Baird v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Leila Baird
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03937
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. ) (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #7 Amended Complaint Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendand Midland Credit Managment, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 14 Days (L.R. 6-1) filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Zadourian, Sevana) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Leila Baird.. (Benedict, Amanda) (Filed on 7/25/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/7/2019. (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management, Inc.. Filed byLeila Baird. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Benedict, Amanda) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2019 02:00 PM in McKinleyville. Parties may participate in the Initial Case Management Conference by telephone and should contact Judge Illman's courtroom deputy for instructions. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Document not properly linked. [err102] Re: #2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Leila Baird. Please attach Civil Cover Sheet as attachment to Complaint. Do not file as separate entry. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/23/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Benedict, Amanda) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Leila Baird . (Benedict, Amanda) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13502037.). Filed byLeila Baird. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Benedict, Amanda) (Filed on 7/9/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baird v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leila Baird
Represented By: Amanda Fay Benedict
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Sevana Zadourian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?