Waymo LLC v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Waymo LLC sued Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc., Ottomotto LLC and Otto Trucking LLC for trade secret misappropriation, patent infringement, and unfair competition. Plaintiff alleged that Anthony Levandowski, a former manager in Waymo's self-driving car project, downloaded over 14,000 highly confidential and proprietary files, including those related to Waymo's LiDAR (Light Detection and Ranging) System. Plaintiff also alleged that Uber was using plaintiff's misappropriated technology to produce Uber's own LiDAR devices.

Plaintiff: Waymo LLC
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc., Otto Trucking LLC and Ottomotto LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00939
Filed: February 23, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2018 2645 Featured Case ORDER PERMITTING USE OF PHYSICAL EXHIBITS AT TRIAL (re 2640 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/8/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 7, 2018 2644 NOTICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. of Submission of Responses to Requests for Admission Packets (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 7, 2018 2643 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Notice of Submission of Interrogatory Responses (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 7, 2018 2642 NOTICE by Waymo LLC Waymo's Notice of Submission of Interrogatory Responses (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A PLACEHOLDER, # 2 Appendix B)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 7, 2018 2641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Notice of Submission of Interrogatory Responses filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Felipe Corredor ISO Waymos Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Appendix A SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 7, 2018 2640 Proposed Order and Request Permitting Use of Physical Exhibits In the Courtroom for Trial by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 7, 2018 2639 Witness List by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. --DEFENDANTS' FEBRUARY 7, 2018 ROLLING WITNESS LIST. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 7, 2018 2638 Witness List by Waymo LLC Waymo's February 7, 2018 List of Next Seven Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 7, 2018 2637 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Jury Trial held on 2/7/2018. Witnesses: Travis Kalanick, Nina Qi, Lior Ron, Eric Friedberg. See log for details.Total Time in Court: 4 Hrs. 57 Min.Court Reporters: Katherine Sullivan / Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Charles Verhoeven, Melissa Baily, David Eiseman, Andrea Roberts, David Perlson, James Judah, Jordan Jaffe, Jared Newton, Patrick Schmidt. Defendant Attorneys: Arturo Gonzales, Bill Carmody, Esther Chang, Michael Jacobs, Karen Dunn, Thomas Pardini, Wendy Ray, Martha Goodman, Meredity Dearborh, Joseph Grinstein, Michael Brille, Matthew Berry, Shawn Rabin.Also Present:Special Master: John CooperWaymo Representative: Demarron BerkeleyUber Representative: Eric MeyhoferAttachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/7/2018)
February 7, 2018 2634 Featured Case ORDER PERMITTING USE OF PHYSICAL EXHIBITS AT TRIAL (re 2632 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/7/2018. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 6, 2018 2646 AMENDED MINUTES to 2636 Jury Trial - Held. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 6, 2018 2636 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Jury Trial held on 2/6/2018. Witnesses: Dmitri Dolgov, Gary Thomas Brown, William Grossman, and Travis Kalanick. See trial log for details.Total Time in Court: 5 Hrs. 17 Min.Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan / Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Charles Verhoeven, Melissa Baily, Duane Lyons, David Eiseman, Andrea Roberts, David Perlson, James Judah, Jordan Jaffe, Jared Newton. Defendant Attorneys: Arturo Gonzales, Bill Carmody, Esther Chang, Michael Jacobs, Karen Dunn, Thomas Pardini, Wendy Ray, Martha Goodman, Meredith Dearborn, Joseph Grinstein,Michael Brille, Matthew Berry, Shawn Rabin.Also Present: Special Master: John CooperWaymo Representative: Demarron Berkeley;Uber Representative: Eric Meyhofer Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/6/2018)
February 6, 2018 2635 Sealed Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Jury Trial held on 2/6/2018.Total Time in Court: 21 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan/Debra PasPlaintiff Attorney: Charles Verhoeven, Melissa Baily, Duane Lyons, David Eiseman, Andrea Roberts, David Perlson, James Judah, Jordan Jaffe, Jared Newton. Defendant Attorney: Arturo Gonzales, Bill Carmody, Esther Chang, Michael Jacobs, Karen Dunn, Thomas Pardini, Wendy Ray, Martha Goodman, Meredith Dearborn, Joseph Grinstein, Michael Brille, Matthew Berry, Shawn Rabin. Attachment: Sealed Civil Trial Minutes. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/6/2018) (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2018 2633 TRIAL BRIEF Waymo's Response to Defendants' Brief on Bill Gurley's Trial Testimony by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 6, 2018 2632 Proposed Order and Request Permitting Use of Physical Exhibits in the Courtroom for Trial by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Chang, Esther) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 6, 2018 2631 Witness List by Waymo LLC Waymo's February 6, 2018 List of Next Seven Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 6, 2018 2630 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2628 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Submission in Response to Defendants' Brief on the Penultimate Jury Instructions (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 6, 2018 2629 RESPONSE to re 2549 Response ( Non Motion ), Waymo's Submission in Response to Defendants' Brief on the Penultimate Jury Instructions by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 PLACEHOLDER)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 6, 2018 2628 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Submission in Response to Defendants' Brief on the Penultimate Jury Instructions filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper ISO Waymo's Adminstrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 SEALED Waymo's Submission in Response to Defendants' Brief on the Penultimate Jury Instructions, # 4 REDACTED Waymo's Submission in Response to Defendants' Brief on the Penultimate Jury Instructions, # 5 Exhibit 1 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 6, 2018 2627 RESPONSE to re 2550 Response ( Non Motion ), WAYMO'S OBJECTIONS AND PROPOSED MODIFICATIONS TO THE PENULTIMATE JURY INSTRUCTIONS ON TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION AND SPECIAL VERDICT FORM by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 6, 2018 2626 TRIAL BRIEF Waymo's Response to Defendants' Brief on the Admissibility and Use of Stroz Friedberg's Due Diligence Materials by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 5, 2018 2625 TRIAL BRIEF DEFENDANTS' BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PRECLUDING WAYMO FROM SOLICITING SPECULATIVE, IRRELEVANT, AND PREJUDICIAL OPINION TESTIMONY FROM FORMER UBER BOARD MEMBER BILL GURLEY by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kaitlyn Murphy, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 2624 Witness List by Waymo LLC Waymo's Second Amended February 5, 2018 List of Next Seven Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 2623 TRIAL BRIEF Uber's and Ottomotto's Brief on The Admissibility and Use of Stroz Friedberg's Due Diligence Materials by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Trial Exhibit 5101, # 3 Trial Exhibit 5102, # 4 Trial Exhibit 5215, # 5 Trial Exhibit 7111, # 6 Trial Exhibit 7114, # 7 Trial Exhibit 7418, # 8 Trial Exhibit 7912, # 9 Trial Exhibit 8854, # 10 Trial Exhibit 8855, # 11 Trial Exhibit 8857, part 1, # 12 Trial Exhibit 8857, part 2, # 13 Trial Exhibit 8858)(Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 2622 STIPULATION Regarding Documentary Evidence filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 2621 Witness List by Waymo LLC Waymo's Amended February 5, 2018 List of Next Seven Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 2620 Witness List by Waymo LLC Waymo's February 5, 2018 List of Next Seven Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 2619 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Jury Trial held on 2/5/2018. Opening statements began and concluded from the parties. Sworn witnesses: John Krafcik, Dmitri Dolgoe; Admitted Exhibits: 1249, 1898, 1362, 1907, 1131, 1648, 1255. The Court ruled 2603 Stipulation as stated on the record. Further Jury Trial set before Judge William Alsup in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco, CA. for 2/6/2018 at 7:30 a.m.Total Time in Court: 4 Hours. Court Reporters: Katherine Sullivan / Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Charles Verhoeven, Melissa Bailey, Duane Lyons, David Eiseman, Andrea Roberts, David Perlson, James Judah, Jordan Jaffe. Defendant Attorneys: Bill Carmody, Arturo Gonzales, Karen Dunn, Esther Chang, Joseph Grinstein, Michael Brille, Matthew Berry, Shawn Rabin. Also Present: John Cooper, Special Master; Demarren Berkeley, Waymo Corporate Representative; Eric Meyhofer, Uber Representative; Tony West, Uber Corporate Counsel; Nicole Barto, Uber Representative.Attachment: Minute Order. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 2618 Clerk's Notice re: 2617 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. Request denied. (Related documents(s) 2617 )(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 2617 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. Video Camera hearing set for 2/26/2018 07:30 AM. Objections to Video Recording due 2/12/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 2616 Statement Parties' Joint Submission of Timeline and List of Key Individuals by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 4, 2018 2615 OBJECTIONS to Use of Videos by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 2/4/2018)
February 4, 2018 2614 Statement Parties' Joint Summary of Top 20 Evidentiary Rulings by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 2/4/2018)
February 4, 2018 2613 Witness List by Waymo LLC Waymo's February 4, 2018 List of Next Seven Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/4/2018)
February 4, 2018 2612 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings, Volume 1, held on 1-31-2018, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2018. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 2/4/2018)
February 4, 2018 2611 RESPONSE to re 2597 Order Joint Proposal Regarding Reasonable Royalty Damages by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/4/2018)
February 4, 2018 2610 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-30-2018, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 2546 Transcript Order, 2547 Transcript Order, 2556 Transcript Order, 2548 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2018. (Related documents(s) 2546 , 2547 , 2556 , 2548 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 2/4/2018)
February 4, 2018 2609 Featured Case AMENDED FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/4/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2018)
February 4, 2018 2608 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2606 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Notice of Submission of Deposition Designation Packets (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/4/2018)
February 4, 2018 2607 NOTICE by Waymo LLC re 2606 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Notice of Submission of Deposition Designation Packets (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1-12 PLACEHOLDERS)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/4/2018)
February 4, 2018 2606 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Notice of Submission of Deposition Designation Packets filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Felipe Corredor ISO Waymos Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Appendix 1 SEALED, # 4 Appendix 2 SEALED, # 5 Appendix 3A SEALED, # 6 Appendix 3B SEALED, # 7 Appendix 4 SEALED, # 8 Appendix 5 SEALED, # 9 Appendix 6 SEALED, # 10 Appendix 7 SEALED, # 11 Appendix 8 SEALED, # 12 Appendix 9 SEALED, # 13 Appendix 10 SEALED, # 14 Appendix 11 SEALED, # 15 Appendix 12 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/4/2018)
February 3, 2018 2605 Witness List by Waymo LLC Waymo's February 3, 2018 List of Next Seven Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/3/2018)
February 3, 2018 2604 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2602 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Parties' Joint Submission Regarding Short Descriptions for Alleged Trade Secrets (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/3/2018)
February 3, 2018 2603 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Parties' Joint Submission Regarding Short Descriptions for Alleged Trade Secrets filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A PLACEHOLDER)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/3/2018)
February 3, 2018 2602 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Parties' Joint Submission Regarding Short Descriptions for Alleged Trade Secrets filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan Francis ISO AMtFUS Parties' Joint Submission Regarding Short Descriptions for Alleged Trade Secrets, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 SEALED Parties' Joint Submission Regarding Short Descriptions for Alleged Trade Secrets, # 4 REDACTED Parties' Joint Submission Regarding Short Descriptions for Alleged Trade Secrets, # 5 Exhibit A SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/3/2018)
February 2, 2018 2601 Witness List by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. --DEFENDANTS' FEBRUARY 2, 2018 ROLLING WITNESS LIST. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
February 2, 2018 2600 Witness List by Waymo LLC Waymo's February 2, 2018 List of Next Seven Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
February 2, 2018 2599 EXHIBITS re 2551 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Trial Brief -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2551-4], # 2 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2551-4])(Related document(s) 2551 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
February 2, 2018 2598 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Otto Trucking LLC. (Schuman, Brett) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
February 2, 2018 2597 Featured Case ORDER RE BIFURCATION OF REASONABLE ROYALTY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/2/2018. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
February 1, 2018 2596 Witness List by Waymo LLC Waymo's February 1, 2018 List of Next Seven Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 2595 Witness List by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. February 1, 2018 Rolling Witness List. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 2594 EXHIBITS re 2542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof re Development Expenses -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2542-4], # 2 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2542-4], # 3 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2543-1], # 4 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2543-1], # 5 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2543-4], # 6 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2543-4])(Related document(s) 2542 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 2593 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Otto Trucking LLC. (Schuman, Brett) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
January 31, 2018 2592 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Stroz Friedberg, LLC. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 31, 2018 2591 Featured Case ORDER FOR JURY REFRESHMENTS. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/31/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 31, 2018 2590 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Jury Selection held on 1/31/2018. See Trial Log for further details.Total Time in Court: 4 Hours; 25 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan / Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Charles Verhoeven, Melissa Bailey, Duane Lyons, David Eiseman, Andrea Roberts, David Perlson, James Judah, Jordan Jaffe.Also Present: Demarren Berkeley, Corporate Representative; Tara Trask, Jury Consultant. Defendant Attorneys: Arturo Gonzales, Bill Carmody, Esther Chang, Karen Dunn, Joseph Grinstein, Michael Brille, Matthew Berry, Shawn Rabin.Also Present: Eric Meyhofer, Uber Representative; Tony West, Uber Corporate Counsel. Special Master: John Cooper. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/31/2018) Modified on 1/31/2018 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2018 2589 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by John Lee Cooper. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 31, 2018 2588 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 30, 2018 before Judge William Alsup by John Lee Cooper, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 31, 2018 2587 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 1281 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 31, 2018 2586 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 963 Motion for Reconsideration. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 30, 2018 2585 (PUBLIC REFILING OF 2557 pursuant to 2558 ) OMNIBUS ORDER ON 677 1552 2199 EXTENT TO WHICH ACCUSATIONS RE UBER'S LITIGATION MISCONDUCT MAY FEATURE AT TRIAL. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2584 EXHIBITS re 2532 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 2527 , [2527-1], [2527-2], [2527-3], and [2527-4] --DECLARATION OF THOMAS J. PARDINI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF WAYMO LLCS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [2527-8], # 2 Revised Unredacted Version of [2527-11], # 3 Revised Unredacted Version of [2527-12], # 4 Revised Unredacted Version of [2527-17], # 5 Revised Unredacted Version of [2527-19])(Related document(s) 2532 ) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2583 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 2160 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2581 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 1709 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2580 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 1703 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2579 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 1669 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2578 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 1668 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2577 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 1649 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2576 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 1597 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2575 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 1453 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2574 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 1324 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2573 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 1058 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE DOCUMENT WITH PERSONAL INFORMATION by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2572 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 993 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2571 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 863 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2570 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 830 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2569 Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini in Support of 2530 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof With Respect To Waymo's Development Expenses filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2530 ) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2568 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Final Pretrial Conference held on 1/30/2018; denying 2511 Motion to Intervene; denying 2512 Motion for advance disclosure of trial examination questions; 2305 Motion for Leave to Add Trial Witnesses: the Court ruled as stated on the record. Opening statements will be split into two sessions: public and sealed. Total Time in Court: 3 Hours; 16 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan / Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Charles Verhoeven, Melissa Bailey, David Eiseman IV, Andrea Roberts, David Perlson, James Judah, Jordan Jaffe, Jared Newton.Defendant Attorneys: Arturo Gonzales, Bill Carmody, Michael Jacobs, Esther Chang, Matthew Berry, Joseph Grinstein, Karen Dunn, Michael Brille, Meredity Dearborn, Shawn Rabin.Special Master: John Cooper. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2567 Witness List by Waymo LLC Parties' Amended Joint List of All Potential Trial Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2566 EXHIBITS Corrected version of [677-2] filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2565 EXHIBITS re 676 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Corrected version of [676-6] filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 676 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2564 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING 2560 STIPULATION RE JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 2563 RESPONSE to re 2562 Statement, Waymo's Response to Uber's Submission of Proposed Dates for Timeline by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 29, 2018 2562 Statement re 2250 Order Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc. and Ottomotto LLC's Submission of Proposed Dates for Timeline by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 2561 Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini in Support of 2519 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Second Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2519 ) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 2560 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation Regarding Trade Secret Jury Instructions and [Proposed] Order filed by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 2559 Featured Case ORDER REQUIRING SUMMARY OF RULINGS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/29/2018. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 2558 Featured Case ORDER RE SEALING OF 2557 OMNIBUS ORDER ON ACCUSATIONS RE UBER'S LITIGATION MISCONDUCT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/29/2018. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 2557 Featured Case OMNIBUS ORDER ON 677 1552 2199 EXTENT TO WHICH ACCUSATIONS RE UBER'S LITIGATION MISCONDUCT MAY FEATURE AT TRIAL by Judge Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018) (whalc2S, COURT STAFF)
January 29, 2018 2556 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01-30-2018 before Judge William Alsup by Waymo LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 2555 Statement --DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND OTTOMOTTO LLC'S AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 2554 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2551 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Trial Brief (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 2553 Statement Joint Submission Regarding the Joint Statement of the Case by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Defendants' Statement of the Case), # 2 Exhibit B (Waymo's Statement of the Case))(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 2552 RESPONSE to re 2539 Response ( Non Motion ) --DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND OTTOMOTTO LLCS RESPONSE TO WAYMOS TRIAL BRIEF by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5 (Redacted))(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 2551 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Trial Brief filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michelle Yang, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Defendants' Response to Waymo's Trial Brief, # 4 Unredacted Version of Defendants' Response to Waymo's Trial Brief, # 5 Unredacted Version of Ex. 5 to Chang Declaration)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 2550 RESPONSE to re 2449 Order, Waymo's Response to Court's Penultimate Jury Instructions and Special Verdict Form by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Edits to Penultimate Jury Instructions and Special Verdict Form, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Special Verdict Form, # 3 Exhibit C - Redlined Edits to Special Verdict Form)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 2549 RESPONSE to re 2449 Order, Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc. and Ottomotto LLC's Response to Court's Penultimate Jury Instructions On Trade Secret Misappropriation (Dkt. 2449) by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 2548 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 30, 2018 before Judge William Alsup by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 2547 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 30, 2018 before Judge William Alsup by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 2546 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 30, 2018 before Judge William Alsup by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 2545 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof re Development Expenses, 2543 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 2544 RESPONSE to re 2531 Statement, --DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND OTTOMOTTO LLCS RESPONSE TO WAYMOS OFFER OF PROOF RE DEVELOPMENT EXPENSES by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Halley Josephs, # 2 Exhibit 1 (REDACTED), # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 (REDACTED), # 5 Exhibit 4 (REDACTED))(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 28, 2018 2543 EXHIBITS re 2542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof re Development Expenses --Redacted Version of Ex. 1 to Josephs Decl. filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Version of Ex. 1 to Josephs Decl., # 2 Unredacted Version of Ex. 3 to Josephs Decl., # 3 Redacted Version of Ex. 4 to Josephs Decl., # 4 Unredacted Version of Ex. 4 to Josephs Decl.)(Related document(s) 2542 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 1/28/2018)
January 28, 2018 2542 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof re Development Expenses filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof re Development Expenses, # 4 Unredacted Version of Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof re Development Expenses)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 1/28/2018)
January 28, 2018 2541 RESPONSE to re 2532 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 2527 , [2527-1], [2527-2], [2527-3], and [2527-4], 2529 Statement, --DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND OTTOMOTTO LLCS RESPONSE TO WAYMOS OFFER OF PROOF REGARDING ADMISSIBILITY OF CERTAIN MARKET AND FINANCIAL INFORMATION by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 1/28/2018)
January 27, 2018 2540 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2538 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Uber's Amended Trial Brief (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/27/2018)
January 27, 2018 2539 RESPONSE to re 2517 Trial Brief REDACTED Waymo's Response to Uber's Amended Trial Brief by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/27/2018)
January 27, 2018 2538 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Uber's Amended Trial Brief filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper ISO Waymo's AMTFUS, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Waymo's Response to Uber's Amended Trial Brief, # 4 SEALED Version of Waymo's Response to Uber's Amended Trial Brief)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/27/2018)
January 26, 2018 2537 Clerk's Notice DECLINING Video Recording re: 2535 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. (Related documents(s) 2535 )(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 2536 RESPONSE to re 1468 Order --JOINT SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED AMENDED REVISION TO JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE QUESTION NO. 9 by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 2535 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. Video Camera hearing set for 2/5/2018 07:30 AM. Objections to Video Recording due 2/2/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 2534 REPLY (re 2512 MOTION advance disclosure of trial examination ) filed byJohn Gardner. (Baldwin, Merri) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 2533 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2528 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 2532 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 2527 , [2527-1], [2527-2], [2527-3], and [2527-4], 2527 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymos Offer of Proof Regarding Admissibility of Certain Market and Financial Information, 2530 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof With Respect To Waymo's Development Expenses (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 2532 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 2527 , [2527-1], [2527-2], [2527-3], and [2527-4] filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order CORRECTED Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration CORRECTED Declaration of Lindsay Cooper ISO Waymo's AMTFUS, # 3 CORRECTED SEALED Version of Offer of Proof Regarding Admissibility of Certain Market and Financial Information, # 4 CORRECTED PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Offer of Proof Regarding Admissibility of Certain Market and Financial Information)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/26/2018) Modified on 1/26/2018 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2018 2531 Statement Waymo's Offer of Proof With Respect To Waymo's Development Expenses by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration ISO Waymo's Offer of Proof With Respect To Waymo's Development Expenses, # 2 Exhibit PUBLIC 1-7 PLACEHOLDERS)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 2530 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof With Respect To Waymo's Development Expenses filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper ISO Waymo's AMTFU', # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Waymo's Offer of Proof With Respect To Waymo's Development Expenses, # 4 SEALED Version of Waymo's Offer of Proof With Respect To Waymo's Development Expenses, # 5 Exhibit 1 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 2 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 3 SEALED, # 8 Exhibit 4 SEALED, # 9 Exhibit 5 SEALED, # 10 Exhibit 6 SEALED, # 11 Exhibit 7 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 2529 Statement Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Admissibility of Certain Market and Financial Information by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration ISO Waymos Offer of Proof Regarding Admissibility of Certain Market and Financial Information, # 2 Exhibit PUBLIC 1-19 PLACEHOLDERS)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 2528 EXHIBITS re 2527 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymos Offer of Proof Regarding Admissibility of Certain Market and Financial Information -- SEALED Exhibit 19 filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 2527 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 2527 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymos Offer of Proof Regarding Admissibility of Certain Market and Financial Information filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper ISO Waymo's AMTFUS, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Waymos Offer of Proof Regarding Admissibility of Certain Market and Financial Information, # 4 SEALED Version of Waymos Offer of Proof Regarding Admissibility of Certain Market and Financial Information, # 5 Exhibit 1 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 2 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 3 SEALED, # 8 Exhibit 4 SEALED, # 9 Exhibit 5 SEALED, # 10 Exhibit 6 SEALED, # 11 Exhibit 7 SEALED, # 12 Exhibit 8 SEALED, # 13 Exhibit 9 SEALED, # 14 Exhibit 10 SEALED, # 15 Exhibit 11 SEALED, # 16 Exhibit 12 SEALED, # 17 Exhibit 13 SEALED, # 18 Exhibit 14 SEALED, # 19 Exhibit 15 SEALED, # 20 Exhibit 16 SEALED, # 21 Exhibit 17 SEALED, # 22 Exhibit 18 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/26/2018) Modified on 1/26/2018 (sxbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/26/2018 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2018 2526 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 2524 JOINT REQUEST RE COURTROOM EQUIPMENT by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 2525 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/16/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Jordan, William) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 2524 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Request and [Proposed] Order Regarding Courtroom Equipment filed by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 24, 2018 2523 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 2512 MOTION advance disclosure of trial examination ) Waymo's Response to Non-Party Witness John Gardner's Motion Pursuant to FRE 611 filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 24, 2018 2522 RESPONSE to re 2515 Order,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc. and Ottomotto LLC's Response to Order Shortening Time to Brief and Hear Motions to Intervene and for Advance Disclosure of Questions (Dkt. 2515) by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 23, 2018 2521 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2519 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Second Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 2520 Proposed Pretrial Order Second Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A PLACEHOLDER, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C, # 4 Appendix D REDACTED, # 5 Appendix E)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 2519 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Second Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan Francis ISO AMtFUS Second Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 SEALED Second Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order, # 4 REDACTED Second Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order, # 5 Appendix A SEALED, # 6 Appendix D SEALED, # 7 Appendix D REDACTED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 2518 EXHIBITS re 2500 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit REVISED SEALED version of [2500-4], # 2 Exhibit REVISED REDACTED version of [2500-4], # 3 Exhibit REVISED SEALED version of [2501-13], # 4 Exhibit REVISED REDACTED version of [2501-13], # 5 Exhibit REVISED SEALED version of [2501-20], # 6 Exhibit REVISED REDACTED version of [2501-20], # 7 Exhibit REVISED SEALED version of [2502-7], # 8 Exhibit REVISED REDACTED version of [2502-7], # 9 Exhibit REVISED SEALED version of [2502-8], # 10 Exhibit REVISED REDACTED version of [2502-8], # 11 Exhibit REVISED SEALED version of [2502-9], # 12 Exhibit REVISED REDACTED version of [2502-9], # 13 Exhibit REVISED SEALED version of [2502-10], # 14 Exhibit REVISED REDACTED version of [2502-10], # 15 Exhibit REVISED SEALED version of [2502-11], # 16 Exhibit REVISED REDACTED version of [2502-11], # 17 Exhibit REVISED SEALED version of [2502-24], # 18 Exhibit REVISED REDACTED version of [2502-24])(Related document(s) 2500 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 2517 TRIAL BRIEF --Amended Trial Brief by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 2516 (PUBLIC REFILING OF 2497 pursuant to 2498 ) ORDER ON 2202 DAUBERT MOTION RE LAMBERTUS HESSELINK. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 22, 2018 2515 Featured Case ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO BRIEF AND HEAR 2511 2512 MOTIONS TO INTERVENE AND FOR ADVANCE DISCLOSURE OF QUESTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/22/2018. Responses due by 1/24/2018. Replies due by 1/26/2018. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 19, 2018 2514 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2502 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,, 2500 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof, 2501 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,, (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 2513 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Waymo LLC. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 2512 MOTION advance disclosure of trial examination filed by John Gardner. Responses due by 2/2/2018. Replies due by 2/9/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Merri Baldwin)(Baldwin, Merri) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 2511 MOTION to Intervene filed by John Gardner. Responses due by 2/2/2018. Replies due by 2/9/2018. (Baldwin, Merri) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 2510 EXHIBITS re 2509 Declaration in Support,,, --Exhibit 28 (REDACTED) to Declaration of Esther Kim Chang ISO Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 29 (REDACTED), # 2 Exhibit 30, # 3 Exhibit 31 (REDACTED), # 4 Exhibit 32, # 5 Exhibit 33 (REDACTED), # 6 Exhibit 34, # 7 Exhibit 35, # 8 Exhibit 36, # 9 Exhibit 37 (REDACTED), # 10 Exhibit 38 (REDACTED), # 11 Exhibit 39 (REDACTED), # 12 Exhibit 40 (REDACTED), # 13 Exhibit 41 (REDACTED), # 14 Exhibit 42 (REDACTED), # 15 Exhibit 43 (REDACTED), # 16 Exhibit 44 (REDACTED), # 17 Exhibit 45 (REDACTED), # 18 Exhibit 46 (REDACTED), # 19 Exhibit 47 (REDACTED), # 20 Exhibit 48 (REDACTED), # 21 Exhibit 49 (REDACTED), # 22 Exhibit 50 (REDACTED), # 23 Exhibit 51, # 24 Exhibit 52, # 25 Exhibit 53, # 26 Exhibit 54, # 27 Exhibit 55 (REDACTED), # 28 Exhibit 56 (REDACTED), # 29 Exhibit 57 (REDACTED), # 30 Exhibit 58, # 31 Exhibit 59 (REDACTED), # 32 Exhibit 60, # 33 Exhibit 61, # 34 Exhibit 62, # 35 Exhibit 63, # 36 Exhibit 64, # 37 Exhibit 65 (REDACTED), # 38 Exhibit 66 (REDACTED), # 39 Exhibit 67, # 40 Exhibit 68 (REDACTED), # 41 Exhibit 69 (REDACTED), # 42 Exhibit 70, # 43 Exhibit 71 (REDACTED), # 44 Exhibit 72 (REDACTED), # 45 Exhibit 73, # 46 Exhibit 74, # 47 Exhibit 75)(Related document(s) 2509 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 2509 Declaration of Esther Kim Chang in Support of 2503 Response ( Non Motion ), re Waymo's Offer of Proof filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 (REDACTED), # 3 Exhibit 3 (REDACTED), # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5 (REDACTED), # 6 Exhibit 6 (REDACTED), # 7 Exhibit 7 (REDACTED), # 8 Exhibit 8 (REDACTED), # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10 (REDACTED), # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17 (REDACTED), # 18 Exhibit 18 (REDACTED), # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22 (REDACTED), # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24 (REDACTED), # 25 Exhibit 25 (REDACTED), # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27 (REDACTED))(Related document(s) 2503 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 2508 Declaration of Kevin Faulkner in Support of 2503 Response ( Non Motion ), re Waymo's Offer of Proof filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2503 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 2507 Declaration of Arturo J. Gonzalez in Support of 2503 Response ( Non Motion ), re Waymo's Offer of Proof filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 2503 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 2506 Declaration of Wendy Ray in Support of 2503 Response ( Non Motion ), re Waymo's Offer of Proof filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2503 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 2505 Declaration of Sylvia Rivera in Support of 2503 Response ( Non Motion ), re Waymo's Offer of Proof filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 2503 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 2504 Declaration of Eric A. Tate in Support of 2503 Response ( Non Motion ), re Waymo's Offer of Proof filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2503 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 2503 RESPONSE to re 2470 Response ( Non Motion ),,,,, --Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof (REDACTED) by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Response to Appendix A of Waymo's Offer of Proof (REDACTED), # 2 Defendants' Response to Appendix B of Waymo's Offer of Proof)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 2502 EXHIBITS re 2500 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof --Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 28 filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 29, # 2 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 31, # 3 Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 33, # 4 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 33, # 5 Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 37, # 6 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 37, # 7 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 38, # 8 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 39, # 9 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 40, # 10 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 41, # 11 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 42, # 12 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 43, # 13 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 44, # 14 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 45, # 15 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 46, # 16 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 47, # 17 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 48, # 18 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 49, # 19 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 50, # 20 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 55, # 21 Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 56, # 22 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 56, # 23 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 57, # 24 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 59, # 25 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 65, # 26 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 66, # 27 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 68, # 28 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 69, # 29 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 71, # 30 Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 72, # 31 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 72, # 32 Redacted Version of Response to Appendix A, # 33 Urnedacted Version of Response to Appendix A)(Related document(s) 2500 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 2501 EXHIBITS re 2500 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof --Declaration of Esther Kim Chang ISO Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 2, # 2 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 2, # 3 Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 3, # 4 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 3, # 5 Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 5, # 6 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 5, # 7 Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 6, # 8 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 6, # 9 Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 7, # 10 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 7, # 11 Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 8, # 12 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 8, # 13 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 10, # 14 Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 17, # 15 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 17, # 16 Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 18, # 17 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 18, # 18 Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 22, # 19 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 22, # 20 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 24, # 21 Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 25, # 22 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 25, # 23 Redacted Version of Chang Ex. 27, # 24 Unredacted Version of Chang Ex. 27)(Related document(s) 2500 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 2500 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michelle Yang, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof, # 4 Unredacted Version of Defendants' Response to Waymo's Offer of Proof)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 2499 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGE CORLEY'S NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge William Alsup [denying 2474 Motion]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 18, 2018 2498 Featured Case ORDER RE SEALING OF 2497 ORDER ON DAUBERT MOTION RE LAMBERTUS HESSELINK. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/18/2018. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/18/2018: # 1 Exhibit A) (whalc2S, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2018 2497 Featured Case (UNDER SEAL) ORDER ON 2202 DAUBERT MOTION RE LAMBERTUS HESSELINK by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018) (whalc2S, COURT STAFF)
