Johnson v. Ayers

Petitioner: Willie Darnell Johnson
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center and California Appellate Project
Case Number: 3:1998cv04043
Filed: February 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL 467 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME 477 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME granting 475 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STIPULATION FOR CLOSING ARGUMENT DATE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 444 CORRECT WRIT of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum issued. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/14/18. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PETITIONER'S MOTION TO CONTINUE THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING 430 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER denying petitioner's motion to continue the evidentiary hearing (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/26/2018) Modified on 2/26/2018 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DISCOVERY MOTIONS 400 401 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER, Motions terminated: 381 MOTION to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Robert L. Ayers, Jr.. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/20/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER GRANTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING AS TO CLAIM I AND DENYING CLAIMS A, H, P, AND Q (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER ADDRESSING RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO WITHDRAW AND SEAL. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/23/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTIONS TO SEAL AND MOTIONS TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL 354 355 356 357 358 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENT'S THIRD REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE A RESPONSE 346 348 352 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER signed by Judge Illston on 5/23/13 setting briefing schedule. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER REGARDING § 2254(d)(1) 316 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER REGARDING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER REGARDING § 2254(d)(1) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER REGARDING § 2254(d)(1) 296 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting leave to file oversized brief (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION.. (no further extensions are contemplated) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER for EOT re Reply Brief (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting extension to file reply (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting request to continue status (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 258 CORRECT ORDER RE: DR. WATSON/PROTECTIVE ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER re discovery (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER Status Conference set for 1/26/2011 04:00 PM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING STATUS OF EXPERT DISCOVERY AND PREPARATIONS FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER DENYING RESPONDENT'S RENEWED MOTION TO CONDUCT MENTAL EXAMINATION OF PETITIONER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 231 TRANSPORTATION ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER FOR PRODUCTION AND TRANSPORTATION OF PETITIONER WILLIE D. JOHNSON. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/28/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO RESET EVIDENTIARY HEARING SCHEDULE (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER continuing case management to 7/16/09 @ 11:30 a.m. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER directing the filing of a joint statement before June 30, 2009.. Signed by Judge Illston on 6/16/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willie Darnell Johnson
Represented By: Lynne S. Coffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Represented By: Michael G. Millman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory A. Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?