Bruce, et al v. E. Ylst, et al

Case Number: 3:1999cv04492
Filed: October 7, 1999
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2016 272 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Denying in Part Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement; Referring Case to Pro Se Prisoner Settlement Program. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/30/2016. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
August 21, 2014 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 248 , [ 249 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Reply due by 9/22/2014. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
March 31, 2014 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement; Directing Defendants to Show Cause. Motions terminated: 243 MOTION for Settlement filed by Vincent C. Bruce, 237 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Vincent C. Bruce , 236 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Vincent C. Bruce, 230 MOTION to enforce settlement agreement; DECLARATION of Plaintiff filed by Vincent C. Bruce. Show Cause Response due by 5/30/2014. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/31/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
November 27, 2013 242 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 240 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Re: 230 MOTION to enforce settlement agreement; DECLARATION of Plaintiff filed by Vincent C. Bruce, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 230 MOTION to enforce settlement agreement; DECLARATION of Plaintiff. Reply due by 1/2/2014. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/27/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
May 13, 2013 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE-OPENING CASE; Directing Defendants to File Repsonse to Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Denying 228 Motion for Discovery; Denying 229 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce, et al v. E. Ylst, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?