Thompson v. Cate, et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Lancaster, Jeffery Mills, Dexter Williams, William Dennis, Steve Livaditis, Jimmy Van Pelt, Harvey Lee Heishmann, III, Johnaton George, Tim Young, Paul Tuilaepa and Cristhian A. Monterroso
Defendant: Matthew Cate and Robert K. Wong
Intervenor: Freddie Fuiava
Case Number: 3:1979cv01630
Filed: April 7, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2015 1612 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 1610 MOTION TO RELATE CASE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
May 1, 2009 1605 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF UNDISPUTED ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 14, 2009 1603 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TERMINATING CONSENT DECREE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
April 7, 2009 1600 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
March 26, 2009 1597 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
February 11, 2009 1589 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ROBERT K. WONG FOR DEFENDANT ROBERT L. AYERS, JR. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
January 29, 2009 1588 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR FILING OF REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE NANDOR J. VADAS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 27, 2009 1586 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF UNDISPUTED FEES AND COSTS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 14, 2009 1583 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING MOTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE VADAS AND VACATING HEARING (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
February 6, 2008 1488 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON FEBRUARY 11, 2008. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 6, 2008. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 4, 2008 1486 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 4, 2008. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Cate, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Freddie Fuiava
Represented By: Charles Carbone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Lancaster
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Mills
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Williams
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dennis
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Livaditis
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Van Pelt
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Lee Heishmann, III
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnaton George
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Tuilaepa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristhian A. Monterroso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Represented By: Julianne Mossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K. Wong
Represented By: Julianne Mossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?