Thomas v. Brown, et al

Plaintiff: Ralph I. Thomas
Defendant: Jill Brown
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project and Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Case Number: 3:1993cv00616
Filed: October 16, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2009 276 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DIRECTING THAT ORIGINAL DECLARATION BE SEALED; re 275 MOTION to Seal Document Declaration of Theresa Thomas ___ filed by Ralph I. Thomas. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/23/2009. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 16, 2009 263 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER setting further briefing schedules; Motions to be heard 2:00 p.m on 11/16/2009 before the Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/16/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
September 9, 2009 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART/DENYING IN PART Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus AND REMANDING CASE back to Superior Court for the County of Alameda for a new guilt phase trial; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/9/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2009: # 1 CertServ) (awb, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2009 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 249 petitioner's Motion to Strike Section VIII from the Answer (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
April 14, 2009 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel finding as moot 237 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
December 18, 2008 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ENLARGING TIME FOR FILING TRAVERSE AND OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT et and including 1/8/2009; Replies to be filed by 1/22/2009; Hearing date of 1/12/2009 vacated; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/18/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Brown, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph I. Thomas
Represented By: Albert Joel Kutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Brown
Represented By: Gerald August Engler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?