Facebook, Inc., v. Grunin Featured Case

Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.,
Defendant: Martin Grunin
Case Number: 3:2014cv02323
Filed: May 20, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2015 89 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 19, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2015: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2015 88 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR DAMAGES, ATTORNEY'S FEES, AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 19, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2015: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2015 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 2/19/2015. Court Reporter Name Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorney Judith Jennison; Julie Schwartz. Defendant Attorney Martin Grunin (pro se). Attachment minute order.(dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/19/2015)
February 10, 2015 86 Declaration of Martin Grunin in Reply re 78 Brief of Damages, filed byMartin Grunin. (Related document(s) 78 ) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 3, 2015 85 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., re 83 Response ( Non Motion ), 84 Declaration in Support, (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
February 2, 2015 84 Declaration of Judith B. Jennison in Support of 83 Response ( Non Motion ) in Support of Damages for Default Judgment filed byFacebook, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 83 ) (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
February 2, 2015 83 RESPONSE to re 82 Response ( Non Motion ) Plaintiff Facebook, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Damages by Facebook, Inc.,. (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
January 28, 2015 82 RESPONSE to 78 Brief of Damages by Martin Grunin. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
January 14, 2015 81 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., re 79 Declaration in Support, 80 Declaration in Support, 78 Brief in Support of Damages (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 14, 2015 80 Declaration of Judith B. Jennison in Support of 78 Brief Damages for Default Judgment filed byFacebook, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 78 ) (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 14, 2015 79 Declaration of Mat Henley in Support of 78 Brief Damages for Default Judgment filed byFacebook, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 78 ) (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 14, 2015 78 Brief re 76 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Plaintiff Facebook, Inc.'s Brief in Support of Damages filed byFacebook, Inc.,. (Related document(s) 76 ) (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 9, 2015 77 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 1/8/2015. re 67 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Martin Grunin filed by Facebook, Inc., Court Reporter Name Lydia Zinn. Plaintiff Attorney Judith Jennison. Defendant Attorney Martin Grunin (pro se). Attachment minute order.(dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/9/2015)
January 8, 2015 76 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION re 67 MOTION. Brief due by 1/14/2015 at noon. Responses due by 1/27/2015 at noon. Replies due by 2/3/2015 at noon. Damages Hearing set for 2/19/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 8, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2015: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2014 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., re 74 Brief (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
December 30, 2014 74 Brief re 73 Order Plaintiff Facebook, Inc.'s Response to Request for Briefing filed byFacebook, Inc.,. (Related document(s) 73 ) (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
December 19, 2014 73 REQUEST FOR BRIEFING. Brief due December 30 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 19, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2014 72 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENSE COUNSELS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW re 69 Joint MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 11, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2014 71 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Martin Grunin . (Gordon, Andrew) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 70 RESPONSE (re 67 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Martin Grunin ) filed byMartin Grunin. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gordon, Andrew) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 11, 2014 69 Joint MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Martin Grunin. Responses due by 12/26/2014. Replies due by 1/2/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 of Seth Weinstein, # 4 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 5 of Andrew Gordon, # 6 Proposed Order)(Gordon, Andrew) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
December 8, 2014 68 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Replies due by 12/17/2014 at noon. Show Cause Response due by 12/11/2014 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 8, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
November 20, 2014 67 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Martin Grunin filed by Facebook, Inc.,. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 12/4/2014. Replies due by 12/11/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
October 30, 2014 66 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/30/2014 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 10/30/2014) re 44 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Martin Grunin, Initial Case Management Conference not held on 10/30/2014 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 10/30/2014). (Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/30/2014)
October 30, 2014 65 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Judge William Alsup [denying 44 Motion to Set Aside Default]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 27, 2014 64 Statement re 61 Order -- STATEMENT RE: NOTICE RE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Facebook, Inc.,. (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 27, 2014 63 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel. by Martin Grunin (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Weinstein, Seth) (Filed on 10/27/2014) Modified on 10/27/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2014 62 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Facebook, Inc.,. (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 10/23/2014)
October 22, 2014 61 NOTICE RE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Statement due October 27 at noon. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 22, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
October 20, 2014 60 CLERK'S NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 44 MOTION to Set Aside Default . Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing re-set for 10/30/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 20, 2014 59 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 44 MOTION to Set Aside Default . Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 20, 2014 58 CLERK'S NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 44 MOTION to Set Aside Default . Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014) Modified on 10/20/2014 (dt, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2014 57 CLERK'S NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing. Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
September 23, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 44 MOTION to Set Aside Default . Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 23, 2014 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. Correct event is Re-notice Motion. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 56 Notice (Other) filed by Martin Grunin (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 22, 2014 56 RE-NOTICE MOTION re 44 Motion to Set Aside Default. by Martin Grunin (Gordon, Andrew) (Filed on 9/22/2014) Modified on 9/23/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2014 55 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Weinstein, Seth) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 18, 2014 54 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 11, 2014 53 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 52 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 11, 2014 52 CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Initial CMC on Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 9, 2014 51 REPLY (re 44 MOTION to Set Aside Default ) filed byMartin Grunin. (Weinstein, Seth) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
