Colleen Mary Rohan, et al v. Jill Brown, et al

Petitioner: Oscar Gates and Colleen Mary Rohan
Respondent: Jill Brown
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project and Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Case Number: 3:1988cv02779
Filed: July 14, 1988
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Presiding Judge: DPLC JBD
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 848 ORDER DENYING CLAIMS 12, 16A, 21 AND 22. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/4/2019. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 817 ORDER GRANTING IN PART RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Judge William Alsup granting in part 815 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Answer shall be submitted no later than July 28, 2017. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 810 SCHEDULING ORDER. Within 28 days, petitioner's counsel shall submit a proposed CJA budget for the next round of briefing. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/18/17. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 808 ORDER DENYING CLAIMS 6A, 6B, AND 7 by Judge William Alsup denying 798 Motion Habeas Relief on Claims 6A, 6B, and 7. Joint Status Report due by 4/17/2017. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017) Modified on 3/27/2017 (dl, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 806 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 804 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Replies due by 10/20/2016. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 803 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MERITS BRIEFING ON CLAIMS 6 A, B AND 7 by Judge William Alsup, granting 801 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Replies due by 10/11/2016. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 800 ORDER GRANTING 2-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF by Judge William Alsup granting 797 Motion extension of time. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 796 SCHEDULING ORDER re 795 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Oscar Gates. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 794 ORDER RE CLAIMS 8 AND 9. Claims 8A, 8B, 8C and 9 are DENIED on the merits. Claim8D is DEFERRED. Signed by Judge William H. Alsup on 4/21/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 792 ORDER GRANTING ONE-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE A REPLY by Judge William Alsup granting 790 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 788 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 787 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 781 MOTION Grant Relief On Claims 8. A., 8. B., 8. C., 8. D., And 9. re 780 Order, Re: Merits Briefing. Responses due by 6/23/2015. Replies due by 7/3/2015. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 780 ORDER RE MERITS BRIEFING re 778 Response filed by Ron Acting Warden Davis, 777 Order on Motion to Strike, 779 Response ( Non Motion ), filed by Oscar Gates. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/14/15. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 777 ORDER RE CLAIMS 13, 15,25, 26 AND 28 AND RE RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge William Alsup granting 755 Motion to Strike (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 775 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR STAY PENDING COMPULSORY RESTORATION PROCEDURES re 729 MOTION to Stay Motion for Limited Stay Pending Efforts to Restore Petitioner to Competency or, in the Alternative, to Certify the Question for Immediate Appellate Review filed by Oscar Gates. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/7/14. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 770 ORDER RE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/25/14. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 769 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 748 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 746 ORDER re 740 Order Competency Procedures. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/18/14. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 744 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR STAY AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CERTIFICATION OF ISSUES FOR APPELLATE REVIEW by Judge William Alsup denying 729 Motion to Stay (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 740 ORDER RE COMPETENCY PROCEDURES re 736 Letter Brief filed by Oscar Gates, 735 Statement filed by Kevin Chappell, 737 Declaration in Support filed by Oscar Gates, 733 Order. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/5/14. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 734 ORDER re 731 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Merits Briefing on Five Claims filed by Oscar Gates. Petitioner is granted extension of 14 days. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/22/14. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 733 ORDER RE EXAMINATION OF PETITIONER. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/21/14. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 725 ORDER by Judge William Alsup terminating 720 Motion to Clarify Order of April 29, 2014; denying 723 Motion to Shorten Time (dtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying 714 Motion for Examination of Petitioner. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 715 ORDER DENYING CERTAIN RECORD-BASED CLAIMS by Judge William Alsup denying 667 Motion ; denying 698 Motion (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 712 ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE re 698 MOTION Expand Record To Include Exhibit 14, 1978 General Election Voter's Pamphlet re 697 Brief On The Merits Of Stipulated claims filed by Oscar Gates, 667 MOTION Expand The Record re 666 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief On Merits Of Stipulated Claims filed by Oscar Gates. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/28/14. (dtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 709 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 708 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 705 ORDER RE MERITS BRIEFING by Judge William Alsup finding as moot 701 Motion (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 704 ORDER RESPONDENT'S EXAMINATION OF PETITIONER re 660 Case Management Scheduling Order, 700 Order. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/24/14. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 700 ORDER RE EX PARTE HEARING. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/11/14. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 694 ORDER re 666 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief On Merits Of Stipulated Claims filed by Oscar Gates, Set hearing 667 MOTION Expand The Record . Motions terminated: 666 MOTION for Extension of Time t o File Opening Brief On Merits Of Stipulated Claims filed by Oscar Gates. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/28/2014. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 629 ORDER GRANTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR TRANSFER AND RESTORATION by Judge William Alsup granting 628 Stipulation (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 626 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE re 625 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time To File Reply Brief filed by Oscar Gates. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/15/13. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 615 ORDER RE MOTION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/3/13. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER by Judge William Alsup denying 587 Motion to File Document Under Seal (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 600 Stipulation filed by Oscar Gates. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/21/13. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 598 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 597 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Oscar Gates. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/23/13. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beeler for Settlement; ORDER. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/16/13. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 582 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE EXTENSION OF TIME by Judge William Alsup granting 581 Stipulation (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/14/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colleen Mary Rohan, et al v. Jill Brown, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oscar Gates
Represented By: Tim Brosnan
Represented By: William L. Osterhoudt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Colleen Mary Rohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Represented By: Michael G. Millman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jill Brown
Represented By: John H. Deist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?