Asian Communications, et al v. Zi Corporation, et al

Defendant: Zi Corporation, a Canadian corporation and Zi Corporation of America,Inc., a Nevada corportation
Case Number: 3:2000cv00989
Filed: March 21, 2000
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2009 501 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO SEAL TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 20, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
November 19, 2008 494 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ZI'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE (1) TEGIC'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANTS SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT OF CONSENT JUDGMENT AND (2) TEGIC'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 19, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 7, 2008 489 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO SEAL DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO TAI AND DAWSON DECLARATIONS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 7, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 5, 2008 481 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION BY PLAINTIFF TEGIC COMMUNICATIONS, INC. FOR COURT ORDER PERMITTING USE OF AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT AT HEARING. Plaintiff's counsel may bring an overhead projector, laptop computer, and projector screen to courtroom 7 after 2:00 p.m. on Thursday, November 6, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 5, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 4, 2008 471 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S ARBITRATION REPLY, CONTEMPT SUR-REPLY AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CONTEMPT SUR-REPLY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 4, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
October 31, 2008 463 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 31, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 29, 2008 457 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING FEDERAL RECORDS CENTER TO DELIVER DOCUMENTS TO CLERK'S OFFICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 29, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 27, 2008 447 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENTS. Defendants' administrative request to seal documents is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 27, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 22, 2008 438 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 22, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 15, 2008 428 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANTS SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT OF CONSENT JUDGMENT. The motion is granted. Plaintiff Tegic Communications, Inc. shall file in the public record, no later than October 22, 2008, an redacted version of the Declaration of Doug Colt in Support of Contempt Motion. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 15, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 10, 2008 427 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME FOR BRIEFING. Defendants' opposition shall be due October 17, 2008. Tegic's reply shall be due October 24, 2008. The hearing on plaintiffs' motions is continued to November 7, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 10, 2008. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
September 12, 2008 423 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Sharon A. Israel is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 12, 2008.(mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asian Communications, et al v. Zi Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zi Corporation, a Canadian corporation
Represented By: Brandon D. Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zi Corporation of America,Inc., a Nevada corportation
Represented By: Brandon D. Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?