Plata et al v. Schwarzenegger et al

Plaintiff: Marciano Plata, Otis Shaw, Ray Stoderd, Joseph Long, Leslie Rhoades, Gilbert Aviles, Paul Decasas, Steven Bautista, Raymond Johns, Elijah J. Sandoval, Gary Alan Smith, Clifford Myelle and Dondi Van Horn
Defendant: Michael C. Genest, Arnold Schwarzenegger, James E. Tilton and John Chiang
Petitioner: Medical Development International
Miscellaneous: Gerald Frank Stanley, Ralph Coleman, Elwood Lui, Peter Siggins, J. Clark Kelso and Peter Davids
Intervenor: California Correctional Peace Officers Association, County of Santa Clara, County of Santa Barbara, County of San Mateo, County of Sonoma, Pat Hedges, Jim Denney, Rod Mitchell, Larry Jones, Jim Mele, Margaret Mims, Mike Kanalakis, Richard Scholl, Gary Philp, Jeff Neves, Mark Pazin, Dean Wilson, Steve Moore, Martin Ryan, William Lutz, Karen Staples, Isabelle Voit, Patricia Stewart, John Wardell, Kim Barrett, Lionel Chatman, Jim Moffett, Brian Richart, Don Meyer, Linda Penner, Gail Neal, Dave Singer, Joel Neves, Barney Melekian, Jim Hudson, Craig Steckler and George Galaza
Amicus: Union of American Physicians & Dentists, Association of California State Supervisors and Californians United for a Responsible Budget
Intervenor_dft: Anthony Adams, Joel Anderson, Tom Berryhill, Sam Blakeslee, Paul Cook,, Chuck DeVore, Michael D. Duvall, Bill Emmerson, Jean Fuller, Ted Gaines, Martin Garrick, Shirley Horton, Guy S. Houston, Bob Huff, Kevin Jeffries, Rick Keene, Doug La Malfa, Bill Maze, Roger Niello,, Sharon Runner, Jim Silva, Cameron Smyth, Todd Spitzer, Audra Strickland, Van Tran, Michael N. Villines, Mimi Walters, San Diego County Sheriff William B. Kolender, Orange County Sheriff Coroner Michael S. Carona, Placer County Sheriff Edward N. Bonner, Butte County Sheriff- Coroner Perry L. Reniff, Calaveras County Sheriff Dennis Downum, Los Angeles County Sheriff Lee Baca, Santa Clara County Sheriff Laurie Smith, San Benito County Sheriff Curtis Hill, Stanislus County Sheriff Adam Christianson, Mendocino County Sheriff Tom Allman, Tehama County Sheriff Clay Parker, Lassen County Sheriff Steve Warren, Yolo County Sheriff Ed Prieto, Santa Barbara County Sheriff Bill Brown, Kern County Sheriff Donny Youngblood, San Mateo County Sheriff Greg Monks, Yuba County Sheriff Steve Durfor, Contra Costa County Sheriff Warren Rupf, Shasta County Sheriff Tom Bosenko, Stanislaus County Chief Probation Officer Jerry Powers, Riverside County Sheriff Bob G. Doyle, Ventura County Sheriff Bob Brooks, Solano County Sheriff Gary R. Stanton, ROD PACHECO, Bonnie M. Dumanis, Tony Rackauckas, Jan Scully, Christie Stanley, Michael Ramos, Robert Kochly, David W. Paulson, Gregg Cohen, Todd Riebe, Bradford Fenocchio, John R. Poyner, Michael Ramsey, Edward R. Jagels, Samuel Aanestad, Roy Ashburn, James F. Battin, Jr., Dave Cox, Bob Dutton, Dennis Hollingsworth, Abel Maldonado, George Runner, Mark Wyland, GREGORY TOTTEN, Vern Pierson, Clifford Newell, Ronald L. Calhoun, Donald Segerstrom, Jim Copsey, Steve Lodge, Rich Word, Cary Sullivan, Mace McIntosh, Lisa Solomon, Michael Billdt, Richard Hawthorne, Adolpho Gonzales, Mark DeRosia, Roy Wasden, Jerry Dyer, Sonoma County District Attorney Stephan Passalacqua, Sonoma County Chief Probation Office Robert Ochs, Sonoma County Sheriff/Coroner William Cogbill, San Mateo County Sheriff Greg Munks, Bill Berryhill, Connie Conway, Danny Gilmore, Curt Hagman, Diane Harkey, Steven Knight, Dan Logue, Jeff Miller, Brian Nestande and Jim Nielsen
3rd_party_defendant: Gerald T. Shea, San Diego County Sheriff William B. Kolender, Orange County Sheriff Coroner Michael S. Carona, Placer County Sheriff Edward N. Bonner, Butte County Sheriff- Coroner Perry L. Reniff, Calaveras County Sheriff Dennis Downum, Los Angeles County Sheriff Lee Baca, Santa Clara County Sheriff Laurie Smith, Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department, San Benito County Sheriff Curtis Hill, Stanislaus County Sheriff Adam Christianson, Mendocino County Sheriff Tom Allman, Tehama County Sheriff Clay Parker, Lassen County Sheriff Steve Warren, Yolo County Sheriff Ed Prieto, Santa Barbara County Sheriff Bill Brown, Kern County Sheriff Donny Youngblood, San Mateo County Sheriff Greg Munks, Yuba County Sheriff Steve Durfor, Contra Costa County Sheriff Warren Rupf, Shasta County Sheriff Tom Bosenko, Riverside County Sheriff Bob G. Doyle, Ventura County Sheriff Bob Brooks, Solano County Sheriff Gary R. Stanton, San Luis Obispo County Sheriff Pat Hedges, Sutter County Sheriff Jim Denney, Lake County Sheriff Rod Mitchell, Glenn County Sheriff, Tuolumne County Sheriff Jim Mele, Fresno County Sheriff, Monterey County Sheriff Mike Kanalakis, Mono County Sheriff Richard Scholl, Humboldt County Sheriff Gary Philp, El Dorado County Sheriff Jeff Neves, Merced County Sheriff Mark Pazin, Del Norte County Sheriff Dean Wilson, San Joaquin County Sheriff Steve Moore, Amador County Sheriff Martin Ryan, Inyo County Sheriff William Lutze, Stanislaus County Chief Probation Officer Jerry Powers, Ventura County Chief Probation Officer Karen Staples, Solano County Chief Probation Officer Isabelle Voit, Santa Barbara County Chief Probation Officer Patricia Stewart, Butte County Chief Probation Officer John Wardell, San Luis Obispo County Chief Probation Officer Kim Barrett, Contra Costa County Chief Probation Officer Lionel Chatman, Inyo County Chief Probation Officer Jim Moffett, Shasta County Chief Probation Officer Brian Richart, Yolo County Chief Probation Officer Don Meyer, Fresno County Chief Probation Officer Linda Penner, Mariposa County Chief Probation Officer Gail Neal, City of Whittier Police Chief Dave Singer, City of Roseville Police Chief Joel Neves, City of Pasadena Police Chief Barney Melekian, City of Alhambra Police Chief Jim Hudson, City of Fremont Police Chief Craig Steckler, City of Grover Beach Police Chief Jim Copsey, City of Santa Clara Police Chief Steve Lodge, City of Vacaville Police Chief Rich Word, City of Woodland Police Chief Carey Sullivan, City of Sonora Police Chief Mace McIntosh, City of Paso Robles Police Chief Lisa Solomon, City of San Bernardino Police Chief Michael Billdt, City of Atwater Police Chief Richard Hawthorne, National City Police Chief Adolfo Gonzales, City of Delano Police Chief Mark DeRosia, City of Modesto Police Chief Roy Wasden, City of Fresno Police Chief Jerry Dyer, City of Delano Chief of Corrections George Galaza, Glenn County Sheriff Larry Jones, Fresno County Sheriff Margaret Mims, Office of the Inspector General and Matthew Cate
Case Number: 3:2001cv01351
