Gilmore, et al v. People of California

Plaintiff: Robert O. Gilmore, Jr., Inmates of San Quentin State Prison and Willie Wisely
Defendant: People of California
3rd_party_plaintiff: Charles T. Davis
Case Number: 3:1966cv45878
Filed: February 1, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2012 331 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION FOR CONTEMPT 330 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
April 19, 2011 329 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION TO INTERVENE (EDWARDS) (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
September 7, 2010 328 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF OF CONTEMPT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
July 1, 2010 325 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for payment of attorneys fees and costs (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2010)
April 29, 2010 323 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting extension (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 12, 2010 318 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT JOINT PROPOSED ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
March 4, 2010 313 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing motion to 4/16/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
February 1, 2010 310 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL re 309 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 11, 2010 306 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting relief from page limit re 296 . (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
December 29, 2009 295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER re 284 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 7, 2009 289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SHORTEN TIME. DEFT. IS DIRECTED TO SERVE COPIES OF THIS ORDER ON ALL PLAINTIFFS AND FILE A PROOF OF SERVICE. re 287 / (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilmore, et al v. People of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert O. Gilmore, Jr.
Represented By: Alison Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inmates of San Quentin State Prison
Represented By: Donald H. Specter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Wisely
Represented By: Donald H. Specter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People of California
Represented By: Damon Grant McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_plaintiff: Charles T. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?