Carpenter v. Brown, et al
Petitioner: David J. Carpenter
Respondent: Jill Brown
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project and Habeas Corpus Resource Center
3rd_party_defendant: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Case Number: 3:1998cv02444
Filed: January 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER SCHEDULING BRIEFING FOR GROUP 5 CLAIMS. Respondent shall file his opening brief within 120 days of the date of this Order. Petitioner shall file his response within 90 days after the opening brief is filed. Respondent shall file any reply brief within 30 days after Petitioners response is filed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 6/7/18. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER DENYING REMAINING GROUP 4 CLAIMS. Claims 9B, 9D.1, 9E, 9F, 9G, 9H, 9I, 9J, 9L, 9M, and 24 in petitioner's First Amended Petition are hereby DENIED. Within 30 days of the date of this Order, the parties shall file a proposed briefing schedule for his Group 5 claims, specifically Claims 45, 53, 53A, 53B, 53C, 53D, 53E, 53F, 53G, and 53H. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/27/18. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 246 SCHEDULING ORDER FOR THE REMAINING GROUP 4 CLAIMS. Respondent's opening brief is due on February 17, 2015. Petitioner's response is due on May 18, 2015. Respondent's reply is due on June 17, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 10, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER RE: PROCEDURAL DEFAULT, GRANTING 238 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 19, 2014.(mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER DENYING GRUOP 3 CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 1, 2014. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER APPROVING IN PART 239 STIPULATION FOR OVERSIZE BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 23, 2014.(mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 237 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 15, 2013.(mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER GRANTING 233 LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 12, 2013.(mmcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER GRANTING 230 EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 11, 2013.(mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER RE: GROUP 2 CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 20, 2012. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER DENYING GROUP I CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 28, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER AMENDING LITIGATION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 14, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER RE: PROPOSED LITIGATION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 27, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND TO SUBMIT SCHEDULE. Counsel for petitioner and counsel for respondent are ordered 1) to meet and confer within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, and (2) within thirty (30) days thereafter to submit a litigation schedule to the Court. After receipt and review of the litigation schedule, the Court will schedule a status conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 24, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER REGARDING COMPETENCY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 2, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER DENYING 186 MOTION FOR A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 16, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER DENYING 184 MOTION FOR STAY OF COMPETENCY EVALUATION PENDING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 12, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER 185 SHORTENING TIME re MOTION FOR STAY OF COMPETENCY EVALUATION PENDING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 5, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenter v. Brown, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David J. Carpenter
Represented By: Robert D. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jill Brown
Represented By: James William Bilderback, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Represented By: James William Bilderback, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?