Universal Trading & Investment Co v. Kiritchenko et al

Plaintiff: Universal Trading & Investment Co
Defendant: Petro Mikolayevich Kiritchenko, Izabella G. Kiritchenko, Pavlo Ivanovich Lazarenko, Tamara Petrovna Lazarenko, Bancross U.S. Holdings, Inc, Xanadu Property Holdings, LLC, BRC Property Holdings, LLC, Dugsbery, Inc, Ludmila Kiritchenko, Alex Liverant, Michael Menko, Brancross (Cayman) LTD, Brancross LTD, Eurofed Bank Limited, ABS Enterprises, LTD, Johnny E. Johnson, Selective Assets LTD, Orby International LTD, Torq Development Corporation, Lady Lake LTD, Nemuro Industrial Group LTD, Fairmont Group, LTD, Firstar Securities LTD, Guardian Investment Group LTD and ABS Trading Inc
Intervenor: USA
Miscellaneous: Graham Taylor, Donald B. Ward, Charles W.A. Walwyn and Barclay's Bank, P.L.C.
Case Number: 3:1999cv03073
Filed: June 24, 1999
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2011 1916 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FOR LEAVE TO CONSIDER LATE MEMORANDUM; DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER ALLOWING INSPECTION OF PURPORTED CONTRACTUAL DOCUMENTS. Finding as moot 1911 Motion for Leave to File; finding as moot 1913 Motion for Disclosure. Signed by J. Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
November 22, 2010 1899 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF ORDER PERMITTING RECOVERY OF ATTACHMENT BONDS; VACATING DECEMBER 3, 2010 HEARING. Denying 1888 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 17, 2010 1897 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDERS. Denying 1893 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 1, 2010 1892 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION UNDER RULE 60(B) FOR REINSTATEMENT OF ACTION AND FOR ORDER TO DEFENDANT PAVLO LAZARENKO TO PRODUCE UKRANIAN COURT RECORDS; VACATING NOVEMBER 5, 2010 HEARING by Judge Maxine M. Chesney denying 1876 . (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 13, 2010 1880 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING RECOVERY ON ATTACHMENT BONDS. Defendants Motion for Order Permitting Recovery on Attachment Bonds 1863 is granted, and American Indemnity Insurance Company shall pay to defendants Peter Kiritch enko, Ludmilla Kiritchenko, Brancross U.S. Holdings, Inc., BRC Property Holdings, LLC, and Xanadu Property Holdings, LLC the sum of $47,500, representing the full amount of the attachment bonds posted in the above-titled action. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/13/2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
October 6, 2010 1879 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER VACATING OCTOBER 8, 2010 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING RECOVERY ON ATTACHMENT BONDS. Having read and considered the papers filed in support of and in opposition to the motion, the Court deems the matter suitable for decision thereon, and vacates the hearing scheduled for October 8, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
September 21, 2010 1871 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEYS. John H. Aspelin, Esq., is substituted by Jeffrey A. Needelman, Esq. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/21/2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 10, 2010 1868 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. The application of George Lambert to be admitted to practice in the Northern District of California on a pro hac vice basis is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 10, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
February 8, 2008 1798 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maxine M. Chesney denying 1797 Administrative Request to Set Conference. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 6, 2008 1796 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laporte denying 1795 Motion for Leave to File (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal Trading & Investment Co v. Kiritchenko et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Trading & Investment Co
Represented By: John H. Aspelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: USA
Represented By: Peter Benjamin Axelrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro Mikolayevich Kiritchenko
Represented By: Tracy M. Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Izabella G. Kiritchenko
Represented By: Tracy M. Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pavlo Ivanovich Lazarenko
Represented By: Daniel A. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara Petrovna Lazarenko
Represented By: Daniel A. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bancross U.S. Holdings, Inc
Represented By: Tracy M. Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xanadu Property Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Tracy M. Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRC Property Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Tracy M. Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dugsbery, Inc
Represented By: Daniel A. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ludmila Kiritchenko
Represented By: Tracy M. Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Liverant
Represented By: Michael George Wah Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Menko
Represented By: A. Marisa Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brancross (Cayman) LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brancross LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eurofed Bank Limited
Represented By: Gordon Alan Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABS Enterprises, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Assets LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orby International LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torq Development Corporation
Represented By: Michael George Wah Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lady Lake LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nemuro Industrial Group LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairmont Group, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firstar Securities LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Investment Group LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABS Trading Inc
Represented By: Tracy M. Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Graham Taylor
Represented By: Christopher J. Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Donald B. Ward
Represented By: Gordon Alan Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Charles W.A. Walwyn
Represented By: Gordon Alan Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Barclay's Bank, P.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?