Legardy v. Atchley et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Legardy
Defendant: M.B. Atchley, O. Redon, J. Fernandez and J. Gonzalez
Case Number: 1:2020cv05716
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Referring Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER from Plaintiff. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re #1 Complaint filed by Ronald Legardy. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 09/16/2020. (rmilc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #2 filed by Ronald Legardy. Plaintiff's application for permission to proceed in forma pauperis (dkt. 2) is GRANTED. The total filing fee that ultimately will be due is $350.00. Plaintiff shall pay only a partial initial filing fee of $5.00. Funds for the remainder of the filing fee will be taken from income to Plaintiff's account in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(B)(1). A copy of this order and the attached instructions will be sent to Plaintiff, the prison trust account office, and the court's financial office. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 09/16/2020. (rmilc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ronald Legardy.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER dated 8/9/20 from Plaintiff. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ronald Legardy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Ronald Legardy. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 17, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk has received plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, Ronald Legardy P-93302, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-01559. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 11, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Ronald Legardy. (Plummer, M)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 08/11/20 ORDERING CASE TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. (Plummer, M)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Ronald Legardy, CDC P-93302 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
August 5, 2020 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Ronald Legardy. (Kastilahn, A)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *8/4/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Kastilahn, A)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ronald Legardy. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 8/6/2020 (Plummer, M).
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Ronald Legardy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Legardy v. Atchley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.B. Atchley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. Redon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Legardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?