Filed: February 22, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2017 2992 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: AMICI CURIAE. Amici Californians United for a Responsible Budget and NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc. are terminated. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Kimberly J. Mueller, and Jon S. Tigar on November 21, 2017. (jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
July 14, 2017 2955 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting case management conference. Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2017. Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco, before the Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/14/17. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
June 20, 2017 2953 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER suspending paragraph 4(b) of 2766 February 10, 2014 Order, pursuant to 2948 Stipulation as modified. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Thelton E. Henderson, and Kimberly J. Mueller on 06/20/17. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 12, 2017 2950 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER WAIVING STATE LAW AS IT PERTAINS TO THE INTRANASAL ADMINISTRATION OF NALOXONE BY LICENSED VOCATIONAL NURSES AND PSYCHIATRIC TECHNICIANS WORKING IN CDCR INSTITUTIONS by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 2949 Stipulation. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
August 1, 2016 2906 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Payment for Court-Appointed Experts: LaMarre; Puisis; Goldenson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 8/1/16. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 1, 2016 2904 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT FOR COURT APPOINTED EXPERTS: LaMarre, Puisis, Goldenson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 7/1/2016. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 1, 2016 2899 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT FOR COURT-APPOINTED EXPERTS - LaMarre, Puisis, and Goldenson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/31/2016. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
April 1, 2016 2892 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Payment of Court Appointed Experts. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/31/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
March 4, 2016 2890 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring additional reporting. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Thelton E. Henderson, and Kimberly J. Mueller on 03/04/16. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
January 6, 2016 2881 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Professional Fees and Expenses of Madeleine LaMarre, MN and Joe Goldenson, MD. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 1/4/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
August 27, 2015 2869 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Collection of Undisputed Attorneys' Fees and Costs for Second Quarter of 2015. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/26/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 26, 2015 2868 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting PACER fee exemption for Compliance Officer Elwood Lui. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/26/15. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
June 17, 2015 2861 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Payment of Court Appointed Experts. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/16/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
May 27, 2015 2857 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER modifying rebuttable presumption upon delegation by Receiver (Paragraph 4(b) of 2841 ORDER modifying Receivership transition plan). Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/27/15. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2015)
March 10, 2015 2841 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER modifying Receivership transition plan. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/10/15. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
January 22, 2015 2834 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER amending 2766 February 10, 2014 and 2779 April 9, 2014 Orders. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Thelton E. Henderson, and Kimberly J. Mueller on 01/22/15. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
December 19, 2014 2830 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Thelton E. Henderson, and Kimberly J. Mueller granting 2827 Stipulation re: 2812 Plaintiffs' motion for further enforcement order. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
November 14, 2014 2823 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Thelton E. Henderson, and Kimberly J. Mueller granting in part 2812 Plaintiffs' motion for further enforcement order. Defendants to file report on parole process for non-violent second-strikers by 12/01/14. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
October 29, 2014 2821 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Compliance Officer to confer with parties re: 2812 Plaintiffs' motion for further enforcement order. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Thelton E. Henderson, and Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/29/14. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
August 6, 2014 2805 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Approving Payment of Court Appointed Experts. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/04/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2014)
June 23, 2014 2796 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson denying 2784 Plaintiffs' motion re: design capacity. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
April 18, 2014 2781 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER designating United States District Court composed of three judges pursuant to Section 2284, Title 28 United States Code. Effective 09/01/14, the Honorable Kimberly J. Mueller will take the place of the Honorable Lawrence K. Karlton. Signed by Chief Judge Alex Kozinski, United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, on 04/11/14. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
