Mitcham v. Calderon, et al

Petitioner: Stephen Louis Mitcham
Respondent: Jeanne Woodford, Jill Brown, Robert L. Ayers and Robert K Wong
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center and California Appellate Project
Case Number: 3:1997cv03825
Filed: August 10, 1994
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2011 381 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 380 MOTION for Extension of Time to File SURREPLY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/24/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 4, 2011 379 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Application of Batson v. Kentucky, 476 U.S. 79 (1986) to Claim D. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 4, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
March 18, 2011 369 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Briefing Schedule re 368 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Vince Cullen. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/16/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
November 5, 2010 356 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/5/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
August 25, 2010 351 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CLAIM D. Because petitioner failed to object to the prosecutor's exercise of peremptory challenges at trial, he has failed to preserve his Batson claim for review on federal habeas. Accordingly, summary judgment on claim D, with the exception of its ineffective assistance of counsel subclaim, is granted. Petitioner's surreply and respondent's response relating to claim D should only address the ineffective assistance subclaim. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 8/25/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
November 4, 2008 338 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Modifying Filing Dates (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
September 19, 2008 335 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 334 Stipulation filed by Stephen Louis Mitcham. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 9/19/2008. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitcham v. Calderon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephen Louis Mitcham
Represented By: Neoma Kenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeanne Woodford
Represented By: Rene Antonio Chacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jill Brown
Represented By: Rene Antonio Chacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers
Represented By: Rene Antonio Chacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert K Wong
Represented By: Rene Antonio Chacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?