September 8, 2014 50 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William Alsup for all further proceedings. Hon. Judge Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/8/14. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 5, 2014 49 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL, ***Hearing before Judge Breyer vacated re 44 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Martin Grunin. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/5/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
September 2, 2014 48 DECLARATION of Judith B. Jennison in Opposition to 44 Motion to Set Aside Default filed byFacebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 47 ) (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 9/2/2014) Modified on 9/3/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2014 47 RESPONSE (re 44 MOTION to Set Aside Default ) Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Default filed byFacebook, Inc.,. (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
August 21, 2014 46 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing CMC (text entry only, no document associated with this entry.) Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/10/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 20, 2014 45 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Gordon. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 18, 2014 44 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Martin Grunin. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 9/2/2014. Replies due by 9/9/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Weinstein, Seth) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 15, 2014 43 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Martin Grunin. (Weinstein, Seth) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 15, 2014 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Andrew Weinstein (Weinstein, Seth) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 14, 2014 41 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Gordon ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8845920.) filed by Martin Grunin. (Gordon, Andrew) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 13, 2014 40 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by Facebook, Inc.,. (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 7, 2014 39 AFFIDAVIT by Martin Grunin. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
August 6, 2014 38 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Martin Grunin. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
August 5, 2014 37 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Administrative Judgment by Martin Grunin.. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
July 31, 2014 36 CERTIFICATE of Administrative Judgment by Martin Grunin. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
July 30, 2014 35 AFFIDAVIT of Specific Negative Averment by Martin Grunin. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 22, 2014 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 33 Order on Motion to Strike (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 21, 2014 33 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 18 Motion Prohibiting Brian Robert Costello from Appearing on Behalf of Defendant and to Strike Dockets 8, 10 and 17. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 16, 2014 32 CERTIFICATE of non-response by Martin Grunin. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 16, 2014 31 NOTICE by Martin Grunin. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 14, 2014 30 NOTICE by Martin Grunin. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 29 Notice of Withdrawal of 28 Motion for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joseph P. Cutler (Cutler, Joseph) (Filed on 7/14/2014) Modified on 7/15/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2014 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joseph P. Cutler ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8766941.) filed by Facebook, Inc.,. (Cutler, Joseph) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 10, 2014 27 NOTICE of Offer to Settle by Martin Grunin. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 10, 2014 26 NOTICE by Martin Grunin. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 9, 2014 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 24 Order to Show Cause (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 9, 2014 24 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/9/2014. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
June 25, 2014 23 NOTICE of Offer to Settle by Martin Grunin. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 23, 2014 22 Clerks Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Martin Grunin. (Related documents(s) 19 )(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 19, 2014 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 18 Motion to Strike, 19 Motion for Entry of Default, 20 Declaration in support by Facebook, Inc. (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 6/19/2014) Modified on 6/20/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2014 20 Declaration of Judith Jennison in Support of 19 MOTION for Entry of Default Request for Entry of Default filed byFacebook, Inc.,. (Related document(s) 19 ) (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 19, 2014 19 MOTION for Entry of Default Request for Entry of Default filed by Facebook, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 19, 2014 18 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Facebook, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for an Order Prohibiting Brian Robert Costello from Appearing on Behalf of Defendant and to Strike Dockets 8, 10, and 17 filed by Facebook, Inc.,. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 7/3/2014. Replies due by 7/10/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 12, 2014 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., for Grunin re 14 Order Setting Case Management Conference (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 6/12/2014) Modified on 6/13/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2014 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., for Grunin re Judge Breyer's Standing Orders (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 12, 2014 14 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 10, 2014 17 "NOTICE of Conditional Acceptance" by Martin Grunin (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Facebook, Inc. Martin Grunin served on 5/22/14, answer due 6/12/14. (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 6/10/2014) Modified on 6/11/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2014 12 Featured Case ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Excecutive Committee on 6/10/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 9, 2014 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
June 9, 2014 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Facebook, Inc.,.. (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
June 6, 2014 10 Letter dated 6/4/2014 from Brian-Robert: Costello. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
May 29, 2014 8 NOTICE Re Special LImited Power of Atorney with Attachments by Martin Grunin (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
May 21, 2014 7 Summons Issued as to Martin Grunin. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 21, 2014 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2014 10:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 20, 2014 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc., re 1 Complaint (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 20, 2014 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc., re 1 Complaint (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 20, 2014 3 Proposed Summons. (Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 20, 2014 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 20, 2014 1 COMPLAINT against Martin Grunin ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8629250.). Filed byFacebook, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jennison, Judith) (Filed on 5/20/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facebook, Inc., v. Grunin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Grunin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.,
Represented By: Joseph Perry Cutler
Represented By: Judith Bond Jennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?