Jimerson
Plaintiff: Jeremiah C. Jimerson
Case Number: 1:2020cv05851
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Referring Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 10/01/2020. (rmilc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 10/01/2020. (rmilc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Jeremiah C. Jimerson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Jeremiah Jimerson. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Submitted #2 CLERK'S NOTICE, #3 CLERK'S NOTICE, #4 CLERK'S NOTICE for mailing. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 9/28/2020. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 9/28/2020. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 Letter from Jeremiah Jimerson. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah C. Jimerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?