March 27, 2014 2776 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Receiver's triannual reports. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/27/14. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 11, 2014 2772 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: court experts. Requirement to complete evaluations of individual prisons as quickly as possible is suspended. Experts shall re-direct focus to more systemic issues, including development of a sustainable system of evaluating the quality of inmate medical care. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/11/14. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
February 26, 2014 2770 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Dismiss Defendants' Appeal to the United States Supreme Court From the Three-Judge Court's September 24, 2013 Order. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 02/26/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 10, 2014 2767 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION re: 2766 Order granting in part and denying part Defendants' request for extension of December 31, 2013 deadline. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 02/10/14. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
January 17, 2014 2753 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Payment of Court-Appointed Experts for services rendered: Madeleine LaMarre MN in the amount of $17,776.31, and Michael Puisis, D.O. in the amount of $13,497.29, Joe Goldenson, M.D. in the amount of $13,310.05. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/16/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 13, 2014 2752 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to file proposed orders re: Defendants' request to extend population reduction deadline. Proposed orders due by 01/23/14. Optional responses due by 01/28/14. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 01/13/14. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
December 17, 2013 2748 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Payment of Court-Appointed Experts for services rendered: Madeleine LaMarre MN in the amount of $11,950.00, and Michael Puisis, D.O. in the amount of $4,950.00, Joe Goldenson, M.D. in the amount of $8,305.00. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/16/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 11, 2013 2746 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER further extending meet-and-confer process to 01/10/14. The deadline to comply with the population reduction order is extended to 04/18/14. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 12/11/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 9, 2013 2744 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Payment of Court-Appointed Experts for services rendered: Madeleine LaMarre MN in the amount of $23,899.69, and Joe Goldenson, M.D. in the amount of $15,692.21. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/09/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
November 8, 2013 2740 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Payment of Court-Appointed Experts for services rendered: Madeleine LaMarre MN in the amount of $5,250.00, and Michael Puisis, D.O. in the amount of $29,801.34. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/07/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 1, 2013 2738 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson granting 2731 Motion by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc. to file amicus curiae brief. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 31, 2013 2737 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to deposit funds. Within 45 days, Defendants shall deposit $300,000 into the Court's registry for this action. Defendants shall make additional deposits within 45 days of each order approving payment. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/31/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 21, 2013 2733 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending meet-and-confer process to 11/18/13. The deadline to comply with the population reduction order is extended to 02/24/14. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 10/21/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 8, 2013 2730 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Collection of Undisputed Attorneys' Fees and Costs for Second Quarter of 2013. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/07/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 4, 2013 2728 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Payment of Court-Appointed Experts for services rendered: Madeleine LaMarre MN in the amount of $19,556.65, and Michael Puisis, D.O. in the amount of $32,967.52, Joe Goldenson, M.D. in the amount of $16,456.22. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/03/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 2, 2013 2727 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 2692 Plaintiffs' motion for relief from 2685 Magistrate Judge's July 25, 2013 order. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
September 30, 2013 2723 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 27, 2013 2722 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER suspending defendants' biweekly reporting requirement. Requirement is suspended during the meet-and-confer process and until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 09/27/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
September 24, 2013 2719 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to meet and confer. The Honorable Peter Siggins will immediately begin facilitating a confidential meet-and-confer process between the parties and report to the Court by 10/21/13. The 12/31/13 deadline to comply with the population reduction order is extended to 01/27/14. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 09/24/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 10, 2013 2709 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Payment of Court-Appointed Experts for services rendered: Madeleine LaMarre MN in the amount of $30,713.49, and Michael Puisis, D.O. in the amount of $35,337.96, Joe Goldenson, M.D. in the amount of $16,754.89. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/09/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
August 21, 2013 2702 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting briefing schedule re: 2692 Plaintiff's motion for relief from 2685 July 25, 2013 Order. Response due by 09/04/13. Reply due by 09/11/13. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/21/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 20, 2013 2700 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Payment of Court-Appointed Experts for services rendered: Madeleine LaMarre MN in the amount of $36,646.36, and Michael Puisis, D.O. in the amount of $38,747.82, Joe Goldenson, M.D. in the amount of $30,912.73. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/19/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
