Depper, et al v. Johnson, et al

Plaintiff: Robert Depper and Stuart Depper
Defendant: Grace Johnson and Earl Thompson
Case Number: 3:1999cv03599
Filed: July 7, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Referring Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 42:9601 CERCLA

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2012 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 128 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ; finding as moot 130 Motion to Appear by Telephone (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
July 7, 2009 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/7/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
December 4, 2008 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/4/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
October 31, 2008 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/31/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Depper, et al v. Johnson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Depper
Represented By: Albert M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Depper
Represented By: Albert M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Johnson
Represented By: Michael Robert Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Thompson
Represented By: John Lauchlan Kortum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?