January 18, 2018 2496 EXHIBITS re 2477 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Response to Waymo's Precis ISO Request to File Motion for Relief -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2477-5], # 2 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2477-5], # 3 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2477-7], # 4 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2477-7])(Related document(s) 2477 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 2495 Featured Case ORDER RE 2404 2405 2407 JURY INSTRUCTION ON DAMAGES BASED ONLY ON ACQUISITION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/18/2018. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 2494 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 2472 2488 2490 REQUESTS TO FILE NEW MOTION FOR RELIEF AND ADDITIONAL MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/18/2018. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 2493 Featured Case ORDER ON 1612 DAUBERT MOTION RE JIM TIMMINS AND 2194 MOTION IN LIMINE RE DUE DILIGENCE by Judge Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 2492 Featured Case ORDER RE 1822 1919 2004 MOTION TO CLOSE COURTROOM by Judge Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 17, 2018 2491 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2487 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Prcis in Support of its Request to File a Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Ubers Use of Ephemeral Communications, Non-attributable Devices or Improper Privilege Design, 2489 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Precis in Support of its Request to File a Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Characterizing Mr. Jacobs' Allegations (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 17, 2018 2490 Brief Waymo's Precis in Support of its Request to File a Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Characterizing Mr. Jacobs' Allegations filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 17, 2018 2489 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Precis in Support of its Request to File a Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Characterizing Mr. Jacobs' Allegations filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan Francis ISO AMTFUS, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 PUBLIC Version of Waymo's Precis in Support of its Request to File a Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Characterizing Mr. Jacobs' Allegations, # 4 SEALED Version of Waymo's Precis in Support of its Request to File a Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Characterizing Mr. Jacobs' Allegations)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 17, 2018 2488 Brief Waymo's Precis in Support of its Request to File a Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Uber's Use of Ephemeral Communications, Non-attributable Devices or Improper Privilege Designations filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 17, 2018 2487 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Prcis in Support of its Request to File a Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Ubers Use of Ephemeral Communications, Non-attributable Devices or Improper Privilege Designations filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan Francis ISO AMTFUS, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Version of Waymo's Prcis in Support of its Request to File a Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Ubers Use of Ephemeral Communications, Non-attributable Devices or Improper Privilege Designations, # 4 SEALED Version of Waymo's Prcis in Support of its Request to File a Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Ubers Use of Ephemeral Communications, Non-attributable Devices or Improper Privilege Designations)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 16, 2018 2486 EXHIBITS re 2466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Defendants' Discovery Misconduct --Declaration of Michelle Yang ISO Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byOttomotto LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [2466-3], # 2 Revised Unredacted Version of [2466-5], # 3 Revised Unredacted Version of [2466-10], # 4 Revised Unredacted Version of [2466-20], # 5 Revised Unredacted Version of [2467-14], # 6 Revised Unredacted Version of [2467-21], # 7 Revised Unredacted Version of [2467-22], # 8 Revised Unredacted Version of 2468 , # 9 Revised Unredacted Version of [2468-5], # 10 Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-11], # 11 Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-13], # 12 Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-16], # 13 Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-18], # 14 Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-19], # 15 Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-20], # 16 Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-21], # 17 Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-22], # 18 Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-25], # 19 Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-27], # 20 Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-31], # 21 Revised Unredacted Version of [2469-35])(Related document(s) 2466 ) (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 16, 2018 2485 Declaration of Adrian J. Sawyer in Support of 2466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Defendants' Discovery Misconduct filed bySandstone Group, LLC, Ognen Stojanovski, Tyto LiDAR, LLC. (Related document(s) 2466 ) (Sawyer, Adrian) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 16, 2018 2484 EXHIBITS re 2473 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge --DECLARATION OF THOMAS J. PARDINI IN SUPPORT OF WAYMO'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [2473-6], # 2 Revised Unredacted Version of [2473-7], # 3 Revised Unredacted Version of [2473-8])(Related document(s) 2473 ) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 16, 2018 2483 Declaration of Ismail Ramsey in Support of 2466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Defendants' Discovery Misconduct filed byAnthony Levandowski. (Related document(s) 2466 ) (Ramsey, Ismail) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 16, 2018 2482 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 2428 Motion for Reconsideration. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 16, 2018 2481 Featured Case SECOND NOTICE OF NON-RECUSAL AND ORDER RE DEADLINE FOR MOTIONS TO DISQUALIFY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/16/2018. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018) (whalc2S, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2018 2480 REDACTION to 2464 Order -- Public Re-Filing in Response to Court Order Re: Waymo's Administrative Motion to Seal by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2446-1], # 2 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [2441-6], # 3 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [2441-7], # 4 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [2441-8], # 5 PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2446-2], # 6 PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2446-3], # 7 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [2441-12], # 8 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [2441-13], # 9 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [2441-14], # 10 PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2446-4])(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 14, 2018 2479 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2477 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Response to Waymo's Precis ISO Request to File Motion for Relief (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/14/2018)
January 14, 2018 2478 RESPONSE to re 2472 Brief Waymo's Precis ISO Request to File Motion for Relief by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Camila Tapernoux, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F (REDACTED), # 8 Exhibit G (REDACTED), # 9 Exhibit H (REDACTED), # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J (REDACTED), # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M (REDACTED))(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/14/2018)
January 14, 2018 2477 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Response to Waymo's Precis ISO Request to File Motion for Relief filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michelle Yang, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted version of Uber's Response to Waymo's Precis ISO Request to File Motion for Relief, # 4 Unredacted version of Uber's Response to Waymo's Precis ISO Request to File Motion for Relief, # 5 Unredacted version of Ex. F to Tapernoux Decl., # 6 Unredacted version of Ex. G to Tapernoux Decl., # 7 Unredacted version of Ex. H to Tapernoux Decl., # 8 Redacted version of Ex. J to Tapernoux Decl., # 9 Unredacted version of Ex. J to Tapernoux Decl., # 10 Redacted version of Ex. M to Tapernoux Decl., # 11 Unredacted version of Ex. M to Tapernoux Decl.)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/14/2018)
January 12, 2018 2476 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2469 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,, 2467 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, 2468 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, 2466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Defendants' Discovery Misconduct (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 2475 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2473 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 2474 MOTION Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 2454 Order, 2458 Order re In Camera Review filed by Waymo LLC. Responses due by 1/26/2018. Replies due by 2/2/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration ISO Waymo's Motion for Relief from Non-Depositive Pretrial Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2-5 PLACEHOLDER)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 2473 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper ISO Waymo's AMTFUS, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 PUBLIC REDACTED Waymo's Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge, # 4 SEALED Waymo's Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge, # 5 Exhibit 2 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 3 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 4 SEALED, # 8 Exhibit 5 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 2472 Brief Waymo's Precis in Support of its Request to File a Motion for Relief Based on Defendants' Litigation Misconduct filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 2471 NOTICE by Waymo LLC re 2466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Defendants' Discovery Misconduct -- Notice of Lodging of Exhibits 25 and 26 in Support of Offer of Proof (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 2470 RESPONSE to re 2447 Order Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Defendants' Discovery Misconduct by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeff Nardinelli in Support of Waymo's Submission, # 2 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 1-10, # 3 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 1-11, # 4 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 12-24, # 5 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 25-26, # 6 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 27, # 7 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 28, # 8 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 29, # 9 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 30, # 10 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 31, # 11 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 32-38, # 12 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 39, # 13 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 40-45, # 14 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 46, # 15 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 47, # 16 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 48-54, # 17 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 55, # 18 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 56-58, # 19 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 59, # 20 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 60-73, # 21 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 74, # 22 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 75-78, # 23 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 79, # 24 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 80, # 25 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 81, # 26 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 82, # 27 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 83-88, # 28 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 89, # 29 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 90, # 30 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 91, # 31 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 92, # 32 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 93-97, # 33 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 98, # 34 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. 99-104, # 35 Exhibit PUBLIC Ex. A-Z & AA, # 36 Appendix A, # 37 Appendix B)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 2469 EXHIBITS re 2466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Defendants' Discovery Misconduct filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 94, # 2 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 95, # 3 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 96, # 4 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 97, # 5 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 99, # 6 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 100, # 7 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 101, # 8 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 102, # 9 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 103, # 10 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 104, # 11 Exhibit SEALED Ex. A, # 12 Exhibit SEALED Ex. AA, # 13 Exhibit SEALED Ex. B, # 14 Exhibit SEALED Ex. C, # 15 Exhibit SEALED Ex. D, # 16 Exhibit SEALED Ex. E, # 17 Exhibit SEALED Ex. F, # 18 Exhibit SEALED Ex. G, # 19 Exhibit SEALED Ex. H, # 20 Exhibit SEALED Ex. I, # 21 Exhibit SEALED Ex. J, # 22 Exhibit SEALED Ex. K, # 23 Exhibit SEALED Ex. L, # 24 Exhibit SEALED Ex. M, # 25 Exhibit SEALED Ex. N, # 26 Exhibit SEALED Ex. P, # 27 Exhibit SEALED Ex. Q, # 28 Exhibit SEALED Ex. R, # 29 Exhibit SEALED Ex. S, # 30 Exhibit SEALED Ex. T, # 31 Exhibit SEALED Ex. U, # 32 Exhibit SEALED Ex. V, # 33 Exhibit SEALED Ex. W, # 34 Exhibit SEALED Ex. Y, # 35 Exhibit SEALED Ex. Z)(Related document(s) 2466 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 2468 EXHIBITS re 2466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Defendants' Discovery Misconduct filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 61, # 2 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 62, # 3 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 63, # 4 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 64, # 5 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 65, # 6 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 66, # 7 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 67, # 8 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 68, # 9 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 69, # 10 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 70, # 11 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 71, # 12 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 72, # 13 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 73, # 14 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 75, # 15 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 76, # 16 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 77, # 17 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 78, # 18 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 83, # 19 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 84, # 20 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 85, # 21 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 86, # 22 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 87, # 23 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 88, # 24 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 90)(Related document(s) 2466 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 2467 EXHIBITS re 2466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Defendants' Discovery Misconduct filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 32, # 2 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 33, # 3 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 34, # 4 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 35, # 5 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 36, # 6 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 37, # 7 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 38, # 8 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 40, # 9 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 41, # 10 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 42, # 11 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 43, # 12 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 44, # 13 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 45, # 14 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 48, # 15 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 49, # 16 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 50, # 17 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 51, # 18 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 52, # 19 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 53, # 20 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 54, # 21 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 56, # 22 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 57, # 23 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 58)(Related document(s) 2466 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 2466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offer of Proof Regarding Defendants' Discovery Misconduct filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in Support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 SEALED Waymo's Offer of Proof, # 4 PUBLIC Waymo's Offer of Proof, # 5 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 1, # 6 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 2, # 7 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 3, # 8 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 4, # 9 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 5, # 10 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 6, # 11 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 7, # 12 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 8, # 13 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 9, # 14 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 10, # 15 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 12, # 16 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 13, # 17 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 14, # 18 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 15, # 19 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 16, # 20 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 17, # 21 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 18, # 22 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 19, # 23 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 20, # 24 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 21, # 25 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 22, # 26 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 23, # 27 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 24)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 11, 2018 2465 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 11, 2018 2464 Featured Case ORDER AMENDING DKT. NO. 2460 ORDER RE: WAYMO'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/11/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 11, 2018 2463 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 2433 Motion for Reconsideration. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 9, 2018 2462 Featured Case NOTICE AND ORDER RE SEATING IN GALLERY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/9/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
January 9, 2018 2461 Featured Case ORDER RE: IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/9/2018. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
January 9, 2018 2460 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 2441 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
January 8, 2018 2459 EXHIBITS re 2451 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2451-5], # 2 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2451-5], # 3 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2451-6], # 4 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2451-6])(Related document(s) 2451 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
January 8, 2018 2458 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING WAYMOS IDENTIFICATION OF DOCUMENTS FOR THE COURTS IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on January 8, 2018. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
January 5, 2018 2457 NOTICE by Waymo LLC re 2454 Order Waymo's Notice of Redacted Pages for In Camera Review (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 5, 2018 2456 Featured Case ORDER Clarifying Docket No. 2454 . Uber shall provide the Court with unredacted copies of those Waymo-identified 50 pages that identify the redacted portions by 5:00 p.m. on Monday, January 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on January 5, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 4, 2018 2455 EXHIBITS re 2451 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit J to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang (corrected highlighted version of 2451-8), # 2 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit K to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang (corrected highlighted version of 2451-9), # 3 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit O to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang (corrected highlighted version of 2451-13))(Related document(s) 2451 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
January 4, 2018 2454 Featured Case DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/4/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
January 4, 2018 2453 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2451 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
January 4, 2018 2452 Declaration of Esther Kim Chang in Support of 2450 Discovery Letter Brief Responding to Waymo's Motion to Compel Ric Jacobs-related discovery (Dkt. 2442) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) 2450 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
January 4, 2018 2451 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michelle Yang, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit B to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # 4 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit E to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # 5 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit G to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # 6 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit H to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # 7 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit I to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # 8 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit J to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # 9 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit K to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # 10 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit L to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # 11 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit M to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # 12 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit N to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # 13 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit O to the Declaration of Esther Kim Chang)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
January 4, 2018 2450 Discovery Letter Brief Responding to Waymo's Motion to Compel Ric Jacobs-related discovery (Dkt. 2442) filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
January 3, 2018 2449 PENULTIMATE JURY INSTRUCTIONS ON TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION and [PROPOSED] SPECIAL VERDICT FORM. Deadline: NOON on 1/29/2018. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/3/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Special Verdict Form)(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
January 3, 2018 2448 Featured Case ORDER RE: RESPONSE TO WAYMO'S LETTER BRIEF RE: OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY ISSUES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/3/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
January 3, 2018 2447 Featured Case ORDER RE FORTHCOMING OFFER OF PROOF AND RESPONSE THERETO. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/3/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
January 2, 2018 2446 EXHIBITS re 2441 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Letter Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Issues filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [2441-5], # 2 Revised Unredacted Version of [2441-9], # 3 Revised Unredacted Version of [2441-11], # 4 Revised Unredacted Version of [2441-15])(Related document(s) 2441 ) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
January 2, 2018 2445 Featured Case ORDER CLARIFYING 2402 PRIOR ORDER DATED DECEMBER 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/2/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
December 29, 2017 2444 Featured Case NOTICE AND ORDER RE 2396 SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/29/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
December 29, 2017 2443 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2441 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Letter Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Issues (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
December 29, 2017 2442 Discovery Letter BriefPlaintiff Waymo LLC's Letter Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Issues filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
December 29, 2017 2441 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Letter Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Issues filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Version of Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Letter Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Issues, # 4 SEALED Version of Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Letter Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Issues, # 5 SEALED Ex. B, # 6 SEALED Ex. C, # 7 SEALED Ex. D, # 8 SEALED Ex. E, # 9 SEALED Ex. F, # 10 SEALED Ex. G, # 11 SEALED Ex. H, # 12 SEALED Ex. I, # 13 SEALED Ex. L, # 14 SEALED Ex. N, # 15 SEALED Ex. O)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
December 26, 2017 2440 EXHIBITS re 2425 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Reply Submission to Special Master Cooper Regarding Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents --Declaration of Michelle Yang ISO Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [2425-4], # 2 Revised Unredacted Version of [2425-6], # 3 Revised Unredacted Version of [2425-10])(Related document(s) 2425 ) (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
December 26, 2017 2439 EXHIBITS re 2419 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Letter Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Items --Declaration of Michelle Yang ISO Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [2419-8], # 2 Revised Unredacted Version of [2419-9], # 3 Revised Unredacted Version of [2419-11], # 4 Revised Unredacted Version of [2419-12])(Related document(s) 2419 ) (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
December 26, 2017 2438 Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini in Support of 2411 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Defendants' Brief Re Unjust Enrichment Per the Court's Order (Dkt. 2409) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2411 ) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
December 26, 2017 2437 EXHIBITS re 2434 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Response to Special Master's Recommendation -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 REVISED REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2434-4], # 2 REVISED SEALED Version of Dkt. [2434-4], # 3 REVISED REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2434-7], # 4 REVISED SEALED Version of Dkt. [2434-7], # 5 REVISED REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2434-8], # 6 REVISED SEALED Version of Dkt. [2434-8])(Related document(s) 2434 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
December 22, 2017 2436 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2434 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Response to Special Master's Recommendation (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 22, 2017 2435 RESPONSE to re 2396 Special Masters Order by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # 2 Exhibit A (REDACTED), # 3 Exhibit B (REDACTED), # 4 Exhibit C (REDACTED), # 5 Exhibit D (REDACTED))(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 22, 2017 2434 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Response to Special Master's Recommendation filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michelle Yang, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Uber's Response to Special Master's Recommendation, # 4 Unredacted Version of Uber's Response to Special Master's Recommendation, # 5 Unredacted Version of Ex. A to Chang Decl., # 6 Unredacted Version of Ex. B to Chang Decl., # 7 Unredacted Version of Ex. C to Chang Decl., # 8 Unredacted Version of Ex. D to Chang Decl.)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 21, 2017 2433 MOTION for Reconsideration re 2393 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Michelle Yang, # 3 Exhibit 1 (REDACTED), # 4 Exhibit 2 (REDACTED))(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 2432 EXHIBITS re 1096 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief in support of Motion to Compel Depositions --Motion for Reconsideration of Order Docket No. 2393 filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Michelle Yang, # 3 Redacted Version of Ex. 1, # 4 Unredacted Version of Ex. 1, # 5 Redacted Version of Ex. 2, # 6 Unredacted Version of Ex. 2)(Related document(s) 1096 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 2431 EXHIBITS re 2406 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Submission in Response to the Court's Order Requiring Further Response re: Unjust Enrichment (Dkt. 2404) --Declaration of Michelle Yang ISO Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [2406-4], # 2 Revised Unredacted Version of [2406-5])(Related document(s) 2406 ) (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 2430 REDACTION to 2393 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Public Refilings Pursuant to LR 79-5(f) -- PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1048-4] by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1048-7], # 2 PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1048-9], # 3 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1059-4], # 4 PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1088-2], # 5 PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1106-2], # 6 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1085-7], # 7 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1085-9], # 8 PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1085-15], # 9 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1085-19], # 10 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1085-21], # 11 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1089-4], # 12 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1089-10], # 13 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1096-6], # 14 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1096-8], # 15 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1096-13], # 16 PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1098-4], # 17 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1098-18], # 18 PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1169-2], # 19 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1117-14])(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 2429 EXHIBITS re 1080 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants Uber Technologies Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Motion to Compel Production of Documents, 1098 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits in Support of Waymo's Opposition to Otto Trucking's Motion to Compel a Second Deposition of Larry Page, 1068 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Motion to Compel Deposition of Larry Page, 1048 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Brief in Opposition to 1032 Uber Motion to Compel -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A SEALED - Revised sealed version of Dkt. [1048-4], # 2 Exhibit B SEALED - Revised sealed version of Dkt. [1048-9], # 3 Exhibit C SEALED - Revised sealed version of Dkt. [1114-2], # 4 Exhibit D SEALED - Revised sealed version of Dkt. [1114-5], # 5 Exhibit E SEALED - Revised sealed version of Dkt. [1068-11], # 6 Exhibit F SEALED - Revised sealed version of Dkt. [1105-4], # 7 Exhibit G SEALED - Revised sealed version of Dkt. [1105-8], # 8 Exhibit H SEALED - Revised sealed version of Dkt. [1098-4])(Related document(s) 1080 , 1098 , 1068 , 1048 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 2428 MOTION for Reconsideration re 2393 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Felipe Corredor, # 2 Declaration of Serge A. Voronov, # 3 Proposed Order)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 2427 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2425 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Reply Submission to Special Master Cooper Regarding Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 2426 REPLY (re 2368 Discovery Letter BriefREDACTED Version of Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper re Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents ) -- REDACTED filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17 PLACEHOLDER, # 2 Exhibit 18, # 3 Exhibit 19-24 PLACEHOLDERS)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 2425 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Reply Submission to Special Master Cooper Regarding Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper ISO Waymo's AMTFUS, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Version of Waymo's Reply Submission to Special Master Cooper Regarding Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents, # 4 SEALED Version of Waymo's Reply Submission to Special Master Cooper Regarding Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents, # 5 Exhibit 17 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 19 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 20 SEALED, # 8 Exhibit 21 SEALED, # 9 Exhibit 22 SEALED, # 10 Exhibit 23 SEALED, # 11 Exhibit 24 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 2424 Featured Case ORDER ON ATTORNEY-CLIENT COMMUNICATION PURSUANT TO RULE 502. