Castro v. Terhune, et al

Plaintiff: Carlos Castro
Defendant: Cal Terhune, G. Bonnie Garibay, J. Batchelor, S. C. Wolhwend, Robert L. Ayers, Jr., A. Scribner, J. Stokes, E. Derusha, M. Yarborough, L. Hood, C. Campbell, A. M. Gonzales, M. Ayala, J. Martinez and A. Jordan
Case Number: 3:1998cv04877
Filed: February 10, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2012 497 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER REPORT by Hon. William Alsup granting 495 Motion leave to file.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 8, 2012 494 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STAY OF PROCEEDINGS ON ATTORNEY'S FEES by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 493 Stipulation.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
February 29, 2012 490 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OBJECTIONS re 489 Notice (Other), filed by M. Yarborough, Cal Terhune, J. Stokes, Robert L. Ayers, Jr., E. Derusha, M. Ayala, A. Scribner, C. Campbell, J. Batchelor, A. M. Gonzales, G. Bonnie Garibay, L. Hood, J. Martinez. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 29, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
January 11, 2012 486 Opinion or Order of the Court APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER AND ORDER OF REFERENCE re 485 Declaration in Support filed by Carlos Castro. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 11, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
December 23, 2011 482 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON REQUEST TO CHANGE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY'S FEES SUBMISSION by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 477 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2011)
November 14, 2011 474 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
July 5, 2011 434 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TERMINATING ACTION by Hon. William Alsup granting 408 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
June 22, 2011 424 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURTROOM AND NOTICE REGARDING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup granting 423 Motion.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
April 29, 2011 407 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO TERMINATE CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 29, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
November 16, 2010 399 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION by Judge Alsup terminating 397 Motion (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
October 29, 2010 396 Opinion or Order of the Court REMEDIAL ORDER TO CONDUCT NEW VALIDATION PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 29, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 26, 2010 394 Opinion or Order of the Court TENTATIVE ORDER TO CONDUCT NEW VALIDATION PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 26, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 20, 2010 391 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING ATTORNEY LICHTBLAUS TELEPHONE MESSAGE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 20, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 18, 2010 388 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF BIAS. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 18, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 8, 2010 380 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Alsup terminating 376 Motion for Order to Show Cause (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
September 27, 2010 371 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 27, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 3, 2010 368 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Alsup denying 306 Motion for Summary Judgment (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 23, 2010 344 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 23, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 18, 2010 338 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 18, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 16, 2010 335 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 16, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 11, 2010 328 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 11, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 10, 2010 322 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued. Signed by Judge Vadas on August 10, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 3, 2010 319 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW DEEMED ADMISSIONS AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting 294 Motion to Withdraw]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
July 23, 2010 317 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CHANGE TIME TO FILE A DISPOSITIVE MOTION by Judge Alsup granting 300 Motion for Extension of Time to File (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
June 21, 2010 293 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS re 292 Stipulation, filed by M. Yarborough, Cal Terhune, J. Stokes, Robert L. Ayers, Jr., E. Derusha, M. Ayala, A. Scribner, C. Campbell, J. Batchelor, A. M. Gonzales, G. Bonnie Garibay, L. Hood, J. Martinez. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/21/10. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 14, 2010 291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE EXHIBIT B TO DECLARATION OF BRENDAN M. KENNY UNDER SEAL by Judge Alsup granting 283 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 3, 2010 289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MAY 21 HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 3, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
May 11, 2010 269 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE AND VACATING 6-17-10 HEARING DATE [re 264 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND DEPOSITIONS filed by Carlos Castro]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/11/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
March 8, 2010 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO PRODUCE RESPONSIVE DOCUMENTS, PRIVILEGE LOGS, AND SUPPORTING DECLARATIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 8, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
March 1, 2010 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [denying 244 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 19, 2010 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO STAY AND DECLINING TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS by Judge Alsup denying (253) Motion to Stay in case 3:98-cv-04877-WHA (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 10, 2010 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING PARTIES' INPUT ON WHETHER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 10, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
January 14, 2010 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/14/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
December 31, 2009 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 31, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2009)
December 16, 2009 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING FORMAT OF PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AFTER BENCH TRIAL. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/16/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 14, 2009 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING AUTHENTICITY AND ADMISSIBILITY OF TRIAL EXHIBITS [re 211 Stipulation filed by Carlos Castro]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/14/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 11, 2009 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 208 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 11, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009) Modified on 12/14/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2009 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR 12/7/2009, AT 2:30 PM. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/1/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
November 6, 2009 199 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER: Bench trial set for 12/14/2009 at 7:30 AM. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 116/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
October 29, 2009 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GIVING NOTICE OF BENCH TRIAL OPPOSITION DEADLINE [re 192 Case Management Scheduling Order]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/29/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 5, 2009 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING MOTION TO FILE EXHIBIT UNDER SEAL AND CONFIRMING TRIAL DATE by Judge William Alsup [denying 118 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 123 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 140 Motion for Leave to File]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
July 10, 2009 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PRIVILEGE CLAIMgranting in part and denying in part 106 Motion to Seal Document (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
June 18, 2009 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 99 Order]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/18/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
June 15, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE AND VACATING HEARING DATE OF 7/23/2009 [re 94 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by Carlos Castro]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/15/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
June 10, 2009 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING JOINT REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF PROCEDURAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 10, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
May 12, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case not settled but parties still discussing settlement and will communicate status to the court. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/12/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
April 29, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; parties continuing to work toward settlement; return May 7, 2009 only if not settled prior. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 4/29/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
February 18, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed on 2/18/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro v. Terhune, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Castro
Represented By: James E. Burns, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal Terhune
Represented By: Brendan Maguire Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Bonnie Garibay
Represented By: Brendan Maguire Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Batchelor
Represented By: Brendan Maguire Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. C. Wolhwend
Represented By: Kenneth T. Roost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Represented By: Brendan Maguire Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Scribner
Represented By: Brendan Maguire Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Stokes
Represented By: Brendan Maguire Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Derusha
Represented By: Brendan Maguire Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Yarborough
Represented By: Brendan Maguire Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Hood
Represented By: Brendan Maguire Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Campbell
Represented By: Brendan Maguire Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. M. Gonzales
Represented By: Brendan Maguire Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Ayala
Represented By: Brendan Maguire Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Martinez
Represented By: Brendan Maguire Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Jordan
Represented By: Brendan Maguire Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?