Ashmus v. Ayers
Plaintiff: Robert K. Wong
Petitioner: Troy Adam Ashmus
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers, Jr., Robert K. Wong and Vincent Cullen
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Case Number: 3:1993cv00594
Filed: January 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION WITH PREJUDICE DUE TO PETITIONERS DEATH ;LIFTING STAY; DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/23/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO LIFT STAY by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 529 Motion to Lift Stay. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 512 STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING POST-HEARING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 511 . Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/30/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 510 STIPULATION AND ORDER Amending Post-Hearing Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/16/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 508 STIPULATION AND ORDER Amending Post-Hearing Briefing re 507 . Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/28/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/28/2012 (tn, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 506 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Amend Post-Hearing Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/09/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 504 STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING POST-HEARING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/10/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 499 STIPULATION AND ORDER Amending Post-Hearing Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/3/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 496 STIPULATION AND ORDER Amending Post-Hearing Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/12/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 489 STIPULATION AND ORDER Amending Post-Hearing Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/04/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 487 STIPULATION AND ORDER Scheduling Post-Hearing Briefing. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/18/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 485 STIPULATION AND ORDER Scheduling Post-Hearing Briefing. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/04/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER Scheduling Post-Hearing Briefing. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/04/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER Scheduling Conclusion of Evidentiary Hearing for 11/19/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/01/10. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER re: Modified Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum for Jimmy Ray Williamson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/07/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER GRANTING the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum for Ronny Mozingo. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/04/2010. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER regarding documents reviewed in camera. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/10/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 387 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference to 2/23/2009 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/07/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER extending time to file joint statement until 05/09/08. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/08/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashmus v. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Troy Adam Ashmus
Represented By: Lorena May Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Represented By: Michael G. Millman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Represented By: Ronald Stephen Matthias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert K. Wong
Represented By: Dane R. Gillette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vincent Cullen
Represented By: Ronald Stephen Matthias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert K. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?