Carpenter v. Brown, et al

Petitioner: David J. Carpenter
Respondent: Jill Brown
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project and Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Case Number: 3:2000cv03706
Filed: January 27, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2016 200 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/1/16. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
October 3, 2016 195 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING SCHEDULE STIPULATION AND ORDER. Respondent will file a motion for reconsideration no later than October 19, 2016. Petitioner will file a response within thirty days of the filing date of Respondent's motion. Respondent will file a reply within thirty days of the filing date of Petitioner's response. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/3/16. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
June 27, 2016 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Within ninety days of the date of this Order, the parties shall meet and confer, and set a briefing schedule for any motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 6/27/16. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
March 8, 2016 186 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER FOR THE REMAINING GROUP 4 CLAIMS. Respondent's opening brief is due on June 6, 2016. Petitioner's response is due on August 5, 2016. Respondent's reply is due on September 4, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/8/16. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
December 11, 2015 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/11/15. (mmcalc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
June 29, 2015 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 176 LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 29, 2015.(mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
May 8, 2015 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PROCEDURAL DEFAULT 169 . Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 8, 2015.(mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
June 13, 2014 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 170 ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 13, 2014.(mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
March 5, 2014 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 165 RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF PROCEDURAL BARS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 5, 2014.(mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
November 13, 2013 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 163 LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 13, 2013.(mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
August 26, 2013 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING GROUP III CLAIMS 4, 15C, 16, 18, 19, 20, 21, 26 and 27. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 26, 2013. (mmcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
March 26, 2013 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 159 EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 26, 2013.(mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
September 7, 2012 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING GROUP II CLAIMS 28, 37, 38 and 40. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 7, 2012. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
November 9, 2011 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Claims 36, 41, 42, 43, 44, 45, 52, 53, 55 and 56 in petitioner's First Amended Petition are hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 9, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
March 14, 2011 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AMENDING LITIGATION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 14, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
January 27, 2010 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PROPOSED LITIGATION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 27, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
November 24, 2009 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND TO SUBMIT SCHEDULE. Counsel for petitioner and counsel for respondent are ordered 1) to meet and confer within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, and (2) within thirty (30) days thereafter to submit a litigation schedule to the Court. After receipt and review of the litigation schedule, the Court will schedule a status conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 24, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
December 2, 2008 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING COMPETENCY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 2, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
September 16, 2008 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 119 MOTION FOR A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 16, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
September 12, 2008 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 117 MOTION FOR STAY OF COMPETENCY EVALUATION PENDING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 12, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 5, 2008 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 118 SHORTENING TIME re MOTION FOR STAY OF COMPETENCY EVALUATION PENDING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 5, 2008. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenter v. Brown, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David J. Carpenter
Represented By: Robert D. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Represented By: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jill Brown
Represented By: Steven T. Oetting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?