USA, et al v. Marin Alliance, et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Marin Alliance for Medical Marijuana and Lynette Shaw
Amicus: City and County of San Francisco and California Medical Association
Case Number: 3:1998cv00086
Filed: January 9, 1998
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 21:841
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2016 331 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING ATTORNEYS' FEES by Judge Charles R. Breyer (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016).
August 4, 2016 330 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING AUGUST 5, 2016 HEARING by Judge Charles R. Breyer (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016).
April 18, 2016 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting: 291 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 281 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by USA.Reset Deadlines as to 281 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. Amended Motion due b y 5/2/2016. Responses due by 6/17/2016. Replies due by 7/15/2016. Motion Hearing reset for 8/5/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/18/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
December 4, 2015 283 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER For An Extension of Time And a Continuance of Noticed Hearing Date re 281 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by USA. Motion Hearing is continued to 6/17/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Plaintiff's deadline to respond is 5/6/2016 and defendants' deadline to reply is 5/20/2016. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/4/2015. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
October 19, 2015 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer Denying Motion to Dissolve Permanent Injunction. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 5, 2015 274 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Parties to Address the Continued Force of Section 538 by Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
August 13, 2015 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE BRIEFING AND HEARING. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 08/13/2015. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
June 23, 2015 265 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 264 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for an Extension of Time filed by USA. Set Deadlines as to 262 First MOTION Dissolve Permanent Injunction [FRCP 60(b)(5) and(6)]. Responses due up to and including 7/17/2015. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/23/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA, et al v. Marin Alliance, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Kathryn L Wyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marin Alliance for Medical Marijuana
Represented By: Greg Anton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynette Shaw
Represented By: Greg Anton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Kamala Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: California Medical Association
Represented By: Alice Pasetta Mead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?