Taylor v. Brown, et al

Plaintiff: Freddie Taylor
Defendant: Jill Brown
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project and Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Case Number: 3:1992cv01627
Filed: April 30, 1992
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2016 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 285 Stay Pending Disposition of Appeal. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
September 30, 2016 282 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Claim 3(A). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/30/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
March 16, 2016 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/16/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
February 26, 2016 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Guilt Phase Claims. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/26/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
April 6, 2015 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/6/2015. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
March 4, 2015 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2015. Further Case Management Conference reset for 3/26/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/4/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
February 23, 2015 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Cause and Prejudice for Procedural Default or Fundamental Miscarriage of Justice. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/23/2015. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
June 10, 2014 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Briefing Schedule Re Cause & Prejudice. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/10/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
March 26, 2014 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 223 Respondent's Motion to Reconsider Findings on Procedural Fault. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
May 20, 2011 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STATISTICALLY CLOSING ACTION; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/20/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Brown, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Taylor
Represented By: Stuart Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Brown
Represented By: Sharon R. Wooden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?