Emma C., et al v. Eastin, et al
Plaintiff: Emma C., Daniel C., Elena C., Gilberto C., James G., George H., Martin M. and Pamela S.
Defendant: Delaine Eastin, Joseph Carrabino, Marion McDowell, Katheryn Dronenburg, Dorothy Lee, S. William Malkasian, Kenneth Peters, David Romero, Joseph Stein, Gerty Thomas, Charlie Mae Knight, Ruben Abrica, Lois Frontino, Edward Moss, Donna Rutherford, Bomani Siwatu, Ravenswood City Elementary School District, Marion Joseph, Yvonne W. Larsen, Janet Nicholas, Robert Trigg, Marina Tse and Chester Palesoo
Intervenor: Ravenswood Teachers Association, CTA/NEA
Special_master: Mark Mlawer
Case Number: 3:1996cv04179
Filed: February 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2598 SECOND ORDER RE STATE'S COMPLIANCE AT PHASE 2. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/16/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2591 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria denying 2565 Motion for Attorney Fees. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2520 ORDER RE STATE'S COMPLIANCE AT PHASE 2. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/5/2019. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2428 ORDER RE STATE'S COMPLIANCE AT PHASE 1. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/17/2018. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2393 SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 3:96-cv-04179 VC and 5:18-cv-03367 NC. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/8/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2364 ORDER RE MONDAY'S HEARING. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/22/2018. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2350 ORDER RE PARTIES' PROPOSALS IN ADVANCE OF HEARING. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 1/30/2018. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2329 ORDER RE: FY 2017-2018 BUDGET. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/29/2017 (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2315 ORDER re: Reassessment of Monitor's Budget Allocation FY 2016-2017. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 8/11/2017. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2314 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONCLUSION OF REMAINING RSIP MONITORING AND RELATED ACTIVITIES, AND DISTRICT TRANSITION PLAN re 2313 Stipulation filed by Ravenswood City Elementary School District. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 7/31/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2303 SECOND AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: STATUS OF STIPULATION CONCLUDING RSIP MONITORING AND TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR FILING SAME re 2301 Stipulation, filed by Ravenswood City Elementary School District. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/31/2017. Proposed joint stipulation regarding the resolution of remaining monitoring items under the RSIP due by 7/27/2017.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2288 STIPULATED ORDER RE: PAYMENT OF PLAINTIFFS' ATTORNEYS' FEES FOR THE NINTH CIRCUIT APPEALS re 2287 Stipulation filed by State Board of Education, Delaine Eastin, California Department of Education. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/16/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2265 ORDER Setting Status Conference. Joint Statement due by 4/12/2017. Status Conference set for 4/20/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 3/22/17. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2264 ORDER Setting Schedule for Budget Allocation Process for Fiscal Year 2017-2018. Proposed Budgets due by 4/21/2017. Joint Statement or email to Court Monitor due by 5/5/2017. Joint Statement or Opening Briefs due by 5/19/2017. Responses to Opening Briefs due by 6/2/2017. Budget Allocation Hearing (if needed) set for 6/19/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 3/21/17. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2245 ORDER Re: CDE's Complaint Resolution Reporting. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 1/20/17. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2208 ORDER Approving Billing Summary for Special Master - August 2016. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 8/1/2016. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2207 ORDER Approving Billing Summary for Special Master for July 2016. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 7/19/2016. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2205 ORDER RE: REASSESSMENT OF MONITOR'S BUDGET ALLOCATION FY 2015-2016. Defendants shall meet and confer with the Monitor via telephone by 07/21/16. Signed by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson on 07/15/16. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016).
