Hall v. Lynch
Petitioner: Nathaniel V. Hall
Respondent: Warden Jeff Lynch
Case Number: 1:2021cv03352
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Referring Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nathaniel V. Hall. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nathaniel V. Hall. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nathaniel V. Hall. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 12, 2021 Filing 9 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Nathaniel V. Hall. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 7, 2021 Copy of #7 and #8 mailed to petitioner. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/3/2021, TRANSFERRING this matter to the USDC for the Northern District of California. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
May 3, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Nathaniel V. Hall. (Yin, K)
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Nathaniel V. Hall, CDC AM-1760 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Rodriguez, E)
April 30, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Nathaniel V. Hall. (Rodriguez, E)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Nathaniel V. Hall. (Rodriguez, E)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Jeff Lynch by Nathaniel V. Hall.(Rodriguez, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Jeff Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nathaniel V. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?