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/21/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 20, 2017 2423 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2418 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Discovery Letter Brief filed pursuant to 2415 (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 2422 Discovery Letter Brief filed pursuant to Order 2415 (REDACTED) filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 2421 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2419 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Letter Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Items (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 2420 Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Outstanding Discovery Items (Redacted Version) filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 PLACEHOLDER, # 4 Exhibit 4 PLACEHOLDER, # 5 Exhibit 5 PLACEHOLDER, # 6 Exhibit 6 PLACEHOLDER, # 7 Exhibit 7 PLACEHOLDER, # 8 Exhibit 8 PLACEHOLDER, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11 PLACEHOLDER, # 12 Exhibit 12 PLACEHOLDER, # 13 Exhibit 13 PLACEHOLDER)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 2419 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Letter Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Items filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper ISO Waymo's AMTFUS, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 SEALED Waymo's Letter Brief re Outstanding Discovery Issues, # 4 PUBLIC Redacted Waymo's Letter Brief re Outstanding Discovery Issues, # 5 Exhibit 1 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 3 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 4 SEALED, # 8 Exhibit 5 SEALED, # 9 Exhibit 6 SEALED, # 10 Exhibit 7 SEALED, # 11 Exhibit 8 SEALED, # 12 Exhibit 11 SEALED, # 13 Exhibit 12 SEALED, # 14 Exhibit 13 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 2418 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Discovery Letter Brief filed pursuant to 2415 filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michelle Yang, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Uber's Discovery Letter Brief, # 4 Unredacted Version of Uber's Discovery Letter Brief)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 2417 REDACTION to 2387 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,, Public Refilings Pursuant to LR 79-5(f) -- PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1784-4] by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1784-5], # 2 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1784-6], # 3 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1784-7], # 4 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [2022-1])(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 2416 NOTICE by Waymo LLC Notice of Withdrawal of Joshua Sohn as Cousnel for Plaintiff Waymo LLC (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 2415 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/20/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 19, 2017 2414 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2411 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Defendants' Brief Re Unjust Enrichment Per the Court's Order (Dkt. 2409) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 19, 2017 2413 RESPONSE to re 2409 Order DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND OTTOMOTTO LLC'S FURTHER RESPONSE REGARDING PRESERVATION OF UNJUST ENRICHMENT BASED ON ACQUISITION by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 19, 2017 2412 RESPONSE to re 2409 Order Waymo's Response to Defendants' Brief Re Unjust Enrichment Per the Court's Order (Dkt. 2409) by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 19, 2017 2411 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Defendants' Brief Re Unjust Enrichment Per the Court's Order (Dkt. 2409) filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in Support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 SEALED Waymo's Response, # 4 PUBLIC Waymo's Response)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 18, 2017 2410 EXHIBITS re 2378 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief for Telephonic Hearing -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2378-6], # 2 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2378-6])(Related document(s) 2378 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 2409 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE: DEADLINE: NOON ON 12/19/2017. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/18/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 2408 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2406 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Submission in Response to the Court's Order Requiring Further Response re: Unjust Enrichment (Dkt. 2404) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 2407 RESPONSE to re 2404 Order Waymo's Submission in Response to the Court's Order Requiring Further Response re: Unjust Enrichment (Dkt. 2404) by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeff Nardinelli in Support of Waymo's Submission, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 2406 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Submission in Response to the Court's Order Requiring Further Response re: Unjust Enrichment (Dkt. 2404) filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in Support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 SEALED Version of Waymo's Submission, # 3 PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Waymo's Submission, # 4 SEALED Ex. 1, # 5 SEALED Ex. 2, # 6 SEALED Ex. 3, # 7 Proposed Order)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 2405 RESPONSE to re 2404 Order by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 15, 2017 2404 Featured Case ORDER REQUIRING FURTHER RESPONSE RE UNJUST ENRICHMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/15/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 2403 EXHIBITS re 2367 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper re Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents --DECLARATION OF MICHELLE YANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [2367-6], # 2 Revised Unredacted Version of [2367-18], # 3 Revised Unredacted Version of [2367-23])(Related document(s) 2367 ) (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 2402 Featured Case ORDER RE DEADLINE TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO OR MOTIONS REGARDING 2396 SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/15/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 2401 Featured Case ORDER AND PUBLIC REFILING OF DKT. NO. 2307-2 PURSUANT TO ORDERS DATED 2307 NOVEMBER 29 AND 2382 DECEMBER 13. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/15/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 2400 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 2399 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/15/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 2399 Letter from Non-party Richard Jacobs to Magistrate Judge Corley. (Boersch, Martha) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 2398 Proposed Jury Instructions by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND OTTOMOTTO LLC'S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF ON JURY INSTRUCTIONS. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 2397 RESPONSE to re 2362 Order -- Waymo's Submission In Response To Order Requiring Further Responses on Jury Instructions Re: Damages by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 2396 Special Masters Order Report of the Special Master Regarding the Jacobs Materials. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 14, 2017 2395 Transcript of Digital Audio Recording of Proceedings held on 12/13/2017, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 2392 Transcript Order, 2390 Transcript Order, 2391 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2018. (Related documents(s) 2392 , 2390 , 2391 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 14, 2017 2394 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 2364 Motion for Reconsideration OF ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. 2326). (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 14, 2017 2393 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 1031 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1048 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 1059 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1068 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1080 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 1085 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 1089 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1096 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 1098 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1117 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 13, 2017 2392 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/13/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Waymo LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 2391 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 13, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by John Lee Cooper, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 2390 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 13, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 2389 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 2317 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. 2237). (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 2388 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 12/13/2017. (FTR Time: 2:02-3:00.)Attorneys for Plaintiff: James Baker; Melissa Baily; David Perlson; Andrea Roberts; Patrick Schmidt.Attorneys for Defendant: Karen Dunn; Arturo Gonzalez; Martha Goodman; Shawn Rabin; Sylvia Rivera. Special Master: John Cooper.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/13/2017) Modified on 12/14/2017 (ahm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/14/2017: Matter transcribed by Lydia Zinn (Zinn Reporting). (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2017 2387 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 1670 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1784 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 1893 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 1994 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 2386 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 2378 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief for Telephonic Hearing ) Waymo's Response to Uber Letter Brief Regarding Jacobs-Related Discovery filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrea Roberts ISO Waymo's Letter Brief re Jacobs-Related Discovery, # 2 Exhibit 11)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 2385 (PUBLIC REFILING OF 2283 pursuant to 2307 ) LETTER OBJECTION FROM RICHARD JACOBS DATED NOVEMBER 27, 2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 2384 (PUBLIC REFILING OF 2307 pursuant to 2307 ) LETTER FROM OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEY DATED NOVEMBER 28, 2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 2383 (PUBLIC REFILING OF 2260 pursuant to 2307 ) LETTER FROM OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEY DATED NOVEMBER 22, 2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 2382 Featured Case ORDER RE 2373 2374 2381 REQUESTS FOR ADDITIONAL REDACTIONS TO JACOBS LETTER by Judge Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 12, 2017 2381 MOTION for Reconsideration re 2307 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, Request for Additional Redaction of Dkt. 2307-2 filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 12, 2017 2380 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2378 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief for Telephonic Hearing (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 12, 2017 2379 Discovery Letter Brief for Telephonic Hearing filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (slipsheet), # 2 Exhibit 2 (slipsheet))(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 12, 2017 2378 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief for Telephonic Hearing filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michelle Yang, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Defendants' Letter Brief for Telephonic Hearing, # 4 Unredacted Version of Defendants' Letter Brief for Telephonic Hearing, # 5 Unredacted Version of Ex. 1, # 6 Unredacted Version of Ex. 2)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 12, 2017 2377 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2376 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Letter Brief Regarding Jacobs-Related Discovery (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 12, 2017 2376 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Letter Brief Regarding Jacobs-Related Discovery filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper In Support of Sealing, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Sealing Motion, # 3 Letter Brief, # 4 Declaration In Support Of Letter Brief, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9 (SEALED), # 14 Exhibit 10)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 12, 2017 2375 EXHIBITS re 2352 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Response to Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Re the Jacobs Documents -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2352-6], # 2 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2352-6], # 3 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2352-7], # 4 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2352-7], # 5 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2352-8], # 6 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2352-8], # 7 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2352-15], # 8 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2352-15], # 9 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2352-16], # 10 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2352-16], # 11 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2352-17], # 12 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2352-17], # 13 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. 2353 , # 14 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. 2353 )(Related document(s) 2352 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 12, 2017 2374 MOTION for Reconsideration re 2307 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, filed by Richard Jacobs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Martha Boersch, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Boersch, Martha) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 12, 2017 2373 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Richard Jacobs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Martha Boersch, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proposed Order)(Boersch, Martha) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 12, 2017 2372 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 1810 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 12, 2017 2371 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDUING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 12/13/2017 at 02:00 PM in Chambers-SF before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017) Modified on 12/12/2017 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2017 2370 Featured Case ORDER ON ATTORNEY-CLIENT COMMUNICATION PURSUANT TO RULE 502. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/12/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 11, 2017 2369 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2367 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper re Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 11, 2017 2368 Discovery Letter BriefREDACTED Version of Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper re Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 PLACEHOLDER, # 2 Exhibit 2 PLACEHOLDER, # 3 Exhibit 3 REDACTED, # 4 Exhibit 4 REDACTED, # 5 Exhibit 5 REDACTED, # 6 Exhibit 6 REDACTED, # 7 Exhibit 7 REDACTED, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10 REDACTED, # 11 Exhibit 11 REDACTED, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13 REDACTED, # 14 Exhibit 14 PLACEHOLDER, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 11, 2017 2367 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper re Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper ISO Waymo's AMTFUS, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Version of Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper re Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents, # 4 SEALED Version of Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper re Uber's Obligation to Produce Jacobs Letter and Related Documents, # 5 Exhibit 1 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 2 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 3 REDACTED, # 8 Exhibit 3 SEALED, # 9 Exhibit 4 REDACTED, # 10 Exhibit 4 SEALED, # 11 Exhibit 5 REDACTED, # 12 Exhibit 5 SEALED, # 13 Exhibit 6 REDACTED, # 14 Exhibit 6 SEALED, # 15 Exhibit 7 REDACTED, # 16 Exhibit 7 SEALED, # 17 Exhibit 10 REDACTED, # 18 Exhibit 10 SEALED, # 19 Exhibit 11 REDACTED, # 20 Exhibit 11 SEALED, # 21 Exhibit 13 REDACTED, # 22 Exhibit 13 SEALED, # 23 Exhibit 14 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 11, 2017 2366 REDACTION to 2326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, --PUBLIC Version Dkt. [1143-4] by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1143-7], # 2 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1143-8], # 3 Revised Redacted Version of Dkt. [1143-10], # 4 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1145-6])(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 11, 2017 2365 EXHIBITS re 1214 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's and Ottomotto's Mot. to Compel Responses to Document Requests and Interrogatories, Enforce Court Order, and Compel 30(b)(6) Testimony -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A SEALED - Revised sealed version of Dkt. [1294-4], # 2 Exhibit B SEALED - Revised sealed version of Dkt. [1294-14])(Related document(s) 1214 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 11, 2017 2364 MOTION for Reconsideration re 2326 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Felipe Corredor ISO Waymo's Motion for Reconsideration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 11, 2017 2363 Featured Case ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 502, FED. R. EV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/11/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 11, 2017 2362 Featured Case ORDER REQUIRING FURTHER RESPONSES ON JURY INSTRUCTIONS RE DAMAGES (re 2350 2351 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/11/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 11, 2017 2361 Featured Case ORDER RE COMMUNICATION FROM ATTORNEY ESTHER CHANG. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/11/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 8, 2017 2360 EXHIBITS re 2327 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Court Inquiry Regarding Uber's Failure to Produce Jacobs Letter and Email filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [2327-10], # 2 Revised Unredacted Version of [2327-11])(Related document(s) 2327 ) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 2359 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2352 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Response to Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Re the Jacobs Documents, 2353 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 2358 Declaration of Marcie Brimer in Support of 2354 Response ( Non Motion ) Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Regarding the Jacobs Documents (REDACTED) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (REDACTED), # 2 Exhibit B (REDACTED), # 3 Exhibit C (REDACTED), # 4 Exhibit D (REDACTED), # 5 Exhibit E (REDACTED))(Related document(s) 2354 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 2357 Declaration of Samuel Cortina in Support of 2354 Response ( Non Motion ) Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Regarding the Jacobs Documents (REDACTED) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (REDACTED), # 2 Exhibit B (REDACTED), # 3 Exhibit C (REDACTED), # 4 Exhibit D (REDACTED))(Related document(s) 2354 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 2356 Declaration of Maxwell Pritt in Support of 2354 Response ( Non Motion ) to Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Regarding the Jacobs Documents filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (REDACTED), # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 2354 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 2355 Declaration of Sylvia Rivera in Support of 2354 Response ( Non Motion ) to Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Regarding the Jacobs Documents filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (REDACTED), # 2 Exhibit B (REDACTED), # 3 Exhibit C (REDACTED), # 4 Exhibit D (REDACTED), # 5 Exhibit E (REDACTED), # 6 Exhibit F (REDACTED), # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I (REDACTED), # 10 Exhibit J (REDACTED), # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L (REDACTED), # 13 Exhibit M (REDACTED), # 14 Exhibit N (REDACTED), # 15 Exhibit O (REDACTED), # 16 Exhibit P (REDACTED), # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R)(Related document(s) 2354 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 2354 RESPONSE to Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Regarding the Jacobs Documents (REDACTED) by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 2353 EXHIBITS re 2352 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Response to Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Re the Jacobs Documents --Unredacted Version of Ex. A to Pritt Decl. filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Version of Ex. A to Cortina Decl., # 2 Unredacted Version of Ex. B to Cortina Decl., # 3 Unredacted Version of Ex. C to Cortina Decl., # 4 Unredacted Version of Ex. D to Cortina Decl., # 5 Unredacted Version of Ex. A to Brimer Decl., # 6 Unredacted Version of Ex. B to Brimer Decl., # 7 Unredacted Version of Ex. C to Brimer Decl., # 8 Unredacted Version of Ex. D to Brimer Decl., # 9 Unredacted Version of Ex. E to Brimer Decl.)(Related document(s) 2352 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 2352 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Response to Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Re the Jacobs Documents filed by Ottomotto LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas Pardini, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Uber's Response to Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Re the Jacobs Documents, # 4 Unredacted Version of Uber's Response to Waymo's Submission to Special Master Cooper Re the Jacobs Documents, # 5 Unredacted Version of Ex. A to Rivera Decl., # 6 Unredacted Version of Ex. B to Rivera Decl., # 7 Unredacted Version of Ex. C to Rivera Decl., # 8 Unredacted Version of Ex. D to Rivera Decl., # 9 Unredacted Version of Ex. E to Rivera Decl., # 10 Unredacted Version of Ex. F to Rivera Decl., # 11 Unredacted Version of Ex. I to Rivera Decl., # 12 Redacted Version of Ex. J to Rivera Decl., # 13 Unredacted Version of Ex. J to Rivera Decl., # 14 Unredacted Version of Ex. L to Rivera Decl., # 15 Unredacted Version of Ex. M to Rivera Decl., # 16 Unredacted Version of Ex. N to Rivera Decl., # 17 Unredacted Version of Ex. O to Rivera Decl., # 18 Unredacted Version of Ex. P to Rivera Decl.)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 7, 2017 2351 Supplemental Brief on Jury Instructions Regarding Unjust Enrichment and Reasonable Royalty Damages filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 7, 2017 2350 Supplemental Brief on Jury Instructions Regarding Reasonable Royalty filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 7, 2017 2349 EXHIBITS re 2322 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2322-4], # 2 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2322-4], # 3 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. 2325 , # 4 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. 2325 )(Related document(s) 2322 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 7, 2017 2348 RESPONSE to re 2341 Order --Defendants' Response to Court's Inquiry Re Special Master's Report and Recommendation by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 7, 2017 2347 RESPONSE to re 2341 Order -- Waymo's Declination to Stipulate to the Special Master's Findings re the Jacobs Letter and Related Documents by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 6, 2017 2346 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF INFORMATION PROVIDED TO DISTRICT COURT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/6/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 5, 2017 2345 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/04/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Travis Kalanick, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Haag, Melinda) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
December 4, 2017 2344 Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini in Support of 2304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Leave to Add Trial Witnesses filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2304 ) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 2343 Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini IN SUPPORT OF NON-PARTY RICHARD JACOBS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE CORRESPONDENCE UNDER SEAL (DKT. 2299) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 2342 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12-4-2017, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 2330 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2018. (Related documents(s) 2330 ) (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 2341 Featured Case AMENDED 2334 ORDER REFERRING ISSUE TO SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/4/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 2340 Featured Case ORDER RE ROLLING, WRITTEN LIST OF NEXT SEVEN WITNESSES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/4/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 2339 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/4/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Otto Trucking LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 2338 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2327 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Court Inquiry Regarding Uber's Failure to Produce Jacobs Letter and Email, 2336 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Court Inquiry re: Any Use by Waymo of Ephemeral Communications and Non-Attributable Devices (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 2337 RESPONSE to re 2315 Order Waymo's Response to Court Inquiry re: Any Use by Waymo of Ephemeral Communications and Non-Attributable Devices by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrea Roberts in Support of Waymo's Response, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 2336 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Court Inquiry re: Any Use by Waymo of Ephemeral Communications and Non-Attributable Devices filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in Support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 SEALED Waymo's Response, # 4 PUBLIC Waymo's Response, # 5 SEALED Ex. 3, # 6 SEALED Ex. 4, # 7 SEALED Ex. 5, # 8 SEALED Ex. 6, # 9 SEALED Ex. 7, # 10 SEALED Ex. 8, # 11 SEALED Ex. 11)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 2335 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/4/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Stroz Friedberg, LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 2334 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING ISSUE TO SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/4/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 2333 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 4, 2017 before Judge William Alsup by John Lee Cooper, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 2332 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2325 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 2322 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 2331 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Further Proceedings held on 12/4/2017. Special Master to decide whether documents stated on the record were required to be produced by Uber. Waymo must file its complete offer of proof by 1/12/2018; Response by Uber due 1/19/2018. Written Order to issue. Total Time in Court: 1 Hour; 20 Minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Charles Verhoeven, David Perlson, Melissa Baily, Andrea Roberts, Jim Baker, Jordan Jaffe. Defendant Attorneys: Arturo Gonzales, Bill Carmody, Michael Jacobs, Ester Chang, Meredith Dearborn.Special Master: John Cooper. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 2330 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/04/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Waymo LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 2329 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 4, 2017 before Judge William Alsup by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 2328 RESPONSE to re 2315 Order Waymo's Response to Court Inquiry Regarding Uber's Failure to Produce Jacobs Letter and Email by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrea Roberts in Support of Waymo's Response, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 2327 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Court Inquiry Regarding Uber's Failure to Produce Jacobs Letter and Email filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrea Roberts in Support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 SEALED Version of Waymo's Response, # 4 REDACTED Version of Waymo's Response, # 5 SEALED Exhibit 1, # 6 REDACTED Exhibit 1, # 7 SEALED Exhibit 2, # 8 REDACTED Exhibit 2, # 9 SEALED Exhibit 5, # 10 SEALED Exhibit 7, # 11 SEALED Exhibit 8)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 4, 2017 2326 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 1120 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 1126 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1143 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1145 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 1150 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1153 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 1155 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 1161 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 1214 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 3, 2017 2325 EXHIBITS re 2322 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Unredacted] Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Matthew R. Berry filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2322 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/3/2017)
December 3, 2017 2324 Declaration of Matthew R. Berry in Support of 2323 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 2323 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/3/2017)
December 3, 2017 2323 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 2305 MOTION for Leave to Add ) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/3/2017)
December 3, 2017 2322 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michelle Yang, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 [Redacted] Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Supplement Its Trial Witness List, # 4 [Unredacted] Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Supplement Its Trial Witness List, # 5 [Redacted] Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Matthew R. Berry, # 6 [Unredacted] Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Matthew R. Berry)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 12/3/2017)
December 1, 2017 2321 Declaration of Michelle Yang in Support of 2281 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Order re Letter from United States Attorney filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2281 ) (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
December 1, 2017 2320 Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini in Support of 2275 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Exhibits in Support of Waymo's Motion to Exclude Defendants' Damages Expert Walter Bratic filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2275 ) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
December 1, 2017 2319 REDACTION to 2237 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Public Refilings Pursuant to LR 79-5(f) -- PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1237-4] by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1291-4], # 2 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1291-6], # 3 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1328-6], # 4 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1354-4], # 5 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1354-6], # 6 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1367-10], # 7 PUBLIC Version of Dkt. [1367-15], # 8 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1404-4]])(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
December 1, 2017 2318 EXHIBITS re 1278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Discovery Letter Brief re Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Topics, 1374 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc. And Ottomotto LLC's Opposition To Waymo's Motion To Compel Further 30(B)(6) Testimony, 1291 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Uber's Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) deposition, 1434 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto, LLC's Motiont to Compel Waymo to Supplement RFA & Interrogatory Responses and to Produce an Unredacted Document -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 SEALED Exhibit A - Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1434-6], # 2 SEALED Exhibit B - Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1374-6], # 3 SEALED Exhibit C - Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1374-8], # 4 SEALED Exhibit D - Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1291-6], # 5 SEALED Exhibit E - Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1278-17], # 6 SEALED Exhibit F - Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1278-12])(Related document(s) 1278 , 1374 , 1291 , 1434 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
December 1, 2017 2317 MOTION for Reconsideration re 2237 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
December 1, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2018 08:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
December 1, 2017 2316 Featured Case ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 2276 MOTION TO EXCLUDE WALTER BRATIC by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
December 1, 2017 2315 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AFTER EVIDENTIARY HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/1/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
December 1, 2017 2314 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING: Motion Hearing re 2276 MOTION TO STRIKE set for hearing on 12/4/2017 at 7:30 a.m. is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
December 1, 2017 2313 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 2276 MOTION to Strike Waymo's Motion to Exclude Defendants' Damages Expert Walter Bratic ) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
December 1, 2017 2312 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 29, 2017 before Judge William Alsup by John Lee Cooper, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
November 30, 2017 2311 Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini in Support of 2271 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Responsive Trial Brief filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2271 ) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
November 30, 2017 2310 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-29-2017, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporters Debra L. Pas, CRR and Katherine Sullivan, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018. (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
November 30, 2017 2309 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-28-2017, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporters Debra L. Pas, CRR and Katherine Sullivan, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 2289 Transcript Order, 2288 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2018. (Related documents(s) 2289 , 2288 ) (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
November 30, 2017 2308 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING BRIEFING RE: 2305 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ADD TRIAL WITNESSES: Response is due by 12/3/2017, 12:00 noon. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
November 29, 2017 2307 Featured Case NOTICE AND ORDER RE 2281 2283 2298 2299 SEALING OF LETTERS FROM OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY AND RICHARD JACOBS by Judge Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2017: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (whalc2S, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2017 2306 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Leave to Add Trial Witnesses (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
November 29, 2017 2305 Waymo's Motion for Leave to Add Trial Witnesses filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeff Nardinelli in Support of Waymo's Motion, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/29/2017) Modified on 11/30/2017 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2017 2304 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Leave to Add Trial Witnesses filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in Support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 UNREDACTED Version of Waymo's Motion for Leave to Add Trial Witnesses, # 4 REDACTED Version of Waymo's Motion for Leave to Add Trial Witnesses)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
November 29, 2017 2303 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/28/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Lyft, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
November 29, 2017 2302 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Evidentiary Hearing held on 11/29/2017. See log for details. Further proceedings set for 12/4/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Jury Selection reset for 1/31/2018 07:30 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Jury Trial reset for 2/5/2018 07:30 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Total Time in Court: 3 Hours, 44 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan / Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Charles Verhoeven, David Eiseman, Melissa Baily, David Perlson, Andrea Roberts, Jordan Jaffe. Defendant Attorneys: Arturo Gonzales, Bill Carmody, Meredith Dearborn, Michael Jacobs, Shawn Rabin, Joseph Grinstein, Matthew Berry, Karen Dunn, Michael Brille. Non Party Witnesses Attorney: Matthew UmhoferSpecial Master: John Cooper (Attachments: # 1 Trial Log)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/29/2017)
November 29, 2017 2301 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/29/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Stroz Friedberg, LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
