State of California, et al v. Remco Hydraulics Inc, et al

Plaintiff: State of California, City of Willits and Willits Environmental Remediation Trust
Defendant: Remco Hydraulics Inc, M-C Industries Inc, Pneumo Abex Corp and Whitman Corporation
Trustee: Barry L. Williams and AMF Remediation Corporation
Miscellaneous: Willits Citizens Advisory Committee
Case Number: 3:1996cv00283
Filed: January 16, 1996
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2016 771 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MAY 6, 2016 HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER MODIFYING THE AMENDED FINAL CONSENT DECREE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
May 7, 2012 734 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN ORDER MODIFYING THE 2006 AMENDED FINAL CONSENT DECREE TO PERMIT THE FRANK R. HOWARD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL TO USE EXISTING SETTLEMENT FUNDS TO PURCHASE NECESSARY MEDICAL EQUIPMENT 728 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
June 18, 2009 689 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
January 26, 2009 681 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY MOTIONS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
February 6, 2008 658 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATION OF DR. LEVIN. Signed by Judge Susan Illsotn. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California, et al v. Remco Hydraulics Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: David R. Isola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Willits
Represented By: Stuart I. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willits Environmental Remediation Trust
Represented By: A. J. BirkBeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remco Hydraulics Inc
Represented By: Christopher L. Rogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M-C Industries Inc
Represented By: Marc Albert Lackner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corp
Represented By: Barbara B. Guibord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitman Corporation
Represented By: Barbara B. Guibord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Barry L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: AMF Remediation Corporation
Represented By: Heather Elizabeth Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Willits Citizens Advisory Committee
Represented By: James Russell Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?