Knox v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Jennifer Knox
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2022cv03420
Filed: June 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kilolo Kijakazi.. (Lehrkind, Margaret) (Filed on 7/16/2022)
June 22, 2022 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jennifer Knox.. (Metsker, John) (Filed on 6/22/2022)
June 17, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2022)
June 17, 2022 Service packet delivered to SSA and the DOJ via email (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2022)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (rmilc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jennifer Knox (Metsker, John) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
June 10, 2022 Filing 7 Erroneous Entry- Disregard (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2022) Modified on 6/10/2022 (slh, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER (Social Security Review Action) (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2022)
June 10, 2022 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/24/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2022)
June 9, 2022 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Parties Disclosure filed by Jennifer Knox (Metsker, John) (Filed on 6/9/2022)
June 9, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Metsker, John) (Filed on 6/9/2022)
June 9, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jennifer Knox. (Metsker, John) (Filed on 6/9/2022)
June 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF DECISION OF COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Administrative Procedure Act Case) against Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. Filed by Jennifer Knox. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Metsker, John) (Filed on 6/9/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knox v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Knox
Represented By: John David Metsker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Margaret T. Lehrkind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?