Reiffin v. Microsoft Corp

Case Number: 3:1998cv00266
Filed: January 23, 1998
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2011 655 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE JUNE 9 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 7, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
May 24, 2011 653 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 24, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 23, 2011 647 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE RE-OPENED AND RE-ASSIGNED Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/26/2011 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 5/25/2011.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 23, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 19, 2011 646 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE HEARINGS ON PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 19, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 12, 2011 644 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING MOTION TO VACATE SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ADVANCING HEARING ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 12, 2011. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
July 14, 2010 624 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER deferring ruling on Microsoft's motion for attorney fees, Doc #606. The clerk is directed to terminate Microsoft's motion as an administrative matter. Microsoft may re-notice its motion within sixty days of issuance of appellate mandate, in which event the parties may submit further briefing to the extent necessary in light of the disposition of the issues on appeal. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reiffin v. Microsoft Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?