August 19, 2013 2699 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 2698 .ORDER granting 2696 Joint Request for Order Authorizing Refeeding Under Specified Conditions of Hunger Striking Inmate-Patients. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/19/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 9, 2013 2693 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER responding to 2674 Defendants' request for clarification and modifying status report requirements. Modified biweekly status reports begin on 09/16/13. Defendants shall file 08/15/13 and 08/29/13 status reports as previously ordered. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 08/09/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
July 25, 2013 2685 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins Denying Plaintiffs' Motion 2676 to Compel Requests for Admissions. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 18, 2013 2677 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Requesting Documents re 2676 and Taking Matter Under Submission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 07/18/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
July 15, 2013 2675 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2634 Plaintiffs' request for order directing court experts to assess Receiver's peer review processes. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/15/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
July 3, 2013 2671 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson denying re 2665 Defendants' Motion to Stay re 2659 June 20, 2013 Order. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
July 2, 2013 2668 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Payment of Court-Appointed Experts for services rendered: Madeleine LaMarre MN in the amount of $20,052.43, and Michael Puisis, D.O. in the amount of $57,621.18, Joe Goldenson, M.D. in the amount of $17,580.84. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 7/1/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
June 24, 2013 2661 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 2580 Plaintiffs' motion for relief re: Valley Fever at Pleasant Valley and Avenal State Prisons. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
May 23, 2013 2637 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting briefing schedule re: 2634 Plaintiffs' request for order directing court experts to assess peer review processes. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/23/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 6, 2013 2613 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Payment of Court-Appointed Experts for services rendered: Madeleine LaMarre MN in the amount of $34,931.34, and Michael Puisis, D.O. in the amount of $17,959.87, Joe Goldenson, M.D. in the amount of $21,449.49. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/06/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
May 3, 2013 2610 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring response to 2609 Defendants' May 2, 2013 filing. Plaintiffs shall file a response on or before 05/20/13. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 05/03/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
April 18, 2013 2596 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending time for court experts to complete written evaluations. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/18/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 15, 2013 2594 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: confidentiality of communications with Receiver. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/15/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 11, 2013 2591 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring list of proposed population reduction measures. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 04/11/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
March 21, 2013 2581 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to meet and confer re: 2580 Plaintiffs' motion regarding Valley Fever. Meet and confer between parties, Receiver, and court experts to be completed by 04/19/13. Briefing and hearing schedule vacated. Motion hearing, if necessary, continued to 06/17/13 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/21/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
March 20, 2013 2576 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to deposit funds. Within 45 days, Defendants shall deposit $250,000 into the Court's registry for this action. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/20/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 15, 2013 2568 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Payment of Court-Appointed Experts for services rendered: Joe Goldenson, M.D. in the amount of $20,772.49, Madeleine LaMarre MN in the amount of $32,584.10, and Michael Puisis, D.O. in the amount of $39,918.12. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/14/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 11, 2013 2564 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring response to 2562 Plaintiffs' request for leave to file supplemental brief. Defendants' response due by 03/18/13. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 03/11/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
March 8, 2013 2561 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Collection of Undisputed Additional Attorneys' Fees and Costs for 2011 through First Quarter of 2012. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/07/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
March 5, 2013 2557 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson re: 2555 2556 Stipulations for attorneys' fees and costs filed on 03/05/13. Parties to correct and re-submit stipulations and proposed orders by 03/12/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 28, 2013 2554 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling 2532 Defendants' objections to Receiver's Twenty-Second Tri-Annual Report. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/28/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
