Freitag v. CDC, et al
Plaintiff: Deanna L. Freitag
Defendant: Robert J. Ayers, Jr., Teresa Schwartz, David A. Carmichael, G. Rodman, Paul Dillard, Barry O'Neill, George Neotti, Auggie Lopez and California Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2000cv02278
Filed: June 27, 2000
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Thelton E Henderson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2014 Filing 673 CLERK'S NOTICE re Withdrawal of Trial Exhibits. (tnS) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 672 ORDER setting briefing schedule re: attorneys' fees and costs. Plaintiff to file motion, if any, by 01/14/13. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/20/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 17, 2012 Filing 671 STATUS REPORT Joint Report re: Attorneys Fees Dispute by Deanna L. Freitag. (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 670 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson terminating monitoring of injunctive relief re #648 . Defendant's Motion to Terminate Injunction is granted in part and denied in part. Parties to file joint report re: attorneys' fees and costs by 12/17/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
October 18, 2012 Filing 669 CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Hearing on re #648 Motion to Terminate Injunction noticed for hearing on 10/29/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
September 28, 2012 Filing 668 REPLY to re #664 Plaintiff's Objections to Evidence and Objection to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice in re #666 Response/Opposition to (re #648 MOTION to Terminate the Injunction or, Alternatively, to Modify the Injunction-Monitoring Process ) CDCR'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE AND TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOSITION TO CDCR'S MOTION TO TERMINATE THE INJUNCTION, OR ALTERNATIVELY MODIFY THE INJUNCTION PROCESS filed by California Department of Corrections. (Harlan, Lyn) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
September 28, 2012 Filing 667 Declaration of WARDEN G.D. LEWIS IN SUPPORT OF re #666 CDCR'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO CDCR'S MOTION TO TERMINATE THE INJUNCTION, OR ALTERNATIVELY MODIFY THE INJUNCTION PROCESS filed by California Department of Corrections. (Harlan, Lyn) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
September 28, 2012 Filing 666 REPLY to Response/Opposition to (re #648 Motion to Terminate the Injunction or, Alternatively, to Modify the Injunction-Monitoring Process) filed by California Department of Corrections. (Harlan, Lyn) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
September 18, 2012 Filing 665 [Proposed] Order Denying re #648 MOTION to Terminate the Injunction or, Alternatively, to Modify the Injunction-Monitoring Process , re #663 Opposition/Response to the Motion filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 664 OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE in Opposition to re #648 MOTION to Terminate the Injunction or, Alternatively, to Modify the Injunction-Monitoring Process filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 663 RESPONSE to (re #648 Defendants' MOTION to Terminate the Injunction or, Alternatively, to Modify the Injunction-Monitoring Process ) filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 662 DECLARATION of Jane B. Moore in Opposition to re #648 MOTION to Terminate the Injunction or, Alternatively, to Modify the Injunction-Monitoring Process filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IERC Minutes (1/31/08), #2 Exhibit IERC Minutes (11/18/10), #3 Exhibit Chart of IERC-Reviewed 115s)(Related document(s) #648 ) (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 661 DECLARATION of Pamela Y. Price in Opposition to re #648 MOTION to Terminate the Injunction or, Alternatively, to Modify the Injunction-Monitoring Process, re #660 Request for Judicial Notice filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Senator Polanco from Freitag (9/9/99), #2 Exhibit Letter from Lyn Harlan (9/8/11), #3 Exhibit Letter to Lyn Harlan (10/14/11), #4 Exhibit Deposition Excerpts of Shirley Michelson (12/23/09), #5 Exhibit Deposition Excerpts of Kelly Stanton (12/23/09))(Related document(s) #648 , #660 ) (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 660 Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition to re #648 Defendants' MOTION to Terminate the Injunction or, Alternatively, to Modify the Injunction-Monitoring Process filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Shirley Michelson, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Kelly Stanton, #3 Exhibit Stipulation and Order for Collection of Undisputed Attorneys Fees (10/11/11), #4 Exhibit Stipulation and Order for Collection of Undisputed Attorneys Fees (2/1/12), #5 Exhibit Stipulation and Order for Collection of Undisputed Attorneys Fees (4/13/12), #6 Exhibit Stipulation and Order for Collection of Undisputed Attorneys Fees (5/23/12), #7 Exhibit Supp. Declaration of Kimberley Morin)(Related document(s) #648 ) (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 659 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Request for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Terminate or Alternatively to Modify the Injunction-monitoring Process re #658 : Responses due by 9/17/2012. Replies due by 9/28/2012. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/10/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 658 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Request for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Terminate or Alternatively to Modify the Injunction-Monitoring Process filed by Deanna L. Freitag, California Department of Corrections. (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 657 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Plaintiff's Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Terminate the Injunction or, Alternatively, to Modify the Injunction-Monitoring Process re #656 : Set/Reset Deadlines as to re #648 Motion to Terminate the Injunction or, Alternatively, to Modify the Injunction-Monitoring Process. Responses due by 9/10/2012. Replies due by 9/21/2012. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/20/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 14, 2012 Filing 656 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFF'S TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TERMINATE INJUNCTION OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO MODIFY THE INJUNCTION-MONITORING PROCESS filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 655 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying re #654 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of re #649 June 1, 2012 Order. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
June 14, 2012 Filing 654 MOTION for Reconsideration of re #649 Order Adopting in Part Magistrate Judge's 4/26/2012 Report & Recommendation; Order Granting in Part & Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion re: Attorneys' Fees filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting extension of time re: #648 Defendant's Motion to Terminate Injunction; ORDER of Referral. Opposition to motion due 08/27/12. Reply due 09/07/12. All discovery disputes are Referred to Magistrate Judge Corley. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
June 6, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing: Motion Hearing re: #648 Defendant's motion to terminate injunction set for 09/24/12 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
June 6, 2012 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Discovery. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
June 5, 2012 Filing 652 RESPONSE to (re #650 to Plaintiff's Administrative Motion and Declaration of Pamela Y. Price for Order to Enlarge Time for Plaintiff to Oppose And the Court to Hear Defendant CDCRs Motion to Terminate the Injunction) -Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Enlarge Time for Plaintiff to Oppose and the Court to Hear the CDCR's Motion to Terminate the Injunction- filed by California Department of Corrections. (Harlan, Lyn) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
June 1, 2012 Filing 651 [Proposed] Order Enlarging Time for Plaintiff to Oppose And the Court to Hear Defendant CDCRs Motion to Terminate the Injunction re #650 filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Williams, Terina) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
June 1, 2012 Filing 650 Administrative Motion & Declaration of Pamela Y. Price for Order to Enlarge Time for Plaintiff to Oppose And the Court to Hear Defendant CDCR's Motion to Terminate the Injunction filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Williams, Terina) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 649 ORDER Adopting in Part re #640 Magistrate Judge's April 26, 2012 Report & Recommendation; ORDER Granting in Part & Denying in Part re #624 Plaintiff's Motion re: Attorneys' Fees. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
May 25, 2012 Filing 648 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Terminate the Injunction or, Alternatively, to Modify the Injunction-Monitoring Process filed by California Department of Corrections. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2012 AT 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Responses due by 6/8/2012. Replies due by 6/15/2012. (Harlan, Lyn) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 25, 2012 Filing 647 Request for Judicial Notice re #645 Declaration in Support, of CDCR's Motion to Terminate the Injunction or Alternatively, to Modify the Injunction-Monitoring Process filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections. (Related document(s) #645 ) (Harlan, Lyn) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 25, 2012 Filing 646 Declaration of G. D. Lewis in Support of #644 Notice (Other) of Motion and Motion to Terminate the Freitag Injunction or Alternatively, to Modify the Injunction-Monitoring Process filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #644 ) (Harlan, Lyn) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 25, 2012 Filing 645 Declaration of Lyn Harlan in Support of #644 Notice (Other) of Motion and Motion to Terminate the Injunction or Alternatively, to Modify the Injunction-Monitoring Process filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) #644 ) (Harlan, Lyn) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 25, 2012 Filing 644 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #648 . *** NOTICE by California Department of Corrections of Motion and Motion to Terminate the Injunction or Alternatively, to Modify the Injunction Monitoring Process (Harlan, Lyn) (Filed on 5/25/2012) Modified on 5/25/2012 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2012 Filing 643 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Relief from re #640 Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge Report & Recommendation on Motion To Modify July 2, 2009 Order And Award of Reasonable Attorneys' Fees filed by Deanna L. Freitag -Motion for Relief from Non-dispositive Pretrial Order Of Magistrate Judge - Report And Recommendation on Motion To Modify July 2, 2009 Order and Award of Reasonable Attorneys Fees- filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Pamela Y. Price, #2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Terina) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 7, 2012 Filing 642 OBJECTIONS to re #640 REPORT & RECOMMENDATIONS on re #624 Motion To Modify July 2, 2009 Order And Award of Reasonable Attorneys Fees filed by Deanna L. Freitag filed by California Department of Corrections. (Harlan, Lyn) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
April 27, 2012 Filing 641 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING on re #624 Plaintiff's Motion to Modify July 2, 2009 Order & Award of Reasonable Attorneys' Fees scheduled for 5/2/2012 at 2:00p.. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 640 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on re #624 Plaintiff's Motion To Modify July 2, 2009 Order And Award of Reasonable Attorneys Fees filed by Deanna L. Freitag. Objections due by 5/10/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/26/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 18, 2012 Filing 639 [Proposed] Order granting re #638 Administrative Motion and Declaration of Pamela Y. Price for Permission to File Objections to Defendant CDCR's Supplemental Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Modify July 2, 2009 Order Award of Reasonable Attorneys' Fees filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Williams, Terina) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 18, 2012 Filing 638 Administrative Motion and Declaration of Pamela Y. Price for Permission to File Objections to re #636 Defendant CDCR's Supplemental Opposition to re #624 Plaintiff's Motion to Modify July 2, 2009 Order and Award of Reasonable Attorneys' Fees filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 17, 2012 Filing 637 Declaration of Lyn Harlan in Support of #636 Supplemental Response/Opposition to Motion to Modify July 2, 2009 Order re Attorneys' Fees filed by California Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) #636 ) (Harlan, Lyn) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 17, 2012 Filing 636 CDCR's Supplemental Opposition to re #624 Motion to Modify July 2, 2009 Order and Award of Fees; Request for Modification to the Monitoring Process and Dissolution of the Injunction filed by California Department of Corrections. (Harlan, Lyn) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 13, 2012 Filing 635 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING ON MOTION: Plaintiff's Motion to Modify July 2, 2009 Order re Attorney's Fees shall be heard on 5/2/2012 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom D, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 4, 2012 Filing 634 Declaration of Terina M. Williams in Support of re #624 Notice of Motion & Motion To Modify July 2, 2009 Order And Award of Reasonable Attorneys' Fees filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #624 ) (Williams, Terina) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
April 4, 2012 Filing 633 REPLY brief in Support of (re #624 Notice of Motion & Motion To Modify July 2, 2009 Order And Award of Reasonable Attorneys' Fees) -Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitags Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Modify July 2, 2009 Order and Award of Reasonable Attorneys Fees- filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Williams, Terina) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
March 28, 2012 Filing 632 Declaration of Lyn Harlan in Support of re #630 Response/Opposition to Motion to Modify July 2, 2009 Order and Award of Reasonable Attorneys' Fees filed by California Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #630 ) (Harlan, Lyn) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 28, 2012 Filing 631 Declaration of Alan L. Sobel in Support of re #630 Response/Opposition to CDCR's Motion to Modify July 2, 2009 Order and Award of Reasonable Attorneys' Fees filed by California Department of Corrections. (Related document(s) #630 ) (Harlan, Lyn) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 28, 2012 Filing 630 RESPONSE to (re #624 Notice of Motion & Motion To Modify July 2, 2009 Order And Award of Reasonable Attorneys' Fees) -CDCR's Opposition to Modify July 2, 2009 Order and Award of Reasonable Attorney Fees; Request for Modification to the Monitoring Process and Dissolution of the Injunction- filed by California Department of Corrections. (Harlan, Lyn) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 629 BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/16/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 16, 2012 Filing 628 CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2012. #624 Motion To Modify July 2, 2009 Order and Award of Reasonable Attorneys Fees has been referred to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman for a report and recommendation. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 627 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/14/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
March 12, 2012 Filing 626 Declaration of Dianne L. Andrews in Support of re #624 Notice of Motion and Motion To Modify July 2, 2009 Order And Award of Reasonable Attorneys Fees filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #624 ) (Williams, Terina) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
March 12, 2012 Filing 625 Declaration of Pamela Y. Price in Support of re #624 Notice of Motion and Motion To Modify July 2, 2009 Order And Award of Reasonable Attorneys Fees filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #624 ) (Williams, Terina) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
March 12, 2012 Filing 624 Notice of Motion & Motion To Modify July 2, 2009 Order And Award of Reasonable Attorneys Fees filed by Deanna L. Freitag. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Responses due by 3/26/2012. Replies due by 4/2/2012. (Williams, Terina) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ORDER re: #622 Parties' September 30, 2011 joint statement re: attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/06/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 622 Joint Statement re #621 Order on Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 2010 Itemized List of Fees and Costs, #(2) Exhibit 2011 Itemized List of Fees and Costs)(Price, Pamela) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 16, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 621 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson re: #612 #613 Parties' motions for de novo review of #611 Report and Recommendation re: #597 Plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees and costs. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 620 REPLY Brief in Support of re #597 Corrected MOTION for Attorney Fees, re #611 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #597 Corrected MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Deanna L. Freitag, re #613 MOTION Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for De Novo Determination of Objections to Report and Recommendation on Plaintiff's Motion for Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Costs -Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of Motion for De Novo Determination of Objections to Report and Recommendations on Plaintiff's Motion for Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Costs- filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Harrell, Jeshawna) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 619 REPLY to re #617 Plaintiff's Opposition to re #613 , #612 Defendants' MOTION for De Novo Determination and Objections to Report and Recommendation on Plaintiff's Motion for Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by California Department of Corrections. (Scally, Vincent) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 8, 2011 Filing 618 DECLARATION of Jeshawna R. Harrell in Opposition to #612 MOTION re #611 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #597 Corrected MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Deanna L. Freitag MOTION re #611 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #597 Corrected MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Deanna L. Freitag, #617 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Vincent Scally)(Related document(s) #612 , #617 ) (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 8, 2011 Filing 617 RESPONSE to re #612 Defendants' MOTION for De Novo Determination and Objections to re #611 Magistrate Judge's Findings/REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 8, 2011 Filing 616 RESPONSE to re #613 Plaintiff's Motion for De Novo Determination of Objections to Report and Recommendation on Plaintiff's Motion for Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by California Department of Corrections. (Scally, Vincent) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
July 26, 2011 Filing 615 [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion Regarding Objections to Report and Recommendation on Plaintiff's Corrected Motion for Supplemental Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Harrell, Jeshawna) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 26, 2011 Filing 614 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Hearing on re #613 Plaintiff's Notice of Motion & Motion for De Novo Determination of Objections to Report and Recommendation on Plaintiff's Motion for Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Motion Hearing re-set for 9/19/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 25, 2011 Filing 613 Plaintiff's Notice of Motion & Motion for De Novo Determination of Objections to Report and Recommendation on Plaintiff's Motion for Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Deanna L. Freitag. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Responses due by 8/8/2011. Replies due by 8/15/2011. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Chart)(Harrell, Jeshawna) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 25, 2011 Filing 612 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for De Novo Determination & OBJECTIONS to re #611 The Magistrate Judge's Findings & Recommendations re #597 Corrected MOTION for Attorney Fees & Costs filed by Deanna L. Freitag filed by California Department of Corrections. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Responses due by 8/8/2011. Replies due by 8/15/2011. (Scally, Vincent) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 611 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on re #597 Plaintiff's Corrected MOTION for Attorneys' Fees & Costs. Objections due by 7/25/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/11/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