November 28, 2017 2300 Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini in Support of 2265 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Reply In Support of its Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2265 ) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 2299 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Richard Jacobs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Martha Boersch, # 2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Martha Boersch, # 3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Martha Boersch, # 4 Proposed Order)(Boersch, Martha) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 2298 MOTION TO DESIGNATE LETTER AS CONFIDENTIAL filed by Richard Jacobs. Responses due by 12/12/2017. Replies due by 12/19/2017. (Boersch, Martha) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 2297 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Evidentiary Hearing held on 11/28/2017. Motion Hearing held on 11/28/2017. Witnesses: Richard Jacobs and Edward Russo. Further Evidentiary Hearing set for 11/29/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Motion taken under submission. Total Time in Court: 3 Hours; 53 Minutes. Court Reporters: Katherine Sullivan / Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Charles Verhoeven, David Eiseman, Melissa Baily, David Perlson, Andrea Roberts, Jordan Jaffe.Intervenors Attorneys: Steven Zansberg (Associated Press); Carolyn Luedtke (Lyft)Non-Party Witness Attorney: Martha Boersch Defendant Attorneys: Arturo Gonzales, Bill Carmody, Sylvia Rivera, Meredith Dearborn, Michael Jacobs, Shawn Rabin, Joseph Grinstein, Matthew Berry, Karen Dunn, Michael Brille.Special Master: John Cooper (Attachments: # 1 Evidentiary Trial Log)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 2296 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 28-29, 2017 before Judge William Alsup by Gunderson Dettmer Stough Villeneuve Franklin & Hachigian, LLP, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Lemmer, Gregory) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 2295 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/29/17 before Judge William Alsup by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 2294 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/28/2017 and 11/29/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Waymo LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 2293 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/28/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Travis Kalanick, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Haag, Melinda) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 2292 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/28/17 before Judge William Alsup by Otto Trucking LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 2291 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 28, 2017 before Judge William Alsup by John Lee Cooper, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 2290 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/28/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Stroz Friedberg, LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 2289 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/28/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Waymo LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 2288 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/28/17 before Judge William Alsup by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 28, 2017 2287 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 2262 Stipulation REGARDING PUBLIC REFILING OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79.5 AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 27, 2017 2286 EXHIBITS re 2252 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2252-3], # 2 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2252-5], # 3 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2252-5])(Related document(s) 2252 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 27, 2017 2285 Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini in Support of 2256 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2256 ) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 27, 2017 2284 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2281 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Order re Letter from United States Attorney (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 27, 2017 2283 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Richard Jacobs. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Martha Boersch, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Boersch, Martha) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 27, 2017 2282 RESPONSE to re 2269 Order, 2261 Order REDACTED Waymo's Response to Order re Letter from United States Attorney by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John McCauley in support of Waymo's Response to Order re Letter from United States Attorney, # 2 Exhibit 1 Placeholder, # 3 Exhibit 2 Placeholder, # 4 Exhibit 3 Placeholder, # 5 Exhibit 4 Placeholder, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6 Placeholder, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8 Placeholder)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 27, 2017 2281 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Order re Letter from United States Attorney filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Waymo's Response to Order re Letter from United States Attorney, # 4 SEALED Waymo's Response to Order re Letter from United States Attorney, # 5 Exhibit 1 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 2 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 3 SEALED, # 8 Exhibit 4 SEALED, # 9 Exhibit 5 REDACTED, # 10 Exhibit 5 SEALED, # 11 Exhibit 6 SEALED, # 12 Exhibit 8 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 27, 2017 2280 Supplemental Brief re 1822 MOTION Close Courtroom filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 1822 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 27, 2017 2279 RESPONSE to re 2251 Order --Defendants' Critique of Revised Tentative Jury Instructions on Trade Secret Misappropriation by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 27, 2017 2278 RESPONSE to re 2251 Order -- Waymo's Critique of Revised Tentative Jury Instructions on Trade Secret Misappropriation and Revised Special Verdict Form by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 27, 2017 2277 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2275 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Exhibits in Support of Waymo's Motion to Exclude Defendants' Damages Expert Walter Bratic (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 27, 2017 2276 MOTION to Strike Waymo's Motion to Exclude Defendants' Damages Expert Walter Bratic filed by Waymo LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2017 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 12/1/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeff Nardinelli in Support of Waymo's Motion to Exclude Defendants' Damages Expert Walter Bratic, # 2 Exhibit 1 Placeholder, # 3 Exhibit 2 Placeholder, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 27, 2017 2275 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Exhibits in Support of Waymo's Motion to Exclude Defendants' Damages Expert Walter Bratic filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 SEALED, # 4 Exhibit 2 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 27, 2017 2274 Featured Case ORDER ALLOWING 2270 MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT TRIAL WITNESS LIST AND REQUIRING DETAILED OFFER OF PROOF. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/27/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 26, 2017 2273 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2271 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Responsive Trial Brief (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/26/2017)
November 26, 2017 2272 RESPONSE to re 2253 Trial Brief REDACTED Waymo's Responsive Trial Brief by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D Placeholder)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/26/2017)
November 26, 2017 2271 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Responsive Trial Brief filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Waymo's Responsive Trial Brief, # 4 SEALED Waymo's Responsive Trial Brief, # 5 Exhibit A REDACTED, # 6 Exhibit A SEALED, # 7 Exhibit B REDACTED, # 8 Exhibit B SEALED, # 9 Exhibit D SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/26/2017)
November 26, 2017 2270 Brief Waymo's Precis for Leave to Supplement its Trial Witness List filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/26/2017)
November 25, 2017 2269 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE LETTER FROM UNITED STATES ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/25/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2017)
November 24, 2017 2268 EXHIBITS re 2238 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Uber's MIL No. 27 filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [2238-5])(Related document(s) 2238 ) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
November 24, 2017 2267 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2265 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Reply In Support of its Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
November 24, 2017 2266 REPLY (re 2199 MOTION Jury Instruction Waymo's Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation ) filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (placeholder))(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
November 24, 2017 2265 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Reply In Support of its Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted version of Waymo's Reply In Support of its Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation, # 4 Sealed version of Waymo's Reply In Support of its Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation, # 5 Sealed Ex. 1)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
November 24, 2017 2264 Featured Case ORDER RE 2248 REQUEST TO FILE A MOTION TO EXCLUDE WALTER BRATIC. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/24/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
November 24, 2017 2263 Clerk's Notice DECLINING Video Recording re: 2227 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. (Related documents(s) 2227 )(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
November 24, 2017 2262 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 2237 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
November 23, 2017 2261 Featured Case ORDER RE LETTER FROM UNITED STATES ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/23/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2017)
November 22, 2017 2260 NOTICE RE LETTER FROM UNITED STATES ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/22/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2017: # 1 Exhibit A) (whalc2S, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2017 2259 RESPONSE to re 2248 Brief DEFENDANTS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. AND OTTOMOTTO LLC'S OPPOSITION TO WAYMO'S PRECIS FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS' DAMAGES EXPERT WALTER BRATIC by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 22, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing Jury Trial set for 12/21/2017 07:30 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Jury Trial set for 12/22/2017 07:30 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 22, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing Further Jury Trial set for 12/5/2017, 12/6/2017, 12/7/2017, 12/8/2017, 12/11/2017, 12/12/2017, 12/13/2017, 12/14/2017, 12/15/2017, 12/18/2017, 12/19/2017, 12/20/2017 07:30 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 22, 2017 2258 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2256 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 22, 2017 2257 Proposed Pretrial Order Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A Placeholder, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C, # 4 Appendix D REDACTED, # 5 Appendix E)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 21, 2017 2256 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order, # 4 SEALED Amended Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Order, # 5 Exhibit SEALED Appendix A, # 6 Exhibit REDACTED Appendix D, # 7 Exhibit SEALED Appendix D)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 21, 2017 2255 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2252 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 21, 2017 2254 Declaration of Camila Tapernoux in Support of 2253 Trial Brief filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) 2253 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 21, 2017 2253 TRIAL BRIEF by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 21, 2017 2252 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Camila Tapernoux, # 4 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Camila Tapernoux, # 5 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Camila Tapernoux)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 21, 2017 2251 REVISED TENTATIVE JURY INSTRUCTIONS ON TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION and SPECIAL VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/21/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 21, 2017 2250 Featured Case ORDER RE TIMELINE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/21/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 21, 2017 2249 Featured Case ORDER RE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND NOTICE RE ANY SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/21/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
November 20, 2017 2248 Brief Waymo's Precis for Leave to File a Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Uber's Damages Expert Walter Bratic filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 2247 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2240 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 2246 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2244 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 18 (Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 2245 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 2194 MOTION in Limine Waymo's MiL. No. 18 to Preclude Reliance on the Stroz Friedberg Due Diligence Investigation ) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Maxwell V. Pritt, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 2244 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 18 filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Maxwell V. Pritt, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Redacted, # 4 Exhibit 1 - Sealed, # 5 Exhibit 2 - Redacted, # 6 Exhibit 2 - Sealed, # 7 Exhibit 3 - Redacted, # 8 Exhibit 3 - Sealed, # 9 Exhibit 4 - Redacted, # 10 Exhibit 4 - Sealed, # 11 Exhibit 5 - Redacted, # 12 Exhibit 5 - Sealed, # 13 Exhibit 6 - Redacted, # 14 Exhibit 6 - Sealed, # 15 Exhibit 7 - Redacted, # 16 Exhibit 7 - Sealed, # 17 Exhibit 8 - Redacted, # 18 Exhibit 8 - Sealed)(Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 2243 Declaration of Camila Tapernoux in Support of 2241 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 2241 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 2242 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2238 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Uber's MIL No. 27 (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 2241 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 2197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation ) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 2240 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 [REDACTED] OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JURY INSTRUCTION BASED ON SPOLIATION, # 4 [UNREDACTED] OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JURY INSTRUCTION BASED ON SPOLIATION)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 2239 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 2202 MOTION in Limine No. 27 to Exclude Dr. Hesselink's Saved Development Time Opinions ) REDACTED filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jordan Jaffe in support of Waymo's Opposition to Uber's MIL No. 27, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 Placeholder, # 4 Exhibit 3 REDACTED, # 5 Exhibit 4 Placeholder, # 6 Exhibit 5 Placeholder, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7 PLACEHOLDER, # 9 Exhibit 8 PLACEHOLDER)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 2238 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Uber's MIL No. 27 filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's AMTFUS, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Waymo's Opposition to Uber's MIL No. 27, # 4 SEALED Waymo's Opposition to Uber's MIL No. 27, # 5 Exhibit 2 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 3 REDACTED, # 7 Exhibit 3 SEALED, # 8 Exhibit 4 SEALED, # 9 Exhibit 5 SEALED, # 10 Exhibit 7 SEALED, # 11 Exhibit 8 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 2237 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 1237 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 1278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1291 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1316 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 1328 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1352 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 1354 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1367 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 1374 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 1434 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 1437 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 17, 2017 2236 DECLARATION & EXHIBITS re 2197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation --DECLARATION OF THOMAS J. PARDINI ISO PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [2197-4], # 2 Revised Unredacted Version of [2197-7], # 3 Revised Unredacted Version of [2197-8], # 4 Revised Unredacted Version of [2197-11], # 5 Revised Unredacted Version of [2197-17], # 6 Revised Unredacted Version of [2197-19], # 7 Revised Unredacted Version of [2197-20], # 8 Revised Unredacted Version of [2197-25], # 9 Revised Unredacted Version of [2197-26])(Related document(s) 2197 ) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 11/17/2017) Modified on 11/20/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2017 2235 DECLARATION re 2198 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion In Limine No. 27 -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2198-4], # 2 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2198-4])(Related document(s) 2198 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/17/2017) Modified on 11/20/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2017 2234 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by John Lee Cooper. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 2233 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Travis Kalanick. (Haag, Melinda) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 2232 RESPONSE to Waymo's Response to Authorities Defendants Raised at November 14, 2017 Hearing re Jury Instructions by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 2231 RESPONSE to Authorities Cited by Waymo at November 14, 2017 Hearing by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # 2 Exhibit A to Chang Declaration)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 2230 RESPONSE to re 2213 Motion Hearing,,, Waymo's Critique of Revised Special Jury Verdict Form by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 2229 Proposed Jury Instructions by Waymo LLC Parties' Joint Submission Regarding Reasonable Royalty Instruction for the Jury. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 2228 RESPONSE to re 2213 Motion Hearing,,, --Defendants' Response to Revised Tentative Special Verdict Form by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 2227 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. Video Camera hearing set for 12/4/2017 07:30 AM. Objections to Video Recording due 11/24/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 2226 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Rabin, Shawn) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 16, 2017 2225 EXHIBITS re 2189 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offers of Proof Regarding Reasonable Royalty Damages and Disclosure of the Asserted Trade Secrets --DECLARATION OF THOMAS J. PARDINI ISO PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [2189-4])(Related document(s) 2189 ) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
November 15, 2017 2224 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 2152 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM 2128 JUDGE CORLEY'S NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER RE DUE DILIGENCE REPORT DRAFTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 15, 2017 2223 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/14/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Otto Trucking LLC, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 15, 2017 2222 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/14/17, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 2216 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts, 2210 Transcript Order, 2211 Transcript Order, 2212 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 12/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2018. (Related documents(s) 2216 , 2210 , 2211 , 2212 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 15, 2017 2221 Featured Case ORDER RE REASONABLE ROYALTY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/15/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 14, 2017 2220 (SECOND PUBLIC REFILING OF 2166 pursuant to 2175 ) ORDER EXCLUDING 1619 MICHAEL WAGNER, RESTRICTING 1559 USE OF FINANCIAL EVIDENCE AT TRIAL, AND DENYING 797 OTHER RELIEF. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 14, 2017 2219 (SECOND PUBLIC REFILING OF 2151 pursuant to 2164 ) ORDER RE 1418 1423 1514 MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND 1108 MOTION TO STRIKE ASSERTED TRADE SECRET NUMBER 96. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 14, 2017 2218 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 2188 REQUEST TO FILE ADDITIONAL MOTION IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/14/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 14, 2017 2217 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING BRIEFING DATES FOR MOTION HEARING: 2194 MOTION in Limine Waymo's MiL. No. 18 to Preclude Reliance on the Stroz Friedberg Due Diligence Investigation is set for hearing on 11/28/2017 at 8:00 a.m. Opposition due 11/20/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 14, 2017 2216 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 14, 2017 2215 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING MOTION HEARING AND BRIEFING: Motion Hearing re: 2199 MOTION Jury Instruction Waymo's Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation set for 11/28/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due 11/20/2017; Replies due 11/24/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)</I(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 14, 2017 2214 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of 2187 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 2187 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 14, 2017 2213 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Hearing Re Instructions and Offers of Proof 2168 held on 11/14/2017. The parties are to submit any further objections on special verdict form by noon on Friday, 11/17/2017.Total Time in Court: 2 Hours; 48 Minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorneys: David Perison, David Eiseman, Jordan Jaffe, Lindsay Cooper, John McCauley IV. Defendants' Attorneys: Arturo Gonzales, Karen Dunn, Cory Buland, Meredity Dearborn, Matt Berry, Ester Chang, Rachel Dolphin.Special Master: John Cooper (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/14/2017)
November 14, 2017 2212 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 14, 2017 before Judge William Alsup by John Lee Cooper, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 14, 2017 2211 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/14/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Waymo LLC, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 14, 2017 2210 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 14, 2017 before Judge William Alsup by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 13, 2017 2209 EXHIBITS re 2182 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion to Compel re Ottomotto team Slack site 280technologies.slack.com --Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini ISO Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [2182-3], # 2 Revised Unredacted Version of [2182-4], # 3 Revised Unredacted Version of [2182-5], # 4 Revised Unredacted Version of [2182-6], # 5 Revised Unredacted Version of [2182-7], # 6 Revised Unredacted Version of [2182-8], # 7 Revised Unredacted Version of [2182-9])(Related document(s) 2182 ) (Pardini, Thomas) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 2208 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2206 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Defendants' Precis in Support of Request to File Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Waymo Expert Lambertus Hesselink on TS 25 (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 2207 RESPONSE to re 2188 Brief Waymo's Opposition to Defendants' Precis in Support of Request to File Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Waymo Expert Lambertus Hesselink on TS 25 (REDACTED) by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 2206 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Defendants' Precis in Support of Request to File Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Waymo Expert Lambertus Hesselink on TS 25 filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Version of Waymo's Opposition to Defendants' Precis in Support of Request to File Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Waymo Expert Lambertus Hesselink on TS 25, # 4 SEALED Version of Waymo's Opposition to Defendants' Precis in Support of Request to File Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Waymo Expert Lambertus Hesselink on TS 25)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 2205 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2198 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion In Limine No. 27, 2201 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, (Yang, Michelle) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 2204 Proposed Order re 2199 MOTION Jury Instruction Waymo's Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 2203 Declaration of Ali Rayl In Support of Waymo's Motion to Seal Documents Pursuant to CIV. L.R. 79-5(d) To File Exhibits Under Seal filed bySlack, Inc.. (Klestoff, Alexei) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 2202 MOTION in Limine No. 27 to Exclude Dr. Hesselink's Saved Development Time Opinions filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 11/20/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ian Gore, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit 3 (Redacted), # 5 Exhibit 4 (Redacted), # 6 Exhibit 5 (Redacted), # 7 Exhibit 6)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 2201 EXHIBITS re 2198 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion In Limine No. 27 --Redacted Version of Ex. 1 to Gore Decl. filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Version of Ex. 1 to Gore Decl., # 2 Redacted Version of Ex. 2 to Gore Decl., # 3 Unredacted Version of Ex. 2 to Gore Decl., # 4 Unredacted Version of Ex. 3 to Gore Decl., # 5 Unredacted Version of Ex. 4 to Gore Decl., # 6 Unredacted Version of Ex. 5 to Gore Decl.)(Related document(s) 2198 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 2200 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 2199 MOTION Jury Instruction Waymo's Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation filed by Waymo LLC. Responses due by 11/27/2017. Replies due by 12/4/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Judah iso Waymo's Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation, # 2 Exhibit 1-7 PLACEHOLDER, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit 10 PLACEHOLDER, # 6 Exhibit 11, # 7 Exhibit 12 PLACEHOLDER, # 8 Exhibit 13, # 9 Exhibit 14-16 PLACEHOLDER, # 10 Exhibit 17, # 11 Exhibit 18-19 PLACEHOLDER, # 12 Exhibit 20, # 13 Exhibit 21, # 14 Exhibit 22-29 PLACEHOLDER)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 2198 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion In Limine No. 27 filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Defendants' MIL No. 27, # 4 Unredacted Version of Defendants' MIL No. 27)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 2197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Waymo's Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation, # 4 SEALED Waymo's Motion for Jury Instruction Based on Spoliation, # 5 Exhibit 1 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 2 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 3 SEALED, # 8 Exhibit 4 SEALED, # 9 Exhibit 5 SEALED, # 10 Exhibit 6 SEALED, # 11 Exhibit 7 SEALED, # 12 Exhibit 10 SEALED, # 13 Exhibit 12 SEALED, # 14 Exhibit 13 REDACTED, # 15 Exhibit 13 SEALED, # 16 Exhibit 14 SEALED, # 17 Exhibit 15 SEALED, # 18 Exhibit 16 SEALED, # 19 Exhibit 18 SEALED, # 20 Exhibit 19 SEALED, # 21 Exhibit 22 SEALED, # 22 Exhibit 23 SEALED, # 23 Exhibit 24 SEALED, # 24 Exhibit 25 SEALED, # 25 Exhibit 26 SEALED, # 26 Exhibit 27 SEALED, # 27 Exhibit 28 SEALED, # 28 Exhibit 29 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 2196 Response re 2180 Proposed Jury Instructions Waymo's Reply to Defendants' Counter-Critique of Further Tentative Jury Instructions on Trade Secret Misappropriation byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 2195 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2193 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's MiL. No. 18 to Preclude Reliance on the Stroz Friedberg Due Diligence Investigation (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 2194 MOTION in Limine Waymo's MiL. No. 18 to Preclude Reliance on the Stroz Friedberg Due Diligence Investigation filed by Waymo LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 11/27/2017. Replies due by 12/4/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John McCauley in support of Waymo's Motion in Limine No. 18, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7 PLACEHOLDER, # 9 Exhibit 8 PLACEHOLDER, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10 PLACEHOLDER, # 12 Exhibit 11 PLACEHOLDER)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 2193 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's MiL. No. 18 to Preclude Reliance on the Stroz Friedberg Due Diligence Investigation filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 SEALED, # 4 Exhibit 1 REDACTED, # 5 Exhibit 2 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 2 REDACTED, # 7 Exhibit 7 SEALED, # 8 Exhibit 8 SEALED, # 9 Exhibit 10 SEALED, # 10 Exhibit 11 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 2192 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2187 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 12, 2017 2191 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2189 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offers of Proof Regarding Reasonable Royalty Damages and Disclosure of the Asserted Trade Secrets (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/12/2017)
November 12, 2017 2190 RESPONSE to re 2168 Order,, Set Hearings, by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 PLACEHOLDER, # 2 Exhibit 2 PLACEHOLDER)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/12/2017)
November 12, 2017 2189 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Offers of Proof Regarding Reasonable Royalty Damages and Disclosure of the Asserted Trade Secrets filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 SEALED Exhibit 1, # 4 SEALED Exhibit 2)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/12/2017)
November 10, 2017 2188 Brief PRECIS IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO FILE MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY AND OPINIONS OF WAYMO EXPERT LAMBERTUS HESSELINK ON TS 25 filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/10/2017)
November 10, 2017 2187 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 [REDACTED] Precis in Support of Request to File Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Waymo Expert Lambertus Hesselink on TS 25, # 4 [UNREDACTED] Precis in Support of Request to File Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Waymo Expert Lambertus Hesselink on TS 25)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 11/10/2017)
November 10, 2017 2186 DISCOVERY ORDER Re: Dkt. No. 2183 . Waymo's motion to compel Uber's consent regarding Slack site is GRANTED. The site falls within Waymo's subpoena and the Court's earlier order and was not adequately disclosed by the Stroz Report. Uber shall provide its consent by 1:00 p.m. today, November 10, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(Corley, Jacqueline) (Filed on 11/10/2017) Modified on 11/13/2017 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2017 2185 RESPONSE to re 2183 Letter Brief, re 1964 Order Waymo's Motion to Compel re Ottomotto team Slack site 280technologies.slack.com by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
November 8, 2017 2184 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2182 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion to Compel re Ottomotto team Slack site 280technologies.slack.com (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 8, 2017 2183 Letter Brief re 1964 Order Waymo's Motion to Compel re Ottomotto team Slack site 280technologies.slack.com filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James D. Judah, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3-4 Placeholders, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6-8 Placeholders, # 7 Exhibit 9, # 8 Exhibit 10-11 Placeholders)(Related document(s) 1964 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 8, 2017 2182 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion to Compel re Ottomotto team Slack site 280technologies.slack.com filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 3 SEALED, # 4 Exhibit 4 SEALED, # 5 Exhibit 6 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 7 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 8 SEALED, # 8 Exhibit 10 SEALED, # 9 Exhibit 11 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 8, 2017 2181 Featured Case ORDER RE 2169 2180 INADEQUATE CRITIQUE OF 2078 TENTATIVE JURY INSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/8/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 7, 2017 2180 Proposed Jury Instructions by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. RESPONSE TO WAYMO'S CRITIQUE OF FURTHER JURY INSTRUCTION ON TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION [DKT. 2171]. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 7, 2017 2179 Featured Case ORDER RE MODIFICATION OF JURY SELECTION PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/7/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 7, 2017 2178 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 2040 PERMISSION TO FILE ADDITIONAL MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/7/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 7, 2017 2177 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 2052 PERMISSION TO FILE MOTION FOR JURY INSTRUCTION BASED ON SPOLIATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/7/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 6, 2017 2176 (PUBLIC REFILING OF 2166 pursuant to 2175 ) ORDER EXCLUDING 1619 MICHAEL WAGNER, RESTRICTING 1559 USE OF FINANCIAL EVIDENCE AT TRIAL, AND DENYING 797 OTHER RELIEF. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 2175 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 2173 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 3, 2017 2174 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2173 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Order Excluding Michael Wagner, Restricting Use of Financial Evidence at Trial, and Denying Other Relief (Dkt. 2166) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 2173 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Order Excluding Michael Wagner, Restricting Use of Financial Evidence at Trial, and Denying Other Relief (Dkt. 2166) filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proposed Redactions to Order Excluding Michael Wagner (Dkt. 2166))(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 2172 EXHIBITS re 2140 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal regarding Defendant Otto Trucking LLC's Reply in support of its Motion to Compel Further Discovery re: Waymo's Investigation -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Otto Trucking's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2140-4], # 2 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2140-4], # 3 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2140-5], # 4 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2140-5])(Related document(s) 2140 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 2171 RESPONSE to re 2078 Order, Waymo's Critique on Further Tentative Jury Instructions on Trade Secret Misappropriation by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 2170 REPLY (re 2152 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE (DKT. 2128) AND REQUEST FOR STAY OF ORDER re 2128 Order on Discovery Letter Brief ) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 2169 Proposed Jury Instructions by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. DEFENDANTS' CRITIQUE OF FURTHER JURY INSTRUCTION ON TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION [DKT. 2078]. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 2168 NOTICE OF HEARING RE INSTRUCTIONS AND OFFERS OF PROOF: Hearing on jury instructions/offers of proffer issue set for 11/14/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/3/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 2, 2017 2167 Featured Case ORDER RE SEALING OF 2166 ORDER EXCLUDING MICHAEL WAGNER, RESTRICTING USE OF FINANCIAL EVIDENCE AT TRIAL, AND DENYING OTHER RELIEF. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/2/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 2166 Featured Case (UNDER SEAL) ORDER EXCLUDING 1619 MICHAEL WAGNER, RESTRICTING 1559 USE OF FINANCIAL EVIDENCE AT TRIAL, AND DENYING 797 OTHER RELIEF by Judge Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017) (whalc2S, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2017 2165 (PUBLIC REFILING OF 2151 pursuant to 2164 ) ORDER RE 1418 1423 1514 MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND 1108 MOTION TO STRIKE ASSERTED TRADE SECRET NUMBER 96. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 2164 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 2158 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2017: # 1 Exhibit A) (whalc2S, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2017 2163 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 2152 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE (DKT. 2128) AND REQUEST FOR STAY OF ORDER re 2128 Order on Discovery Letter Brief ) filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 2162 Featured Case ORDER RE: DEPOSITION OF WAYMO'S EXPERT LAMBERTUS HESSELINK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/2/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
October 31, 2017 2161 Featured Case ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 847 942 1607 1620 1841 2015 PENDING MOTIONS RE OTTO TRUCKING by Judge Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 31, 2017 2160 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document: Dkt. No. 2091-2 filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 31, 2017 2159 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2158 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Order Re Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Motion to Strike Asserted Trade Secret Number 96 (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 31, 2017 2158 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Order Re Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Motion to Strike Asserted Trade Secret Number 96 filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 SEALED Version of Dkt. 2151 )(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 31, 2017 2157 Featured Case ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO BRIEF 2152 MOTION FOR RELIEF. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/31/2017. Responses due by 11/2/2017. Replies due by 11/3/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 30, 2017 2156 Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini in Support of 2108 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Defendant Otto Trucking's Response to Waymo's Supplemental Offer of Proof Regarding Otto Trucking filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2108 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 2155 Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini in Support of 2086 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Otto Trucking's Opposition to Waymo's Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion For Order to Show Cause [Dkt. 2054]) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2086 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 2154 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley dismissing as moot 2036 Otto Trucking's Motion to Compel Discovery re: Waymo Investigation. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 2153 Featured Case ORDER RE SEALING OF 2151 ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO STRIKE ASSERTED TRADE SECRET NUMBER 96. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/30/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2017: # 1 Exhibit A) (whalc2S, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2017 2152 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE (DKT. 2128) AND REQUEST FOR STAY OF ORDER re 2128 Order on Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 11/13/2017. Replies due by 11/20/2017. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 2151 Featured Case (UNDER SEAL) ORDER RE 1418 1423 1514 MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND 1108 MOTION TO STRIKE ASSERTED TRADE SECRET NUMBER 96 by Judge Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017) (whalc2S, COURT STAFF)