February 21, 2013 2546 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 2534 Plaintiffs' motion for discovery and denying oral motion made at 02/19/13 hearing. Expert disclosure and discovery deadlines set if Defendants opt to file motion to terminate. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
February 20, 2013 2545 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Payment of Court-Appointed Experts for services rendered: Joe Goldenson, M.D. in the amount of $28,820.20, Madeleine LaMarre MN in the amount of $34,439.33, and Michael Puisis, D.O. in the amount of $21,414.95. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/20/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
February 19, 2013 2542 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 2534 Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/19/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013) Modified on 2/19/2013 (tmi, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2013 2536 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: responses to 2532 Defendants' objections to Receiver's 22nd report. Responses from Receiver and Plaintiffs due by 02/22/13. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/14/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
January 29, 2013 2527 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 2506 Defendants' January 7, 2013 motion to vacate or modify. Defendants' filing re: Plata motion to terminate due 02/12/13. Plaintiffs' show cause response and opposition to motion to vacate or modify due 02/12/13. Defe ndants' reply due 02/19/13. 2374 June 30, 2011 Order is modified by extending the deadline for final population reduction benchmark to 12/31/13. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 01/29/2013.(tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 23, 2013 2523 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Payment of Court-Appointed Expert Madeleine LaMarre for services rendered in the amount of $12,907.48. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/23/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 9, 2013 2516 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Payment of Court-Appointed Experts for services rendered: Joe Goldenson, M.D. in the amount of $12,306.03, Madeleine LaMarre MN in the amount of $3,650.00, and Michael Puisis, D.O. in the amount of $18,097.63. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/07/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
December 6, 2012 2499 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2494 Defendants' motion for six-month extension and 2497 Plaintiffs' motion for order to show cause re: contempt. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 12/06/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
November 5, 2012 2492 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to deposit funds. Within 45 days, Defendants shall deposit $250,000 into the Court's registry for this action. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/05/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
October 17, 2012 2490 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER modifying 2470 ORDER re: Receivership transition plan and expert evaluations. Deadline for expert evaluations extended to 03/05/13 for institutions receiving requisite OIG score prior to 09/05/12. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/17/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 16, 2012 2489 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Collection of Undisputed Attorneys' Fees and Costs for First Quarter of 2012. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/15/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 11, 2012 2485 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to develop plans to achieve required prison population reduction. Plans due by 01/07/13. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 10/11/12.(tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
September 13, 2012 2475 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Collection of Undisputed Attorneys' Fees and Costs for Fourth Quarter of 2011. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/12/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
September 7, 2012 2473 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 2435 May 9 and 2467 August 22, 2012 motions. Defendants' supplemental brief due on or before 09/17/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 5, 2012 2470 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Receivership transition plan and expert evaluations. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/05/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
August 3, 2012 2460 Opinion or Order of the Court Second ORDER requiring further briefing re: 2435 Plaintiffs' renewed motion for an order requiring Defendants to demonstrate how they will achieve the required population reduction by June 2013. Supplemental briefs due by 08/17/12. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 08/03/12.(tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
June 7, 2012 2445 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring further briefing re: 2435 Plaintiffs' renewed motion for an order requiring Defendants to demonstrate how they will achieve the required population reduction by June 2013. Supplemental briefs or stipulation due by 06/22/12. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton & Thelton E. Henderson on 06/07/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
May 30, 2012 2443 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER proposing Receivership transition plan. Parties' responses due by 06/29/12. Replies due by 07/20/12. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/30/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 23, 2012 2441 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Collection of Undisputed Attorneys' Fees and Costs for Third Quarter of 2011. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/23/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
April 24, 2012 2432 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending reporting deadline re: 2417 Order to meet and confer re: post-Receivership planning. Joint report due by 05/07/12. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/24/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 17, 2012 2431 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Collection of Undisputed Fees and Costs for Second Quarter 2011. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/16/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