May 25, 2011 Due to Judge Chen's elevation to Article III status, this case is re-referred to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for settlement. All matters scheduled before, and deadlines set by, Judge Chen are hereby vacated. All future settlement matters should be addressed to Judge Cousins unless otherwise ordered by the presiding judge. Until Judge Cousins takes the bench on July 5, 2011, any urgent settlement issues requiring immediate judicial attention should be addressed to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by contacting his courtroom deputy, Karen Hom, at (415) 522-2035. ; Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to case. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
April 4, 2011 Filing 610 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held 4/4/2011. Case did not settle. No Further Settlement Conference scheduled. (Date Filed: 4/4/2011). (Court Reporter: Not Recorded.). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/4/2011)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER Granting #608 Plaintiff's Request to Excuse Attendance at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/29/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 24, 2011 Filing 608 Letter from Attorney Jeshawna R. Harrell Regarding Waiver of Officer Deanna Freitag's Attendance at Settlement Conference. (Harrell, Jeshawna) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 607 STIPULATION & ORDER to Continue Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge re #606 . Settlement Conference set for 2/25/2011 09:30 AM has been CONTINUED to 4/4/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/15/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 606 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Settlment Conference by Deanna L. Freitag. (Harrell, Jeshawna) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 605 Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge. Settlement Conference set for 2/25/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/10/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
December 29, 2010 Filing 604 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Attorney Pamela Yvette Price. (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/20/10. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 15, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. Motion Hearing for 12/20/10 vacated per #602 Order referred to Magistrate Judge. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010) Modified on 12/15/2010 (tmi, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ORDER referring re #592 MOTION for Attorneys' Fees to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/14/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
December 6, 2010 Filing 601 Reply Brief in Support of re #597 Corrected MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of Plaintifff's Motion for an Award of Supplemental Attorney's Fees & Costs filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
November 29, 2010 Filing 600 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #597 Corrected MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vincent J. Scally)(Related document(s) #597 ) (Scally, Vincent) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 16, 2010 Filing 599 Proposed Order re #597 Corrected MOTION for Supplemental Attorneys' Fees, #596 Declaration in Support, #595 Declaration in Support, #594 Request for Judicial Notice, #592 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for An Award of Supplemental Attorneys' Fees MOTION to Amend/Correct #594 Request for Judicial Notice, #592 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for An Award of Supplemental Attorneys' Fees, #595 Declaration in Support, #593 Declaration in Support, #598 Errata, [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for An Award of Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Deanna L. Freitag. (Harrell, Jeshawna) (Filed on 11/16/2010) Modified on 11/17/2010 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2010 Filing 598 ERRATA re #595 Declaration in Support,,, Errata to the Declaration of Pamela Y. Price and Exhibit J in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for An Award for Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Deanna L. Freitag. (Harrell, Jeshawna) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 16, 2010 Filing 597 Corrected MOTION for Supplemental Attorneys' Fees re #592 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for An Award of Supplemental Attorneys' Fees, #596 Declaration in Support, #595 Declaration in Support,,, #594 Request for Judicial Notice, #593 Declaration in Support Plaintiff's Corrected Notice of Motion For An Award of Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Deanna L. Freitag. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Harrell, Jeshawna) (Filed on 11/16/2010) Modified on 11/17/2010 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2010 Filing 596 Declaration of Jeshawna R. Harrell in Support of #592 Plaintiff's Motion for An Award of Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Harrell, Jeshawna) (Filed on 11/16/2010) Modified on 11/16/2010 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2010 Filing 595 Declaration of Pamela Y. Price in Support of #594 Request for Judicial Notice, #592 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for An Award of Supplemental Attorneys' Fees, #593 Declaration in Support filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pamela Y. Price Resume, #2 Exhibit Order Awarding Attorneys Fees (Reissner), #3 Exhibit Order for Permanent Injunctive Relief, #4 Exhibit Special Master's Final Report, #5 Exhibit Order Adopting Special Master's Final Report, #6 Exhibit Order Awarding Attorneys Fees (Freitag), #7 Exhibit Stipulation & Order For Attorneys Fees (Freitag), #8 Exhibit Order Awarding Attorneys Fees (Campbell), #9 Exhibit Price And Associates Bills, #10 Exhibit Attorneys' Fee Summary)(Related document(s) #594 , #592 , #593 ) (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 15, 2010 Filing 594 Request for Judicial Notice Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of #592 Plaintiff's Motion for An Award of Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Harrell, Jeshawna) (Filed on 11/15/2010) Modified on 11/16/2010 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2010 Filing 593 Declaration of Roger L. Cook in Support of #592 Plaintiff's Motion for An Award of Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Harrell, Jeshawna) (Filed on 11/15/2010) Modified on 11/16/2010 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2010 Filing 592 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for An Award of Supplemental Attorneys' Fees filed by Deanna L. Freitag. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Harrell, Jeshawna) (Filed on 11/15/2010) Modified on 11/17/2010 REPLACED BY #597 CORRECTED MOTION (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ORDER closing case. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/09/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 590 STIPULATION AND ORDER pursuant to Fees Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/07/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
October 6, 2009 Filing 589 STIPULATION re #587 Status Report STIPULATIION PURSUANT TO FEES SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Deanna L. Freitag. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
September 30, 2009 Filing 588 Letter from Charles S Ralston, Attorney for Plaintiff LETTER TO COURT CONFIRMING RECEIPT OF SETTLEMENT PAYMENT. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 28, 2009 Filing 587 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS STATEMENT ON FEES SETTLEMENT by Deanna L. Freitag. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 586 SECOND ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT OF PLAINTIFFS' SEPTEMBER 15, 2008 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES re #585 Letter filed by Deanna L. Freitag (counsel shall notify the Court as soon as payment on the settlement of Planitiffs' September 15, 2008 motion for attorneys' fees has been made by 9/28/09. If payment has not yet been made the parties shall file a joint statement re: delay and proposal for moving forward).. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 8/24/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 19, 2009 Filing 585 Letter from Charles S Ralston, Attorney for Plaintiff LETTER IN RESPONSE TO ORDER OF AUGUST 12, 2009. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER re: settlement of #530 Plaintiffs' September 15, 2008 motion for attorneys' fees. Motion and objections to #558 Report and recommendations will be deemed resolved pursuant to #583 unless the parties otherwise notify the Court by 08/24/09. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/12/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
July 30, 2009 Filing 583 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference Held. CASE SETTLED. (Date Filed: 7/30/2009). (Tape #10:11 - 10:14.) (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/30/2009)
July 14, 2009 Filing 582 Letter from Charles S Ralston, Attorney for Plaintiff RE: STATUS OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND REQUEST TO RESCHEDULE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO JULY 30. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 2, 2009 Filing 581 Minute Entry: Further Telephonic Status Re: Settlement Conference Held. (Date Filed: 7/2/2009). Further Telephonic Status set for 7/16/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Margo Gurule.) (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/2/2009)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER re: injunctive relief. Injunctive relief shall remain in full effect unless and until otherwise ordered. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/02/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
June 29, 2009 Filing 579 Statement re #576 Order, JOINT STATUS STATEMENT ON INJUNCTION by Deanna L. Freitag. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 18, 2009 Filing 578 Minute Entry: Further Status Re: Settlement. (Date Filed: 6/18/2009). Matter Continued for Further Status Re: Settlement set for 7/2/2009 10:00 AM. (Court Reporter Jim Yeomams.) (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/18/2009)
June 16, 2009 Filing 577 Letter from Vincent J. Scally, Jr. re: Settlement Conference. (Scally, Vincent) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER re: referral of #530 pending attorneys' fees motion to Magistrate Judge. Scope of referral does not include future claims for attorneys' fees. Parties to meet and confer and submit joint statement re: injunctive relief by 06/29/09. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/01/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
May 28, 2009 Filing 575 Minute Entry: Status RE: Settlement (Date Filed: 5/28/2009). Further Status RE: Settlement set for 6/18/2009, 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Sarah Goekler.) (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/28/2009)
April 28, 2009 Filing 574 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference Held (Date Filed: 4/28/2009). Status Re: Settlement Conference set for 5/28/2009 10:00 AM. () (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/28/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 573 NOTICE by Deanna L. Freitag OF UNAVAILABILITY (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 3, 2009 Filing 572 NOTICE by California Department of Corrections, Robert J. Ayers, Jr, Teresa Schwartz of Unavailability of Kathryn Allen (Allen, Kathryn) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 3, 2009 Filing 571 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles Stephen Ralston (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 570 NOTICE by Auggie Lopez, California Department of Corrections, Robert J. Ayers, Jr, Teresa Schwartz, David A. Carmichael, G. Rodman, Paul Dillard, Barry O'Neill, George Neotti of Unavailability of Kathryn Allen (Allen, Kathryn) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER re #568 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Report and Recommendations Settlement Conference set for 4/28/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 1/26/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 568 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson referring case for mandatory settlement and vacating January 26, 2009 hearing. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 567 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #563 Objection, PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #563 ) (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
January 5, 2009 Filing 566 Memorandum in Opposition Defendants/appellants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for De Novo Determination and Objections to Report and Recommendation on Plaintiffs Motion for Supplemental Attorneys Fees and Costs filed byRobert J. Ayers, Jr, Teresa Schwartz. (Harlan, Lyn) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 24, 2008 Filing 565 Declaration of John L. Burris in Support of #540 Declaration in Support Third Supplemental Declaration of John L. Burris Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #540 ) (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 12/24/2008)
December 24, 2008 Filing 564 Declaration of Pamela Y. Price in Support of #541 Declaration in Support, Third Supplemental Declaration of Pamela Y. Price Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #541 ) (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 12/24/2008)
December 22, 2008 Filing 563 OBJECTIONS to Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommedations by California Department of Corrections, Robert J. Ayers, Jr, Teresa Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for De Novo Determination and Objections to the Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Supplemental Attorneys Fees)(Allen, Kathryn) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 22, 2008 Filing 562 Proposed Order GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS RE: OBJECTIONS by Deanna L. Freitag. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 22, 2008 Filing 561 Declaration of CHARLES STEPHEN RALSTON in Support of #560 Objection, DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL FEES filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #560 ) (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 22, 2008 Filing 560 OBJECTIONS to re #558 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #530 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion filed by Deanna L. FreitagREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #530 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion filed by Deanna L. Freitag NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR DE NOVO DETERMINATION OF OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Deanna L. Freitag. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 17, 2008 Filing 559 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/3/08, before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Christine Triska, Telephone number (650) 743-8425. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2009. (djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
December 8, 2008 Filing 558 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #530 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion filed by Deanna L. Freitag Objections to R&R due by 12/22/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/8/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 3, 2008 Filing 557 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2008 before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman (Date Filed: 12/3/2008) re #530 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Court Reporter Christine Triska.) (sv, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/3/2008)
October 29, 2008 Filing 556 Proposed Order re #530 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion [AMENDED PROPOSED] ORDER by Deanna L. Freitag. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 29, 2008 Filing 555 Declaration of JOHN L BURRIS in Support of #530 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JOHN L BURRIS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #530 ) (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 29, 2008 Filing 554 Declaration of CHARLES STEPHEN RALSTON in Support of #530 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion REPLY DECLARATION OF C RALSTON TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBITS KK TO NN TO REPLY DECLARATION OF C RALSTON)(Related document(s) #530 ) (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 29, 2008 Filing 553 Declaration of PAMELA Y PRICE in Support of #530 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION OF P PRICE filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #530 ) (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 29, 2008 Filing 552 Reply to Opposition re #530 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 16, 2008 Filing 550 NOTICE by Auggie Lopez, California Department of Corrections, Robert J. Ayers, Jr, Teresa Schwartz, David A. Carmichael, G. Rodman, Paul Dillard, Barry O'Neill, George Neotti Notice of Errata to Correct Citation Error in Opposition and Corrected Opposition to Deanna Freitag Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Allen, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 551 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Pamela Y. Price in Support of re #530 MOTION for Award of Reasonale Attorney's Fees & Costs Filed by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag.(Related document(s) #530 ). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 549 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition and Exhibits A to D of John L. Trunko to re #530 Deanna Freitag's Motion for Attorney Fees filed byAuggie Lopez, California Department of Corrections, Robert J. Ayers, Jr, Teresa Schwartz, David A. Carmichael, G. Rodman, Paul Dillard, Barry O'Neill, George Neotti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit Exhibits F to J)(Allen, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 548 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to re #530 Deanna Freitag's Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed byAuggie Lopez, California Department of Corrections, Robert J. Ayers, Jr, Teresa Schwartz, David A. Carmichael, G. Rodman, Paul Dillard, Barry O'Neill, George Neotti. (Allen, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 547 Memorandum in Opposition to re #530 Deanna Freitag's Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Auggie Lopez, California Department of Corrections, Robert J. Ayers, Jr, Teresa Schwartz, David A. Carmichael, G. Rodman, Paul Dillard, Barry O'Neill, George Neotti. (Allen, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 14, 2008 Filing 546 Declaration of John L. Burris in Support of #540 Declaration in Support, #530 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion Supplemental Declaration filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #540 , #530 ) (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 14, 2008 Filing 545 Declaration of Pamela Y. Price in Support of #541 Declaration in Support, #530 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion Supplemental Declaration filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #541 , #530 ) (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 544 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/17/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 543 NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING OF..EXHIBITS "DD", "EE", "FF" & "GG" in Support of re #530 Motion for an Award of Supplemental Attorneys Fees & Costs Filed by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008) (tn, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2008 Filing 542 MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION of Exhibit D to re #541 Declaration of Pamela Y. Price in Support of re #530 Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs Filed by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #541 ) (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 541 Declaration of Pamela Y. Price In Support of re #530 Plaintidff's Motion For Award of Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs Filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B, #(3) Exhibit C, #(4) Exhibit E, #(5) Exhibit F, #(6) Exhibit G, #(7) Exhibit H, #(8) Exhibit I, #(9) Exhibit J, #(10) Exhibit K). (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 540 Declaration of John L. Burris In Support of re #530 Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit L). (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 539 [Proposed] Order Granting re #530 MOTION for an Award of Supplemental Attorney's Fees & Costs Filed by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 538 Declaration of JAMES M FINBERG in Support of re #530 MOTION for an Award of Supplemental Attorney's Fees & Costs Filed by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #530 ). (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 537 Declaration of TODD M SCHNEIDER in Support of re #530 MOTION for an Award of Supplemental Attorney's Fees & Costs Filed by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #530 ) (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 536 Declaration of WILLIAM C McNEILL in Support of re #530 MOTION for an Award of Supplemental Attorney's Fees & Costs Filed by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #530 ) (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 535 Declaration of HOWARD J MOORE, JR in Support of re #530 MOTION for an Award of Supplemental Attorney's Fees & Costs Filed by Deanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #530 ). (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 534 Declaration of BILL LANN LEE in Support of re #530 MOTION for an Award of Supplemental Attorney's Fees & Costs Filed by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #530 ). (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 533 Declaration of MORRIS J. BALLER in Support of re #530 MOTION for an Award of Supplemental Attorney's Fees & Costs Filed by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #530 ). (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 532 SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of CHARLES STEPHEN RALSTON & EXHIBITS in Support of re #530 MOTION for an Award of Supplemental Attorney's Fees & Costs Filed by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit EXHIBITS O-R TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF C RALSTON, #(2) Exhibit EXHIBITS S-U TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF C RALSTON, #(3) Exhibit EXHIBITS V TO Z TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF C RALSTON, #(4) Exhibit EXHIBITS AA-CC TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF C RALSTON, #(5) Exhibit NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING OF EXHIBITS DD-GG TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF C RALSTON). (Related document(s) #530 ). (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 531 Declaration of CHARLES STEPHEN RALSTON in Support of re #530 MOTION for an Award of Supplemental Attorney's Fees & Costs Filed by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit EXHIBIT N TO DECLARATION OF C RALSTON). (Related document(s) #530 ). (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