October 30, 2017 2150 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of 2108 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Defendant Otto Trucking's Response to Waymo's Supplemental Offer of Proof Regarding Otto Trucking filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 2108 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 2149 EXHIBITS re 2101 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Motion for Leave to File Amended List of Elected Trade Secrets. -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2101-4], # 2 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2101-4], # 3 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2101-5], # 4 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2101-5], # 5 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2101-6], # 6 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2101-6], # 7 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2101-7], # 8 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2101-7])(Related document(s) 2101 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 2148 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Otto Truckings Opposition to Waymos Second Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion for Order to Show Cause 2054 filed by Otto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 2147 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of 2100 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 2100 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 2146 EXHIBITS re 2090 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Request to File Motion Re Spoliation and Exhibits Thereto -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2094-4], # 2 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2094-4], # 3 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2094-5], # 4 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2094-5], # 5 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2094-8], # 6 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2094-8])(Related document(s) 2090 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 2145 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of 2089 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Opposition To Waymos Request To File A Motion In Limine Regarding the Stroz Friedberg Due Diligence filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 2089 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 2144 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of 2086 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Otto Trucking's Opposition to Waymo's Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion For Order to Show Cause [Dkt. 2054]) filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 2086 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 2143 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of 2081 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 2081 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 2142 Response re 2050 Notice (Other) -- Waymo's Response to Defendants' Notice of Subsequent Case History byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 2141 Discovery Letter Brief regarding Defendant Otto Trucking LLC's Reply Supporting its Motion to Compel Further Discovery re: Waymo's Investigation filed by Otto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Todd A. Boock in support of Otto Trucking LLC's Motion to Compel Discovery re: Waymo's Investigation, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Boock Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 Placeholder to Boock Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 Placeholder to Boock Declaration)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 2140 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal regarding Defendant Otto Trucking LLC's Reply in support of its Motion to Compel Further Discovery re: Waymo's Investigation filed by Otto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Otto Trucking LLC's Motion to Compel Discovery re: Waymo's Investigation, # 4 Unredacted Version of Otto Trucking LLC's Motion to Compel Discovery re: Waymo's Investigation, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2 to Boock Declaration, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3 to Boock Declaration, # 7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Boock, Todd) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 27, 2017 2139 EXHIBITS re 2053 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Second Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion for Order to Show Cause filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [2053-7])(Related document(s) 2053 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 2138 Declaration of Miles Ehrlich in Support of 2053 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Second Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion for Order to Show Cause filed byAnthony Levandowski. (Related document(s) 2053 ) (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 2137 EXHIBITS re 2045 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Statement re Intent to Use Lyft Information at Trial -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2045-5], # 2 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2045-5])(Related document(s) 2045 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 2136 Declaration of Michelle Yang in Support of 2057 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Leave to File Amended List of Elected Trade Secrets, Supplemental Expert Reports and Revised Witness and Exhibit Lists filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2057 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 2135 DECLARATION re 2055 Waymo's Supplemental Offer of Proof Regarding Otto Trucking, Supplemental Opposition to Otto Trucking's MSJ and Supplemental Opposition to Otto Trucking's Motion for a Separate Trial filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [2055-3], # 2 Revised Unredacted Version of [2055-14])(Related document(s) 2055 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/27/2017) Modified on 10/30/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/30/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2017 2134 Declaration of Hayes P. Hyde in Support of 2057 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Leave to File Amended List of Elected Trade Secrets, Supplemental Expert Reports and Revised Witness and Exhibit Lists filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Related document(s) 2057 ) (Hyde, Hayes) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 2133 DECLARATION re 2055 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Supplemental Offer of Proof Regarding Otto Trucking, Supplemental Opposition to Otto Trucking's MSJ and Supplemental Opposition to Otto Trucking's Motion for a Separate Trial -- Declaration of Hayes P. Hyde in Support of Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Supplemental Offer of Proof Regarding Otto Trucking, and Supplemental Brief in Support of Both its Opposition to Otto Trucking's Motion for Summary Judgment and its Opposition to Otto Trucking's Motion for a Separate Trial (w/ Otto Trucking's Confidential Designations), # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) 2055 ) (Hyde, Hayes) (Filed on 10/27/2017) Modified on 10/30/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2017 2132 EXHIBITS re 2053 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Second Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion for Order to Show Cause -- Declaration of Hayes P. Hyde in Support of Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Lindsay Cooper (w/ Otto Trucking's Confidential Designations), # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) 2053 ) (Hyde, Hayes) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 2131 Proposed Jury Instructions by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc, Otto Trucking LLC. DEFENDANTS' COUNTER-CRITIQUE OF PLAINTIFF WAYMO LLC'S CRITIQUE OF AND PROPOSED ADDITIONS TO TENTATIVE JURY INSTRUCTIONS ON TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION AND TENTATIVE SPECIAL VERDICT FORM (ON MISAPPROPRIATION CLAIMS) (DKT. 2010). (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/27/2017) Modified on 10/27/2017 (fff, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2017 2130 RESPONSE to re 2076 Proposed Jury Instructions, Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Counter-Critique of Defendants' Critique and Proposed Additions (Dkt. 2076) to Tentative Jury Instructions on Trade Secret Misappropriation and Tenative Special Verdict Form (on Misappropriation Claims) (Dkt. 2010) by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 2129 Featured Case ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 2062 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/27/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 27, 2017 2128 Featured Case ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES 1995 & 2019 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/27/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 26, 2017 2127 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 2036 Discovery Letter Briefin support of Otto Trucking's Motion to Compel Discovery re: Waymo Investigation ) filed byKeker, Van Nest & Peters LLP. (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 2126 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 2036 Discovery Letter Briefin support of Otto Trucking's Motion to Compel Discovery re: Waymo Investigation ) filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeff Nardinelli)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 2125 ***AMENDED TRANSCRIPT - REPLACES DOCKET NO. 2124***Transcript of Proceedings held on 10-26-2017, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@can.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2018. (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 2124 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10-26-2017, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 2118 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2018. (Related documents(s) 2118 ) (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 2123 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/26/17 before Judge William Alsup by Otto Trucking LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 2122 Featured Case ORDER RE: BRIEFING ON WAYMO'S RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL SOURCE CODE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/26/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 2121 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 10/26/2017 re 2062 MOTION for Leave to File Amended List of Elected Trade Secrets, Supplemental Expert Reports and Revised Witness and Exhibit Lists (REDACTED) filed by Waymo LLC: Written order to issue.Total Time in Court: 58 Minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Plaintiff's Attorneys: Charles Verhoven, Andrea Roberts, Lindsey Cooper, David Perlson, Melissa Baily, Mark Tung, Jordon Jaffe. Defendants' Attorneys: Joseph Grinstein, Arturo Gonzales, Bill Carmody, Meredith Dearborn, Neel Chatterjee (Otto).Also Present: Special Master, John Cooper. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 2120 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 26, 2017 before Judge William Alsup by John Lee Cooper, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 2119 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/26/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Waymo LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 26, 2017 2118 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 26, 2017 before Judge William Alsup by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 25, 2017 2117 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10-23-17, before Judge Jacqueline Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Wyatt, telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 2072 Transcript Order, 2074 Transcript Order, 2070 Transcript Order, 2066 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2018. (Related documents(s) 2072 , 2074 , 2070 , 2066 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2116 ERRATA re 2101 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Motion for Leave to File Amended List of Elected Trade Secrets., 2103 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2115 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2101 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Motion for Leave to File Amended List of Elected Trade Secrets. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2114 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2100 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2113 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2094 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, 2090 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Request to File Motion Re Spoliation and Exhibits Thereto (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2112 Joinder re 2091 Response ( Non Motion ), Otto Trucking LLCs Notice to Join and Adopt Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc. and Ottomotto, LLCs Opposition To Waymos Request To File A Motion In Limine Regarding the Stroz Friedberg Due Diligence by Otto Trucking LLC. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2111 Joinder re 2102 Opposition/Response to Motion, Otto Trucking LLCs Notice to Join and Adopt Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc. and Ottomotto, LLCs Opposition to Waymos Supplemental Brief ISO Waymos Motion in Limine No. 4 by Otto Trucking LLC. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2110 Joinder re 2103 Opposition/Response to Motion, Otto Trucking LLCs Notice to Join and Adopt Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc. and Ottomotto, LLCs Opposition to Waymos Motion for Leave to File Amended List of Elected Trade Secrets, Supplemental Expert Reports, and Revised Witness and Exhibit Lists by Otto Trucking LLC. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2109 Brief re 2056 Supplemental Brief,,, Defendant Otto Trucking's Response to Waymo's Supplemental Offer of Proof Regarding Otto Trucking, and Supplemental Opposition to Otto Trucking's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shane Brun in support of Defendant Otto Trucking's Response to Waymo's Supplemental Opposition to Otto Trucking's Motion for a Separate Trial, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Brun Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Brun Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 Placeholder to Brun Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Brun Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 Placeholder to Brun Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Brun Declaration)(Related document(s) 2056 ) (Brun, David) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2108 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re: Defendant Otto Trucking's Response to Waymo's Supplemental Offer of Proof Regarding Otto Trucking filed by Otto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Otto Trucking's Response to Waymo's Supplemental Offer of Proof Regarding Otto Trucking, # 4 Unredacted Version of Otto Trucking's Response to Waymo's Supplemental Offer of Proof Regarding Otto Trucking, # 5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Brun Declaration, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Brun Declaration, # 7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 2 to Brun Declaration, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2 to Brun Declaration, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3 to Brun Declaration, # 10 Redacted Version of Exhibit 4 to Brun Declaration, # 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4 to Brun Declaration, # 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5 to Brun Declaration, # 13 Redacted Version of Exhibit 6 to Brun Declaration, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6 to Brun Declaration, # 15 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brun, David) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2107 Joinder re 2093 Response ( Non Motion ), (Joinder in Uber Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Waymo's Motion in Limine No. 14 to Exclude Evidence of Levandowski's Failure to Cooperate [Dkt. No. 2042]) by Otto Trucking LLC. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2106 Declaration of Don Burnette in Support of 2103 Opposition/Response to Motion, (REDACTED VERSION) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2103 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2105 Declaration of Esther Kim Chang in Support of 2103 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (REDACTED), # 2 Exhibit 2 (REDACTED), # 3 Exhibit 3 (REDACTED), # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5 (REDACTED), # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9 (REDACTED), # 10 Exhibit 10 (REDACTED), # 11 Exhibit 11 (REDACTED))(Related document(s) 2103 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2104 Declaration of Sylvia Rivera in Support of 2102 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 2102 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2103 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 2062 MOTION for Leave to File Amended List of Elected Trade Secrets, Supplemental Expert Reports and Revised Witness and Exhibit Lists (REDACTED) ) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2102 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 2044 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Supplemental Brief In Support of Motion In Limine No. 4 ) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2101 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Motion for Leave to File Amended List of Elected Trade Secrets. filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michelle Yang, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Opposition to Waymo's Motion for Leave to File Amended List of Elected Trade Secrets, # 4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Waymo's Motion for Leave to File Amended List of Elected Trade Secrets, # 5 Unredacted Version of Ex. 1 to Chang Decl., # 6 Unredacted Version of Ex. 2 to Chang Decl., # 7 Unredacted Version of Ex. 3 to Chang Decl., # 8 Unredacted Version of Ex. 5 to Chang Decl., # 9 Unredacted Version of Ex. 9 to Chang Decl., # 10 Unredacted Version of Ex. 10 to Chang Decl., # 11 Unredacted Version of Ex. 11 to Chang Decl., # 12 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Don Burnette)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2100 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 [REDACTED] Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Supplemental Brief, # 4 [UNREDACTED] Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Supplemental Brief, # 5 [REDACTED] Exhibit 1 to Rivera Declaration, # 6 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit 1 to Rivera Declaration, # 7 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit 4 to Rivera Declaration, # 8 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit 6 to Rivera Declaration)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2099 RESPONSE to re 2056 Supplemental Brief,,, by Otto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Brun Declaration, # 2 Redacted Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Vu, Hong-An) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2098 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Response to Waymo's Supplemental Opposition to Otto Truckings Motion for Separate Trial [Dkt. 2056] filed by Otto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Hong-An Vu in support of Sealing, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Response to Waymo Supplemental Opposition to Otto Truckings Motion for Separate Trial, # 4 Declaration of Shane Brun, # 5 Redacted Exhibit 1, # 6 Unredacted Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Vu, Hong-An) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2097 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2092 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Supplemental Brief In Opposition to Waymo's Motion In Limine No. 14 To Exclude Evidence Of Levandowski's Failure To Cooperate (Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2096 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 2051 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Precis in support of Request to File Motion for an Adverse Inference Jury Instruction On Account of Defendants' Spoliation ) and 2052 filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cory Buland, # 2 Exhibit 1 (REDACTED), # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 (REDACTED), # 5 Exhibit 4 (REDACTED), # 6 Exhibit 5 (REDACTED), # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11 (REDACTED), # 13 Exhibit 12 (REDACTED))(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2095 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2089 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Opposition To Waymos Request To File A Motion In Limine Regarding the Stroz Friedberg Due Diligence (Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2094 EXHIBITS re 2090 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Request to File Motion Re Spoliation and Exhibits Thereto --Redacted Version of Ex. 1 filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Version of Ex. 1, # 2 Redacted Version of Ex. 3, # 3 Unredacted Version of Ex. 3, # 4 Unredacted Version of Ex. 4, # 5 Unredacted Version of Ex. 5, # 6 Unredacted Version of Ex. 11, # 7 Redacted Version of Ex. 12, # 8 Unredacted Version of Ex. 12)(Related document(s) 2090 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2093 RESPONSE to re 2042 Supplemental Brief, Uber's Supplemental Brief In Opposition to Waymo's Motion In Limine No. 14 To Exclude Evidence Of Levandowski's Failure To Cooperate by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Martha L. Goodman, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2092 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber's Supplemental Brief In Opposition to Waymo's Motion In Limine No. 14 To Exclude Evidence Of Levandowski's Failure To Cooperate filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Martha L. Goodman, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Opposition Brief, # 4 Unredacted Version of Opposition Brief)(Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2091 RESPONSE to re 2040 Brief Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Opposition To Waymos Request To File A Motion In Limine Regarding the Stroz Friedberg Due Diligence by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Maxwell V. Pritt, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 ,*** DOCUMENT LOCKED -EXH 1 AT FILER'S REQUEST. CONTAINS CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION*** Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 10/25/2017) Modified on 10/31/2017 (wv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/1/2017 (wv, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/2/2018) (rcsS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2017 2090 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Request to File Motion Re Spoliation and Exhibits Thereto filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas Pardini, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Request to File Motion Re Spoliation, # 4 Unredacted Version of Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Request to File Motion Re Spoliation)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2089 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Opposition To Waymos Request To File A Motion In Limine Regarding the Stroz Friedberg Due Diligence filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Maxwell V. Pritt, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Precis Opp Brief, # 4 Unredacted Version of Precis Opp Brief, # 5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 3, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, # 9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 4, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, # 11 Redacted Version of Exhibit 5, # 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, # 13 Redacated Version of Exhibit 6, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6, # 15 Redacted Version of Exhibit 7, # 16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7, # 17 Reacted Version of Exhibit 8, # 18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8)(Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2088 RESPONSE to re 2052 Brief (Defendant Otto Truckings Opposition to Waymos Precis re: Adverse Inference Instruction) by Otto Trucking LLC. (Schuman, Brett) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2087 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 2053 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Second Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion for Order to Show Cause ) filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel Walsh in support, # 2 Exhibit A Placeholder, # 3 Exhibit B to Walsh Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Walsh Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Walsh Declaration)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2086 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Otto Trucking's Opposition to Waymo's Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion For Order to Show Cause [Dkt. 2054]) filed by Otto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Neel Chatterjee in Support of Sealing, # 2 Proposed Order Regarding Sealing, # 3 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Waymos Second Supplemental Brief, # 4 Redacted Otto Truckings Opposition to Waymos Second Supplemental Brief, # 5 Declaration of Rachel Walsh in support of Opposition, # 6 Unredacted Exhibit A to Walsh Declaration, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2085 Declaration of Wendy J. Ray in Support of 2084 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 2084 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2084 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 2053 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Second Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion for Order to Show Cause ) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2083 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2081 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Chang, Esther) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2082 NOTICE by Uber Technologies, Inc. re 1710 Terminate Hearings,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,, OF FILING OF PHOTOGRAPHS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Chang, Esther) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 2081 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas J. Pardini, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Chang, Esther) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 24, 2017 2080 EXHIBITS re 2035 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in support of Otto Trucking's Motion to Compel Discovery re: Waymo's Investigation -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Otto Trucking's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2035-4], # 2 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2035-4], # 3 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2035-7], # 4 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2035-7], # 5 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2035-9], # 6 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2035-9], # 7 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2035-11], # 8 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2035-11])(Related document(s) 2035 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 2079 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON 2062 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/24/2017. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 2078 FURTHER TENTATIVE JURY INSTRUCTION [re 2010 TENTATIVE JURY INSTRUCTIONS ON TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION]. DEADLINES: NOON ON 11/3 to file critique and NOON ON 11/7 to file counter critique. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/24/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 2077 RESPONSE to re 2010 Order, Waymo's Critique of and Proposed Additions to Tentative Jury Instructions by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 2076 Proposed Jury Instructions by Otto Trucking LLC, Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. --Defendants' Critique of Tentative Jury Instructions and Special Verdict Form on Trade Secret Misappropriation. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing: Discovery Hearing set for 10/31/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 24, 2017 2075 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Discovery Hearing held on 10/23/2017. The motion for sanctions at docket no. 1910 is terminated for the reasons stated on the record. The Court intends to unlock the underlying locked docket entries on Monday, October 30, 2017, absent some showing from Waymo that sealing is still necessary. Docket No. 1995 is taken under submission. For docket nos. 2036 and 2038 , the opposition briefs are due Thursday, October 26, at midnight, and any reply is due Monday, October 30 at 10:00 a.m. The moving party shall provide a chambers courtesy binder of the moving papers and oppositions by noon, Friday, October 27. The Court sets a hearing for October 31 at 8:30 a.m. (Court Reporter: Kathy Wyatt.)(Time: 1:28)Attorneys for Plaintiff: David Perlson; James Baker; James Judah; Jeff Nardinelli; Andrea Roberts; Jordan Jaffe.Attorneys for Defendants Uber & Ottomotto: Slyvia Rivera; Esther Chang.Attorneys for Defendant Otto Trucking LLC: Brett Schuman; James Lin.Attorney for Non-Party Stroz: Whitney Weber.Special Master: John Cooper. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/24/2017)
October 23, 2017 2074 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/23/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Waymo LLC, for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2073 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING: 2015 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Report and Testimony of Dr. Lambertus Hesselink and Waymo's Opposition Thereto has been RESCHEDULED for hearing from 10/26/2017 to 11/28/2017 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2072 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/23/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Otto Trucking LLC, for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Schuman, Brett) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2071 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2045 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Statement re Intent to Use Lyft Information at Trial (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2070 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 23, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by John Lee Cooper, for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2069 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of 2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Letter Brief in Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Compel Discovery and Exhibits Thereto [Dkt. 1994] -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Otto Trucking's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 2017 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2068 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of 2014 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Motion to Exclude Report and Testimony of Dr. Lambertus Hesselink and Waymo's Opposition Thereto -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Otto Trucking's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 2014 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2067 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 23, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2066 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 23, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2065 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2061 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, 2063 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 2057 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Leave to File Amended List of Elected Trade Secrets, Supplemental Expert Reports and Revised Witness and Exhibit Lists (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2064 Proposed Order re 2062 MOTION for Leave to File Amended List of Elected Trade Secrets, Supplemental Expert Reports and Revised Witness and Exhibit Lists (REDACTED) by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2063 EXHIBITS re 2057 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Leave to File Amended List of Elected Trade Secrets, Supplemental Expert Reports and Revised Witness and Exhibit Lists -- SEALED EXHIBIT 20 filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 2057 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2062 MOTION for Leave to File Amended List of Elected Trade Secrets, Supplemental Expert Reports and Revised Witness and Exhibit Lists (REDACTED) filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeff Nardinelli in Support of Waymo's Motion to Amend, # 2 Exhibits 1-9 PLACEHOLDERS, # 3 Exhibits 11-13 PLACEHOLDERS, # 4 Exhibits 16-20 PLACEHOLDERS, # 5 Exhibits 22-25 PLACEHOLDERS, # 6 Exhibit 26, # 7 Exhibit 27, # 8 Exhibits 28-31 PLACEHOLDERS, # 9 Exhibit 32, # 10 Exhibit 33 PLACEHOLDER)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2061 EXHIBITS re 2057 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Leave to File Amended List of Elected Trade Secrets, Supplemental Expert Reports and Revised Witness and Exhibit Lists -- SEALED Exhibit 1 filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 SEALED Exhibit 2, # 2 SEALED Exhibit 3, # 3 SEALED Exhibit 4, # 4 SEALED Exhibit 5, # 5 SEALED Exhibit 6, # 6 SEALED Exhibit 7, # 7 SEALED Exhibit 8, # 8 SEALED Exhibit 9, # 9 SEALED Exhibit 11, # 10 SEALED Exhibit 12, # 11 SEALED Exhibit 13, # 12 SEALED Exhibit 16, # 13 SEALED Exhibit 17, # 14 SEALED Exhibit 18, # 15 SEALED Exhibit 19, # 16 SEALED Exhibit 22, # 17 SEALED Exhibit 23, # 18 SEALED Exhibit 24, # 19 SEALED Exhibit 25, # 20 SEALED Exhibit 28, # 21 SEALED Exhibit 29, # 22 SEALED Exhibit 30, # 23 SEALED Exhibit 31, # 24 SEALED Exhibit 33)(Related document(s) 2057 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2060 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2051 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Precis in support of Request to File Motion for an Adverse Inference Jury Instruction On Account of Defendants' Spoliation (Baily, Melissa) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2059 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2055 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Supplemental Offer of Proof Regarding Otto Trucking, Supplemental Opposition to Otto Trucking's MSJ and Supplemental Opposition to Otto Trucking's Motion for a Separate Trial (Baily, Melissa) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2058 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2053 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Second Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion for Order to Show Cause (Perlson, David) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2057 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Leave to File Amended List of Elected Trade Secrets, Supplemental Expert Reports and Revised Witness and Exhibit Lists filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Version of Waymo's Motion to Amend, # 4 SEALED Version of Waymo's Motion to Amend)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2056 Supplemental Brief Waymo's Supplemental Offer of Proof Regarding Otto Trucking, Supplemental Opposition to Otto Trucking's MSJ and Supplemental Opposition to Otto Trucking's Motion for a Separate Trial filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeff Nardinelli in Support of Waymo's Supplemental Otto Trucking Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20)(Baily, Melissa) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2055 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Supplemental Offer of Proof Regarding Otto Trucking, Supplemental Opposition to Otto Trucking's MSJ and Supplemental Opposition to Otto Trucking's Motion for a Separate Trial filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in Support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 SEALED Version of Waymo's Supplemental Otto Trucking Brief, # 4 REDACTED Version of Waymo's Revised Supplemental Otto Trucking Brief, # 5 Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT 1, # 6 Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT 2, # 7 Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT 3, # 8 Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT 4, # 9 Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT 5, # 10 Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT 6, # 11 Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT 7, # 12 Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT 8, # 13 Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT 9, # 14 Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT 10, # 15 Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT 11, # 16 Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT 12, # 17 Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT 13, # 18 Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT 14, # 19 Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT 15, # 20 Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT 16, # 21 Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT 17, # 22 Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT 19, # 23 Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT 19, # 24 Exhibit SEALED EXHIBIT 20)(Baily, Melissa) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2054 Supplemental Brief re 2053 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Second Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion for Order to Show Cause PUBLIC REDACTED filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 Placeholder, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4-7 Placeholder)(Related document(s) 2053 ) (Perlson, David) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2053 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Second Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion for Order to Show Cause filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Waymo's Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion for Order to Show Cause, # 4 SEALED Waymo's Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion for Order to Show Cause, # 5 Exhibit 2 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 4 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 5 SEALED, # 8 Exhibit 6 SEALED, # 9 Exhibit 7 SEALED)(Perlson, David) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2052 Brief Precis in support of Request to File Motion for an Adverse Inference Jury Instruction On Account of Defendants' Spoliation filed byWaymo LLC. (Baily, Melissa) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2051 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Precis in support of Request to File Motion for an Adverse Inference Jury Instruction On Account of Defendants' Spoliation filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in support of Waymo's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Precis in support of Request to File Motion for an Adverse Inference Jury Instruction On Account of Defendants' Spoliation, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted version of Waymo's Precis in support of Request to File Motion for an Adverse Inference Jury Instruction On Account of Defendants' Spoliation, # 4 Sealed version of Waymo's Precis in support of Request to File Motion for an Adverse Inference Jury Instruction On Account of Defendants' Spoliation)(Baily, Melissa) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2050 NOTICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 1619 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Michael Wagner NOTICE OF SUBSEQUENT CASE HISTORY (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2049 REPLY (re 2004 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Supporting Waymo's Motion to Close Courtroom, 1919 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byAssociated Press, Bloomberg L.P., BuzzFeed, Inc., Dow Jones & Co., Gizmodo Media Group, LLC, MediaNews Group, Inc., Reuters America LLC, The First Amendment Coalition, The Hearst Corporation, The New York Times Company, Vox Media, Inc.. (Zansberg, Steven) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2048 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2044 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Supplemental Brief In Support of Motion In Limine No. 4 (Jaffe, Jordan) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2047 Statement re 2008 Order, Terminate Deadlines --Defendants' Statement Re Intent to Use Lyft Information at Trial by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (REDACTED), # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 (REDACTED), # 4 Exhibit 4 (REDACTED))(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2046 Supplemental Brief re 913 Fourth MOTION in Limine filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in support of Waymo's Supplemental Brief regarding Motion In Limine No. 4, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 913 ) (Jaffe, Jordan) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2045 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Statement re Intent to Use Lyft Information at Trial filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ian Gore, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Defendants' Statement re Intent to Use Lyft Information at Trial, # 4 Unredacted Version of Defendants' Statement re Intent to Use Lyft Information at Trial, # 5 Unredacted Version of Ex. 1, # 6 Unredacted Version of Ex. 3, # 7 Unredacted Version of Ex. 4)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2044 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Supplemental Brief In Support of Motion In Limine No. 4 filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in support of Waymo's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Brief in Support of Waymo's Motion in Limine No. 4, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted version of Supplemental Brief in Support of Waymo's Motion in Limine No. 4, # 4 Sealed version of Supplemental Brief in Support of Waymo's Motion in Limine No. 4, # 5 Sealed Ex. A, # 6 Sealed Ex. B, # 7 Sealed Ex. C, # 8 Sealed Ex. D)(Jaffe, Jordan) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2043 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2041 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Brief in Support of Waymo's Motion In Limine No. 14 (Jaffe, Jordan) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2042 Supplemental Brief re 1552 MOTION in Limine Waymo's Motion in Limine No. 14 and Defendants' Response filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jordan Jaffe re Supplemental Brief In Support of Waymo's Motion In Limine No. 14, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 1552 ) (Jaffe, Jordan) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2041 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Brief in Support of Waymo's Motion In Limine No. 14 filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in support of Waymo's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Brief in Support of Waymo's Motion In Limine No. 14, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted version of Waymo's Supplemental Brief in Support of Waymo's Motion In Limine No. 14, # 4 Sealed version of Waymo's Supplemental Brief in Support of Waymo's Motion In Limine No. 14, # 5 Redacted version of Ex. 1, # 6 Sealed Version of Exhibit 1, # 7 Sealed Ex. 2, # 8 Sealed Ex. 3, # 9 Sealed Ex. 4)(Jaffe, Jordan) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 23, 2017 2040 Brief Waymo's Precis Brief Requesting Leave to File a Motion in Limine regarding the Stroz Due Diligence Investigation filed byWaymo LLC. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 20, 2017 2039 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2037 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Renewed Motion to Compel Source Code (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 2038 Letter Brief -- Waymo's Renewed Motion to Compel Source Code filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3 Placeholders)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 2037 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Renewed Motion to Compel Source Code filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Waymo's Renewed Motion to Compel Source Code, # 4 SEALED Waymo's Renewed Motion to Compel Source Code, # 5 Exhibit 1 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 2 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 3 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 2036 Discovery Letter Briefin support of Otto Trucking's Motion to Compel Discovery re: Waymo Investigation filed by Otto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Hong-An Vu in support of Otto Trucking's Motion to Compel Discovery re: Waymo Investigation, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Vu Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 Placeholder to Vu Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Vu Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 Placeholder to Vu Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 Placeholder to Vu Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 Placeholder to Vu Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 7 Placeholder to Vu Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 8 Placeholder to Vu Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 9 Placeholder to Vu Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 10 to Vu Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 11 to Vu Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 12 to Vu Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 13 to Vu Declaration)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 2035 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in support of Otto Trucking's Motion to Compel Discovery re: Waymo's Investigation filed by Otto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Otto Trucking's Motion to Compel Discovery re: Waymo's Investigation, # 4 Unredacted Version of Otto Trucking's Motion to Compel Discovery re: Waymo's Investigation, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2 to Vu Declaration, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4 to Vu Declaration, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5 to Vu Declaration, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6 to Vu Declaration, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7 to Vu Declaration, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8 to Vu Declaration, # 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9 to Vu Declaration, # 12 Redacted Version of Exhibit 10 to Vu Declaration, # 13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10 to Vu Declaration, # 14 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 2034 EXHIBITS re 2011 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Dkt. 2006) --DECLARATION OF MICHELLE YANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [2011-10])(Related document(s) 2011 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 2033 CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 2032 Declaration of Michelle Yang in Support of 2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Letter Brief in Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Compel Discovery and Exhibits Thereto [Dkt. 1994] filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2017 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 2031 Declaration of Michelle Yang in Support of 2014 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Motion to Exclude Report and Testimony of Dr. Lambertus Hesselink and Waymo's Opposition Thereto filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2014 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 2030 MANDATE of USCA as to 765 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit,, filed by Anthony Levandowski (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 2029 MANDATE of USCA as to 213 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Anthony Levandowski (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 20, 2017 2028 CLERK'S NOTICE CHANGING TIME OF DISCOVERY HEARING. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that the discovery hearing re: status and pending discovery disputes currently scheduled for October 23, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. shall commence at 2:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017)
October 19, 2017 2027 EXHIBITS re 2001 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Sur-reply to Waymo's Motion to Compel Uber Source Code -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [2001-11], # 2 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [2001-11])(Related document(s) 2001 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 19, 2017 2026 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 2012 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM 2006 JUDGE CORLEY'S NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER RE SOURCE CODE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 19, 2017 2025 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that a discovery hearing is scheduled for October 23, 2017 at 11:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 18, 2017 2024 Declaration of Michelle Yang in Support of 1998 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymos Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel Uber Source Code filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1998 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 18, 2017 2023 EXHIBITS re 2020 Declaration in Support, --EXHIBIT E TO RIVERA DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO WAYMO'S MOTION TO COMPEL STROZ-RELATED DISCOVERY (RE-FILING [2020-5] DUE TO TECHNICAL ERROR) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 2020 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 17, 2017 2022 DECLARATION re 1994 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Letter Brief to Compel Stroz-Related Discovery --DECLARATION OF MICHELLE YANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [1994-6], # 2 Revised Unredacted Version of [1994-13])(Related document(s) 1994 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/17/2017) Modified on 10/18/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2017 2021 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2016 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Compel Stroz-Related Discovery (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 2020 Declaration of Sylvia Rivera in Support of 2018 Opposition/Response to Motion, to Compel Stroz-Related Discovery filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C (REDACTED), # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L (REDACTED))(Related document(s) 2018 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 2019 Discovery Letter Brief in opposition to Waymo's Motion to Compel Discovery [Dkt. 1994] filed by Otto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel M. Walsh in Support of Otto Trucking LLC's Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Compel Stroz Discovery, # 2 Exhibit A to Walsh Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B Placeholder to Walsh Declaration, # 4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 2018 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 1994 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Letter Brief to Compel Stroz-Related Discovery ) and 1995 filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Adam Bentley, # 2 Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # 3 Declaration of Arturo Gonzalez, # 4 Declaration of Eric Tate)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 2017 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Letter Brief in Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Compel Discovery and Exhibits Thereto [Dkt. 1994] filed by Otto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Neel Chatterjee in Support of Sealing, # 2 Proposed Order Regarding Sealing, # 3 Redacted Version of Defendant Otto Trucking LLC's Letter Brief in Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Compel Discovery and Exhibits Thereto [dkt. 1994], # 4 Unredacted Version of Defendant Otto Trucking LLC's Letter Brief in Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Compel Discovery and Exhibits Thereto [dkt. 1994], # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B to Walsh Declaration)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 2016 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Compel Stroz-Related Discovery filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michelle Yang, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Ex. C to Rivera Declaration, # 4 Unredacted Version of Ex. C to Rivera Declaration, # 5 Redacted Version of Ex. L to Rivera Declaration, # 6 Unredacted Version of Ex. L to Rivera Declaration)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 2015 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Report and Testimony of Dr. Lambertus Hesselink and Waymo's Opposition Thereto filed by Otto Trucking LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 10/31/2017. Replies due by 11/7/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Lin in Support of Motion in Limine, # 2 Exhibit 1 Placeholder to Lin Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 Placeholder to Lin Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 Placeholder to Lin Declaration, # 5 Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Opposition to Defendant Otto Trucking's Motion to Exclude Report and Testimony of Dr. Lambertus Hesselink, # 6 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Opposition to Defendant Otto Trucking's Motion to Exclude Report and Testimony of Dr. Lambertus Hesselink, # 7 Exhibit 1 to Corredor Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 2 Placeholder to Corredor Declaration, # 9 Proposed Order Granting Motion in Limine to Exclude Report and Testimony of Dr. Lambertus Hesselink, # 10 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 2014 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Motion to Exclude Report and Testimony of Dr. Lambertus Hesselink and Waymo's Opposition Thereto filed by Otto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Neel Chatterjee in Support of Sealing, # 2 Proposed Order Regarding Sealing, # 3 Redacted Version of Defendant Otto Trucking's Motion to Exclude Report and Testimony of Dr. Lambertus Hesselink, # 4 Unredacted Version of Defendant Otto Trucking's Motion to Exclude Report and Testimony of Dr. Lambertus Hesselink, # 5 Unredacted Version of Lin Exhibit 1, # 6 Unredacted Version of Lin Exhibit 2, # 7 Unredacted Version of Lin Exhibit 3, # 8 Redacted Version of Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Opposition to Defendant Otto Trucking's Motion to Exclude Report and Testimony of Dr. Lambertus Hesselink, # 9 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Opposition to Defendant Otto Trucking's Motion to Exclude Report and Testimony of Dr. Lambertus Hesselink, # 10 Unredacted Version of Corredor Exhibit 2)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 2013 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 2011 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Dkt. 2006) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 2012 MOTION Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Dkt. 2006) re 2006 Order (REDACTED) filed by Waymo LLC. Responses due by 10/31/2017. Replies due by 11/7/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibits 1-10 (PLACEHOLDERS))(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 2011 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Dkt. 2006) filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Version of Waymo's Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Dkt. 2006), # 4 SEALED Version of Waymo's Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Dkt. 2006), # 5 SEALED Exhibit 1, # 6 SEALED Exhibit 2, # 7 SEALED Exhibit 3, # 8 SEALED Exhibit 4, # 9 SEALED Exhibit 5, # 10 SEALED Exhibit 6, # 11 SEALED Exhibit 7, # 12 SEALED Exhibit 8, # 13 SEALED Exhibit 9, # 14 SEALED Exhibit 10)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 17, 2017 2010 TENTATIVE JURY INSTRUCTIONS ON TRADE SECRET MISAPPROPRIATION and TENTATIVE SPECIAL VERDICT FORM (ON MISAPPROPRIATION CLAIMS). By NOON on 10/24, counsel to submit critique plus any proposed additions. By NOON on 10/27, each side shall submit a "counter critique." Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/17/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 16, 2017 2009 Featured Case ORDER RE SUPPLEMENTS TO PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/16/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 2008 Featured Case ORDER RE BRIEFING ON 2004 LYFT, INC.'S MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/16/2017. ***Deadlines terminated. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 2007 DECLARATION re 1990 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Compel Uber Source Code -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1990-10], # 2 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1990-10])(Related document(s) 1990 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/16/2017) Modified on 10/17/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2017 2006 Featured Case ORDER DENYING WAYMO'S MOTION FOR UBER'S CURRENT SOURCE CODE. 1977 . Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on October 16, 2017. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 2005 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 1919 MOTION to Intervene ) Plaintiff Waymo's Response to Media Coalition's Motion to Intervene for Limited Purpose of Opposing Waymo's Closure Motion filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 2004 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Supporting Waymo's Motion to Close Courtroom filed by Lyft, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 10/30/2017. Replies due by 11/6/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of T. Matthiesen In Support Thereof, # 2 Proposed Order)(Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 16, 2017 2003 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 2001 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Sur-reply to Waymo's Motion to Compel Uber Source Code (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 15, 2017 2002 Supplemental Brief re 1977 Letter Brief, DEFENDANTS' SUR-REPLY TO WAYMO'S MOTION TO COMPEL UBER SOURCE CODE filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Don Burnette (REDACTED), # 2 Exhibit A to Burnette Decl. (REDACTED), # 3 Exhibit B to Burnette Decl. (REDACTED), # 4 Exhibit C to Burnette Decl., # 5 Declaration of Esther Kim Chang, # 6 Exhibit 1 to Chang Decl. (REDACTED), # 7 Exhibit 2 to Chang Decl. (REDACTED))(Related document(s) 1977 ) (Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/15/2017)
October 15, 2017 2001 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Sur-reply to Waymo's Motion to Compel Uber Source Code filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michelle Yang, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Defendants' Sur-reply to Waymo's Motion to Compel Uber Source Code, # 4 Unredacted Version of Defendants' Sur-reply to Waymo's Motion to Compel Uber Source Code, # 5 Redacted Version of Declaration of Don Burnette, # 6 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Don Burnette, # 7 Unredacted Version of Ex. A to Burnette Declaration, # 8 Unredacted Version of Ex. B to Burnette Declaration, # 9 Redacted Version of Ex. 1 to Chang Declaration, # 10 Unredacted Version of Ex. 1 to Chang Declaration, # 11 Unredacted Version of Ex. 2 to Chang Declaration)(Jacobs, Michael) (Filed on 10/15/2017)
October 14, 2017 2000 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 1998 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymos Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel Uber Source Code (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/14/2017)
October 14, 2017 1999 REPLY (re 1976 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion to Compel Uber Source Code ) Waymos Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel Uber Source Code filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Placeholder, # 2 Exhibit 2 Placeholder, # 3 Exhibit 3 Placeholder)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/14/2017)
October 14, 2017 1998 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymos Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel Uber Source Code filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Waymos Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel Uber Source Code, # 4 SEALED Waymos Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel Uber Source Code, # 5 Exhibit 1 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 2 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 3 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/14/2017)
October 13, 2017 1997 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/04/17 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Otto Trucking LLC, for Court Reporter Victoria Valine. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
October 13, 2017 1996 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 1994 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Letter Brief to Compel Stroz-Related Discovery (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
October 13, 2017 1995 Letter Brief REDACTED Waymo's Letter Brief to Compel Stroz-Related Discovery filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5 placeholders, # 2 6, # 3 7-10 placeholders, # 4 11)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
October 12, 2017 1994 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Letter Brief to Compel Stroz-Related Discovery filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Waymo's Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Waymo's Letter Brief to Compel Stroz-Related Discovery, # 4 SEALED Waymo's Letter Brief to Compel Stroz-Related Discovery, # 5 Exhibit 1 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 2 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 3 SEALED, # 8 Exhibit 4 SEALED, # 9 Exhibit 5 SEALED, # 10 Exhibit 7 SEALED, # 11 Exhibit 8 SEALED, # 12 Exhibit 9 SEALED, # 13 10 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
October 12, 2017 1993 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 1990 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Compel Uber Source Code (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
October 12, 2017 1992 Joinder re 1991 Opposition/Response to Motion,, by Otto Trucking LLC. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
October 12, 2017 1991 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 1976 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion to Compel Uber Source Code ) and 1977 Waymo's Motion to Compel Uber Source Code filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michelle Yang, # 2 Exhibit 1 (redacted), # 3 Exhibit 2 (redacted), # 4 Exhibit 3 (redacted), # 5 Exhibit 4 (redacted), # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6A (redacted), # 8 Exhibit 6B (redacted))(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
October 12, 2017 1990 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Compel Uber Source Code filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michelle Yang ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Version of Yang Ex. 1, # 4 Unredacted Version of Yang Ex. 2, # 5 Unredacted Version of Yang Ex. 3, # 6 Unredacted Version of Yang Ex. 4, # 7 Unredacted Version of Yang Ex. 6A, # 8 Unredacted Version of Yang Ex. 6B, # 9 Redacted Version of Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Compel Uber Source Code, # 10 Unredacted Version of Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Compel Uber Source Code)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
October 10, 2017 1989 OBJECTIONS to re 1980 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Objection to Waymo's Declaration in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Otto Trucking LLC. (Boock, Todd) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 10, 2017 1988 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of 1966 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Sur-Reply In Support Of Its Opposition To Waymo LLC's Motion For Sanctions filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 1966 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 10, 2017 1987 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/04/2017, before Judge JSC. Court Reporter/Transcriber Victoria L. Valine, CSR, RMr, Crr, telephone number victoriavalinecsr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 1982 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/31/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/8/2018. (Related documents(s) 1982 ) (vlv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 10, 2017 1986 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 1985 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY SERAFINA CONCANNON PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 10, 2017 1985 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Serafina Concannon ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11784191.) filed by Waymo LLC. (Concannon, Serafina) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 10, 2017 1984 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/05/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Otto Trucking LLC, for Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 10, 2017 1983 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/05/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Stroz Friedberg, LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 10, 2017 1982 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/04/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Stroz Friedberg, LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 10, 2017 1981 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/03/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Stroz Friedberg, LLC, for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
October 9, 2017 1980 EXHIBITS re 1955 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions Of Its Opposition To Waymo LLC's Motion For Sanctions [Dkt. 1910] -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit REDACTED version of [1955-6], # 2 Exhibit SEALED version of [1955-6], # 3 Exhibit REDACTED version of [1955-9], # 4 Exhibit SEALED version of [1955-9])(Related document(s) 1955 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/9/2017)
October 9, 2017 1979 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Waymo LLC. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 10/9/2017)
October 9, 2017 1978 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 1976 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion to Compel Uber Source Code (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/9/2017)
October 9, 2017 1977 Letter Brief Waymo's Motion to Compel Uber Source Code filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jordan Jaffe in support of Waymo's Motion to Compel Uber Source Code, # 2 Exhibit 1 Placeholder, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 Placeholder, # 5 Exhibit 4 Placeholder, # 6 Exhibit 5 Placeholder)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/9/2017)
October 9, 2017 1976 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion to Compel Uber Source Code filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Waymo's Motion to Compel Uber Source Code, # 4 SEALED Waymo's Motion to Compel Uber Source Code, # 5 Exhibit 1 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 3 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 4 SEALED, # 8 Exhibit 5 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/9/2017)
October 9, 2017 1975 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/05/2017, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 1:34 p.m. - 1:56 p.m. = 22 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 1962 Transcript Order, 1961 Transcript Order, 1960 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/8/2018. (Related documents(s) 1962 , 1961 , 1960 ) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 10/9/2017)
October 6, 2017 1974 EXHIBITS re 1928 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Supplemental Motion for Continuance --DECLARATION OF MICHELLE YANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [1928-4], # 2 Revised Unredacted Version of [1928-12], # 3 Revised Unredacted Version of [1928-21], # 4 Revised Unredacted Version of [1928-24])(Related document(s) 1928 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 1973 Declaration of Michelle Yang in Support of 1926 Defendant Otto Trucking's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Motion to Exclude Report and Testimony of Dr. Lambertus Hesselink filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 1972 EXHIBITS re 1933 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Otto Trucking's Motion for a Separate Trial --DECLARATION OF MICHELLE YANG IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [1933-4])(Related document(s) 1933 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 1971 Letter Brief re 1964 Order Waymo's letter brief re additional discovery requested from Defendants or third parties relating to the Stroz Friedberg report filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 1964 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 1970 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 1522 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGE CORLEY'S NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER RE MOTION TO QUASH by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 1969 EXHIBITS re 1926 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Motion in Limine to Exclude Report and testimony of Dr. Lambertus Hesselink -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 REVISED SEALED Verison of Dkt. 1926-3)(Related document(s) 1926 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 1968 REPLY (re 1910 MOTION for Sanctions ) Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Sur-Reply In Opposition to Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Motion for Sanctions filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 1967 Brief re 1910 MOTION for Sanctions filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Todd A. Boock In Support Of Sur-Reply In Support Of Its Opposition To Waymo's Motion For Sanctions, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 1910 ) (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 1966 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Sur-Reply In Support Of Its Opposition To Waymo LLC's Motion For Sanctions filed by Otto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Neel Chatterjee in Support of Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 (Proposed Order) Granting Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Redacted Sur-Reply in Support of Opposition to Waymo LLCs Motion for Sanctions, # 4 Unredacted Sur-Reply in Support of Opposition to Waymo LLCs Motion for Sanctions, # 5 Proof of Service)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 1965 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/03/2017, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 1948 Transcript Order, 1951 Transcript Order, 1949 Transcript Order, 1952 Transcript Order, 1950 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2018. (Related documents(s) 1948 , 1951 , 1949 , 1952 , 1950 ) (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 1964 Featured Case ORDER RE: SLACK DISCOVERY DISPUTE AND ANY FURTHER DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/6/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 5, 2017 1963 REPLY (re 1910 MOTION for Sanctions ) Waymo's Reply Memorandum In Support of Its Motion for Sanctions filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
October 5, 2017 1962 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 5, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by John Lee Cooper, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
October 5, 2017 1961 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 5, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
October 5, 2017 1960 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/05/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Waymo LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
October 5, 2017 1959 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 10/5/2017. Court to issue an order. (FTR Time: 1:34-1:56.)Attorneys for Plaintiff: James Judah; James Baker; Jordan Jaffe.Attorney for Defendants Uber and Ottomotto: Sylvia Rivera.Attorneys for Otto Trucking: Hayes Hyde; Todd Boock.Special Master: John Cooper.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/5/2017) Modified on 10/5/2017: Matter transcribed by Leo Mankiewicz. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2017 1958 Declaration of Hayes P. Hyde in Support of 1933 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Otto Trucking's Motion for a Separate Trial filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Related document(s) 1933 ) (Hyde, Hayes) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
October 4, 2017 1957 Joinder re 1956 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Defendants Uber Technologies Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Notice Of Joinder in Opposition to Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Motion for Sanctions by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Martha L. Goodman, # 2 Declaration of Kaitlyn Murphy)(Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 4, 2017 1956 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 1910 MOTION for Sanctions ) filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 James Lin Declaration in support of Opposition, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Lin Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Lin Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Lin Declaration, # 5 Redacted Exhibit 4 to Lin Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Lin Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Lin Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Lin Declaration, # 9 Redacted Declaration of Todd Boock in support of Opposition, # 10 Placeholder for Exhibit 8 to Boock Declaration)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 4, 2017 1955 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions Of Its Opposition To Waymo LLC's Motion For Sanctions [Dkt. 1910] filed by Otto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Neel Chatterjee in Support of Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Redacted Opposition to Waymo LLC's Motion for Sanctions, # 4 Unredacted Opposition to Waymo LLC's Motion for Sanctions, # 5 Redacted Exhibit 4 to Lin Declaration, # 6 Unredacted Exhibit 4 to Lin Declaration, # 7 Redacted Declaration of Todd Boock in Support of Opposition to Motion for Sanctions, # 8 Unredacted Declaration of Todd Boock in Support of Opposition to Motion for Sanctions, # 9 Unredacted Exhibit 8 to Boock Declaration, # 10 Proof of Service)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 4, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 1822 MOTION Close Courtroom . Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 4, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 1919 MOTION to Intervene . Responses due by 10/16/2017. Replies due by 10/23/2017. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 4, 2017 1954 Featured Case ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 1604 MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/4/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 11/29/2017 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Jury Trial set for 12/4/2017 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 4, 2017 1953 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 10/4/2017. All depositions shall be completed by October 20, 2017. (FTR Time: 10:02-10:06.)Attorney for Plaintiff: Melissa Bailey. Attorney for Defendants Uber & Ottomotto: Arturo Gonzalez. Attorney for Defendant Otto Trucking: Hong-An Vu.Special Master: John Cooper.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/4/2017) Modified on 10/10/2017: Matter transcribed by Victoria Valine. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 3, 2017 1952 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/3/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Otto Trucking LLC, for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Schuman, Brett) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
October 3, 2017 1951 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/03/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Waymo LLC, for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
October 3, 2017 1950 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 3, 2017 before Judge William Alsup by John Lee Cooper, for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
October 3, 2017 1949 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/3/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Lior Ron, for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
October 3, 2017 1948 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 3, 2017 before Judge William Alsup by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
October 3, 2017 1947 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing 1604 Motion to Continue and 1841 Motion to Sever held on 10/3/2017. Motion to Continue is GRANTED. Jury Selection continued to 11/29/2017 at 7:30 a.m. Jury Trial continued to 12/4/2017 at 7:30 a.m. with Further Jury Trial set for 12/5/2017 thru 12/20/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 8:00 AM. 1841 Motion to Sever - under submission. Written order to follow. Total Time in Court: 1 Hour; 20 Minutes. Court Reporter: Rhonda Aquilina. Plaintiff's Attorneys: Charles Verhoeven, Melissa Baily, David Perison, Andrea Roberts, Jeffrey Nardinelli, Jordan Jaffe. Defendants' Attorneys: Arturo J. Gonzalez, Bill Carmody, Shawn Rabin, Karen Dunn, Joseph Grinstein, Michael Jacobs, Brett Schuman (Otto). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/3/2017)
October 3, 2017 1946 Supplemental Brief re 1423 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Neel Chatterjee in support of Supplement, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Neel Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Neel Declaration)(Related document(s) 1423 ) (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
October 3, 2017 1945 Featured Case ORDER RE HEARING ON 1919 MEDIA COALITION'S MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/3/2017. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2017 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
October 3, 2017 1944 Declaration of Esther Kim Chang in Support of 1943 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 1943 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
October 3, 2017 1943 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 1928 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Supplemental Motion for Continuance ) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
