Mickle v. Brown, et al
Plaintiff: Denny Mickle
Defendant: Jill Brown
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers and Robert K. Wong
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project and Habeas Corpus Resource Center
3rd_party_defendant: Robert L. Ayers
Case Number: 3:1992cv02951
Filed: February 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER Regarding Petitioner's Merits Briefing on Group I Claims. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/04/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER Regarding Impact of CULLEN V. PINHOLSTER, 131 S. CT. 1388 (2011). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/13/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER Regarding Petitioner's Request for an Extension to File Discovery Motion. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/31/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER Extending Time for Filing Petitioner's Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/30/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER on Joint Case Management Conference Statement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/04/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER Directing Petitioner to Refile Motion for Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/01/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mickle v. Brown, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denny Mickle
Represented By: Denise Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Brown
Represented By: Allen Robert Crown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Robert L. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers
Represented By: Allen Robert Crown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert K. Wong
Represented By: Allen Robert Crown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?