Lopez, et al v. SF Unified School, et al

Plaintiff: Roxanne Lopez, Frank Marone, Teresa Gallegos and Hugo Lopes
Defendant: San Francisco Unified School District, Linda Davis, Juanita Owens, Mary T. Hernandez, Eddie Y. Chin, Frank Chong, Dan Kelly, Steve Phillips and Jill Wynns
Case Number: 3:1999cv03260
Filed: October 9, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2013 785 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Terminating Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/1/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 9, 2009 778 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing cmc to 11/4/09 @ 10 a.m. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
January 13, 2009 770 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing cmc to 2/25/09 @ 4 p.m.. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/13/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
November 13, 2008 768 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing the status conference to 1/14/08 (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
October 2, 2008 766 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing status to 11/19/08 @ 4 p.m.. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/2/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez, et al v. SF Unified School, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Lopez
Represented By: Jose R. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Marone
Represented By: Jose R. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Gallegos
Represented By: Jose R. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Lopes
Represented By: Lewis Loy Bossing, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Unified School District
Represented By: James Moxon Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Davis
Represented By: James Moxon Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanita Owens
Represented By: James Moxon Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary T. Hernandez
Represented By: James Moxon Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Y. Chin
Represented By: James Moxon Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Chong
Represented By: James Moxon Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Kelly
Represented By: James Moxon Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Phillips
Represented By: James Moxon Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Wynns
Represented By: James Moxon Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?