Rosenfeld, et al v. US, et al

Plaintiff: Rosenfeld Seth
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 3:1985cv01709
Filed: February 22, 1985
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2012 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 1/30/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
January 10, 2012 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE re (166 in 3:85-cv-02247-MHP) Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge: Status Conference Statements due by 1/17/2012. Status Conference set for 1/24/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 1/10/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
January 4, 2012 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CMC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/4/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosenfeld, et al v. US, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Stuart M. Gerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosenfeld Seth
Represented By: John Beattie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?