High Sierra Hikers, et al v. Powell, et al

Case Number: 3:2000cv01239
Filed: April 10, 2000
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Referring Judge: Edward M. Chen
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2008 396 Opinion or Order of the Court PARTIES' STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses Pursuant to EAJA 371 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/8/2008. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 2, 2008 394 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 393 Stipulation filed by High Sierra Hikers Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 1, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
October 27, 2008 392 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE with Magistrate Judge Spero. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/27/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
September 23, 2008 370 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re 369 Stipulation filed by High Sierra Hikers Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on September 23, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: High Sierra Hikers, et al v. Powell, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?