March 22, 2012 2428 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson denying without prejudice 2420 Plaintiffs' motion for an order requiring Defendants to demonstrate how they will achieve the required population reduction by June 2013. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
February 10, 2012 2421 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting briefing schedule re: 2420 MOTION for order requiring Defendants to demonstrate how they will achieve the required population reduction by June 2013. Response due by 02/27/12. Reply due by 03/05/12. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 02/10/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
January 17, 2012 2417 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to meet and confer re: post-Receivership planning. Joint report due by 04/30/12. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/17/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
October 13, 2011 2406 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Costs. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/13/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 11, 2011 2405 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Collection of Undisputed Attorney' Fees and Costs for 2010. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/11/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
September 14, 2011 2392 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: pro se inmate filings. Documents submitted by pro se inmates to the three-judge court shall not be filed. Documents raising specific medical care concerns shall be forwarded to the Receiver for appropriate investigation, and documents rais ing specific mental health care concerns shall be forwarded to plaintiffs' counsel. All other documents shall be returned to the inmates. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 09/14/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
August 25, 2011 2391 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part 2354 Defendant's Motion to Clarify October 17, 2006 Order. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
June 30, 2011 2374 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring interim reports to the three-judge court. Defendants shall file a report on or before 07/21/11 and monthly status reports beginning on 09/15/11. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 06/30/11.(tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 14, 2011 2368 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Stay of All Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses Related to Work Before the Three Judge Panel and the Supreme Court of the United States. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/14/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 7, 2011 2366 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Modifying Hearing and Briefing Schedule on re 2354 MOTION to Clarify Court Order of October 17, 2006. Motion Hearing rescheduled for 8/15/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/06/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
May 25, 2011 2360 Opinion or Order of the Court Scheduling ORDER re: 2354 Motion to Clarify Court Order of October 17, 2006. Defendant to serve motion papers and this order on bargaining units whose salaries are at issue in the motion. Oppositions or statements of non-opposition due by 06/13/11. Reply due by 06/20/11. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/25/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
March 28, 2011 2350 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Collection of 2008 and 2009 Formerly Disputed Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/28/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
February 7, 2011 2348 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: pro se inmate filings. Documents submitted by pro se inmates shall not be filed in this action. Documents concerning medical care will be forwarded to the Receiver for appropriate investigation. All other documents shall be returned to the inmate. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/07/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
January 18, 2011 2347 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Stay of All Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses Related to All Work Before the Three-Judge Court until U.S. Supreme Court Decision re 2344 . Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/18/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 12, 2011 2343 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Collection of Undisputed Attorneys' Fees and Costs for Third Quarter of 2010. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/12/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
October 25, 2010 2339 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER For Collection of Undisputed Attorneys' Fees and Costs for First Quarter of 2010. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/25/10. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
September 1, 2010 2331 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to pay plaintiffs' interim fees and to stay motion to compel payment of reasonable fees. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/31/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
July 2, 2010 2321 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER temporarily staying all fees, costs and expenses. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/01/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
June 30, 2010 2319 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to stay plaintiffs' motion to compel payment. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/30/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
May 12, 2010 2313 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re-appointing Advisory Board. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/12/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 5, 2010 2311 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for collection of undisputed attorneys' fees and costs for fourth quarter of 2009. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/05/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
February 22, 2010 2302 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing Nathan Fletcher, John J. Benoit, and David Cogdill as intervenors. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 02/22/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
