Quade v. Saul
Plaintiff: Ivy Quade
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv07577
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 12/23/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 **PLEASE DISREGARD ENTRY**DOCKETED IN ERROR**ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for all further proceedings. RE #9 Order of Reference to Magistrate for all Purposes. Judge Edward J. Davila no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019) Modified on 12/23/2019 (haS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for random reassignment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on December 18, 2019. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Letellier, Marla) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM-285, #2 USM-285, #3 USM-285)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on November 21, 2019.(ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Edward J. Davila. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ivy Quade.. (Kitson, Kyle) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ivy Quade. (Kitson, Kyle) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul. Filed byIvy Quade. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kitson, Kyle) (Filed on 11/18/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quade v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Marla Kendall Letellier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivy Quade
Represented By: Kyle R. Kitson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?