Bowoto et al v. Chevron Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Larry Bowoto, Ola Oyinbo, Bassey Jeje, Eniesoro Irowarinun, Adegorye Oloruntimjehum Irowarinun, Monotutegha Irowarinun, Olamisbode Irowarinun, Ibimisan Irowarinun, Margaret Irowarinun, Roseline Irowarinun, Mary Irowarinun, Bosuwo Sebi Irowarinun, Caleb Irowarinun, Orioye Laltu Irowarinun, Temilola Irowarinun, Aminora James Irowarinun, Gbenga Irowarinun and All Plaintiffs
Defendant: Chevron Corporation, Chevron Investments, Inc. and Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Miscellaneous: EarthRights International
Case Number: 3:1999cv02506
Filed: May 27, 1999
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2315 ORDER DENYING BILL OF COSTS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2297 ORDER setting hearing re: atty fees on 4/24/09. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/20/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2288 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL and DENYING PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2284 ORDER continuing motions to 3/6/09. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/23/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2278 ORDER: Bill of Costs stayed to 2/6/09. Signed by Judge Illston on 12/22/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2264 AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Illston on 12/3/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2260 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2252 Instructions to Jury (Final as Amended -- 11/25/08) (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2246 JURY INSTRUCTIONS - 11/24/08 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2210 Draft Instructions (11/23/08) (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2008)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2206 FURTHER ORDER RE: TRIAL PARTICIPANTS' COMMUNICATIONS WITH PRESS DURING PENDENCY OF TRIAL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2201 ORDER re: Bassey Jeje deposition (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2186 ORDER re: deposition of John Mackey (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2184 ORDER re Michael Ray Browne Deposition. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2152 ORDER re: Gene Browne's Deposition (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2121 ORDER re: deposition of Dr. Banji Ajaka (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2108 ORDER re: James Neku Deposition (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2069 ORDER RE: TRIAL PARTICIPANTS' COMMUNICATIONS WITH PRESS DURING PENDENCY OF TRIAL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2067 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' OFFER OF PROOF AS TO KIDNAPPING OF CNL EMPLOYEES (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2062 ORDER/RULING re: Osupayojo Deposition Testimony. Signed by Judge Illston on 11/3/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2054 ORDER/Rulings re: Ogboru (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2045 ORDER on objections to Arenewo deposition (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2031 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RELIEF BASED ON PLAINTIFF JEJES REOPENED DEPOSITION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 2021 ORDER granting pltf. access to courthouse re 2017 . Signed by Judge Illston on 10/22/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1983 ORDER by Judge Illston granting 1943 Motion to Seal; granting 1966 Motion to Seal (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1934 SEALING ORDER re 1903 . Signed by Judge Illston on 9/18/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1881 ORDER re: summaries of evidence. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/10/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1856 ORDER RE: LETTER REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING RE VISA REQUESTS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowoto et al v. Chevron Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Bowoto
Represented By: Judith Brown Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ola Oyinbo
Represented By: Judith Brown Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bassey Jeje
Represented By: Judith Brown Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eniesoro Irowarinun
Represented By: Judith Brown Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adegorye Oloruntimjehum Irowarinun
Represented By: Judith Brown Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monotutegha Irowarinun
Represented By: Judith Brown Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olamisbode Irowarinun
Represented By: Judith Brown Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ibimisan Irowarinun
Represented By: Judith Brown Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Irowarinun
Represented By: Judith Brown Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roseline Irowarinun
Represented By: Judith Brown Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Irowarinun
Represented By: Judith Brown Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bosuwo Sebi Irowarinun
Represented By: Judith Brown Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb Irowarinun
Represented By: Judith Brown Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orioye Laltu Irowarinun
Represented By: Judith Brown Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Temilola Irowarinun
Represented By: Judith Brown Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aminora James Irowarinun
Represented By: Judith Brown Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gbenga Irowarinun
Represented By: Judith Brown Chomsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: Cindy Ann Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Corporation
Represented By: Lucas W. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Lucas W. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Lucas W. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: EarthRights International
Represented By: Marco Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?