January 12, 2010 2287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to reduce prison population. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 01/12/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
November 20, 2009 2277 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for collection of undisputed attorneys' fees and costs for second quarter of 2009. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/20/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
November 18, 2009 2275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER inviting responses from plaintiffs and intervenors to 2274 Defendants' November 12, 2009 proposed prison population reduction measures. Plaintiffs' and intervenors' responses, if any, due by 12/07/09. Defendants' response due by 12/18/09. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 11/18/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
October 21, 2009 2269 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rejecting defendants' proposed population plan and directing the submission of a plan that complies with the August 4, 2009 Opinion and Order. Defendants' submission shall be filed within 21 days. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 10/21/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 7, 2009 2255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part 2227 Defendants' Motion to stay three-judge court attorneys' fees and costs pending appeal. Temporary stay entered until July 1, 2010. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
October 2, 2009 2253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson granting 2238 Motion to Intervene by Assembly Republicans. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
September 18, 2009 2236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 2207 Plaintiffs' motion re: procedure for submitting attorneys' fee requests arising from three-judge court proceedings. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 16, 2009 2235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 2193 Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees and costs for calendar year 2008. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
September 11, 2009 2231 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 2217 Plaintiffs' motion to compel re: population reduction plan. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 3, 2009 2218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson denying 2216 Motion to Stay August 4, 2009 Order. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
August 26, 2009 2210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part 1588 Plaintiffs' Motion for attorneys' fees and costs for third and fourth quarters of 2007 and first quarter of 2008. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 12, 2009 2204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson staying 2180 Motion by Dondi Van Horn for leave to file complaint against Receivers. Motion hearing set for 08/31/09 is vacated. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
August 10, 2009 2203 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the hearing date on the motion for leave to file complaint to 8/31/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/07/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
August 4, 2009 2198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson ruling on evidentiary matters related to 2197 Opinion and Order. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 3, 2009 2195 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for collection of undisputed attorneys' fees and costs for first quarter of 2009. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/03/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
May 29, 2009 2166 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING the 06/01/09 motion hearing. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/29/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 8, 2009 2151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re 2150 Stipulation for Collection of Undisputed Attorneys' Fees And Costs For Fourth Quarter of 2008 filed by Marciano Plata. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 5/7/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 1, 2009 2148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 2139 Defendants' request to shorten time on motion to stay March 24, 2009 Order. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
March 24, 2009 2132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 2039 Defendants' motion to replace Receiver with special master and to terminate the Receiver's construction plan. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 4, 2009 2123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying without prejudice 2106 Receiver's motion to set date for evidentiary hearing and for leave to take limited discovery. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
February 26, 2009 2105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part 2089 Receiver's motion for postponement of automatic stay. No automatic stay shall go into effect until April 1, 2009. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 25, 2009 2098 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Dr. Jacqueline Tulsky to Advisory Board. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/25/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 12, 2009 2075 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: briefing schedule. Motion Hearing is continued to 3/16/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/12/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
February 9, 2009 2066 Opinion or Order of the Court TENTATIVE RULING in three-judge court proceedings. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 02/09/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 4, 2009 2064 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring further briefing. Supplemental briefing on specified funding questions due on or before 02/18/09. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 02/04/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