October 2, 2017 1942 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of 1887 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Brief On Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Motion To Exclude One Of Three Opinions Proffered By Waymo Expert Jim Timmins [Dkt. 1612] filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 1887 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1941 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of 1839 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Motion for a Separate Trial, 1895 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 1839 filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 1839 , 1895 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1940 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of 1830 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Compel Further Depositions and Interrogatories filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 1830 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1939 EXHIBITS re 1839 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Motion for a Separate Trial, 1895 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 1839 --DECLARATION OF MICHELLE YANG IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [1839-3], # 2 Revised Unredacted Version of [1839-7], # 3 Revised Unredacted Version of [1895-3])(Related document(s) 1839 , 1895 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1938 EXHIBITS re 1834 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Defendants' Submission of Michael Wagner's Deposition Testimony --DECLARATION OF MICHELLE YANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [1834-4])(Related document(s) 1834 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1937 EXHIBITS re 1820 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Supplemental Proposed Pretrial Order --DECLARATION OF MICHELLE YANG IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [1820-3])(Related document(s) 1820 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1936 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 1933 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Otto Trucking's Motion for a Separate Trial (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1935 EXHIBITS re 1818 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Supplemental Notice of Joinder in Uber Technologies Inc. and Ottomotto's Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Waymo's Damages Expert Michael Wagner (Dkt. 1619) --DECLARATION OF MICHELLE YANG IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [1818-3])(Related document(s) 1818 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1934 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 1841 MOTION to Sever (Otto Trucking LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for a Separate Trial [Redacted]) ) (REDACTED) filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1933 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Otto Trucking's Motion for a Separate Trial filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Version of Waymo's Opposition to Otto Trucking's Motion for a Separate Trial, # 4 SEALED Version of Waymo's Opposition to Otto Trucking's Motion for a Separate Trial)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1932 Renotice motion hearing re 1910 MOTION for Sanctions filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 1910 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1931 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 1928 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Supplemental Motion for Continuance (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1930 Declaration of Andy Crain in Support of 1929 Supplemental Brief,, Declaration of Andy Crain in Support of Waymo's Supplemental Motion for Continuance filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 1929 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1929 Supplemental Brief re 1883 Order,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, Correction of Docket # 1925 filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John McCauley in support of Waymo's Motion for Continuance of Trial Date, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 16, # 15 Exhibit 17, # 16 Exhibit 18, # 17 Exhibit 19, # 18 Exhibit 20, # 19 Exhibit 21, # 20 Exhibit 22)(Related document(s) 1883 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1928 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Supplemental Motion for Continuance filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Supplemental Motion for Continuance, # 4 SEALED Supplemental Motion for Continuance, # 5 Declaration of John McCauley, # 6 Exhibit 1 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 2 SEALED, # 8 Exhibit 3 SEALED, # 9 Exhibit 4 PUBLIC, # 10 Exhibit 5 SEALED, # 11 Exhibit 6 SEALED, # 12 Exhibit 7 SEALED, # 13 Exhibit 8 SEALED, # 14 Exhibit 9 PUBLIC, # 15 Exhibit 10 SEALED, # 16 Exhibit 12 PUBLIC, # 17 Exhibit 13 PUBLIC, # 18 Exhibit 16 SEALED, # 19 Exhibit 17 PUBLIC, # 20 Exhibit 18 SEALED, # 21 Exhibit 19 SEALED, # 22 Exhibit 20 PUBLIC, # 23 Exhibit 21 SEALED, # 24 Exhibit 22 PUBLIC)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1927 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Report and Testimony of Dr. Lambertus Hesselink filed by Otto Trucking LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 10/16/2017. Replies due by 10/23/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Lin in support of Motion in Limine, # 2 Exhibit 1 Placeholder, # 3 Exhibit 2 Placeholder, # 4 Exhibit 3 Placeholder, # 5 Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1926 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Motion in Limine to Exclude Report and testimony of Dr. Lambertus Hesselink filed by Otto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Lin in support of Sealing, # 2 Proposed Order Regarding Sealing, # 3 Unredacted Version of Motion to Exclude report and Testimony of Dr. Lambertus Hesselink, # 4 Redacted Version of Motion to Exclude report and Testimony of Dr. Lambertus Hesselink, # 5 James Lin Declaration in support of Motion in Limine, # 6 Unredacted Exhibit 1, # 7 Unredacted Exhibit 2, # 8 Unredacted Exhibit 3, # 9 Proposed Order to Motion in Limine, # 10 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1925 Supplemental Brief re 1883 Order,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, PUBLIC REDACTED Waymo's Supplemental Motion for Continuance and Response to Request for Input on Pending Motion to Continue Trial Date filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 1883 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1924 (PUBLIC REFILING OF 1416 pursuant to 1485 ) SUPPLEMENT TO 1408 ORDER SETTING FURTHER HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE ASSERTED TRADE SECRET NUMBER 96. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1923 (PUBLIC REFILING OF 1408 pursuant to 1485 ) ORDER SETTING FURTHER HEARING ON 1108 MOTION TO STRIKE ASSERTED TRADE SECRET NUMBER 96. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1922 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Waymo LLC. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1921 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 1915 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY STEVEN CHERNY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1920 Declaration of Adrian J. Sawyer in Support of 1887 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Brief On Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Motion To Exclude One Of Three Opinions Proffered By Waymo Expert Jim Timmins [Dkt. 1612] filed bySandstone Group, LLC, Ognen Stojanovski, Tyto LiDAR, LLC. (Related document(s) 1887 ) (Sawyer, Adrian) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1919 MOTION to Intervene filed by Associated Press, Bloomberg L.P., BuzzFeed, Inc., Dow Jones & Co., Gizmodo Media Group, LLC, MediaNews Group, Inc., Reuters America LLC, The First Amendment Coalition, The Hearst Corporation, The New York Times Company, Vox Media, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 10/16/2017. Replies due by 10/23/2017. (Zansberg, Steven) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1918 Certificate of Interested Entities by Associated Press, Bloomberg L.P., BuzzFeed, Inc., Dow Jones & Co., Gizmodo Media Group, LLC, MediaNews Group, Inc., Reuters America LLC, The First Amendment Coalition, The Hearst Corporation, The New York Times Company, Vox Media, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Grupo Financiero Inbursa, S.A.B. de C.V. for The New York Times Company; Other Affiliate Univision Interactive Media, Inc., Other Affiliate Univision Communications, Inc. for Gizmodo Media Group, LLC; Other Affiliate Thompson Reuters Corporation for Reuters America LLC; Corporate Parent Ruby Newco, LLC, Other Affiliate News Corporation for Dow Jones & Co.; Other Affiliate NBCUniversal Media, LLC for Vox Media, Inc.; Other Affiliate Bloomberg Inc. for Bloomberg L.P.. (Zansberg, Steven) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1917 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Zansberg (Zansberg, Steven) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1916 Declaration of Mike Schlanser in Support of 1903 Order, Regarding Google Drive and Gmail Migration filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1903 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1915 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice For Steven Cherny ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11764895.) filed by Waymo LLC. (Cherny, Steven) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1914 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING TIME OF MOTIONS HEARING: 1604 MOTION to Continue Waymo's Motion for Continuance of Trial Date and 1841 MOTION to Sever (Otto Trucking LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for a Separate Trial [Redacted]) are RESCHEDULED from 10/3/2017 at 8:00 a.m. to 10/3/2017 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1913 Declaration of Jesse Murray in Support of 1903 Order, filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1903 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1912 Declaration of Sylvia Rivera in Support of 1903 Order, filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1903 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 1911 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 1909 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Sanctions (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 1, 2017 1910 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Waymo LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 10/16/2017. Replies due by 10/23/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Baker in Support of Waymo's Motion for Sanctions, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Proposed Order)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/1/2017)
October 1, 2017 1909 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Sanctions filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in Support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 SEALED Version of Waymo's Motion for Sanctions, # 4 Public Redacted Version of Waymo's Motion for Sanctions, # 5 SEALED Version of Exhibit B, # 6 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit B, # 7 SEALED Version of Exhibit C, # 8 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit C, # 9 SEALED Version of Exhibit D, # 10 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit D, # 11 SEALED Version of Exhibit F, # 12 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit F, # 13 SEALED Version of Exhibit G, # 14 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit G, # 15 SEALED Version of Exhibit H, # 16 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit H, # 17 SEALED Version of Exhibit I, # 18 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit I, # 19 SEALED Version of Exhibit J, # 20 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit J)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 10/1/2017)
October 1, 2017 1908 Declaration of Adrian Sawyer in Support of 1830 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Compel Further Depositions and Interrogatories filed bySandstone Group, LLC, Ognen Stojanovski, Tyto LiDAR, LLC. (Related document(s) 1830 ) (Sawyer, Adrian) (Filed on 10/1/2017)
September 29, 2017 1907 EXHIBITS re 1789 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's motion to compel depositions, overrule objections, compel interrogatories, and compel supplemental 30(b)(6) witness --DECLARATION OF MICHELLE YANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [1789-5] (Ex. 1), # 2 Revised Unredacted Version of [1789-8] (Ex. 10), # 3 Revised Unredacted Version of [1789-8] (Ex. 12), # 4 Revised Unredacted Version of [1789-9] (Ex. 16), # 5 Revised Unredacted Version of [1789-9] (Ex. 17), # 6 Revised Unredacted Version of [1789-11] (Ex. 21))(Related document(s) 1789 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 1906 EXHIBITS re 1585 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Otto Trucking's Response to Waymo LLC's Corrected Supplemental Brief (docket No. 1501) in support of its Motion for Order to Show Cause filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Redacted CORRECTION OF EXHIBIT and DOCKET # 1585-35)(Related document(s) 1585 ) (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 1905 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of 1786 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 1786 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 1904 Declaration of Adrian J. Sawyer in Support of 1789 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's motion to compel depositions, overrule objections, compel interrogatories, and compel supplemental 30(b)(6) witness filed bySandstone Group, LLC, Ognen Stojanovski, Tyto LiDAR, LLC. (Related document(s) 1789 ) (Sawyer, Adrian) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 1903 Featured Case ORDER re 1893 Declaration of Kevin Faulkner Regarding Google Drive and Gmail Migration 1894 Declaration in Support filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Ottomotto LLC. Signed by Judge Jacqueline S. Corley on September 29, 2017. (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 1902 EXHIBITS re 1620 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Gary Brown and Kristinn Gudjonsson (REDACTED) filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Redacted CORRECTION OF EXHIBIT AND DOCKET # 1620 )(Related document(s) 1620 ) (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 1901 Declaration of Hayes P. Hyde in Support of 1789 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's motion to compel depositions, overrule objections, compel interrogatories, and compel supplemental 30(b)(6) witness filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Related document(s) 1789 ) (Hyde, Hayes) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 1900 EXHIBITS re 1481 Notice (Other),, filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Redacted CORRECTION OF EXHIBIT AND DOCKET # [1481-2])(Related document(s) 1481 ) (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 1899 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Yeh-Kai Tung (Tung, Mark) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 1898 Declaration of Hayes P. Hyde in Support of 1786 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Related document(s) 1786 ) (Hyde, Hayes) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 1897 EXHIBITS re 1618 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Mr. Brown and Mr. Gudjonsson regarding Protections of Waymo's Alleged Trade Secrets, 1609 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Hesselink regarding Protections of Waymo's Alleged Trade Secrets, 1585 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Otto Trucking's Response to Waymo LLC's Corrected Supplemental Brief (docket No. 1501) in support of its Motion for Order to Show Cause, 1540 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 26 filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Redacted CORRECTION OF EXHIBIT AND DOCKET # [1585-8], [1609-10], [1618-14], [1540-8] and [1540-11])(Related document(s) 1618 , 1609 , 1585 , 1540 ) (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 1896 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Sang-Chul Pak (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 1895 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 1839 filed by Otto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Version Exhibit 3, # 4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 1894 Declaration of Kevin Faulkner Regarding Google Drive and Gmail Migration filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 1893 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Kevin Faulkner Regarding Google Drive and Gmail Migration filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michelle Yang, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Declaration of Kevin Faulkner Regarding Google Drive and Gmail Migration, # 4 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Kevin Faulkner Regarding Google Drive and Gmail Migration)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. ENTRY DOES NOT REFLECT DOCUMENT. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 1867 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Waymo LLC (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 1892 Featured Case ORDER RE: WAYMO'S MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL DEPOSITIONS AND INTERROGATORIES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/29/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 1891 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/28/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Stroz Friedberg, LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 1890 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 09/28/17, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number 8584537590. Tape Number: FTR 2:14 - 2:36. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 1874 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2017. (Related documents(s) 1874 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 29, 2017 1889 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 1887 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Brief On Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Motion To Exclude One Of Three Opinions Proffered By Waymo Expert Jim Timmins [Dkt. 1612] (Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 28, 2017 1888 Supplemental Brief re 1612 MOTION in Limine Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc.'s And Ottomotto LLC's Motion To Exclude One Of Three Opinions Proffered By Waymo Expert Jim Timmins filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Melissa Felder Zappala, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) 1612 ) (Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 1887 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Brief On Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Motion To Exclude One Of Three Opinions Proffered By Waymo Expert Jim Timmins [Dkt. 1612] filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Melissa Felder Zappala, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 3 REDACTED Supplemental Timmins Brief, # 4 SEALED Supplemental Timmins Brief, # 5 REDACTED Zappala Declaration, # 6 SEALED Zappala Declaration, # 7 REDACTED Exhibit 1, # 8 ENTIRELY SEALED Exhibit 1, # 9 REDACTED Exhibit 2, # 10 ENTIRELY SEALED Exhibit 2, # 11 REDACTED Exhibit 3, # 12 ENTIRELY SEALED Exhibit 3, # 13 REDACTED Exhibit 4, # 14 ENTIRELY SEALED Exhibit 4, # 15 REDACTED Exhibit 5, # 16 ENTIRELY SEALED Exhibit 5, # 17 REDACTED Exhibit 6, # 18 ENTIRELY SEALED Exhibit 6, # 19 REDACTED Exhibit 9, # 20 ENTIRELY SEALED Exhibit 9)(Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 1886 Supplemental Brief re 1774 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Waymo's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Exclude One of Three Opinions Proffered By Waymo Expert Jim Timmins filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John W. McCauley, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 1774 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 1885 Featured Case FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER (denying 1541 Motion in Limine; denying 1543 Motion in Limine; granting 1546 Motion in Limine; granting 1547 Motion in Limine; granting 1549 Motion in Limine; denying 1554 Motion in Limine; denying 1556 Motion in Limine; denying 1564 Motion in Limine; granting 1566 Motion in Limine; denying 1610 Motion in Limine) by Judge Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 1884 Response re 1852 Notice (Other), Waymo's Response to Defendants' Notice of Cases Regarding Testimony of Waymo's Damages Expert Michael J. Wagner byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 1883 REQUEST FOR INPUT ON PENDING 1604 MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/28/2017. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 1882 Declaration of Adrian J. Sawyer in Support of 1789 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's motion to compel depositions, overrule objections, compel interrogatories, and compel supplemental 30(b)(6) witness filed bySandstone Group, LLC, Ognen Stojanovski, Tyto LiDAR, LLC. (Related document(s) 1789 ) (Sawyer, Adrian) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 1881 Declaration of Adrian J. Sawyer in Support of 1784 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Letter Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel forensic images and other materials provided by the Diligenced Employees to Stroz Friedberg filed bySandstone Group, LLC, Ognen Stojanovski, Tyto LiDAR, LLC. (Related document(s) 1784 ) (Sawyer, Adrian) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 1880 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 1782 Motion to Quash.(jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 1879 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/28/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Lior Ron, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 1878 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/27/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Stroz Friedberg, LLC, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 1877 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 28, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by John Lee Cooper, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 1876 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 27, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by John Lee Cooper, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 1875 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 28, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 1874 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/28/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Waymo LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 1873 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 9/28/2017. (FTR Time: 2:20-2:36.)Attorneys for Plaintiff: David Perlson; James Judah; Monica Tarazi.Attorneys for Defendants Uber & Ottomotto: Kaitlyn Murphy; Sylvia Rivera.Attorney for Defendant Otto Trucking: Hayes Hyde.Special Master: John Cooper. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/28/2017) Modified on 9/28/2017: Matter transcribed by Tara Bauer (ECHO Reporting). (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2017 1872 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/27/17, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 1860 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2017. (Related documents(s) 1860 ) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 1871 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 1682 1684 1685 1686 MOTIONS FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER OVER DUE DILIGENCE REPORT by Judge Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 1869 Declaration of Miles Ehrlich in Support of 1781 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits in Support of Defendants' Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order Regarding Subpoenas to Yoo and Gonzalez filed byAnthony Levandowski. (Related document(s) 1781 ) (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 1868 EXHIBITS re 1781 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits in Support of Defendants' Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order Regarding Subpoenas to Yoo and Gonzalez --CORRECTED UNREDACTED VERSION OF EX. 2 TO GONZALEZ DECL. (CORRECTING [1781-5]) filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1781 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 1867 EXHIBITS re 1558 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion in Limine No. 17 and Defendants' Response Sealed Version of Waymo's Motion In Limine No. 17 filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Version of Waymo's Motion In Limine No. 17)(Related document(s) 1558 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 1866 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Privileged Documents filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 27, 2017 1865 Discovery Letter Brief regarding apex standard for deposing Uber's Chief Legal Officer filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 1864 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/27/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Otto Trucking LLC, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 1863 Transcript of Proceedings, Pretrial Conference, held on 9/27/2017, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporters/Transcribers Lydia Zinn and Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 1853 Transcript Order, 1856 Transcript Order, 1855 Transcript Order, 1854 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2017. (Related documents(s) 1853 , 1856 , 1855 , 1854 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 1862 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/27/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Anthony Levandowski, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 1861 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 27, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 1860 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/27/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Waymo LLC, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 1859 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/27/2017 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Lior Ron, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 1858 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Discovery Hearing held on 9/27/2017. (Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce) (Time: 1:05)Attorneys for Plaintiff: David Perlson; James Judah; Linda Brewer.Attorneys for Defendants Uber & Ottomotto: Arturo Gonzalez; Esther Chang, Cory Buland.Attorneys for Defendant Otto Trucking: Rachel Walsh.Attorneys for Non-Parties: Miles Erlich for Levandowski; David Brownstein for Sebern; Jonathan Patchen for Ron; Melanie Blunchi & Whitney Weber via Court Call for Stroz Friedberg.Special Master: John Cooper. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 1857 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Pretrial Conference held on 9/27/2017; Motions Hearing 1541 , 1543 , 1546 , 1547 , 1549 , 1552 , 1554 , 1556 , 1559 , 1560 , 1564 , 1566 , 1607 , 1610 , 1612 , 1619 1620 held on 9/27/2017. 1560 Motion in Limine - withdrawn; 1612 Motion in Limine - parties to submit supplemental briefs no more than 5 pages in length. Pretrial Conference Order to issue. Total Time in Court: 4 Hours; 15 Minutes. Court Reporters: Lydia Zinn / JoAnn Bryce. Special Master: John Cooper.Plaintiff's Attorneys: Charles Verhoven, Melissa Baily, David Eiseman, Lindsay Cooper, Felipe Corredor, Andrea Roberts. Defendants' Attorneys: Neel Chatterjee (Otto), Karen Dunn, Arturo Gonzalez, Bill Carmody, Michael Jacobs, Joseph Grinstein, Esther Chang, Cory Buland, Halley Josephs, Ian Gore, Shawn Rabin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 1856 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 27, 2017 before Judge William Alsup by John Lee Cooper, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 1855 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/27/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Lior Ron, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 1854 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/27/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Waymo LLC, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 1853 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/27/2017 before Judge William Alsup by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 1852 NOTICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. NOTICE OF CASES EXCLUDING TESTIMONY OF WAYMO'S DAMAGES EXPERT MICHAEL J. WAGNER (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3, # 4 Attachment 4, # 5 Attachment 5, # 6 Attachment 6, # 7 Attachment 7, # 8 Attachment 8)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 1851 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 1827 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Quash and for Protective Order, 1837 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Reply to Defendants' Motion re Diligenced Employees' Privilege Waiver, 1834 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Defendants' Submission of Michael Wagner's Deposition Testimony (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 1850 EXHIBITS re 1784 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Letter Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel forensic images and other materials provided by the Diligenced Employees to Stroz Friedberg Correction of Docket #[1784-7] filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 1784 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 1849 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 1847 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Notice Regarding Stroz Report Discovery and Tasks (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 1848 NOTICE by Waymo LLC Waymo's Notice Regarding Stroz Report Discovery and Tasks (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in support of Waymo's Notice Regarding Stroz Report Discovery and Tasks, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 27, 2017 1847 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Notice Regarding Stroz Report Discovery and Tasks filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in support of Waymo's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Notice Regarding Stroz Report Discovery and Tasks, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted version of Waymo's Notice Regarding Stroz Report Discovery and Tasks, # 4 Sealed version of Waymo's Notice Regarding Stroz Report Discovery and Tasks)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 26, 2017 1846 DECLARATION & EXHIBITS re 1777 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Michael Wagner --DECLARATION OF MICHELLE YANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [1777-3], # 2 Revised Unredacted Version of [1777-5])(Related document(s) 1777 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/26/2017) Modified on 9/27/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2017 1845 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 1830 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Compel Further Depositions and Interrogatories (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1844 Declaration of Michelle Yang in Support of 1773 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Motion to Exclude One of Three Opinions Proffered by Waymo Expert Jim Timmins filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1773 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1843 DECLARATION & EXHIBITS re 1770 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Exclude Otto Trucking's Damages Expert James Malackowski --DECLARATION OF MICHELLE YANG IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [1770-3], # 2 Revised Unredacted Version of [1770-5], # 3 Revised Unredacted Version of [1770-7])(Related document(s) 1770 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/26/2017) Modified on 9/27/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2017 1842 Declaration of Miles Ehrlich in Support of 1773 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Motion to Exclude One of Three Opinions Proffered by Waymo Expert Jim Timmins CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 1840 filed byAnthony Levandowski. (Related document(s) 1773 ) (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1841 MOTION to Sever (Otto Trucking LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for a Separate Trial [Redacted]) filed by Otto Trucking LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 10/10/2017. Replies due by 10/3/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Neel Chatterjee, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Sealed), # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 (Sealed), # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1840 Declaration of Miles Ehrlich in Support of 1773 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Motion to Exclude One of Three Opinions Proffered by Waymo Expert Jim Timmins filed byAnthony Levandowski. (Related document(s) 1773 ) (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1839 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Motion for a Separate Trial filed by Otto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Neel Chatterjee in support of Sealing, # 2 Proposed Order Regarding Sealing, # 3 Unredacted Version of Motion for Separate Trials, # 4 Redacted Version of Motion for Separate Trials, # 5 Declaration of Neel Chatterjee in support of Motion, # 6 Proposed Order Granting Motion, # 7 Unredacted Exhibit 1, # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Unredacted Exhibit 3, # 10 Exhibit 4, # 11 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1838 Letter Brief re 1747 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTED Version of Waymo's Brief on the Diligenced Employees waiver of attorney-client privilege for materials provided to third party Stroz Friedberg Waymo's Reply to Defendants' Motion re Diligenced Employees' Privilege Waiver filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3 Placeholders)(Related document(s) 1747 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1837 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Reply to Defendants' Motion re Diligenced Employees' Privilege Waiver filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Waymo's Reply to Motion re Dilligenced Employees' Privilege Waiver, # 4 SEALED Waymo's Reply to Motion re Dilligenced Employees' Privilege Waiver, # 5 Exhibit 1 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 2 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 3 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1836 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey John Miles (Miles, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1835 Supplemental Brief re 1795 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Waymo's Response to Defendants' Submission of Michael Wagner's Deposition Testimony filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 1795 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1834 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Response to Defendants' Submission of Michael Wagner's Deposition Testimony filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Waymo's Reponse to Defendants' Submission of Michael Wagner's Deposition Testimony, # 4 SEALED Waymo's Reponse to Defendants' Submission of Michael Wagner's Deposition Testimony)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1833 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S.M. Francis (Francis, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1832 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 1789 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's motion to compel depositions, overrule objections, compel interrogatories, and compel supplemental 30(b)(6) witness ) and re 1790 filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Arturo J. Gonzalez, # 2 Exhibit 1 (REDACTED), # 3 Exhibit 2 (REDACTED), # 4 Exhibit 3 (REDACTED), # 5 Exhibit 4 (REDACTED), # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6 (REDACTED), # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8 (REDACTED), # 10 Exhibit 9 (REDACTED), # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1831 Declaration in Support of 1744 Letter Brief, 1747 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTED Version of Waymo's Brief on the Diligenced Employees waiver of attorney-client privilege for materials provided to third party Stroz Friedberg filed byAnthony Levandowski. (Related document(s) 1744 , 1747 ) (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1830 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Compel Further Depositions and Interrogatories filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michelle Yang, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Compel Further Depositions and Interrogatories, # 4 Unredacted Version of Defendants' Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Compel Further Depositions and Interrogatories, # 5 Redacted Version of Ex. 1 to Gonzalez Decl., # 6 Unredacted Version of Ex. 1 to Gonzalez Decl., # 7 Redacted Version of Ex. 2 to Gonzalez Decl., # 8 Unredacted Version of Ex. 2 to Gonzalez Decl., # 9 Redacted Version of Ex. 3 to Gonzalez Decl., # 10 Unredacted Version of Ex. 3 to Gonzalez Decl., # 11 Unredacted Version of Ex. 4 to Gonzalez Decl., # 12 Redacted Version of Ex. 6 to Gonzalez Decl., # 13 Unredacted Version of Ex. 6 to Gonzalez Decl., # 14 Redacted Version of Ex. 8 to Gonzalez Decl., # 15 Unredacted Version of Ex. 8 to Gonzalez Decl., # 16 Unredacted Version of Ex. 9 to Gonzalez Decl.)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1829 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lior Ron (Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1828 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 1782 MOTION to Quash and Motion for Protective Order Regarding Subpoenas to Yoo and Gonzalez ) Waymo's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Quash and for Protective Order filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Marks, Andrew) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1827 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Quash and for Protective Order filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Waymo's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Quash and for Protective Order, # 4 SEALED Waymo's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Quash and for Protective Order)(Marks, Andrew) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1826 Letter Brief re 1785 Letter Brief, in Response to Waymo's Motion to Compel Inspection filed byLior Ron. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Jonathan A. Patchen, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Patchen Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Patchen Declaration)(Related document(s) 1785 ) (Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1825 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief in Response to Waymo's Motion to Compel Inspection filed by Lior Ron. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan A. Patchen, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Sealed Version of Letter Brief, # 4 Redacted Version of Letter Brief, # 5 Sealed Version of Exhibit 1, # 6 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1)(Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1824 Discovery Letter Brief in Response to Waymo's Motion to Compel (Dkt. 1785) filed by Anthony Levandowski. (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1823 Declaration of Adrian J. Sawyer in Support of 1773 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Motion to Exclude One of Three Opinions Proffered by Waymo Expert Jim Timmins filed bySandstone Group, LLC, Ognen Stojanovski, Tyto LiDAR, LLC. (Related document(s) 1773 ) (Sawyer, Adrian) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1822 MOTION Close Courtroom filed by Waymo LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2017 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before William Alsup. Responses due by 10/6/2017. Replies due by 10/9/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Anil Patel, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Gerard Dwyer, # 3 Proposed Order)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1821 Proposed Pretrial Order (Otto Trucking's Supplemental Proposed Pretrial Order) (REDACTED) by Otto Trucking LLC. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1820 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Supplemental Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Otto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Neel Chatterjee, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 UNREDACTED Supplemental Proposed Pretrial Order, # 4 REDACTED Supplemental Proposed Pretrial Order, # 5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1819 Joinder re 1653 Joinder, 1619 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Michael Wagner (Supplemental Notice of Joinder in Uber Technologies Inc. and Ottomotto's Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Waymo's Damages Expert Michael Wagner) (REDACTED) by Otto Trucking LLC. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1818 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Supplemental Notice of Joinder in Uber Technologies Inc. and Ottomotto's Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Waymo's Damages Expert Michael Wagner (Dkt. 1619) filed by Otto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Neel Chatterjee, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 UNREDACTED Supplemental Joinder, # 4 REDACTED Supplemental Joinder, # 5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1817 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 1762 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 26, 2017 1816 Statement of Non-Opposition To The Court's Order Re Ground Rules For Testimony By Anthony Levandowski And Joinder Uber's Response filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 25, 2017 1815 EXHIBITS re 1690 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Reply in Support of Motion to Continue Trial / 1694 corrected version filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [1694-1] (Corrected version of [1690-3]))(Related document(s) 1690 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1814 Declaration of Michelle Yang in Support of 1724 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Pretrial Filings filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1724 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1813 Declaration of Michelle Yang in Support of 1681 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1681 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 1619 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Michael Wagner. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1812 Featured Case ORDER RE RESPONSE TO DEPOSITION OF MICHAEL WAGNER AND HEARING ON 1619 DAUBERT MOTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/25/2017. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1811 OBJECTIONS to re 1535 Order by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1810 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document [1784-7] filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1809 RESPONSE to re 1535 Order Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto, LLC's Response to Court's Order Re Ground Rules for Testimony by Anthony Levandowski (Dkt. 1535) by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1808 Declaration of Miles Ehrlich in Support of Waymo's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Pretrial Filings filed byAnthony Levandowski. (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1807 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Laban Singer (Singer, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1806 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lior Ron re 1803 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Lior Ron's Opposition to Waymo's Letter Brief re: Diligenced Employees' Attorney-Client Privilege Waiver (Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1805 Discovery Letter Brief regarding waiver of attorney-client privilege filed by Anthony Levandowski. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Gardner, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J)(Ramsey, Ismail) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1804 Letter Brief re 1746 Supplemental Brief, in Opposition to Waymo's Letter Brief re: Diligenced Employees' Attorney-Client Privilege Waiver filed byLior Ron. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan A. Patchen, # 2 Exhibit A to Patchen Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Patchen Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Patchen Declaration)(Related document(s) 1746 ) (Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1803 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Lior Ron's Opposition to Waymo's Letter Brief re: Diligenced Employees' Attorney-Client Privilege Waiver filed by Lior Ron. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan A. Patchen, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Sealed Version of Lior Ron's Opposition, # 4 Redacted Version of Lior Ron's Opposition)(Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1802 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 1798 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW MARKS PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1801 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 1797 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY NORA FEHER PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1800 Letter Brief re 1746 Supplemental Brief, Opposition to Waymo's corrected brief on the Diligenced Employees' waiver of attorney-client privilege for materials provided to third party Stroz Friedberg, filed byColin Sebern. (Related document(s) 1746 ) (Brownstein, David) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1799 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (Dkt. Nos. 1780 and 1780-1) filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1798 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11744791.) filed by Waymo LLC. (Marks, Andrew) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1797 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nora Feher ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11744708.) filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Feher, Nora) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1796 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Christopher Kirkpatrick (Kirkpatrick, Ryan) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1795 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 1787 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT 1619 MOTION RECORD by William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1794 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 1760 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MONICA TARAZI PRO HAC VICE by William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1793 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 1786 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1792 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 1789 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's motion to compel depositions, overrule objections, compel interrogatories, and compel supplemental 30(b)(6) witness (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1791 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 1784 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Letter Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel forensic images and other materials provided by the Diligenced Employees to Stroz Friedberg (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1790 Letter Brief Waymo's motion to compel depositions, overrule objections, compel interrogatories, and compel supplemental 30(b)(6) witness filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6 Placeholders, # 2 Exhibit 7, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9-12 Placeholders, # 5 Exhibit 13, # 6 Exhibit 14, # 7 Exhibit 15 Placeholders, # 8 Exhibit 19, # 9 Exhibit 20-23 Placeholders, # 10 Exhibit 24)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1789 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's motion to compel depositions, overrule objections, compel interrogatories, and compel supplemental 30(b)(6) witness filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in Support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 3 REDACTED Waymo's motion to compel depositions, overrule objections, compel interrogatories, and compel supplemental 30(b)(6) witness, # 4 SEALED Waymo's motion to compel depositions, overrule objections, compel interrogatories, and compel supplemental 30(b)(6) witness, # 5 Exhibit 1-2 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 3 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 4-6 SEALED, # 8 Exhibit 9-12 SEALED, # 9 Exhibit 15-18 SEALED, # 10 Exhibit 20 SEALED, # 11 Exhibit 21 SEALED, # 12 Exhibit 22 SEALED, # 13 Exhibit 23 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1788 Declaration of Halley Josephs in Support of 1787 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to file the transcript of the deposition of Plaintiffs damages expert Michael J. Wagner re 1619 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Michael Wagner filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 1787 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1787 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to file the transcript of the deposition of Plaintiffs damages expert Michael J. Wagner re 1619 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Michael Wagner filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. Responses due by 9/29/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1786 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Halley Josephs, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit 1 to Josephs Declaration, # 4 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit 2 to Josephs Declaration, # 5 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit 3 to Josephs Declaration, # 6 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit 4 to Josephs Declaration, # 7 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit 5 to Josephs Declaration, # 8 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit 6 to Josephs Declaration, # 9 [UNREDACTED] Exhibit 7 to Josephs Declaration)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 1785 Letter Brief Waymo's Letter Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel forensic images and other materials provided by the Diligenced Employees to Stroz Friedberg filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 24, 2017 1784 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Letter Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel forensic images and other materials provided by the Diligenced Employees to Stroz Friedberg filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Schmidt in support of Waymo's Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Waymo's Letter Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel forensic images and other materials provided by the Diligenced Employees to Stroz Friedberg, # 4 SEALED Waymo's Letter Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel forensic images and other materials provided by the Diligenced Employees to Stroz Friedberg, # 5 Exhibit 1 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 2 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 3 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/24/2017)
September 24, 2017 1783 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. re 1781 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits in Support of Defendants' Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order Regarding Subpoenas to Yoo and Gonzalez (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/24/2017)
September 24, 2017 1782 MOTION to Quash and Motion for Protective Order Regarding Subpoenas to Yoo and Gonzalez filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. Responses due by 10/10/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Arturo J. Gonzalez, # 3 Exhibit 1 (redacted), # 4 Exhibit 2 (redacted), # 5 Exhibit 3 (redacted))(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/24/2017)
September 24, 2017 1781 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits in Support of Defendants' Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order Regarding Subpoenas to Yoo and Gonzalez filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Camila Tapernoux in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Ex. 1 to the Gonzalez Decl., # 4 Unredacted Version of Ex. 1 to the Gonzalez Decl., # 5 Unredacted Version of Ex. 2 to the Gonzalez Decl., # 6 Unredacted Version of Ex. 3 to the Gonzalez Decl.)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/24/2017)
September 23, 2017 1780 *** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** NOTICE by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. of Filing Photographs (Attachments: # 1 Photographs Displayed at September 20, 2017 Hearing)(Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/23/2017) Modified on 9/25/2017 (fff, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2017 1779 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 1777 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Michael Wagner (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1778 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 1619 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Michael Wagner ) filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeff Nardinelli in Support of Waymo's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Michael Wagner, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1777 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Michael Wagner filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in Support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 SEALED Version of Waymo's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Michael Wagner, # 4 PUBLIC REDACTED Version of Waymo's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Michael Wagner, # 5 SEALED EX. 1, # 6 SEALED EX. 2, # 7 SEALED EX. 3, # 8 SEALED EX. 4, # 9 SEALED EX. 5, # 10 SEALED EX. 6, # 11 SEALED EX. 7, # 12 SEALED EX. 8, # 13 SEALED EX. 9)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1776 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 1773 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Motion to Exclude One of Three Opinions Proffered by Waymo Expert Jim Timmins (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1775 EXHIBITS re 1634 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, Motion to Strike TS 96, and Daubert Motion (Dkt. 1514) --DECLARATION OF MICHELLE YANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [1634-4], # 2 Revised Redacted Version of [1634-16], # 3 Revised Unredacted Version of [1634-16], # 4 Revised Redacted Version of [1634-17], # 5 Revised Unredacted Version of [1634-17])(Related document(s) 1634 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1774 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 1612 MOTION in Limine Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc.'s And Ottomotto LLC's Motion To Exclude One Of Three Opinions Proffered By Waymo Expert Jim Timmins ) filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 McCauley Declaration in support of Waymo's Opposition to Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Motion to Exclude One of Three Opinions Proffered by Waymo Expert Jim Timmins, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1773 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Motion to Exclude One of Three Opinions Proffered by Waymo Expert Jim Timmins filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Sealed Waymo's Opposition to Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Motion to Exclude One of Three Opinions Proffered by Waymo Expert Tim Timmins, # 4 Redacted Waymo's Opposition to Uber Technologies, Inc.'s and Ottomotto LLC's Motion to Exclude One of Three Opinions Proffered by Waymo Expert Tim Timmins, # 5 Sealed Ex. 1, # 6 Sealed Ex. 2, # 7 Sealed Ex. 3, # 8 Sealed Ex. 4, # 9 Sealed Ex. 5, # 10 Redacted Ex. 5, # 11 Sealed Ex. 6, # 12 Sealed Ex. 7, # 13 Redacted Ex. 7, # 14 Sealed Ex. 8, # 15 Redacted Ex. 8, # 16 Sealed Ex. 9, # 17 Redacted Ex. 9)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1772 Declaration of Michelle Yang in Support of 1670 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Corrected Versions of Documents Referenced at Docket 1668 filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1670 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1771 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 1607 MOTION to Strike Waymo's Motion to Exclude Otto Trucking's Damages Expert James Malackowski ) (REDACTED) filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Neel Chatterjee, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Placeholder))(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1770 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Its Opposition to Waymo's Motion to Exclude Otto Trucking's Damages Expert James Malackowski filed by Otto Trucking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Neel Chatterjee, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Version of Opposition, # 4 Redacted Version of Opposition, # 5 Unredacted Version of Ex. 1 to Chatterjee Declaration ISO Opposition, # 6 Redacted Version of Ex. 1 to Chatterjee Declaration ISO Opposition, # 7 Unredacted Version of Ex. 2 to Chatterjee Declaration ISO Opposition, # 8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1769 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 1610 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Hesselink regarding Protections of Waymo's Alleged Trade Secrets (REDACTED) ) (REDACTED) filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jared Newton, # 2 Exhibit 1 REDACTED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1768 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Hesselink filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Version of Waymo's Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Hesselink, # 4 SEALED Version of Waymo's Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Hesselink, # 5 REDACTED Version of Ex. 1, # 6 SEALED Version of Ex. 1)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1767 EXHIBITS re 1623 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1623-4], # 2 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1623-4])(Related document(s) 1623 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1766 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of 1636 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply ISO Motion for Summary Judgment filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 1636 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1765 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of 1638 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 1638 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1764 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 1763 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to 1618 Otto Trucking's Motion in Limine To Exclude Testimony of Gary Brown and Kristinn Gudjonsson (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1763 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Opposition to 1618 Otto Trucking's Motion in Limine To Exclude Testimony of Gary Brown and Kristinn Gudjonsson filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of sealing motion, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Brief in Opposition (Redacted), # 4 Brief in Opposition (Sealed), # 5 Declaration of Jeff Nardinelli, # 6 Exhibit 1 (PUBLIC REDACTED), # 7 Exhibit 1 (SEALED), # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit 3, # 10 Exhibit 4, # 11 Exhibit 5 (PUBLIC REDACTED), # 12 Exhibit 5 (SEALED))(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1762 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at September 27, 2017 Discovery Hearing filed by Stroz Friedberg, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1761 Declaration of Jonathan A. Patchen in Support of 1690 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Reply in Support of Motion to Continue Trial filed byLior Ron. (Related document(s) 1690 ) (Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1760 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11742300.) filed by Waymo LLC. (Tarazi, Monica) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1759 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Jane Brewer (Brewer, Linda) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1758 Declaration of Miles Ehrlich ISO Waymo's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Reply filed byAnthony Levandowski. (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1757 Declaration of Miles Ehrlich ISO Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Arturo Gonzalez filed byAnthony Levandowski. (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1756 Declaration of Miles Ehrlich ISO Defendants' Administrative Motion to file Under Seal filed byAnthony Levandowski. (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1755 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Carmody, William) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1754 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING DISCOVERY HEARING. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that a discovery hearing is scheduled for September 27, 2017 at 2:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) <(ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1753 Witness List by Waymo LLC Parties' Joint List of All Potential Trial Witnesses. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1752 REPLY (re 1686 MOTION to Intervene and MOTION for Protective Order ) filed byLior Ron. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan A. Patchen, # 2 Exhibit A to Patchen Declaration)(Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1751 REPLY (re 1682 MOTION for Protective Order ) filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1750 EXHIBITS re 1728 Proposed Jury Instructions --CORRECTED Version of Joint Proposed Jury Instructions filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 1728 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1749 EXHIBITS re 1724 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Pretrial Filings --Exhibits in Support of Adminstrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Pretrial Filings filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 SEALED Version of Joint Proposed Jury Instructions)(Related document(s) 1724 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1748 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 1747 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTED Version of Waymo's Brief on the Diligenced Employees waiver of attorney-client privilege for materials provided to third party Stroz Friedberg (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1747 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTED Version of Waymo's Brief on the Diligenced Employees waiver of attorney-client privilege for materials provided to third party Stroz Friedberg filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED CORRECTED version of Waymo's Brief on the Diligenced Employees waiver of attorney-client privilege for materials provided to third party Stroz Friedberg, # 4 SEALED CORRECTED version of Waymo's Brief on the Diligenced Employees waiver of attorney-client privilege for materials provided to third party Stroz Friedberg, # 5 Exhibit 1 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 2 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 3 SEALED, # 8 Exhibit 4 SEALED, # 9 Exhibit 5 SEALED, # 10 Exhibit 6 SEALED, # 11 Exhibit 7 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1746 Supplemental Brief re 1744 Letter Brief, CORRECTED Waymo's Brief on the Diligenced Employees waiver of attorney-client privilege for materials provided to third party Stroz Friedberg Redacted Version of Waymo's Brief on the Diligenced Employees waiver of attorney-client privilege for materials provided to third party Stroz Friedberg filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 1744 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1745 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 1743 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Brief on the Diligenced Employees waiver of attorney-client privilege for materials provided to third party Stroz Friedberg (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 22, 2017 1744 Letter Brief re 1743 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Brief on the Diligenced Employees waiver of attorney-client privilege for materials provided to third party Stroz Friedberg Redacted Version of Waymo's Brief on the Diligenced Employees waiver of attorney-client privilege for materials provided to third party Stroz Friedberg filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 1743 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 21, 2017 1743 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Brief on the Diligenced Employees waiver of attorney-client privilege for materials provided to third party Stroz Friedberg filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lindsay Cooper in support of Waymo's Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED version of Waymo's Brief on the Diligenced Employees waiver of attorney-client privilege for materials provided to third party Stroz Friedberg, # 4 SEALED version of Waymo's Brief on the Diligenced Employees waiver of attorney-client privilege for materials provided to third party Stroz Friedberg, # 5 Exhibit 1 SEALED, # 6 Exhibit 2 SEALED, # 7 Exhibit 3 SEALED, # 8 Exhibit 4 SEALED, # 9 Exhibit 5 SEALED, # 10 Exhibit 6 SEALED, # 11 Exhibit 7 SEALED)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 1742 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 1030 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY LINDSEY KEENAN PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 1741 Declaration of Hayes P. Hyde in Support of 1623 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Uber and Ottomotto's Opposition to Waymo's Motion for Continuance of Trial Date filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Related document(s) 1623 ) (Hyde, Hayes) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 1740 Declaration of Aleksandr Korzh in Support of 1636 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply ISO Motion for Summary Judgment filed byVelodyne LiDAR, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1636 ) (Picone, John) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 1739 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 1737 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOSHUA RILEY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 1738 OBJECTIONS to re 1720 Statement (Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Statement Regarding Trade Secrets) by Otto Trucking LLC. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 1737 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11737323.) filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Riley, Joshua) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 1736 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waymo LLC re 1724 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Pretrial Filings (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 1735 Proposed Jury Instructions by Otto Trucking LLC, Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDA OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DISPUTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 1732 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 1684 MOTION for Protective Order , 1685 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Due Diligence Report, 1686 MOTION to Intervene and MOTION for Protective Order ) filed byWaymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 1731 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael Elizabeth Meny (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 1730 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Edward Gorman (Gorman, Thomas) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 1729 Brief re 1728 Proposed Jury Instructions Waymo's Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Proposed Jury Instructions filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 1728 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 1728 Proposed Jury Instructions by Waymo LLC Joint Proposed Jury Instructions. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 1727 Proposed Voir Dire by Waymo LLC Joint Submission of Proposed Voir Dire Questions. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 1726 Proposed Form of Verdict by Waymo LLC Waymo's Proposed Verdict Form. (Attachments: # 1 Uber's Proposed Special Verdict Form (REDACTED), # 2 Otto Trucking's Proposed Special Verdict Form (REDACTED))(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 1725 Proposed Pretrial Order Joint Proposed Pretrial Order by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A PLACEHOLDER, # 2 Appendix B REDACTED, # 3 Appendix C, # 4 Appendix D REDACTED, # 5 Appendix E, # 6 Appendix F)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 1724 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Pretrial Filings filed by Waymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Waymo's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 REDACTED Version of Joint Proposed Pretrial Order, # 4 SEALED Version of Joint Proposed Pretrial Order, # 5 SEALED Version of Appendix A, # 6 REDACTED Version of Appendix B, # 7 SEALED Version of Appendix B, # 8 REDACTED Version of Appendix D, # 9 SEALED Version of Appendix D, # 10 REDACTED Version of Uber's Proposed Special Verdict Form, # 11 SEALED Version of Uber's Proposed Special Verdict Form, # 12 REDACTED Version of Otto Trucking's Proposed Special Verdict Form, # 13 SEALED Version of Otto Trucking's Proposed Special Verdict Form, # 14 REDACTED Version of Joint Proposed Jury Instructions, # 15 SEALED Version of Joint Proposed Jury Instructions)(Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 1723 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/20/17, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, JoAnn_Bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 1704 Transcript Order, 1699 Transcript Order, 1701 Transcript Order, 1706 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/20/2017. (Related documents(s) 1704 , 1699 , 1701 , 1706 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 1722 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/20/17, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, JoAnn_Bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 10/10/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2017. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 1721 Proposed Voir Dire by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. DEFENDANTS' SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED SUPPLEMENTAL VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 20, 2017 1720 Statement Plaintiff Waymo LLC's Statement Regarding Trade Secrets by Waymo LLC. (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 1719 DECLARATION re 1609 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Hesselink regarding Protections of Waymo's Alleged Trade Secrets -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1609-3], # 2 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1609-3], # 3 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1609-6], # 4 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1609-6], # 5 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1609-7], # 6 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1609-7], # 7 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1609-8], # 8 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1609-8], # 9 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1609-9], # 10 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1609-9], # 11 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1609-11], # 12 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1609-11])(Related document(s) 1609 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/20/2017) Modified on 9/21/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2017 1718 EXHIBITS re 1618 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of its Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Mr. Brown and Mr. Gudjonsson regarding Protections of Waymo's Alleged Trade Secrets -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1618-3], # 2 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1618-3], # 3 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1618-5], # 4 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1618-5], # 5 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1618-7], # 6 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1618-7], # 7 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1618-11], # 8 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1618-11], # 9 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1618-13], # 10 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1618-13], # 11 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1618-17], # 12 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1618-17], # 13 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1618-23], # 14 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1618-23], # 15 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1618-25], # 16 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1618-25], # 17 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1618-26], # 18 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1618-26], # 19 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1618-28], # 20 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1618-28])(Related document(s) 1618 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 1717 DECLARATION re 1606 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion to Exclude Otto Trucking's Damages Expert James Malackowski --[Corrected] DECLARATION OF MICHELLE YANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 [Corrected] Revised Redacted Version of 1605 (DOCUMENT FILED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL))(Related document(s) 1606 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/20/2017) Modified on 9/21/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2017 1716 DECLARATION re 1606 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion to Exclude Otto Trucking's Damages Expert James Malackowski --DECLARATION OF MICHELLE YANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Unredacted Version of [1606-5] (ENTIRE DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL))(Related document(s) 1606 ) (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/20/2017) Modified on 9/21/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2017 1715 Declaration of Adrian Sawyer in Support of 1611 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits To And Portions Of Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc.'s And Ottomotto LLC's Motion To Exclude One Of Three Opinions Proffered By Waymo Expert Jim Timmins filed bySandstone Group, LLC, Ognen Stojanovski, Tyto LiDAR, LLC. (Related document(s) 1611 ) (Sawyer, Adrian) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 1714 Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of 1614 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Michael Wagner filed byWaymo LLC. (Related document(s) 1614 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 1713 Declaration of Miles Ehrlich in Support of Waymo's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Its Motion for Continuance filed byAnthony Levandowski. (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 1712 Declaration of Hayes P. Hyde in Support of 1606 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion to Exclude Otto Trucking's Damages Expert James Malackowski filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Related document(s) 1606 ) (Hyde, Hayes) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 1711 Declaration of Hayes P Hyde in Support of 1603 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Motion for Continuance of Trial Date filed byOtto Trucking LLC. (Related document(s) 1603 ) (Hyde, Hayes) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 1710 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 9/20/2017. re 1423 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Otto Trucking LLC, Ottomotto LLC, 1514 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Motion to Strike TS 96, and Daubert Motion filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Ottomotto LLC, 1418 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Certain Affirmative Defenses filed by Waymo LLC, 1604 MOTION to Continue Waymo's Motion for Continuance of Trial Date filed by Waymo LLC Total Time in Court: 3:12. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan and Jo Ann Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney: Charles Verhoeven; David Perlson; Melissa Baily; Felipe Corredor; James Baker; Jordan Jaffe; Jeffrey Nardinelli. Defendant Attorney: Michael Jacobs; Arturo Gonzalez; Esther Chang; William Carmody; Michelle Yang; Kathleen Hartnett; Neel Chatterjee; Shane Brun. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 1709 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document [Dkt. Nos. 1666-2, 1666-3 and 1666-4] filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 1708 EXHIBITS re 1561 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Waymo's Renewed Motion in Limine No. 1 and Defendants' Response [Corrected] Unredacted Revised Redactions for [1666-2, 1666-3, 1666-4, 1666-5 and 1666-6] filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Revised Redactions for [1666-3], # 2 Unredacted Revised Redactions for [1666-4], # 3 Unredacted Revised Redactions for [1666-5], # 4 Unredacted Revised Redactions for [1666-6], # 5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) 1561 ) (Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 1707 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Rebecca Fokstuen (Fokstuen, Anne) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 1706 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/20/2017 before Hon. William Alsup by Otto Trucking LLC, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 1705 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/20/2017 before Hon. William Alsup by Lior Ron, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 1704 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 20, 2017 before Hon. William Alsup by John Lee Cooper, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Cooper, John) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 1703 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document [Dkt. Nos. 1562-17 and 1564-14] filed by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 1702 EXHIBITS re 1562 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion In Limine No. 25 And Waymo's Brief In Opposition Thereto [Corrected] Revised Redactions for [1562-17] & [1564-14] filed byOttomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Revised Redactions for [1562-17] & [1564-14], # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) 1562 ) (Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 1701 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/20/2017 before Hon. William Alsup by Waymo LLC, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Perlson, David) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 1700 ERRATA re 1562 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion In Limine No. 25 And Waymo's Brief In Opposition Thereto by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Dunn, Karen) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 20, 2017 1699 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 20, 2017 before Hon. William Alsup by Ottomotto LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Gonzalez, Arturo) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 19, 2017 1698 DECLARATION re 1585 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Otto Trucking's Response to Waymo LLC's Corrected Supplemental Brief (docket No. 1501) in support of its Motion for Order to Show Cause -- Declaration of Felipe Corredor in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byWaymo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1585-4], # 2 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1585-4], # 3 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1585-7], # 4 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1585-7], # 5 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1585-9], # 6 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1585-9], # 7 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1585-10], # 8 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1585-10], # 9 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1585-16], # 10 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1585-16], # 11 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1585-24], # 12 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1585-24], # 13 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1585-25], # 14 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1585-25], # 15 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1585-26], # 16 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1585-26], # 17 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1585-30], # 18 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1585-30], # 19 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1585-33], # 20 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1585-33], # 21 Revised REDACTED Version of Dkt. [1585-38], # 22 Revised SEALED Version of Dkt. [1585-38])(Related document(s) 1585 ) (Verhoeven, Charles) (Filed on 9/19/2017) Modified on 9/20/2017 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2017