September 15, 2008 Filing 530 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for an Award of Supplemental Attorney's Fees & Costs Filed by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
August 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 529 STIPULATION AND ORDER to continue date for filing of motion. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/26/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2008)
August 25, 2008 Filing 528 STIPULATION re #526 Order, STIPULATION TO THE CONTINUANCE OF DATE FOR FILING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES by Deanna L. Freitag. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
August 21, 2008 Filing 527 NOTICE by Deanna L. Freitag Notice of Unavailability (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 8/21/2008)
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER re: attorneys' fees. Parties to meet and confer and notify Court in writing if they are able to reach agreement. If they cannot reach agreement, Plaintiff shall, by 09/01/08, file a motion for attorneys' fees, which shall be referred to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman for a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/25/08. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2008)
July 18, 2008 Filing 525 CLERK'S Letter Spreading re #524 Mandate to Counsel. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2008)
July 16, 2008 Filing 524 United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit MANDATE as to re #507 Notice of Appeal: Affirming the decision of the district court. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2008)
June 13, 2008 Filing 523 United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit ORDER as to re #507 Notice of Appeal. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2008)
May 5, 2008 Filing 522 United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit ORDER as to re #507 Notice of Appeal: Granting Appellee's Motion to Transfer Consideration of Attorneys' Fees to the District Court. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
April 9, 2008 Filing 521 NOTICE by Deanna L. Freitag Notice of Unavailability (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 4/9/2008)
October 2, 2007 Filing 520 United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit ORDER as to re #507 Notice of Appeal: Granting Motion Requesting Assignment of this Appeal to the Panel that decided Freitag v. Ayers et al, 468 F.3d 528 (9th Cir. 2006). Vacating the Court's 8/27/2007 Order Expediting this Appeal. This appeal shall be heard in the ordinary course. The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2007)
September 5, 2007 Filing 519 STIPULATION of the Parties to Retain Parts of the Record in the District Court by Robert J. Ayers, Jr. (Allen, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/5/2007)
August 9, 2007 Filing 518 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Held on 6/4/2007 before Judge Thelton E. Hendeson - [Court Reporter: Juanita Gonzalez]. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2007)
July 23, 2007 Filing 517 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATEMENT by Robert J. Ayers, Jr, Teresa Schwartz. (Manford, Richard) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER denying #514 Plaintiff's request for order of payment of funds from special deposit fund. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/20/07. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2007)
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER for Further Joint Status Statement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/18/07. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2007)
July 16, 2007 Filing 514 Proposed Order REQUIRING PAYMENT FROM SPECIAL DEPOSIT FUND by Deanna L. Freitag. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 7/16/2007)
July 16, 2007 Filing 513 Proposed Order re #512 Status Report PROPOSED ORDER ON FURTHER STATUS STATEMENT by Deanna L. Freitag. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 7/16/2007)
July 16, 2007 Filing 512 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT JULY 16 2007 by Deanna L. Freitag. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 7/16/2007)
July 13, 2007 Filing 511 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION & ORDERING FORM Filed by Defendants Auggie Lopez, California Department of Corrections, Robert J. Ayers, Jr, Teresa Schwartz, David A. Carmichael, G. Rodman, Paul Dillard, Barry O'Neill & George Neotti for Proceedings Held on 6/4/2007 before Judge Thelton E. Hendeson - [C/R: Juanita Gonzales]. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2007 (tn, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2007 Filing 510 USCA Case Number 07-16200 U.S. Court of Appeal for the Ninth Circuit for #507 Notice of Appeal, filed by Robert J. Ayers, Jr., Teresa Schwartz. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2007)
June 29, 2007 Filing 509 LETTER from Patty Conway, Legal Secretary to Deputy Attorney General Kathryn Allen, dated 6/28/2007 to Clerk Regarding Filing of Notice of Appeal and supporting documents. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2007)
June 29, 2007 COPY of Notice of Appeal & Docket Sheet Mailed to All Counsel. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2007)
June 29, 2007 TRANSMISSION of Notice of Appeal & Docket Sheet to United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit Re #507 Notice of Appeal. (tn, COURT STAFF)
June 28, 2007 Filing 508 NOTICE OF ORDERED TRANSCRIPT (Fed.R.App.P. 10; 9th Cir.Rule 10-3.1(a) Filed by Defendants Robert J. Ayers, Jr. & Teresa A. Schwartz for Proceedings Held on 6/4/2007 before Judge Thelton E. Henderson - [Court Reporter: Juanita Gonzales]. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2007)
June 28, 2007 Filing 507 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to the Court's Order re #504 Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion Re Remanded Issues Filed by Defendants Robert J. Ayers, Jr. & Teresa A. Schwartz - [Filing Fee: $455.00, Receipt Number 34611007772]. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2007)
June 28, 2007 RECEIVED DOCUMENT: Civil Appeal Docketing Statement in Support of re #507 Notice of Appeal Submitted by Defendants Robert L. Ayers, Jr. & Teresa A. Schwartz. (tn, COURT STAFF)
June 25, 2007 Filing 506 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles Stephen Ralston (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 16, 2007 Filing 505 NOTICE by Deanna L. Freitag NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 6/16/2007)
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER granting #494 Plaintiff's motion re: remanded issues. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/06/07. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2007)
June 4, 2007 Filing 503 Minute Entry: Hearing on the remanded issues held on 6/4/2007 before Judge Thelton E. Henderson. The matter is taken under submission. (Court Reporter: Juanita Gonzalez) (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/4/2007)
May 14, 2007 Filing 502 Declaration in Support of #500 Reply to Opposition DECLARATION OF CHARLES STEPHEN RALSTON filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A TO DECLARATION OF CHARLES STEPHEN RALSTON)(Related document(s) #500 ) (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 5/14/2007)
May 14, 2007 Filing 501 Declaration in Support of #500 Reply to Opposition SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF DEANNA L. FREITAG filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #500 ) (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 5/14/2007)
May 14, 2007 Filing 500 Reply to Opposition ON REMANDED ISSUES filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 5/14/2007)
May 8, 2007 Filing 499 [MANUAL FILING OF] APPENDEX OF EXHIBITS in Support of re #498 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Order on Issues Remanded by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals & DECLARATION of Deputy Attorney General Richard L. Manford in Support Thereof Filed by Defendants Robert J. Ayers, Jr. & Teresa Schwartz. (Related document(s) #498 ). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2007)
May 7, 2007 Filing 498 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to re #494 Plaintiff's Motion for Order on Issues Remanded by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Filed by Robert J. Ayers, Jr. & Teresa A. Schwartz. (Manford, Richard) (Filed on 5/7/2007)
April 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 497 STIPULATION AND ORDER awarding interim attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/25/07. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007)
April 24, 2007 Filing 496 [PROPOSED] STIPULATION, AGREEMENT AND REQUEST FOR ORDER AWARDING INTERIM ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS ATTRIBUTABLE TO PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS UNDER TYTLE VII Submitted by Parties California Department of Corrections, Robert J. Ayers, Jr, Teresa Schwartz & Deanna L. Freitag. (Allen, Kathryn) (Filed on 4/24/2007)
April 23, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing on Motion for an Order on Remanded Issues set for 6/4/2007 at 10:00 AM. (tn, COURT STAFF)
April 23, 2007 Filing 495 [PROPOSED] Order Granting Plaintiff's re #494 MOTION FOR AN ORDER ON REMANDED ISSUES Submitted by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 4/23/2007)
April 23, 2007 Filing 494 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for an Order on Remanded Issues Filed by Plaintiff Deanna J. Freitag. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 4/23/2007)
April 23, 2007 Filing 493 DECLARATION of Deanna L. Freitag in Support of re #492 Memorandum on Remanded Issues Filed by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #492 ). (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 4/23/2007)
April 23, 2007 Filing 492 MEMORANDUM in Support of re #494 Motion for an Order on Remand Issues Filed by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 4/23/2007)
April 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part #478 Motion for Interim Attorneys' Fees and ORDER setting briefing schedules. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2007)
April 16, 2007 Filing 490 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/16/2007 before Judge Thelton E. Henderson. The Motion for Award of Interim Attorney's Fees and Costs is granted in part and denied in part. (Court Reporter: Kathy Powell) (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2007)
April 10, 2007 Filing 489 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ON REMAND FROM APPEAL filed by Robert J. Ayers, Jr, Teresa Schwartz. (Manford, Richard) (Filed on 4/10/2007)
April 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER setting case management conference on 04/16/07 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/03/07. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2007)
April 3, 2007 Filing 487 OBJECTIONS to Reply to Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag For Award of Interim Attorney's Fees and Costs by California Department of Corrections. (Manford, Richard) (Filed on 4/3/2007)
April 2, 2007 Filing 486 Reply to Opposition re #478 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR INTERIM FEES AND COSTS REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 4/2/2007)
March 26, 2007 Filing 485 Memorandum in Opposition to re #478 Motion by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag for Award of Interim Attorney's Fees and Costs Filed by Defendants California Department of Corrections, Robert J. Ayers, Jr. & Teresa Schwartz. (Manford, Richard) (Filed on 3/26/2007)
March 23, 2007 Filing 484 CIVIL MINUTE ENTRY: [Court Reporter: Not Reported] Settlement Conference Held on 3/16/2007 before Mag. Judge Maria-Elena James. Parties Unable to Settle. Case Referred to TEH for Setting/Status. (Date Filed: 3/23/2007). (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/23/2007)
March 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER associating Vincent Scally as counsel for defendants. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/12/07. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2007)
March 8, 2007 Filing 482 NOTICE by California Department of Corrections, Robert J. Ayers, Jr, Teresa Schwartz of Unavailability of Counsel (Scally, Vincent) (Filed on 3/8/2007)
March 7, 2007 Filing 481 ASSOCIATION of Counsel for Defendants by California Department of Corrections, Robert J. Ayers, Jr, Teresa Schwartz. (Scally, Vincent) (Filed on 3/7/2007)
March 2, 2007 Filing 480 Proposed Order re #478 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR INTERIM FEES AND COSTS PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED ORDER by Deanna L. Freitag. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
March 2, 2007 Filing 479 Declaration in Support of #478 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR INTERIM FEES AND COSTS DECLARATION OF CHARLES STEPHEN RALSTON filed byDeanna L. Freitag. (Related document(s) #478 ) (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
March 2, 2007 Filing 478 Interim MOTION for Attorney Fees NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR INTERIM FEES AND COSTS filed by Deanna L. Freitag. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
February 27, 2007 Filing 477 NOTICE by Deanna L. Freitag NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL (Ralston, Charles) (Filed on 2/27/2007)
February 9, 2007 Filing 476 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Kathryn Allen and Association of Counsel for Defendants (Allen, Kathryn) (Filed on 2/9/2007)
January 31, 2007 APPEAL RECORD Returned re 389 , 402 & 358 Notice of Appeals. [received 13 main files & 7 expandos]. (tn, COURT STAFF)
January 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER re: association of counsel. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/09/07. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2007)
January 8, 2007 Filing 473 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Deanna L. Freitag. (Price, Pamela) (Filed on 1/8/2007)
January 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 474 NOTICE & ORDER OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Signed by Mag. Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/5/2007 Setting Further Settlement Conference to 3/16/2007 at 10:00 A.M.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2007)
January 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER designating case for electronic case filing (ECF). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/05/07. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2007 (rbe, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 1/3/2007: This Case is Referred to United StatesMagistrate Judge Maria-Elena James, the original settlement judge, for a Mandatory Settlement Conference on All Remanded Issues. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2007)
December 28, 2006 Filing 470 CLERK'S LETTER Spreading Mandate/Judgment re 469 to Counsel. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2006)
December 26, 2006 Filing 469 United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit CERTIFIED JUDGMENT as to 389 , 402 & 358 Notice of Appeals: The Judgment of the said District Court in this cause be, and hereby is AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART & REMANDED. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2006)
April 4, 2006 Filing 468 RECEIPT/ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Case Records from United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2006)
February 14, 2006 Certified & Transmitted Record on Appeal to United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit re 358 , 389 & 402 Notice of Appeals - [includes 13 Main Files & 7 Expandos]. (tn, COURT STAFF)
September 2, 2005 Filing 467 USCA Order: Appellee's motion for a 2nd extension of time to file the answering brief is granted and it is due 9/14/05. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. Any further delay in filing the answering brief is disfavored. [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
February 22, 2005 Filing 466 AMENDED TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form filed by defendants for dates ; ; appeal [402-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
February 22, 2005 CERTIFICATE of Record mailed to USCA, counsel notified., [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
February 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting Speical Master's 1-25-05 Report and Recommendation.The Special Master's Report if adopted in full. See order [464-1] ( Date Entered: 2/15/05) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
January 25, 2005 Filing 464 Special Master's Report and Recommendations: Re Pelican Bay State Prison title 15 Pilot Project and Operational Procedures to Manage Inmate Indecent Exposure Incidents. [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
October 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER denying Freitag's request for further injunctive relief, by Judge Thelton E. Henderson ( Date Entered: 10/18/04) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
October 8, 2004 Filing 462 DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant CA Dept of Correct re supplemental response [461-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
October 8, 2004 Filing 461 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE by defendant CA Dept of Correct re response to plaintiff's request for injunctive relief to mandate a new and separate policy prohibiting retaliation [458-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
October 4, 2004 Filing 460 Plaintiff's SupplementalMEMORANDUM of points and authorities in support of request for permanent relief to prohibit retaliation. [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
September 21, 2004 Filing 459 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR FURTHER INJUNCTIVE RELIEF TO PROHIBIT RETALIATION,plaintiff to file a statement by 10/1/04, that describes the relief she continues to seek following the parties meet and confer. Defendants shall file a response to plaintiff's statement by 10/8/04. Defendants to cite relevant case law to support any legal arguments made regarding plaintiff's entitlement to further injunctive relief.After defendants have filed their response, the matter will be deemed submitted. There will be no hearing unless ordered by the court. Judge Thelton E. Henderson ( Date Entered: 9/21/04) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
September 20, 2004 Filing 458 AMENDED RESPONSE to plaintiff's request for injunctive relief to mandate a new and separate policy prohibiting retaliation, by defendant CA Dept of Correct [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
September 17, 2004 Filing 457 STATUS REPORT re plaintiff's request for injunctive relief to prohibit retaliation by defendant CA Dept of Correct [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
August 25, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson The Court grants defendants request for a continuance to 10:00 am on 9/27/04. If defendants wish to file a written response to plaintiff's proposed remedial paln, they shall do so by 9/17/04. No further requests to continue the hearing date will be considered. ; ( Date Entered: 8/26/04) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
August 18, 2004 Filing 456 LETTER dated 8/17/04 to the Court form CA Attorney General regarding plaintiff's request for additional injunctive relief re retaliation [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
August 17, 2004 Filing 454 CERTIFIED COPY of USCA Order: Appellants' motion to further stay appellate proceedings is granted. These appeals are stayed until 10/29/04. On or before the expiration of the stay, appellants to file the opening brief or file a status report and an appropriate motion. If appellants file the opening brief, the answering brief shall be due ll/29/04: and the optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. The filing of the opening brief or failure to file a status report shall terminate the stay. [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
August 16, 2004 Filing 453 LETTER to the Court dated 8/13/04 from Price and Associates, enclosed: Original and one copy of Page 5 of the revised draft of Retaliation Policy. [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
August 12, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson Status conference re set for 10:00 AM on 9/8/04 ; ( Date Entered: 8/13/04) (cc: If Defendants wish to file a written response to Plaintiff's proposed remedial plan, they shall do so on or before 8/27/04. all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF) Modified on 08/13/2004
August 12, 2004 Filing 451 DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant CA Dept of Correction re Meet and Confer Efforts concerning plaintiff's rquest for additional injunctive relief re retaliation [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
