Washington v. California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Washington
Defendant: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, State of California, CCPOA and Howard
Case Number: 1:2022cv02454
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Eureka Office
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Referring Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION on Consent Form to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anthony Washington. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2022)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 5/6/22. (rmilc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (rmilc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 2, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anthony Washington.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2022) Modified on 5/4/2022 (sfb, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2022 Filing 8 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Anthony Washington. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2022)
April 21, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk has received plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, Anthony Washington T-54933, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 21, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 21, 2022 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-00676. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/19/2022 TRANSFERRING this case to the USDC for the Northern District of California. CASE CLOSED.(Yin, K)
April 19, 2022 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *4/18/2022*. Consent or Decline due by 5/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Licea Chavez, V)
April 19, 2022 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Anthony Washington. (Yin, K)
April 19, 2022 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Anthony Washington. (Licea Chavez, V) Modified on 4/19/2022 (Licea Chavez, V).
April 18, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Anthony Washington. (Licea Chavez, V)
April 18, 2022 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against CCPOA, California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, Howard, State of California by Anthony Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Licea Chavez, V)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCPOA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?