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2197 ORDER re: 2170 Order to Show Cause. The Court discharges the Order to Show Cause without a finding of contempt or imposition of sanctions. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/23/16. (tehlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2189 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE RSIP BUDGET FOR FY 2016-17 Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/31/2016. re 2186 Proposed Order filed by Ravenswood City Elementary School District (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2187 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for June 2016. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/25/16. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2179 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: MODIFICATIONS TO RSIP RE ITEMS 1.5.2, 1.5.3, 8.2.1, 8.3.1, 9.2.1, 12.1.2, 12.1.3, 12.2.1, 14.1.1, 14.1.2, AND 14.2.1 re 2178 Stipulation, filed by Ravenswood City Elementary School District. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/4/2016. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2177 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2015/2016 Disbursement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/27/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2174 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for May 2016. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/18/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016) Modified on 4/19/2016 (tmiS, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2170 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: 2167 Monitor Memo to Court re: 5th Joint Statement. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/13/2016 at 10:00 AM. CDE Response due by 4/25/2016. Plaintiffs Response due by 5/16/2016. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/31/16. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2166 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for April 2016. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/16/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2164 ORDER Approving Disbursement in the amount of $102,806.32. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/14/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2163 ORDER Setting Schedule for Allocation Process for Fiscal Year 2016-2017 and Raising Court Monitor's Compensation. Proposed budgets due 04/15/16; Joint statement re: allocation due 05/06/16. If parties cannot reach agreement on allocation, p arties shall submit briefing. Opening Briefs due by 05/20/16; Responses due by 6/03/16; Motion Hearing set for 06/13/16 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson on 03/09/16. (tehlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2158 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for March 2016. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/17/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2147 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2015/2016 Disbursement in the Amount of $411,225.28, Invoice 7919 re 2074 Order. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 1/21/2016. (cc: Financial)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2146 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for February 2016. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/19/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2140 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS FOR THE PERIOD OF JANUARY 1, 2015 THROUGH JUNE 30, 2015. Cross Motions due by 1/28/2016. Responses due by 2/11/2016. Motion Hearing set for 2/29/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/22/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2128 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for December 2015. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/23/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2109 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for November 2015. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/16/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2106 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2015/2016 Disbursement in the amount of $616,837.92. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/05/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2100 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for October 2015. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/15/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2096 ORDER Setting Benchmark Framework Deadlines by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/01/15. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2093 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for September 2015. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/18/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2087 PLEASE IGNORE; SEE DOCKET 2088 ORDER Instructing the Monitor to File Timesheets Under Seal by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/12/15. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015) Modified on 8/12/2015 (tmiS, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2086 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2015/2016 Disbursement in the amount of $925,256.88. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/11/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2083 ORDER Denying 2075 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Surreply by Judge Thelton E. Henderson. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2082 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for August 2015. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/30/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2080 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for July 2015. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/20/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2077 ORDER Re: 2076 State Defendants' Response by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/08/15. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2069 ORDER Re: 2067 State Defendants' Request for Clarification of Budget Order by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/25/15. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2065 REVISED ORDER re: 2064 Order on FY 2015-2016 Budget by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/18/15. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2044 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for June 2015. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/18/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2041 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE STANDARDS OF MEASUREMENT RELATED TO CURRICULUM-BASED ASSESSMENTS. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/30/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2037 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2014/2015 Disbursement in the amount of $395,513.50 Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/16/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2034 ORDER Denying 2032 CDE's Ex Parte Request for Evidentiary Hearing by Judge Thelton E. Henderson. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2030 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for April 2015. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/17/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2029 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2014/2015 Disbursement in the amount of $114,826.50. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/12/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2026 ORDER Setting Schedule for Allocation Process for Fiscal Year 2015-2016 by Judge Thelton E. Henderson. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2021 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for March 2015. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/19/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2020 ORDER Granting 2017 Motion to Retroactively Redact or Seal Documents Containing the Names of Minors. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/18/2015. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2014 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2014/2015 Disbursement in the amount of $395,513.50. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/21/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2013 ORDER Re: Process to Approve and Implement CDE Corrective Action Plan Per the Court's July 2, 2014 Order. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/15/15. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2012 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for February 2015. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/14/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2010 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for January 2015 in the amount of $35,564.75. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/22/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2006 ORDER Approving Monitor and Monitoring Consultants Fees. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/03/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2005 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for December 2014 in the amount of $35,564.75. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/25/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2002 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2014/2015 Disbursement in the amount of $114,826.50. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/24/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1993 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2014/2015 Disbursement in the amount of $593,270.25 Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/6/2014. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1992 ORDER Setting Benchmark Framework Deadlines by Judge Thelton E. Henderson(tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1982 ORDER Denying State Defendants' Motion to Stay July 2, 2014 Order by Judge Thelton E. Henderson 1980 (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1981 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2014-2015 Disbursement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/21/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1979 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for September 2014 in the amount of $35,564.75. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/18/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1962 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for August 2014 in the amount of $35,564.75. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/21/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1959 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for July 2014 in the amount of $35,564.75 Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/02/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1944 ORDER requiring Superintendent's attendance at Monitor's June 2014 meetings and directing Monitor to meet with Board of Trustees. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 6/2/14. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1938 ORDER construing 1933 MOTION to Strike 1925 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by California Department of Education as objection to Plaintiffs' evidence. Plaintiffs' response to CDE's objection due by 6/4/14. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/28/14. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/28/2014 (tmi, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1937 CORRECTION OF DOCKET 1936 ORDER Granting Ex Parte Request for Extension of Time to Submit Stipulation re RSIP and Monitor's Budget. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/27/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1931 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for June 2014 in the amount of $33,147.00. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/19/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1923 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2013/2014 Disbursement in the amount of $395,112.80. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/24/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1910 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for May 2014 in the amount of $33,147.00. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/10/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1904 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for April 2014 in the amount of $33,147.00. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/17/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1901 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2013/2014 Disbursement in the amount of $131,704.60. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/04/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1898 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for March 2014 in the amount of $33,147.00. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/19/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1897 ORDER Setting Schedule for Allocation Process for Fiscal Year 2014-2015. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 2/19/14. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1893 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2013/2014 Disbursement in the amount of $395,113.05. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/27/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1892 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for February 2014 in the amount of $33,147.00. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/15/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1887 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for January 2014 in the amount of $33,147.00. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/18/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1885 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2013/2014 Disbursement in the amount of $131,704.35. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/12/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1881 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for December 2013 in the amount of $33,147.00. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/26/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1873 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for November 2013 in the amount of $33,147.00. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/31/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1871 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2013/2014 Disbursement in the amount of $592,669.57. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/29/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1869 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for October 2013 in the amount of $33,147.00. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/19/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1863 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson re: extensions of time. 1857 Defendant CDE's motion for extension of time is granted. Future requests for extensions of time must be submitted at least one week prior to the deadline sought to be extended and must be accompanied by a showing of good cause. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1856 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for August 2013 in the amount of $33,147.00. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/15/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1854 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for July 2013 in the amount of $33,147.00. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/08/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1850 ORDER Status Conference set for 12/18/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson.Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/20/2013. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1849 SECOND JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE AMENDMENT OF DISPUTE RESOLUTION TIMELINES IN FIFTH JOINT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/18/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1845 DEFENDANTS' CORRECTED AND AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER ON THE RSIP AND COURT MONITOR'S BUDGET FOR FISCAL YEAR 2013-2014. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/12/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1836 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for June 2013 in the amount of $31,796.42. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/16/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1833 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2012-2013 Fourth Quarter Disbursement in the amount of $357,029.00. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/25/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1832 ORDER directing clerk to issue refund to District. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/22/2013. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1829 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for May 2013 in the amount of $31,796.42. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/16/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1828 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Amendment of Dispute Resolution Timelines in Fifth Joint Statement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/15/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1825 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference re 1824 : Case Management Statement due by 6/10/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/17/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/01/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1822 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for April 2013 in the amount of $31,796.42. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/18/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1813 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for March 2013 in the amount of $31,796.42. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/28/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1812 ORDER making corrections to 2012-2013 Budget Order 1718 .Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/28/2012. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1810 ORDER setting out process for making allocation for FY 2013-14 and raising Court Monitor's compensation rate. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1807 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for February 2013 in the amount of $31,796.42. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/22/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1798 ORDER Approving State's 20 percent Share of RSIP Budget Disbursement in the amount of $153,012.00. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/11/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1794 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for December 2012 in the amount of $31,796.42 Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/26/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1791 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Deadline for Case Management Statements. Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2012. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/19/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1785 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for November 2012 in the amount of $31,796.42. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/05/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1776 ORDER directing filing of joint supplemental brief and for CDE to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for its failure to comply in full with the Court's August 30, 2012 order. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1775 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2012-2013 Second Quarter Disbursement in the amount of $535,542.00. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/16/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1762 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for October 2012 in the amount of $31,796.42. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/21/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1759 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 1755 ex parte application for extension of time. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1754 Order by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson (1) granting 1737 motion to compel CDE to produce evidence that USDOE has approved CDE's monitoring system; (2) Directing CDE to file its objections to the Monitor's report and any related motions in accordance with local rule 7-2; and (3) granting Plaintiffs' request for an extension of time to submit objections to CDE's monitoring system.(tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1748 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2012-2013 First Quarter Disbursement in the amount of $994,579.00. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/21/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1747 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for September 2012 in the amount of $31,796.42. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/20/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1741 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 1737 Motion for Extensions of Time to File objections. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1739 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for August 2012 in the amount of $31,796.42. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/02/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1736 ORDER by Judge Thelton Henderson granting 1735 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 1735 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1734 Letter Objections to Monitor's report due by 8/13/2012. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1730 STIPULATION AND ORDER Amending Defendants' Final Stipulation on RSIP Budget and Court Monitor's Budget for Fiscal Year 2012-2013. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/09/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1727 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for July 2012 in the amount of $31,796.42. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/25/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1719 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for June 2012 in the amount of $33,322.75. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/16/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1718 DEFENDANTS' FINAL STIPULATION AND ORDER ON RSIP BUDGET AND COURT MONITORS BUDGET FOR FISCAL YEAR 2012-2013, WITH EXHIBIT A ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/14/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1715 Defendants' Amended Final Stipulation and Order on RSIP Budget and Court Monitor's Budget for Fiscal Year 2011-2012 re 1713 . Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/30/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1712 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2012 Fourth Quarter Disbursement in the amount of $412,442.00. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/20/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1705 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Payment of Plaintiffs' Attorneys' Fees and Costs for the Period of July 1, 2011 through December 31, 2011. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/29/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1702 ORDER RE PROCESS FOR MAKING ALLOCATION FOR FISCAL YEAR 2012-2013. Signed by Judge Thelton Henderson on 3/19/12. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1700 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2012 Fourth Quarter Disbursement in the amount of $198,583.00. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/15/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1698 ORDER re Deadlines. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/14/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1692 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for March 2012 in the amount of $33,322.75. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/15/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1688 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for February 2012 in the amount of $33,322.75. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 1/26/2012. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1687 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2012 Third Quarter Disbursement in the amount of $412,442.00. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/23/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1684 STIPULATION AND ORDER Re: RSIP Interventions for District Non-Compliance. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/05/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1682 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Payment of Plaintiffs' Attorneys' Fees and Costs for the Period of July 1, 2010 through June 30, 2011. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/22/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1677 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for January 2012 in the amount of $33,322.75. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/08/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1666 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for December 2011 in the amount of $33,322.75. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/21/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1662 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for November 2011 in the amount of $33,322.75. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Hendeson on 10/24/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1660 ORDER Approving Fiscal Year 2012 Second Quarter Disbursement in the amount of $618,663.00. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/11/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1655 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for September 2011 in the amount of $33,322.75. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/29/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1654 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Aspire Public Schools. Status Conference set for 08/30/2011 is Vacated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/16/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1635 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for July 2011 in the amount of $33,322.75. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/05/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1630 FINAL STIPULATION AND ORDER on RSIP and Court Monitor's Budget for Fiscal Year 2011-2012. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/11/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1625 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for June 2011 in the amount of $32,769.50. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/05/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1624 ORDER Approving Fourth Quarter Disbursement in the amount of $640,118.20. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/02/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011) Modified on 5/2/2011 (tmi, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1621 ORDER Clarifying Directive Procedure. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/05/11. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1620 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for May 2011 in the amount of $32,769.50. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/04/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011) Modified on 4/4/2011 (tmi, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1615 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for April 2011 in the amount of $32,769.50. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/09/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1609 ORDER Hearing re: budget allocation for FY 2011-12 set for 6/1/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson.. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/07/11. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1605 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for March 2011 in the amount of $32,769.50. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/15/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1600 ORDER Approving Third Quarter Disbursement in the amount of $640,118.20. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/28/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1591 ORDER Approving request for January 2011 funds for Mark Mlawer in the amount of $32,769.50. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/8/10. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1587 ORDER approving billing summary for Mark Mlawer in the amount of $32,769.50 for December 2010. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/22/10. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1574 ORDER Approving Billing Summary of Special Master for November 2010 in the amount of $32,769.50. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/19/10. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1570 ORDER re: Billing Summary for Mark Mlawer in the amount of $32,769.50 for October 2010. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/20/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1565 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 8/31/2010 Approving Mlawer Consulting's Request for Funds for September 2010 in the amount of $32,769.50.(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1555 ORDER RE: QUARTERLY DISBURSEMENT. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 8/5/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1554 ORDER APPROVING MLAWER CONSULTING'S FEE. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 8/5/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1549 ORDER to Meet and Confer Re District's Filing System. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 7/14/10. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1547 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: RSIP Benchmark and Compliance Framework. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/08/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1544 ORDER Re: Court Monitor's Salary. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 7/1/10. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1545 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 6/30/2010 Approving Mlawer Consulting's Request for Funds for July 2010 in the amount of $32,769.50. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2010)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1539 Final STIPULATION AND ORDER on RSIP and Court Monitor's Budget. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/25/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1531 Interim STIPULATION AND ORDER re: RSIP and Court Monitor's Budget. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/10/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1522 ORDER vacating briefing schedule and hearing. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/24/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1515 ORDER Approving 1514 Stipulation filed by Delaine Eastin, California Department of Education.(tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1511 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: payment of plaintiffs' 2009 attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/21/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1506 ORDER Re: Objections to Court Monitor's Quarterly Report and Setting Status Conference. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1504 ORDER granting request for an extension of time to develop RSIP interim benchmarks and deadlines framework. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/30/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1503 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 3/29/2010 APPROVING Mlawer Consulting's Request for Funds for April 2010. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1492 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 2/25/2010 APPROVING Mlawer Consulting's Request for Funds for March 2010. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1488 AMENDED ORDER Approving Mlawer Consulting's Request for Funds for February 2010. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/27/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1481 ORDER RE PROCESS FOR MAKING ALLOCATION FOR FISCAL YEAR 2010-11. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1479 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 1/27/2010 Approving Mlawer Consulting's Request for Funds for February 2010 in the amount of $31,050.75.(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1464 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/10/2009 Approving Mlawer Consulting's Request for Funds for January 2010. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1458 AMENDED ORDER re: Quarterly Disbursement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/30/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1457 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/18/2009 APPROVING Mlawer Consulting's Request for Funds for December 2009. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1450 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE(tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1451 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/27/2009 APPROVING Mlawer Consulting's Request for Funds for November 2009 in the amount of $31,050.75.(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1443 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 9/29/2009 APPROVING Mlawer Consulting's Request for Funds for October 2009 in the amount of $31,050.75.(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1425 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 7/14/2009 APPROVING Mlawer Consulting's Request for Funds for August 2009 in the amount of $31,050.75(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1408 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/27/2009 APPROVING Mlawer Consulting's Request for Funds for June 2009 in the amount of $30,714.41. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1405 Amended STIPULATION AND ORDER re: allocation of RSIP and Court Monitor budget. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/21/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1399 ORDER Approving Mlawer Consulting Request for Funds in the amount of $30,714.41. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/8/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1394 ORDER RE: QUARTERLY DISBURSEMENT. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 4/27/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1393 ORDER granting extension to submit the RSIP Budget Agreement on 05/08/09. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/23/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1389 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 4/6/2009 APPROVING Mlawer Consulting's Request for Funds for April 2009 in the amount of $30,714.41. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1384 ORDER re allocation process for FY 2009-10. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on March 11, 2009. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1373 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: plan for provision of compensatory services. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/17/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1371 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 2/11/2009 APPROVING Mlawer Consulting's Request for Funds for February 2009 in the amount of $30,714.41.(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1367 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time in which to file a stipulation re plan for provision of compensatory services. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/05/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1363 ORDER continuing hearing signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on January 22, 2009. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1341 ORDER POSTPONING DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/11/2008. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1327 ORDER re: Quarterly Disbursement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/24/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1324 ORDER Regarding Matters Raised in Status Conference Statements Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/20/08. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1320 ORDER VACATING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/14/08. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1308 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/27/08. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1302 ORDER To Pro Tem Reporter to Produce Transcript. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/6/08. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emma C., et al v. Eastin, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma C.
Represented By: Larisa M Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel C.
Represented By: Larisa M Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elena C.
Represented By: Larisa M Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto C.
Represented By: Larisa M Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James G.
Represented By: Larisa M Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George H.
Represented By: Larisa M Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin M.
Represented By: Larisa M Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela S.
Represented By: Larisa M Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaine Eastin
Represented By: Lisa Anne Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Carrabino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katheryn Dronenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. William Malkasian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerty Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Mae Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Abrica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois Frontino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bomani Siwatu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravenswood City Elementary School District
Represented By: Aimee Armsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvonne W. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Trigg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marina Tse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chester Palesoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Ravenswood Teachers Association, CTA/NEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Mark Mlawer
Represented By: Mark Ari Mlawer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?