August 9, 2004 Filing 450 STATUS REPORT re: Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief to prohibit retliation by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
August 4, 2004 Filing 449 CLERK'S NOTICE of return of Writ unsatisfied by the Sheriff's Department [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
August 4, 2004 WRIT on return not satisfied. 8/4/04 [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
July 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson adopting Special Master's Final Report and Recommendations regarding Inmate Exhibitionist Masterbation [434-1] ( Date Entered: 7/19/04) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
July 12, 2004 Filing 447 MINUTES: ( C/R Kathy Wyatt) ( Hearing Date: 7/12/04) Hearing on Special Master's Report held and continued to 10:00 AM, on 8/16/04 ;Ordered after hearing: Parties are to meet and confer. Plaintiff to file a report of the meeting and confer by 8/9/04: any response by the defendants is due by 8/12/04. [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
July 2, 2004 Filing 446 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 3/25/02 ( C/R: Diane E. Skillman) [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
July 1, 2004 REMARK four transcripts needed to send certificate of record to USCA.3/19/03, 3/29/03, 3/23/03 and 7/28/03 [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
June 28, 2004 Filing 445 CERTIFIED COPY of USCA Order: ppellants' motion to further stay appellate proceedings pending resolution of matters pending before the district court is granted. These appeals are stayed until 7/30,04. 03-16702, 03 17184 and 03 17398 [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
June 24, 2004 Filing 444 CLERK'S NOTICE the Court has scheduled a hearing at 10:00 am on 7/12/04, on Special Master's Final Report re Adequacy of PBSP's remedial plan filed 5/14/04 ; [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
June 7, 2004 Filing 443 OBJECTIONS by defendant CA Dept of Correct to brief [434-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
May 24, 2004 Filing 442 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form filed by defendant for dates March 4-7,11-14,18-21 2003 ;, March 25-27,29, April 01-2, 2003 Court Reporter Debra Pas: March 23, 2003 Court Reporter Diane Skillman: July 21, 2003 Court Reporter Rosita Flores: July 28, 2003, Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz, C/R: Debra Pas; appeal [402-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
May 21, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying request [438-1] The Court will not, at this time, order formal hearings on this issue. The Special Master shall arrange an informal meeting with the parties. ( Date Entered: 5/24/04) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
May 20, 2004 Filing 440 RESPONSE/LETTER by Steven Fama from the Prison Law Office dated 5/6/04 re request [438-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 20, 2004 Filing 439 RESPONSE/LETTER by Richard Manford dated 5/6/04 re request [438-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 20, 2004 Filing 438 REQUEST to Conduct Formal Hearings by Special Master dated 4/23/04 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF) Modified on 05/21/2004
May 19, 2004 Filing 437 CERTIFIED COPY of USCA Order: Appellant's motion for reinstatement of No. 03-17184 is granted. The clerk shall amend court records to reflect the docket fees have been paid in No. 03 17184. Appellants' motion to stay proceedings pending resolution of matters pending before the district court is granted. These appeals are stayed until 6/30/04. See order. [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
May 18, 2004 Filing 436 NOTICE by US Marshal's Service of return on Execution of Writ unsatisfied with added costs of $315.00 against judgment debtor California Department of Corrections. [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
May 18, 2004 Filing 435 NOTICE of Writ of Execution returned unsatisfied with added costs of $75.00 against Stte of California Department of Corrections by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
May 14, 2004 Filing 434 SPECIAL MASTER'S FINAL REPORT REGARDING ADEQUACY OF PELICAN BAY STATE PRISON REMEDIAL PLAN RE INMATE EXHIBITIONIST MASTURBATION. [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
April 22, 2004 Filing 433 CLERK's letter spreading the mandate to counsel. re appeal [389-1] for appeal 03 17184 only, dismissed [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
April 22, 2004 Filing 432 CERTIFIED COPY of USCA Order: dismissing the appeal [389-1] US Court of appeals Number 03-17184. US Court of Appeals numbers 03-16702 and 03 17398 remain open. The current briefing schedule continues to govern as to 03-16702 and 03 17398. [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2004 Filing 431 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 4/2/03; Volume 17, Pages 2847-2943 ( C/R: Debra L. Pas) [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2004 Filing 430 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 4/1/03; Volume 16, Pages 2605-2846 ( C/R: Debra L. Pas) [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2004 Filing 429 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 3/28/03; Volume 15, Pages 2431-2604 ( C/R: Debra L. Pas) [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2004 Filing 428 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 3/27/03; Volume 14, Pages 2311-2430 ( C/R: Debar L. Pas) [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2004 Filing 427 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 3/26/03; Volume 13, Pages 2130-2310 ( C/R: Debra L. Pas) [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2004 Filing 426 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 3/25/03; Volume 12, Pages 1914-2129 ( C/R: Debra L. Pas) [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2004 Filing 425 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 3/21/03; Volume 11, Pages 1690-1913 ( C/R: Debra L. Pas) [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2004 Filing 424 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 3/20/03; Volume 10, Pages 1497-1689 ( C/R: Debra L. Pas) [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2004 Filing 423 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 3/18/03; Volume 9, Pages 1329-1496 ( C/R: Debra L. Pas) [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2004 Filing 422 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 3/14/03; Volume 8, Pages 1158-1328 ( C/R: Debra L. Pas) [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2004 Filing 421 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 3/13/03; Volume 7, Pages 1017-1157 ( C/R: Debra L. Pas) [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2004 Filing 420 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 3/12/03; Volume 6, Pages 922-1016 ( C/R: Debra L. Pas) [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2004 Filing 419 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 3/11/03; Volume 5, Pages 728-921 ( C/R: Debra L. Pas) [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2004 Filing 418 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 3/7/03; Volume 3, Pages 562-727 ( C/R: Debra L. Pas) [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2004 Filing 417 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 3/6/03; Volume 3, Pages 420-561 ( C/R: Debra L. Pas) [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2004 Filing 416 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 3/5/03; Volume 2, Pages 189-419 ( C/R: Debra L. Pas) [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2004 Filing 415 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 3/4/03 ( C/R: Debra L. Pas) [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2004 RECEIVED re appeal [402-1] fee in amount of $ 255.00 ( Receipt # 3358497, 3358462) [3:00-cv-02278] (ys, COURT STAFF)
March 30, 2004 Filing 414 COPY of USCA Order: Within 14 days from the date of this order tender the fee to the district court and provide this court with verification of payment re Appeal No.03-17398. Court reporter Debra Pas' motion for an extension of time to file the reporter's transcript is granted. The transcript is due 4/19/04. This order waives the mandantory fee reduction provided that the transcripts are filed within the time allowed in this order. See order for briefing schedule. [3:00-cv-02278] (ys, COURT STAFF)
March 30, 2004 Filing 413 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 7/21/03 ( C/R: Rosita Flores) minutes [344-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (ys, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2004 Filing 412 CERTIFIED COPY of USCA Order: 03-17398, 03 16702 and 03 17184 are consolidated by the Court. Granted, Court Reporter Debra L. Pas's late motion for an extension of time to file the transcript, which is now due 3/18/04. This order waives the mandatory fee reduction provided that the transcripts are filed within the time allowed by this order. See order for briefing schedule. [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
January 6, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 411 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson : Protective order applys to all Department of Corrections documents provided to counsel for plaintiffs during the development of a remedial plan to address the problem of inmate exhibitionists.....see order. except those documents filed with the Court by Special Master John Hagar. (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
January 5, 2004 Filing 410 MINUTES: ( C/R Joan Columbini) ( Hearing Date: 1/5/04)Case Management Conference held.Ordered after hearing: Protective order signed in court. [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF) Modified on 01/07/2004
January 5, 2004 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 03-17398 [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
December 22, 2003 Filing 408 CERTIFIED COPY of USCA Order: for 03-16702 and 03-17184. Court Reporter has not finished transcript. Briefing schedules set by the court are vacated. A new briefing shcedule will be established when the transcript problem has been resolved. These appeals are consolidated. This appeal will not be selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. All further inguiries regarding this appeal, including requests for extensions of time, to be directed to the Clerk's Office. see order. [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
December 19, 2003 Filing 409 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiff and Defendant. [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
December 19, 2003 RECEIVED re appeal [402-1] fee in amount of $ 255.00 ( Receipt # 3354755) Notice to USCA. [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
December 18, 2003 Filing 407 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct of declaration [406-1], declaration [405-1], declaration [404-1], declaration [403-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
December 18, 2003 Filing 406 DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct re order [400-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
December 18, 2003 Filing 405 DECLARATION by Sue Griffith on behalf of defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct re order [400-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
December 18, 2003 Filing 404 DECLARATION by Glenda M. Clark on behalf of defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez re order [400-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
December 18, 2003 Filing 403 DECLARATION by William Dougherty on behalf of defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct re order [400-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
December 18, 2003 Copy of notice of appeal and docket sheet to all counsel [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
December 18, 2003 Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant (cc to USCA) [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
December 18, 2003 Docket fee notification form and case information sheet to USCA [402-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
December 17, 2003 Filing 402 NOTICE OF APPEAL by defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct from Dist. Court decision order [394-1] Fee status fee not paid, counsel billed. [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
December 8, 2003 Filing 401 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 8-11-03 ( C/R: Leo T. Mankiewicz) [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
December 4, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting motion for temporary restraining order staying execution of judgment [378-1], The November 10, 2003 temporary restraining order shall remain in effect through 12/19/03, or the date defendants have filed declarations. ( Date Entered: 12/8/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
December 4, 2003 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 03-17184 [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
December 4, 2003 RECEIVED re appeal [389-1] fee in amount of $ 255.00 receipt ( Receipt # 3354143) from Defendant CA Dept of Corrections. Notice to USCA [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
November 25, 2003 Filing 399 NOTICE by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [394-1] order [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
November 24, 2003 Filing 398 DECLARATION by Wendy Still on behalf of defendant re motion for temporary restraining order staying execution of judgment [378-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 24, 2003 Filing 397 REPLY by defendant re opposition [391-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 24, 2003 Filing 396 OBJECTIONS and Motion by defendant to strike evidence in support of opposition [391-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 24, 2003 Filing 395 OPPOSITION by defendant to objection [390-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 19, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 394 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson : granting motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [363-1] (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 17, 2003 Filing 393 DECLARATION by William C. McNeill on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in opposition to motion for order granting modified supersedeas stay of execution [371-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 17, 2003 Filing 392 DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in opposition to motion for order granting modified supersedeas stay of execution [371-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 17, 2003 Filing 391 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag to motion for order staying execution on judgment [370-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 17, 2003 Filing 390 OBJECTIONS and MOTION to Strike Evidence by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 17, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) dissolving TRO [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 17, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) re: motion for order staying execution on judgment [370-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 17, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) re: motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [363-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 14, 2003 Filing 389 NOTICE OF APPEAL by defendant from Dist. Court decision order [362-1] Fee status not paid [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 14, 2003 Copy of notice of appeal and docket sheet to all counsel [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 13, 2003 Filing 388 NOTICE of entry by defendant of [386-1] order [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 13, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson setting hearing on motion for order granting modified supersedeas stay of execution [371-1] 10:00 12/8/03, setting hearing on motion for order staying execution on judgment [370-1] 10:00 12/8/03 ( Date Entered: 11/17/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/17/2003
November 10, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting motion for temporary restraining order staying execution of judgment [378-1] ( Date Entered: 11/13/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 10, 2003 Filing 385 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant of order [377-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 10, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) stipulation to continue hearing on motion [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 10, 2003 Abstract of judgment issued against defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct in the amount of $ 600,300.00 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 7, 2003 Filing 384 Supplemental MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by defendant in support of motion for order granting modified supersedeas stay of execution [371-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 6, 2003 Filing 383 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant of declaration [382-1], order received [0-0], declaration [381-1], declaration [380-1], memorandum [379-1], motion for temporary restraining order staying execution of judgment [378-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 6, 2003 Filing 382 DECLARATION by William Dougherty on behalf of defendant re motion for temporary restraining order staying execution of judgment [378-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 6, 2003 Filing 381 DECLARATION by Wendy Still on behalf of defendant re motion for temporary restraining order staying execution of judgment [378-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 6, 2003 Filing 380 DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant re motion for temporary restraining order staying execution of judgment [378-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 6, 2003 Filing 379 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by defendant in support of motion for temporary restraining order staying execution of judgment [378-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 6, 2003 Filing 378 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by defendant for temporary restraining order staying execution of judgment [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 6, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant) re: motion for temporary restraining order staying execution of judgment [378-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 5, 2003 Abstract of judgment issued against defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct in the amount of $ 600,300.00 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 5, 2003 WRIT of Execution issued as to Deanna L. Freitag in the amount of $636,070.00 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 4, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson continuing the Status conference to 10:00 1/5/04 ; ( Date Entered: 11/7/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 3, 2003 Filing 376 NOTICE of hearing by defendant setting motion for order granting modified supersedeas stay of execution [371-1] ; hearing set for 10:00 12/1/03 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 3, 2003 Filing 375 NOTICE of hearing by defendant setting motion for order staying execution on judgment [370-1] ; hearing set for 10:00 12/1/03 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 3, 2003 Filing 374 STIPULATION to continue the 11/17/03 CMC to 01/05/04 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 31, 2003 Abstract of judgment issued against defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct in the amount of $ 600,300.00 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 27, 2003 Filing 373 DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in support of (second) writ [0-0] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 27, 2003 WRIT of Execution issued as to Deanna L. Freitag in the amount of $635,618.38 for Sacramento County [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 24, 2003 Filing 372 PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag of second motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 24, 2003 Filing 371 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by defendant for order granting modified supersedeas stay of execution with Notice set for 11/24/03 10:00 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 24, 2003 Filing 370 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by defendant for order staying execution on judgment [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 24, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant) re: motion for order granting modified supersedeas stay of execution [371-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 23, 2003 WRIT of Execution issued as to Deanna L. Freitag in the amount of $635,618.38 for Alameda County [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 23, 2003 WRIT of Execution issued as to Deanna L. Freitag in the amount of $635,618.38 for Solano County [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 22, 2003 Filing 369 AFFIDAVIT of interest on judgment [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 22, 2003 Filing 368 AFFIDAVIT of identity of Augustin Lopez [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 22, 2003 Filing 367 AFFIDAVIT of identity of Robert Ayers [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 22, 2003 WRIT of Execution issued as to Deanna L. Freitag in the amount of $635,618.38 in Del Norte County [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 22, 2003 WRIT of Execution issued as to Deanna L. Freitag in the amount of $635,618.38 in the County of Sacramento [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 21, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson vacating [363-1] motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs ( Date Entered: 10/22/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 20, 2003 Filing 365 DECLARATION by John L. Burris on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [363-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 20, 2003 Filing 364 DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [363-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 20, 2003 Filing 363 SECOND MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs with Notice set for 11/24/03 10:00 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/22/2003
