Bates, et al v. United Parcel Serv

Plaintiff: Eric Bates, Bert Enos, Babaranti Oloyede, Eric Bumbala and Edward Williams
Defendant: United Parcel Service
Special_master: Edward Swanson
Case Number: 3:1999cv02216
Filed: May 13, 1999
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Referring Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2010 647 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 636 Motion for final approval of class action settlement. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 9, 2010 645 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Allowing Objector to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/09/2010. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
November 9, 2010 642 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Denying Motion Shortening Time. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/9/10. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
April 23, 2009 621 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring joint case management conference statement on or before 04/29/09. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/23/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
December 3, 2008 613 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference to 2/2/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/02/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates, et al v. United Parcel Serv
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bates
Represented By: Katrina Kasey Corbit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bert Enos
Represented By: Katrina Kasey Corbit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Babaranti Oloyede
Represented By: Katrina Kasey Corbit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bumbala
Represented By: Katrina Kasey Corbit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Williams
Represented By: Katrina Kasey Corbit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Edward Swanson
Represented By: Edward W. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?