Lira v. Director of Correct, et al

Case Number: 3:2000cv00905
Filed: March 14, 2000
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Prison Condition Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2010 527 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING ORDER AWARDING PLAINTIFF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS PENDING RESOLUTION OF NINTH CIRCUIT APPEAL re 514 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
March 24, 2010 518 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING MOTION TO 4/23/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
February 26, 2010 513 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS re 467 , 468 , 509 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 8, 2010 508 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending page limitation (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
November 17, 2009 479 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting leave to file brief up to 35 pages (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
October 14, 2009 459 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting 1/15/10 motion hearing (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
September 30, 2009 457 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Judgment is entered in favor of Ernesto Lira and against defendant. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
January 22, 2009 435 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiffs permission to enter the Federal Building and Courtroom 10 located at 450 Golden Gate, SF, CA.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/8/09. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
December 29, 2008 417 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA ORDER re the petitiner's Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2008)
December 23, 2008 412 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Writ re 408 . Signed by Judge Illston on 12/23/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008) Modified on 12/24/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2008 405 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
November 4, 2008 367 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case did not settle. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 11/4/08. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
October 27, 2008 364 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case did not settle. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/27/08. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 14, 2008 361 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR CRATEO INDICATION re 340 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 8, 2008 359 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting settlement conference for 10/23/08 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom F, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/8/08. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
September 3, 2008 339 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE THIRTEEN DEFENDANTS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lira v. Director of Correct, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?