October 20, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) re: motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [363-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 17, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1]; dfts shall pay plaintiff within 30 days of this order: $928,133.75 in attorney fees and $68,082.20 in non-statutory costs ( Date Entered: 10/21/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 17, 2003 COSTS taxed for Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in the amount of $ $25,417.47 against defendant (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 15, 2003 Filing 361 DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re bill of costs [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 7, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 360 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson : re plaintiff's second motion for award of attorneys fees and costs (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 2, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) stipulation re pla's second motion for award of attorneys fees and costs [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
September 19, 2003 Filing 359 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form filed by defendant for dates March 4-7, 11-14, 18-21, 25-27, 29; April 1-2; March 23; July 21; July 28, 2003 ; C/R: Debra Pas, Diane Skillman, Rosita Flores and Leo Mankiewicz; appeal [358-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
September 18, 2003 NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 3-16702 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2003 Copy of notice of appeal and docket sheet to all counsel [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
September 9, 2003 Filing 358 NOTICE OF APPEAL by defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct from Dist. Court decision Scheduling order Status conference set for 1:30 11/17/03 ; [355-1], order [355-2], Scheduling order terminating case ; appeal filing ddl 6/4/03 [276-1], judgment [276-2] Fee status paid [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
August 22, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson relating cases C03-3174 JCS ( Date Entered: 8/27/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
August 20, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 356 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson : re resolution of motion for attorneys fees (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
August 18, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part motion to amend judgment to include permanent injunctive relief [279-1] Status conference set for 1:30 11/17/03 ; ( Date Entered: 8/21/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
August 14, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) stipulation re resolution of motion for attorneys' fees [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
August 11, 2003 Filing 354 MINUTES: ( C/R Leo Mankiewicz) ( Hearing Date: 8/11/03) that the motion to amend judgment to include permanent injunctive relief [279-1] is submitted Status conference set for 10:00 11/17/03 ; [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
August 11, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying motion for a new trial [288-1] ( Date Entered: 8/15/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
August 11, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying motion for judgment as a matter of law [283-1] ( Date Entered: 8/15/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
August 11, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER re Third Supplemental Declaration in support of Motion for Attorneys Fees by Judge Thelton E. Henderson ( Date Entered: 8/15/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
August 11, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting motion for prejudgment and post-judgment interest [277-1] ( Date Entered: 8/15/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 30, 2003 Filing 349 Third Supplemental DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 29, 2003 Filing 348 Amended PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant of notice [345-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 28, 2003 Filing 347 MINUTES: ( C/R Claudia Blake) ( Hearing Date: 7/28/03) that the motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1] is submitted [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 25, 2003 Filing 346 NOTICE of Lodging of plaintiff's June 2003 billing statement by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 22, 2003 Filing 345 NOTICE of Lodging of original signature page to declaration of James Schratz by defendant [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 21, 2003 Filing 344 MINUTES: ( C/R Rosita Flores) ( Hearing Date: 7/21/03) that the motion for a new trial [288-1] is submitted, that the motion for judgment as a matter of law [283-1] is submitted, that the motion for prejudgment and post-judgment interest [277-1] is submitted [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 11, 2003 Filing 343 Second Supplemental DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 11, 2003 Filing 342 NOTICE of hearing by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag setting motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1] ; hearing set for 10:00 7/28/03 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 9, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson vacating hearing re motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1] ( Date Entered: 7/15/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 9, 2003 Filing 340 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in opposition to motion for a new trial [288-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 8, 2003 Filing 339 NOTICE by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag of related case(s) C03-3174 JCS [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 8, 2003 Filing 338 NOTICE of entry by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag of [313-1] order [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 7, 2003 Filing 337 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant of reply [336-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 7, 2003 Filing 336 REPLY by defendant re opposition [319-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 7, 2003 Filing 335 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant of declaration [334-1], reply [333-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 7, 2003 Filing 334 DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant in reply to opposition [317-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 7, 2003 Filing 333 REPLY by defendant re opposition [317-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 7, 2003 Filing 332 Supplemental DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 7, 2003 Filing 331 REPLY Brief by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for prejudgment and post-judgment interest [277-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 7, 2003 Filing 330 REPLY Brief by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 2, 2003 Filing 329 Amended PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 2, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) re: motion for a new trial [288-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 30, 2003 Filing 328 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant of declaration [327-1], declaration [326-1], opposition memorandum [325-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 30, 2003 Filing 327 DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant in opposition to motion for prejudgment and post-judgment interest [277-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 30, 2003 Filing 326 DECLARATION by Marybelle D. Archibald on behalf of defendant in support of opposition memorandum [325-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 30, 2003 Filing 325 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by defendant in opposition to motion for prejudgment and post-judgment interest [277-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 30, 2003 Filing 324 PROOF OF personal SERVICE by defendant CA Dept of Correct of declaration [323-1], request [322-1], opposition [321-1], opposition [320-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 30, 2003 Filing 323 DECLARATION by James P. Schratz on behalf of defendant CA Dept of Correct re opposition [320-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 30, 2003 Filing 322 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by defendant CA Dept of Correct in opposition to motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1], motion to amend judgment to include permanent injunctive relief [279-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 30, 2003 Filing 321 OPPOSITION by defendant CA Dept of Correct to motion to amend judgment to include permanent injunctive relief [279-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 30, 2003 Filing 320 OPPOSITION by defendant CA Dept of Correct to motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 30, 2003 Filing 319 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag to motion for a new trial [288-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 30, 2003 Filing 318 DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in opposition to motion for a new trial [288-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 30, 2003 Filing 317 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag to motion for judgment as a matter of law [283-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 30, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) re: motion for judgment as a matter of law [283-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 20, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson setting hearing on motion to amend judgment to include permanent injunctive relief [279-1] 10:00 8/11/03 ( Date Entered: 6/23/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 20, 2003 Filing 315 DECLARATION by Darryl Parker on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 20, 2003 Filing 314 DECLARATION by Deanna L. Freitag re motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 20, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 313 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson : continuing the deadlines for filing declarations in support of attorneyss fees and non-statutory costs motion until 6/20/03 (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 19, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) stipulation continuing the deadlines [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 13, 2003 Filing 312 NOTICE of entry of stipulated order re date for hearing on pending motions by defendant [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 12, 2003 Filing 311 PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag of declaration [307-1], declaration [306-1], declaration [305-1], declaration [304-1], declaration [303-1], declaration [302-1], declaration [301-1], motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 12, 2003 Filing 310 TABLE OF CONTENTS AND AUTHORITIES by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 12, 2003 Filing 309 NOTICE of hearing by defendant setting motion for judgment as a matter of law [283-1] ; hearing set for 10:00 7/21/03 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 12, 2003 Filing 308 NOTICE of hearing by defendant setting motion for a new trial [288-1] ; hearing set for 10:00 7/21/03 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 12, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) re: motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 9, 2003 Filing 307 DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 9, 2003 Filing 306 DECLARATION by John L. Burris on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 9, 2003 Filing 305 DECLARATION by William C. McNeill on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 9, 2003 Filing 304 DECLARATION by Howard Moore on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 9, 2003 Filing 303 DECLARATION by Andrew C. Schwartz on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 9, 2003 Filing 302 DECLARATION by Michael C. Douglass on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 9, 2003 Filing 301 DECLARATION by James B. Chanin on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs [300-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 9, 2003 Filing 300 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag for award of attorney fees and non-statutory costs with Notice set for 7/21/03 at 10:00 a.m. [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 6, 2003 Filing 299 NOTICE of entry by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag of [298-1] order [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 5, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 298 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson : continuing the deadlines re plaintiff's attorneys fees and non-statutory costs motion (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 3, 2003 Filing 297 NOTICE of hearing by defendant setting motion for a new trial [288-1] ; hearing set for 10:00 7/21/03, motion for judgment as a matter of law [283-1] ; hearing set for 10:00 7/21/03 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 2, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) stipulation continuing the deadlines re plaintiff's attorneys fees and non-statutory costs motion [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 20, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) stipulation continuing the deadlines re plaintiff's attorneys fees [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 19, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 296 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson : continuing the deadline for filing plaintiff's motion for attorneys fees and non-statutory costs to 6/3/03 (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 19, 2003 Filing 293 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct of order received [0-0], declaration [292-1], declaration [291-1], declaration [290-1], memorandum [289-1], motion for a new trial [288-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 19, 2003 Filing 292 DECLARATION by Cindy Ranzenberger on behalf of defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct re motion for a new trial [288-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 19, 2003 Filing 291 DECLARATION by Marybelle D. Archibald on behalf of defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct re motion for a new trial [288-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 19, 2003 Filing 290 DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct re motion for a new trial [288-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 19, 2003 Filing 289 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct in support of motion for a new trial [288-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 19, 2003 Filing 288 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct for a new trial with Notice set for 6/23/03 10:00 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 19, 2003 Filing 287 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct of order received [0-0] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 19, 2003 Filing 286 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct of declaration [285-1], memorandum [284-1], motion for judgment as a matter of law [283-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 19, 2003 Filing 285 DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct re motion for judgment as a matter of law [283-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 19, 2003 Filing 284 POINTS AND AUTHORITIES by defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct in support of motion for judgment as a matter of law [283-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 19, 2003 Filing 283 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct for judgment as a matter of law with Notice set for 6/23/03 10:00 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 19, 2003 Filing 282 BILL OF COSTS submitted by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re judgment [276-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 19, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct ) re: motion for judgment as a matter of law [283-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 19, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct ) re: motion for a new trial [288-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2003 Filing 281 PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag of order received [0-0], declaration [280-1], motion to amend judgment to include permanent injunctive relief [279-1], order received [0-0], declaration [278-1], motion for prejudgment and post-judgment interest [277-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2003 Filing 280 DECLARATION by Deanna L. Freitag re motion to amend judgment to include permanent injunctive relief [279-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2003 Filing 279 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag to amend judgment to include permanent injunctive relief with Notice set for 6/23/03 10:00 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2003 Filing 278 DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for prejudgment and post-judgment interest [277-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2003 Filing 277 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag for prejudgment and post-judgment interest with Notice set for 6/23/03 10:00 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) re: motion for prejudgment and post-judgment interest [277-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) re: motion to amend judgment to include permanent injunctive relief [279-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 5, 2003 Filing 276 JUDGMENT: by Judge Thelton E. Henderson terminating case ; appeal filing ddl 6/4/03 ( Date Entered: 5/5/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
April 21, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying motion for judgment as a matter of law ( Date Entered: 4/23/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
April 8, 2003 Filing 263 TRIAL EXHIBITS --- includes one box of binders located on BIN 11. An appointment is needed at all times to view any exhibit. [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
April 3, 2003 Filing 295 TRIAL MINUTES: ( C/R Debra Pas) ( Hearing Date: 4/3/03) Jury trial ended ; verdict read [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
April 3, 2003 Filing 294 JURY NOTE(S) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
April 3, 2003 Filing 274 TRIAL Sheet [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
April 3, 2003 Filing 273 VERDICT (Form) for Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
April 3, 2003 Filing 272 Final JURY INSTRUCTIONS [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2003 Filing 271 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2003 Filing 270 OPPOSITION by defendant to plaintiff's 3/31/03 list of exhibits for admission [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2003 Filing 269 TRIAL MINUTES: ( C/R Debra Pas) ( Hearing Date: 4/2/03) jury instructions read; jury begin to deliberate; the Court discussed special verdict form, exhibits and jury questions Jury trial will be held 8:30 4/3/03 ; [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
April 1, 2003 Filing 268 TRIAL MINUTES: ( C/R Debra Pas) ( Hearing Date: 4/1/03) Counsel read deposition transcripts; Deanna Freitag recalled to the stand; parties rest; closing arguments made Jury trial will be held 8:30 4/2/03 ; [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 31, 2003 Filing 267 Defendants' Proposed Special Verdict form [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 31, 2003 Filing 266 OBJECTIONS by defendant to remark [265-1] proposed reading of deposition testimony in rebuttal [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 31, 2003 Filing 265 Plaintiff's proposed rebuttal deposition testimony excerpts [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 31, 2003 Filing 264 Proposed special instruction no. 24 submitted by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 31, 2003 RECEIVED proposed special verdict submitted by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 28, 2003 Filing 262 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff to jury [259-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 28, 2003 Filing 261 TRIAL MINUTES: ( C/R Debra Pas) ( Hearing Date: 3/28/03) Carl Larson testified [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 27, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 260 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson : allowing lodging of certified copies of reporters' transcripts of depositions in lieu of originals (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
March 27, 2003 Filing 259 PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTION NOS. 22 AND 23 submitted by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
March 27, 2003 Filing 258 TRIAL MINUTES: ( C/R Debra Pas) ( Hearing Date: 3/27/03) The following witnesses testified: R. Ayers and Julian Case by way of deposition. Rule 50 Motion -- granted in part / denied in part; defendants' Rule 403 motion -- denied. [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
