City of Emeryville, et al v. Elementis Pigments, et al
Plaintiff: City of Emeryville and Emeryville Redevelopment Agency
Defendant: Elementis Pigments Inc., Sherwin-Williams Co., Pfizer, Inc., A & J Trucking Company Inc, Baker Hughes Inc, Arthur M. Sepulveda, Josephine Sepulveda and Sepulveda Family Living Trust
3rd_party_defendant: Howard F. Robinson, Jr
Intervenor: Christopher D. Adam and Hilary A. Jackson
Case Number: 3:1999cv03719
Filed: July 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9607 Real Property Tort to Land

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER RESOLVING DISPUTE OVER MEANING OF 2001 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [vacating hearing 272 Motion for Attorney Fees]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 266 USCA MANDATE- Plaintiff's motion for voluntary dismissal is granted re 220 Notice of Cross-Appeal filed by Emeryville Redevelopment Agency, City of Emeryville (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER DENYING ALL PENDING MOTIONS AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup denying 225 Motion to Stay; denying 228 Motion to Enforce Judgment (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 212 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE RE DEFENDANT SHERWIN-WILLIAMS' MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 17, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 158 Motion to Enforce Judgment]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO MOTIONS TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 14, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 187 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD RELATING TO THE PENDING MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 10, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2008)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER RE PENDING MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 19, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Emeryville, et al v. Elementis Pigments, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Emeryville
Represented By: Stuart I. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emeryville Redevelopment Agency
Represented By: Stuart I. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elementis Pigments Inc.
Represented By: James M. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherwin-Williams Co.
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & J Trucking Company Inc
Represented By: David H. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Inc
Represented By: Diana C. Dutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur M. Sepulveda
Represented By: David H. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josephine Sepulveda
Represented By: David H. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sepulveda Family Living Trust
Represented By: David H. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Howard F. Robinson, Jr
Represented By: Henry Sanford Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Christopher D. Adam
Represented By: Carolyn Nelson Rowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Hilary A. Jackson
Represented By: Carolyn Nelson Rowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?