March 26, 2003 Filing 257 TRIAL MINUTES: ( C/R Debra Pas) ( Hearing Date: 3/26/03) The following witnesses testified: William Wels, Paul Dillard, Cal Terhune by way of deposition, Robert Ayers,and Von Philips Scheltz. [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
March 25, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson directing the Jury Administrator not to pay Andrew Swierstra an attendance fee or travel allowance. The Court finds that Mr. Swierstra did not render "service" as a juror within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1871(b)(1) and (c)(1) ( Date Entered: 3/27/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
March 25, 2003 Filing 255 TRIAL MINUTES: ( C/R Debra Pas) ( Hearing Date: 3/25/03) The following witnesses testified: Guy E. Tracy, Ramon Lpez, II, Ballard, Jr., Francis King, Larry J. Rives, Brian Kingston, Joseph McGrath, Vincent Schumacker, and Francis King. [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
March 25, 2003 RECEIVED Stipulation and Order Allowing Lodging of Certified Copies of Repoeters' Transcripts of Depositions in Lieu of Originals submitted by defendants [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
March 21, 2003 Filing 254 TRIAL MINUTES: ( C/R Debra Pas) ( Hearing Date: 3/21/03) The following witnesses testified: Dr. Lerchin, testimony of Robert J. Druesel read into the record, Chris Todd, Robert Rice, Joel Pena, Nan Udell, and Guy E. Tracy. [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
March 18, 2003 Filing 253 TRIAL MINUTES: ( C/R Debra Pas) ( Hearing Date: 3/18/03) Witnesses called were Augustine Lopez, Paul Dillard, Tanya Young to read testimony of Matthew Jamison & Wayne Hawthorne into the record, Carol Highland, Dr. Richard Palfin. [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
March 14, 2003 Filing 252 TRIAL MINUTES: ( C/R Debra Pas) ( Hearing Date: 3/14/03) Jury trial resumes with continued direct exam of witness Nayoni. Plaintiff called Sgt. Ricky Graves, CO Carla Beth Wood, and AW Harry O'Neill. Jury trial continued to 8:30 a.m. on 3/18/03 ; [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
March 13, 2003 Filing 251 TRIAL MINUTES: ( C/R Debra Pas) ( Hearing Date: 3/13/03) David Carmichael, Glen Rodman, Richard Boyce and George Neotti testified. [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
March 12, 2003 Filing 250 TRIAL MINUTES: ( C/R Debra Pas) ( Hearing Date: 3/12/03) Teresa Schwartz finished testimony; William Wells testified; Juror #7 excused from service. [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
March 11, 2003 Filing 249 TRIAL MINUTES: ( C/R Debra Pas) ( Hearing Date: 3/11/03) Deanna Freitag finished testifying; Richard Newton testified; Teresa Schwartz began testimony. [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
March 10, 2003 Filing 248 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion in limine no. 6 to exclude defense expert Tod Roy [146-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rcs, COURT STAFF)
March 10, 2003 Filing 247 LETTER BRIEF FILED by defendant re the proposed testimony of defense expert witness Tod Roy [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 7, 2003 Filing 246 TRIAL MINUTES: ( C/R Debra Pas) ( Hearing Date: 3/7/03) Dr. Harry Lesch and William Ramsdell testified [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 7, 2003 Filing 245 NOTICE of Lodging of Exhibit 608 by defendant [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 6, 2003 Filing 244 TRIAL MINUTES: ( C/R Debra Pas) ( Hearing Date: 3/6/03) Dawn Melton and Deanna Freitag testified [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 5, 2003 Filing 243 TRIAL MINUTES: ( C/R Debra Pas) ( Hearing Date: 3/5/03) Kismet Mayo, Melissa Cruse, Darla Aguirre and Ken Katsaris testified; plaintiff's exhibits #3-9 and #62 marked and admitted [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 4, 2003 Filing 242 TRIAL MINUTES: ( C/R Debra Pas) ( Hearing Date: 3/4/03) that the motion in limine to exclude from evidence the 2/23/00 inmate riot [159-1] is submitted, that the motion in limine no. 6 to exclude defense expert Tod Roy [146-1] is submitted Jury trial began ; jury voir dire, impaneled and sworn in; opening statements made [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 4, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting motion for order for admission and use of audio equipment and easel during trial [239-1] ( Date Entered: 3/6/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 4, 2003 Filing 240 Second Amended EXHIBIT list by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 3, 2003 Filing 239 EX-PARTE APPLICATION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag for order for admission and use of audio equipment and easel during trial [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 3, 2003 Filing 238 Supplemental MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in limine to exclude evidence of plaintiff's relationship with Jose Garcia [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 3, 2003 Filing 237 EX-PARTE APPLICATION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag for leave to file supplemental in limine motion no. 2 to exclude evidence of plaintiff's relationship with Jose Garcia [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 3, 2003 Filing 236 NOTICE of lodging of exhibits 375 and 324-A by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 25, 2003 Filing 235 NOTICE of lodging original reporters' trancripts of depositions by defendant [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 24, 2003 Filing 234 Proposed Special INSTRUCTION No. 26 submitted by defendant [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 21, 2003 Filing 233 Proposed Court VOIR DIRE questions of the trial venire submitted by defendant [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 21, 2003 Filing 232 NOTICE of lodging of plaintiff's exhibits by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 20, 2003 Filing 231 NOTICE of entry by defendant of [221-1] order [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 20, 2003 Filing 230 Second Amended EXHIBIT list by defendant for inclusion in the joint pretrial statement [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 18, 2003 Filing 229 NOTICE of lodging of deposition exhibit nos. 317, 319 and 325 by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 18, 2003 Filing 228 Amended NOTICE of lodging of deposition exhibits by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 14, 2003 Filing 227 NOTICE of lodging of deposition exhibit by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 14, 2003 Filing 226 Proposed VOIR DIRE questions submitted by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 14, 2003 Filing 225 NOTICE of lodging of deposition exhibits by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 14, 2003 Filing 224 Statement by defendant CA Dept of Correct in NON-Opposition to request [205-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 14, 2003 Filing 223 MINUTES: ( C/R Joan Columbini) ( Hearing Date: 2/14/03) vacating [172-1] motion to shorten time on motion to quash subpoena [170-1], denying motion to quash subpoena [170-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 14, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part motion in limine to exclude from evidence opinion testimony by expert witness W. Ken Katsaris [166-1], granting motion in limine to exclude from evidence non-confirmation by CA Senate of Robert L. Ayers, Jr. [164-1], granting motion in limine to exclude from evidence plaintiff's performance evaluation of January 2000 [162-1], granting in part and denying in part motion in limine to exclude from evidence investigation report prepared by CA Office of Inspector General [161-1], that the motion in limine to exclude from evidence the 2/23/00 inmate riot [159-1] is submitted, denying motion in limine no. 11 to exclude from evidence drawings made by inmate Wheeler [158-1], denying motion in limine no. 9 to exclude from evidence anonymous statement [157-1], denying motion in limine no. 8 to exclude from evidence specific acts of alleged adverse employment action [155-1], granting motion in limine no. 7 to exclude from evidence allegations by plaintiff concerning certain events [154-1], granting motion in limine no. 6 to exclude from evidence alleged comment by defendant Lopez [153-1], denying motion in limine no. 5 to exclude from evidence alleged comment by defendant Rodman [152-1], denying motion in limine no. 3 to exclude from evidence lay opinion testimony by other female correctional officers [151-1], denying motion in limine no. 7 to exclude defense expert Carl M. Larson [147-1], that the motion in limine no. 6 to exclude defense expert Tod Roy [146-1] is submitted, granting motion in limine no. 5 to preclude "sweetheart" cross-examinations [145-1], denying motion in limine no. 4 to exclude evidence of workers compensation claims [144-1], denying motion in limine no. 3 to exclude internal affairs reports [143-1], denying motion in limine no. 2 to exclude evidence of pre-9/98 complaints and involvement in Jose Garcia case [142-1], denying motion in limine no. 1 to preclude dft CDC from offering evidence of remedial measures [141-1] ( Date Entered: 2/20/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 12, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson for admission of and use of audio-visual equipment and physical objects during trial ( Date Entered: 2/20/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 11, 2003 Filing 220 PROOF OF SERVICE of declaration [219-1], brief [218-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 11, 2003 Filing 219 DECLARATION by Nancy A. Beninati re brief [218-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 11, 2003 Filing 218 Supplemental BRIEF FILED by non-parties regarding motion to quash subpoena [170-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 10, 2003 Filing 217 LETTER dated 2/4/03 from Pamela Y. Price to Judge Henderson [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 10, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant) Amended application for admission and use of audio-visual equipment during trial [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 7, 2003 Filing 216 DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in opposition to motion to quash subpoena [170-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 7, 2003 Filing 215 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag to motion to quash subpoena [170-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 7, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) re: motion to quash subpoena [170-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 7, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson Jury trial will be held 8:30 2/25/03 ; ( Date Entered: 2/12/03) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2003 Filing 213 Master EXHIBIT list by defendant [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2003 Filing 212 NOTICE of lodging of exhibit no. 349 by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2003 Filing 211 NOTICE of Lodging of Deposition Exhibits by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant) application for admission of and use of audio-visual equipment during trial [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 4, 2003 Filing 210 Plaintiff's EXHIBITS [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 4, 2003 Filing 209 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag to defendants' proposed special jury instructions [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 4, 2003 Filing 208 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant of opposition [206-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 4, 2003 Filing 207 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant of defendants' trial exhibits [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 4, 2003 Filing 206 OPPOSITION by defendant to jury [138-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 3, 2003 Filing 205 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag as to defendant CDC's annual budget for Pelican Bay State Prison [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 3, 2003 Filing 204 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag to defendants' request for judicial notice nos. 1-4 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 30, 2003 Filing 203 MINUTES: ( C/R Sahar McVickar) ( Hearing Date: 1/30/03) pretrial held [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 30, 2003 Filing 202 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr. of opposition [181-1], opposition [180-1], opposition [179-1], opposition [178-1], opposition [177-1], opposition [176-1], opposition statement [175-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 30, 2003 Filing 201 Amended EXHIBIT list by defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr. for inclusion of joint pretrial statement [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 30, 2003 Filing 200 Proposed Special JURY INSTRUCTION No. 21 submitted by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 30, 2003 Filing 199 PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag of list [195-1], declaration [194-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 30, 2003 Filing 198 Statement by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in NON-Opposition to motion in limine to exclude from evidence plaintiff's performance evaluation of January 2000 [162-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 30, 2003 Filing 197 Statement by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in NON-Opposition to motion in limine to exclude from evidence non-confirmation by CA Senate of Robert L. Ayers, Jr. [164-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 29, 2003 Filing 196 AMENDMENT by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag to motion in limine no. 2 to exclude evidence of pre-9/98 complaints and involvement in Jose Garcia case [142-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 29, 2003 Filing 195 Amended Witness List submitted by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 29, 2003 Filing 194 Supplemetal DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in opposition to motion in limine to exclude from evidence opinion testimony by expert witness W. Ken Katsaris [166-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2003 Filing 193 PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag of opposition [192-1], declaration [191-1], opposition [190-1], opposition [189-1], opposition [188-1], opposition [187-1], opposition [186-1], opposition statement [185-1], opposition statement [184-1], opposition [183-1], opposition [182-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2003 Filing 192 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag to motion in limine to exclude from evidence investigation report prepared by CA Office of Inspector General [161-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2003 Filing 191 DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in opposition to motion in limine to exclude from evidence opinion testimony by expert witness W. Ken Katsaris [166-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2003 Filing 190 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag to motion in limine to exclude from evidence opinion testimony by expert witness W. Ken Katsaris [166-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2003 Filing 189 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag to motion in limine to exclude from evidence the 2/23/00 inmate riot [159-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2003 Filing 188 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag to motion in limine no. 11 to exclude from evidence drawings made by inmate Wheeler [158-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2003 Filing 187 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag to motion in limine no. 9 to exclude from evidence anonymous statement [157-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2003 Filing 186 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag to motion in limine no. 8 to exclude from evidence specific acts of alleged adverse employment action [155-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2003 Filing 185 Statement by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in NON-Opposition to motion in limine no. 7 to exclude from evidence allegations by plaintiff concerning certain events [154-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2003 Filing 184 Statement by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in NON-Opposition to motion in limine no. 6 to exclude from evidence alleged comment by defendant Lopez [153-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2003 Filing 183 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag to motion in limine no. 5 to exclude from evidence alleged comment by defendant Rodman [152-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2003 Filing 182 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag to motion in limine no. 3 to exclude from evidence lay opinion testimony by other female correctional officers [151-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2003 Filing 181 OPPOSITION by defendant to motion in limine no. 7 to exclude defense expert Carl M. Larson [147-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2003 Filing 180 OPPOSITION by defendant to motion in limine no. 6 to exclude defense expert Tod Roy [146-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2003 Filing 179 OPPOSITION by defendant to motion in limine no. 4 to exclude evidence of workers compensation claims [144-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2003 Filing 178 OPPOSITION by defendant to motion in limine no. 3 to exclude internal affairs reports [143-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2003 Filing 177 OPPOSITION by defendant to motion in limine no. 2 to exclude evidence of pre-9/98 complaints and involvement in Jose Garcia case [142-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2003 Filing 176 OPPOSITION by defendant to motion in limine no. 1 to preclude dft CDC from offering evidence of remedial measures [141-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2003 Filing 175 Statement by defendant in NON-Opposition to motion in limine no. 5 to preclude "sweetheart" cross-examinations [145-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 24, 2003 Filing 174 PROOF OF SERVICE of declaration [173-1], order received [0-0], motion to shorten time on motion to quash subpoena [170-1] [172-1], order received [0-0], declaration [171-1], motion to quash subpoena [170-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 24, 2003 Filing 173 DECLARATION by Nancy A. Beninati re motion to shorten time on motion to quash subpoena [170-1] [172-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 24, 2003 Filing 172 MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson to shorten time on motion to quash subpoena [170-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 24, 2003 Filing 171 DECLARATION by Anthony Lewis re motion to quash subpoena [170-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 24, 2003 Filing 170 MOTION by non-parties before Judge Thelton E. Henderson to quash subpoena [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 24, 2003 Filing 169 NOTICE by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag of association of attorney John L. Burris [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 24, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( ) re: motion to shorten time on motion to quash subpoena [170-1] [172-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 24, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( ) re: motion to quash subpoena [170-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 168 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant of notice [150-1], notice [149-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 167 DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant re motion in limine to exclude from evidence opinion testimony by expert witness W. Ken Katsaris [166-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 166 MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by defendant in limine to exclude from evidence opinion testimony by expert witness W. Ken Katsaris [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 165 DECLARATION by Robert L. Ayers, Jr. on behalf of defendant re motion in limine to exclude from evidence non-confirmation by CA Senate of Robert L. Ayers, Jr. [164-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 164 MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by defendant in limine to exclude from evidence non-confirmation by CA Senate of Robert L. Ayers, Jr. [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 163 DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant re motion in limine to exclude from evidence plaintiff's performance evaluation of January 2000 [162-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 162 MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by defendant in limine to exclude from evidence plaintiff's performance evaluation of January 2000 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 161 MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by defendant in limine to exclude from evidence investigation report prepared by CA Office of Inspector General [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 160 DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant re motion in limine to exclude from evidence the 2/23/00 inmate riot [159-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 159 MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by defendant in limine to exclude from evidence the 2/23/00 inmate riot [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 158 MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by defendant in limine no. 11 to exclude from evidence drawings made by inmate Wheeler [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 157 MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by defendant in limine no. 9 to exclude from evidence anonymous statement [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 156 DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant re motion in limine no. 8 to exclude from evidence specific acts of alleged adverse employment action [155-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 155 MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by defendant in limine no. 8 to exclude from evidence specific acts of alleged adverse employment action [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 154 MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by defendant in limine no. 7 to exclude from evidence allegations by plaintiff concerning certain events [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 153 MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by defendant in limine no. 6 to exclude from evidence alleged comment by defendant Lopez [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 152 MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by defendant in limine no. 5 to exclude from evidence alleged comment by defendant Rodman [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 151 MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by defendant in limine no. 3 to exclude from evidence lay opinion testimony by other female correctional officers [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 150 Proposed Special Instructions by defendant [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 149 Proposed Special Verdict Form by defendant [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 148 PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag of motion in limine no. 7 to exclude defense expert Carl M. Larson [147-1], motion in limine no. 6 to exclude defense expert Tod Roy [146-1], motion in limine no. 4 to exclude evidence of workers compensation claims [144-1], motion in limine no. 3 to exclude internal affairs reports [143-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 147 MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in limine no. 7 to exclude defense expert Carl M. Larson [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 146 MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in limine no. 6 to exclude defense expert Tod Roy [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 145 MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in limine no. 5 to preclude "sweetheart" cross-examinations [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 144 MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in limine no. 4 to exclude evidence of workers compensation claims [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 143 MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in limine no. 3 to exclude internal affairs reports [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 142 MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in limine no. 2 to exclude evidence of pre-9/98 complaints and involvement in Jose Garcia case [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 141 MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in limine no. 1 to preclude dft CDC from offering evidence of remedial measures [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 Filing 140 AMENDED JOINT PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) association of counsel [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant) re: motion in limine to exclude from evidence the 2/23/00 inmate riot [159-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant) re: motion in limine no. 5 to exclude from evidence alleged comment by defendant Rodman [152-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant) re: motion in limine to exclude from evidence investigation report prepared by CA Office of Inspector General [161-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant) re: motion in limine to exclude from evidence plaintiff's performance evaluation of January 2000 [162-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant) re: motion in limine to exclude from evidence opinion testimony by expert witness W. Ken Katsaris [166-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant) re: motion in limine no. 11 to exclude from evidence drawings made by inmate Wheeler [158-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant) re: motion in limine to exclude from evidence non-confirmation by CA Senate of Robert L. Ayers, Jr. [164-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant) re: motion in limine no. 6 to exclude from evidence alleged comment by defendant Lopez [153-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant) re: motion in limine no. 9 to exclude from evidence anonymous statement [157-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant) re: motion in limine no. 7 to exclude from evidence allegations by plaintiff concerning certain events [154-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2003 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant) re: motion in limine no. 8 to exclude from evidence specific acts of alleged adverse employment action [155-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 17, 2003 Filing 139 PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag of jury [138-1], notice [137-1], notice [136-1], statement [135-1], report [134-1], jury [133-1], jury [132-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 17, 2003 Filing 138 Proposed Special JURY INSTRUCTIONS submitted by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 17, 2003 Filing 137 DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS, Richard A. Palfin, Ph.D. by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 17, 2003 Filing 136 DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Carol Hyland, rehabilitation consultant by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 17, 2003 Filing 135 Joint STATEMENT re the proposed jury instruction meet and confer by Plaintiff, defendant [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 17, 2003 Filing 134 JOINT PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 17, 2003 Filing 133 Joint Proposed Ninth Circuit Model Civil JURY INSTRUCTIONS submitted by Plaintiff, defendant [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 17, 2003 Filing 132 Joint Proposed Special JURY INSTRUCTIONS submitted by Plaintiff, defendant [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 3, 2003 Filing 131 STATEMENT of meet and confer re preparation of joint PTC statement and settlement by Plaintiff, defendant [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 2, 2003 Filing 130 CLERK'S NOTICE Pretrial conference set for 10:00 1/30/03 ; [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
December 5, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Mag. Judge Maria-Elena James: GRANTING dfts' request that individual defendants be excused from personally appearing; DENYING pla's request to be excused from personally appearing at the settlement conference ( Date Entered: 12/11/02) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
December 5, 2002 Filing 128 LETTER dated 12/4/02 from Pamela Y. Price to Mag. Judge James re appearance at the settlement conference [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
December 2, 2002 Filing 127 LETTER dated 12/2/02 from Richard L. Manford to Mag. Judge James [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 28, 2002 Filing 126 LETTER dated 10/25/02 from Richard L. Manford, Pamela Y. Price continuing settlement conference to 12/18/02 at 2:00 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 28, 2002 Docket Modification (Administrative) to letter [126-1] Settlement conf. (Mag) at 2:00 12/18/02 ; [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 25, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying motion for reconsideration of order dismissing equal protection claims [118-1] ( Date Entered: 7/30/02) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 22, 2002 Filing 124 NOTICE of Unavailability by Pamela Price [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 8, 2002 RECEIVED letter from Pamela Price re continuation of settlement conference from 3/26/02 to 10/28/02 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 3, 2002 Filing 123 POINTS and AUTHORITIES by defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant David A. Carmichael, defendant G. Rodman, defendant Paul Dillard, defendant Barry O'Neill, defendant George Neotti, defendant Auggie Lopez in opposition to motion for reconsideration of order dismissing equal protection claims [118-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 29, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part motion for leave to file third amended complaint [109-1] ( Date Entered: 6/3/02) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 22, 2002 Filing 117 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [3-1] by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag; jury demand (document originally received on 12/18/00) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF) (msrS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2002 Filing 121 DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for leave to file third amended complaint [109-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 20, 2002 Filing 120 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag motion for reconsideration of order dismissing equal protection claims [118-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 20, 2002 Filing 119 REPLY BRIEF by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for leave to file third amended complaint [109-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 20, 2002 Filing 118 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag for reconsideration of order dismissing equal protection claims [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 20, 2002 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) re: motion for reconsideration of order dismissing equal protection claims [118-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 13, 2002 Filing 116 DECLARATION by Andrea R. Austin on behalf of defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant David A. Carmichael, defendant G. Rodman, defendant Paul Dillard, defendant Barry O'Neill, defendant George Neotti, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct re opposition [113-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 13, 2002 Filing 115 DECLARATION by Joseph F. Barbara on behalf of defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant David A. Carmichael, defendant G. Rodman, defendant Paul Dillard, defendant Barry O'Neill, defendant George Neotti, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct re opposition [113-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 13, 2002 Filing 114 DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant David A. Carmichael, defendant G. Rodman, defendant Paul Dillard, defendant Barry O'Neill, defendant George Neotti, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct re opposition [113-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 13, 2002 Filing 113 OPPOSITION by defendant to motion for leave to file third amended complaint [109-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
May 2, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting motion for leave to file motion for reconsideration of order dismissing equal protection claims [105-1] ( Date Entered: 5/8/02) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
April 26, 2002 Filing 111 NOTICE of hearing by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag setting motion for leave to file third amended complaint [109-1] ; hearing set for 10:00 6/3/02 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
April 15, 2002 Filing 110 DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for leave to file third amended complaint [109-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
April 15, 2002 Filing 109 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag for leave to file third amended complaint with Notice set for 5/20/02 10:00 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
April 15, 2002 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) re: motion for leave to file third amended complaint [109-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
April 12, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson vacating hearing re motion for leave to file motion for reconsideration of order dismissing equal protection claims [105-1] ( Date Entered: 4/15/02) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
April 9, 2002 Filing 107 DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for leave to file motion for reconsideration of order dismissing equal protection claims [105-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
April 9, 2002 Filing 106 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag motion for leave to file motion for reconsideration of order dismissing equal protection claims [105-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
April 9, 2002 Filing 105 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag for leave to file motion for reconsideration of order dismissing equal protection claims [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
April 9, 2002 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) re: motion for leave to file motion for reconsideration of order dismissing equal protection claims [105-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 26, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part motion for summary judgment [48-1], granting in part and denying in part motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2], granting motion to amend answer [45-1] ( Date Entered: 3/28/02) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 25, 2002 Filing 103 MINUTES: ( C/R Diane Skillman) ( Hearing Date: 3/25/02) granting in part and denying in part motion for summary judgment [48-1], granting in part and denying in part motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2], granting motion to amend answer [45-1] Discovery cutoff set for 10/28/02 ; Deadline for all motion filings is 11/12/02 ; All motions will be heard by 10:00 12/23/02 ; Pretrial conference set for 3:00 1/27/03 ; Jury trial will be held 8:30 2/11/03 ; , continue settlement with Mag. Judge Maria-Elena James [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 25, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER for PRETRIAL PREPARATION: by Judge Thelton E. Henderson Discovery cutoff 10/28/02 ; All motions will be filed by 11/12/02 ; All motions hearing date 10:00 12/23/02 ; Pre-trial conference will be held 3:00 1/27/03 ; Jury Trial set for 8:30 2/11/03 ; . Est.trial days: 10 (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 21, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte re [62-1] compelling further production of documents and answers to interrogatories. (Date Entered: 3/22/02) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (lmh, COURT STAFF)
March 21, 2002 Filing 100 MINUTES: (C/R Jeanne Bishop) (Hearing Date: 3/12/02) Granting in part and denying in part motion to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories [62-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (lmh, COURT STAFF)
March 20, 2002 Filing 99 STATEMENT of recent decision by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion for summary judgment [48-1], in support of motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 19, 2002 Filing 98 LETTER dated 3/18/02 from Richard L. Manford to Mag. Judge James requesting that the settlement conference be taken off calendar [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 18, 2002 Filing 97 DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in response for order to show cause [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 8, 2002 Filing 96 DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant re objection [90-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 8, 2002 Filing 95 DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant opposing plaintiff's request to deny motion for summary judgment/adjudication [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 8, 2002 Filing 94 DECLARATION by Robert J. Ayers, Jr. on behalf of defendant in reply to opposition memorandum [83-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 8, 2002 Filing 93 DECLARATION by George A. Neotti on behalf of defendant in reply to opposition memorandum [83-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 8, 2002 Filing 92 DECLARATION by Augustin Lopez on behalf of defendant in reply to opposition memorandum [83-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 8, 2002 Filing 91 REPLY by defendant in support motion for summary judgment [48-1], re motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 8, 2002 Filing 90 OBJECTIONS by defendant to and MOTIONS to Strike late-filed documents submitted in opposition memorandum [83-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 8, 2002 Filing 89 CLERK'S NOTICE setting hearing on motion to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories [62-1] 9:30 3/12/02 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 5, 2002 Filing 88 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories [62-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 5, 2002 Filing 87 STATEMENT of Disputed Discovery by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in support of motion to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories [62-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 5, 2002 Filing 86 REPLY BRIEF by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories [62-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 27, 2002 Filing 85 PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag of declaration [81-1], declaration [80-1], declaration [79-1], declaration [78-1], declaration [77-1], declaration [76-1], opposition memorandum [75-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 27, 2002 Filing 84 DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant CA Dept of Correct in partial opposition to motion to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories [62-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 27, 2002 Filing 83 AMENDED MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in opposition to motion for summary judgment [48-1], motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 27, 2002 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by defendant CA Dept of Correct in opposition to motion to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories [62-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 27, 2002 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) re: motion for summary judgment [48-1], re: motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 26, 2002 Filing 81 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in opposition to motion for summary judgment [48-1], re motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 26, 2002 Filing 80 DECLARATION by Monique Beaver on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in opposition motion for summary judgment [48-1], re motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 25, 2002 Filing 79 DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in opposition to motion for summary judgment [48-1], re motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 25, 2002 Filing 78 DECLARATION by Melissa Cruse on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in opposition to motion for summary judgment [48-1], re motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 25, 2002 Filing 77 DECLARATION by Ken Katsaris on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in opposition to motion for summary judgment [48-1], re motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 25, 2002 Filing 76 DECLARATION by Deanna L. Freitag in opposition to motion for summary judgment [48-1], re motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 25, 2002 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in opposition to motion for summary judgment [48-1], motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 25, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting motion for order extending the time to file opposition to motion for summary judgment [71-1], setting hearing on motion for summary judgment [48-1] 10:00 3/25/02, setting hearing on motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] 10:00 3/25/02, setting hearing on motion to amend answer [45-1] 10:00 3/25/02; vacating currently scheduled trial and PT dates , Case Management Conference set for 10:00 3/25/02 ; ( Date Entered: 2/28/02) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 22, 2002 Filing 73 DECLARATION by Marybelle D. Archibald on behalf of defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant David A. Carmichael, defendant G. Rodman, defendant Paul Dillard, defendant Barry O'Neill, defendant George Neotti, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct re statement [72-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 22, 2002 Filing 72 STATEMENT by defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant David A. Carmichael, defendant G. Rodman, defendant Paul Dillard, defendant Barry O'Neill, defendant George Neotti, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct in support of memorandum [49-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 21, 2002 Filing 71 EX-PARTE APPLICATION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag for order extending the time to file opposition to motion for summary judgment [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 21, 2002 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) re: motion for order extending the time to file opposition to motion for summary judgment [71-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 20, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting motion for order shortening time for hearing of motion to compel [63-1] ( Date Entered: 2/27/02) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2002 Filing 69 NOTICE of entry by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag of [43-1] order [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2002 Filing 68 NOTICE of entry by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag of [44-1] order [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2002 Filing 67 PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag of motion for order shortening time for hearing of motion to compel [63-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2002 Filing 66 DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories [62-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2002 Filing 65 DECLARATION by Emmeline Thompson on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories [62-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2002 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in support of motion to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories [62-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2002 Filing 63 EX-PARTE APPLICATION before Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag for order shortening time for hearing of motion to compel [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2002 Filing 62 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories with Notice set for 3/26/02 2:00 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2002 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) re: motion to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories [62-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2002 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) shortening time [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2002 Filing 61 DECLARATION by Robert J. Ayers, Jr. on behalf of defendant re motion for summary judgment [48-1], re motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2002 Filing 60 DECLARATION by Glen L. Rodman on behalf of defendant re motion for summary judgment [48-1], re motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2002 Filing 59 DECLARATION by Teresa Schwartz on behalf of defendant re motion for summary judgment [48-1], re motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2002 Filing 58 DECLARATION by David A. Carmichael on behalf of defendant re motion for summary judgment [48-1], re motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2002 Filing 57 THIRD DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant re motion for summary judgment [48-1], re motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2002 Filing 56 SECOND DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant re motion for summary judgment [48-1], re motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2002 Filing 55 FIRST DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant re motion for summary judgment [48-1], re motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2002 Filing 54 DECLARATION by George A. Neotti on behalf of defendant re motion for summary judgment [48-1], re motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2002 Filing 53 DECLARATION by Augustin Lopez on behalf of defendant re motion for summary judgment [48-1], re motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2002 Filing 52 DECLARATION by Ronald Willis Julian Case on behalf of defendant re motion for summary judgment [48-1], re motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2002 Filing 51 DECLARATION by Paul Dillard on behalf of defendant re motion for summary judgment [48-1], re motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2002 Filing 50 DECLARATION by Barry O'Neill on behalf of defendant re motion for summary judgment [48-1], re motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2002 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by defendant in support of motion for summary judgment [48-1], of motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2002 Filing 48 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by defendant for summary judgment , or in the alternative, for summary adjudication of issues with Notice set for 3/11/02 10:00 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2002 Filing 47 DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant re motion to amend answer [45-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2002 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by defendant in support of motion to amend answer [45-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2002 Filing 45 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by defendant to amend answer with Notice set for 3/11/02 10:00 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2002 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant) re: motion for summary judgment [48-1], re: motion for summary adjudication of issues [48-2] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2002 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant) re: motion to amend answer [45-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 5, 2002 Docket Modification (Administrative) to order [43-1] granting motion for order enlarging pretrial discovery dates [42-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 5, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson : enlarging discovery dates (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 5, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson : enlarging pretrial discovery dates (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 31, 2002 Filing 42 EX-PARTE APPLICATION before Judge Thelton E. Henderson by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag for order enlarging pretrial discovery dates [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 31, 2002 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) stipulation enlarging pretrial discovery dates [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 31, 2002 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) stipulation enlarging discovery dates [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 7, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER by Mag. Judge Maria-Elena James : Settlement conf. (Mag) at 2:00 3/26/02 ; (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
December 28, 2001 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant) stipulation to continue date of mandatory settlement conference [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 26, 2001 Docket Modification (Administrative) to order [40-1] vacating [33-1] motion to compel production of documents and request for sanctions [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 26, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte : dropping plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery from the calendar (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 26, 2001 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) stipulation dropping plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery from the calendar [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 14, 2001 Filing 39 LETTER dated 11/14/01 from Pamela Y. Price to Mag. Judge Laporte [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 30, 2001 Filing 38 DECLARATION by Richard L. Manford on behalf of defendant CDC, defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant David A. Carmichael, defendant G. Rodman, defendant Paul Dillard, defendant Barry O'Neill, defendant George Neotti, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct in opposition to motion to compel production of documents and request for sanctions [33-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 19, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson : enlarging pretrial discovery dates (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 17, 2001 Filing 36 DECLARATION by Pamela Y. Price on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion to compel production of documents and request for sanctions [33-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 17, 2001 Filing 35 DECLARATION by Maria C. LaHood on behalf of Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag re motion to compel production of documents and request for sanctions [33-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 17, 2001 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag in support of motion to compel production of documents and request for sanctions [33-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 17, 2001 Filing 33 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag to compel production of documents and request for sanctions with Notice set for 11/27/01 2:00 [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 17, 2001 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) stipulation enlarging pretrial discovery dates [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
October 17, 2001 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) re: motion to compel production of documents and request for sanctions [33-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
September 27, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re Discovery Procedures by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte ( Date Entered: 10/2/01) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
September 26, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER of Reference by Judge Thelton E. Henderson to a magistrate judge for discovery dispute (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
September 26, 2001 REFERRAL: referring case for discovery to Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte [3:00-cv-02278] (wh, COURT STAFF)
August 15, 2001 Filing 30 NOTICE of entry by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag of [29-1] order [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
August 10, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson : (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
July 18, 2001 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff) confidentiality stipulation [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
June 8, 2001 Filing 28 ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Bill Lockyer for CA Dept of Correct, attorney Damon M. Connolly for CA Dept of Correct, attorney Regina J. Brown for CA Dept of Correct, attorney Bill Lockyer for Auggie Lopez, attorney Damon M. Connolly for Auggie Lopez, attorney Regina J. Brown for Auggie Lopez, attorney Bill Lockyer for George Neotti, attorney Damon M. Connolly for George Neotti, attorney Regina J. Brown for George Neotti, attorney Bill Lockyer for Barry O'Neill, attorney Damon M. Connolly for Barry O'Neill, attorney Regina J. Brown for Barry O'Neill, attorney Bill Lockyer for Paul Dillard, attorney Damon M. Connolly for Paul Dillard, attorney Regina J. Brown for Paul Dillard, attorney Bill Lockyer for G. Rodman, attorney Damon M. Connolly for G. Rodman, attorney Regina J. Brown for G. Rodman, attorney Bill Lockyer for David A. Carmichael, attorney Damon M. Connolly for David A. Carmichael, attorney Regina J. Brown for David A. Carmichael, attorney Bill Lockyer for Teresa Schwartz, attorney Damon M. Connolly for Teresa Schwartz, attorney Regina J. Brown for Teresa Schwartz, attorney Bill Lockyer for Robert J. Ayers Jr., attorney Damon M. Connolly for Robert J. Ayers Jr., attorney Regina J. Brown for Robert J. Ayers Jr., attorney Bill Lockyer for CDC, attorney Damon M. Connolly for CDC, attorney Regina J. Brown for CDC as counsel for by defendant CDC, defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant David A. Carmichael, defendant G. Rodman, defendant Paul Dillard, defendant Barry O'Neill, defendant George Neotti, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct and substituting attorney Richard L. Manford, Jacob A. Appelsmith [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
March 16, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Mag. Judge Maria-Elena James Settlement conf. (Mag) at 2:00 1/15/02 ; ( Date Entered: 3/20/01) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson Discovery cutoff set for 1/7/02 ; Deadline for all motion filings is 2/6/02 ; All motions will be heard by 3/11/02 ; Pretrial conference set for 3:00 4/8/02 ; Jury trial will be held 8:30 4/16/02 ; ( Date Entered: 2/8/01) (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 6, 2001 Filing 25 MINUTES: ( C/R Kathy Wyatt) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD. Discovery cutoff 1/7/02 ; All motions will be filed by 2/6/02 ; Pre-trial conference will be held 3:00 4/8/02 ; All motions hearing date 3/11/02 ; Jury Trial set for 8:30 4/16/02 ; , referring case for settlement to Mag. Judge Maria-Elena James [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
February 2, 2001 Filing 24 NOTICE of entry by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag, of [22-2] order [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 26, 2001 Filing 23 SECOND JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT and PROPOSED ORDER filed. [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 24, 2001 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson : referring to ADR (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 19, 2001 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) stipulation re ADR [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
January 17, 2001 Filing 21 ANSWER by defendant CDC, defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant David A. Carmichael, defendant G. Rodman, defendant Paul Dillard, defendant Barry O'Neill, defendant George Neotti, defendant Auggie Lopez, defendant CA Dept of Correct to complaint [3-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
December 18, 2000 RECEIVED first amended complaint submitted by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (rbe, COURT STAFF)
November 28, 2000 Telephone conference with ADR director :MRA [3:00-cv-02278] (mra, COURT STAFF)
November 17, 2000 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant by Regina J. Brown, Damon M. Connolly, Bill Lockyer [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
November 16, 2000 Filing 20 MINUTES: ( C/R Leo Mankiewicz) ( Hearing Date: 11/16/00) granting in part and denying in part motion to dismiss case [6-1] Case Management Conference set for 1:30 2/5/01 ;See minute order for long explanation of instructions [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
November 8, 2000 Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiff Eeanna L. Freitag. [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
November 8, 2000 RECEIVED Proposed Order re case management statement( Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag ) [3:00-cv-02278] (db, COURT STAFF)
October 26, 2000 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE All motions will be heard by 2:00 11/16/00 ; Case Management Conference set for 2:00 11/16/00 ; [3:00-cv-02278] (lal, COURT STAFF)
October 23, 2000 Filing 17 OBJECTIONS by defendant CDC, defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant David A. Carmichael, defendant G. Rodman, defendant Paul Dillard, defendant Barry O'Neill, defendant George Neotti, defendant Auggie Lopez to opposition [15-1], request [14-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (lal, COURT STAFF)
October 23, 2000 Filing 16 REPLY by defendant CDC, defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant David A. Carmichael, defendant G. Rodman, defendant Paul Dillard, defendant Barry O'Neill, defendant George Neotti, defendant Auggie Lopez to opposition to motion to dismiss case [6-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (lal, COURT STAFF)
October 17, 2000 Filing 15 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag to motion to dismiss case [6-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (lal, COURT STAFF)
October 17, 2000 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag motion to dismiss case [6-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (lal, COURT STAFF)
October 3, 2000 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 10:00 11/6/00 ; [3:00-cv-02278] (lal, COURT STAFF)
September 26, 2000 Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE of hearing by defendant CDC, defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant David A. Carmichael, defendant G. Rodman, defendant Paul Dillard, defendant Barry O'Neill, defendant George Neotti, defendant Auggie Lopez setting motion to dismiss case [6-1] ; hearing set for 10:00 11/6/00 [3:00-cv-02278] (lal, COURT STAFF)
September 26, 2000 RECEIVED Proposed Order ( defendant CDC, defendant Robert J. Ayers Jr., defendant Teresa Schwartz, defendant David A. Carmichael, defendant G. Rodman, defendant Paul Dillard, defendant Barry O'Neill, defendant George Neotti, defendant Auggie Lopez ) re: motion to dismiss case [6-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (lal, COURT STAFF)
September 12, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Executive Committee Case reassigned to Judge Thelton E. Henderson referred to Judge Thelton E. Henderson the motion to dismiss case [6-1] () (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (ga, COURT STAFF)
September 6, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Mag. Judge Maria-Elena James of impending reassignment to a United States District Judge () (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (ga, COURT STAFF)
August 31, 2000 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant of Magistrate order [7-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (ga, COURT STAFF)
August 30, 2000 Filing 8 DECLINATION to proceed before magistrate by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (ga, COURT STAFF)
August 29, 2000 Filing 7 DECLINATION to proceed before magistrate by CDC, Robert J. Ayers Jr., Teresa Schwartz, David A. Carmichael, G. Rodman, Paul Dillard, Barry O'Neill, George Neotti, Auggie Lopez [3:00-cv-02278] (ga, COURT STAFF)
August 29, 2000 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION WITH MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES before Mag. Judge Maria-Elena James by CDC, Robert J. Ayers Jr., Teresa Schwartz, David A. Carmichael, G. Rodman, Paul Dillard, Barry O'Neill, George Neotti, Auggie Lopez to dismiss case with Notice set for 10/5/00 at 10:00am [3:00-cv-02278] (ga, COURT STAFF)
August 14, 2000 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE unexecuted - original summons returned [3:00-cv-02278] (ga, COURT STAFF)
August 11, 2000 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE of ADR Multi-Option Program order [2-1] [3:00-cv-02278] (ga, COURT STAFF)
July 28, 2000 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by Plaintiff Deanna L. Freitag [3:00-cv-02278] (ga, COURT STAFF) (msrS, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2000 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER RE COURT PROCEDURE and SCHEDULE (ADR Multi-Option) by Mag. Judge Maria-Elena James : Proof of service to be filed by 8/11/00 ; counsels' case management statement to be filed by 10/16/00 ; initial case management conference will be held at 10:00am on 10/26/00 . (cc: all counsel) [3:00-cv-02278] (kk, COURT STAFF)
June 27, 2000 Filing 1 COMPLAINT no Summons(es) issued; Fee status pd entered on 6/27/00 in the amount of $ 150.00 ( Receipt No. 4401904); jury demand [3:00-cv-02278] (kk, COURT STAFF) (msrS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freitag v. CDC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna L. Freitag
Represented By: Pamela Yvette Price
Represented By: Charles Stephen Ralston
Represented By: Curtis E. Allen
Represented By: Jeshawna Rochea Harrell
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Maria Couri Lahood
Represented By: Terina Marie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Ayers, Jr.
Represented By: Bill Lockyer
Represented By: Damon Mathew Connolly
Represented By: Kathryn Allen
Represented By: Regina Jaynell Brown,
Represented By: Richard Lee Manford
Represented By: Jacob A. Appelsmith
Represented By: Lyn Harlan
Represented By: Marybelle Archibald
Represented By: Vincent John Scally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Schwartz
Represented By: Bill Lockyer
Represented By: Damon Mathew Connolly
Represented By: Kathryn Allen
Represented By: Regina Jaynell Brown,
Represented By: Richard Lee Manford
Represented By: Jacob A. Appelsmith
Represented By: Lyn Harlan
Represented By: Marybelle Archibald
Represented By: Vincent John Scally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Carmichael
Represented By: Bill Lockyer
Represented By: Damon Mathew Connolly
Represented By: Kathryn Allen
Represented By: Regina Jaynell Brown,
Represented By: Richard Lee Manford
Represented By: Jacob A. Appelsmith
Represented By: Marybelle Archibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Rodman
Represented By: Bill Lockyer
Represented By: Damon Mathew Connolly
Represented By: Kathryn Allen
Represented By: Regina Jaynell Brown,
Represented By: Richard Lee Manford
Represented By: Jacob A. Appelsmith
Represented By: Marybelle Archibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Dillard
Represented By: Bill Lockyer
Represented By: Damon Mathew Connolly
Represented By: Kathryn Allen
Represented By: Regina Jaynell Brown,
Represented By: Richard Lee Manford
Represented By: Jacob A. Appelsmith
Represented By: Marybelle Archibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry O'Neill
Represented By: Bill Lockyer
Represented By: Damon Mathew Connolly
Represented By: Kathryn Allen
Represented By: Regina Jaynell Brown,
Represented By: Richard Lee Manford
Represented By: Jacob A. Appelsmith
Represented By: Marybelle Archibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Neotti
Represented By: Bill Lockyer
Represented By: Damon Mathew Connolly
Represented By: Kathryn Allen
Represented By: Regina Jaynell Brown,
Represented By: Richard Lee Manford
Represented By: Jacob A. Appelsmith
Represented By: Marybelle Archibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auggie Lopez
Represented By: Bill Lockyer
Represented By: Damon Mathew Connolly
Represented By: Kathryn Allen
Represented By: Regina Jaynell Brown,
Represented By: Richard Lee Manford
Represented By: Jacob A. Appelsmith
Represented By: Marybelle Archibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections
Represented By: Bill Lockyer
Represented By: Damon Mathew Connolly
Represented By: Kathryn Allen
Represented By: Regina Jaynell Brown,
Represented By: Richard Lee Manford
Represented By: Jacob A. Appelsmith
Represented By: Lyn Harlan
Represented By: Marybelle Archibald
Represented By: Vincent John Scally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?