January 30, 2009 2053 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Receiver's Supplemental Application No. 8. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/29/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 27, 2009 2036 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: oral argument in three-judge court proceedings. Argument will begin at 10:00 AM on 02/03/09 in the Ceremonial Courtroom (Courtroom 1) of the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, 95 Seventh Street, San Francisco, California. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 01/27/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 15, 2009 2004 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: transcription and dictation coordination agreement. Show Cause Response due by 1/30/2009. Signed by Judges Lawrence K. Karlton, Thelton E. Henderson, Jeffrey S. White, and Claudia Wilken on 01/15/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 8, 2009 1998 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: proposed findings and oral argument. Proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law due by 01/23/09. Joint statement with time estimates for oral argument due by 01/23/09. Oral argument to begin on 02/03/09 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 01/08/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
January 6, 2009 1985 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Governor's budget proposal. Defendants' response due by 01/16/09. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 01/06/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
January 5, 2009 1984 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing on 1588 Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/05/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 1, 2008 1862 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: transition planning coordination agreement. Supplemental statement due by 02/02/09. Signed by Judges Lawrence K. Karlton, Thelton E. Henderson, Jeffrey S. White, and Claudia Wilken on 12/01/08. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
November 26, 2008 1858 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: request to continue hearing date and extend time for plaintiffs to file reply. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/26/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 20, 2008 1835 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 1517 Motion to unseal second draft of Receiver's Facility Program Statement. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 19, 2008 1830 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER modifying reporting requirements re: coordination orders. Reports are now due by January 15, May 15, and September 15 of each year. Signed by Judges Lawrence K. Karlton, Thelton E. Henderson, Jeffrey S. White, and Claudia Wilken on 11/19/08. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 18, 2008 1825 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Modification of Order Sealing Deposition of Expert Witness Haney. Signed by Judges Thelton E. Henderson, Lawrence K. Karlton and Stephen Reinhardt on 11/18/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008) Modified on 11/18/2008 (rbe, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2008 1822 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER modifying reporting requirements by the Receiver. Reports are now due by January 15, May 15, and September 15 of each year. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/17/08. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
November 14, 2008 1803 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER allowing equipment to be brought into the ceremonial courtroom. Signed by Judges Thelton E. Henderson, Lawrence K. Karlton and Stephen Reinhardt on 11/14/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 13, 2008 1797 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson denying 1784 Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 12, 2008 1788 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring responses to 1784 Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 11/12/08. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 7, 2008 1778 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 1739 Defendants' Motion to Stay 1610 October 27, 2008 Order. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 6, 2008 1775 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for collection of undisputed attorneys' fees and costs for second quarter of 2008. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/06/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
November 3, 2008 1757 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson denying 1478 Defendants' motion for dismissal or, alternatively, summary judgment. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
October 30, 2008 1622 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: transition planning coordination agreement. Show Cause Response due by 11/10/2008. Signed by Judges Lawrence K. Karlton, Thelton E. Henderson, Jeffrey S. White, and Claudia Wilken on 10/30/08. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 27, 2008 1611 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1602 Stipulation regarding approval of the Inspector General's proposed medical inspection program. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/27/08. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 8, 2008 1549 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for further proceedings re: Receiver's motion for contempt. Hearing set for 10/27/08 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/08/08. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 7, 2008 1546 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Receiver's Construction Oversight Advisory Board and Rehabilitation Services Advisory Council. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/07/08. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
September 30, 2008 1534 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1512 Defendants' request for clarification. Discovery sanctions from 08/29/08 order shall be paid within ten days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge John F. Moulds on 09/30/08. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 26, 2008 1516 Opinion or Order of the Court Further ORDER re: physician clinical competency policies and implementation plan. Joint status report due on or before 11/21/08. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/26/08. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 25, 2008 1515 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson denying 1441 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of the magistrate judge's August 29, 2008 order. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 18, 2008 1500 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 1495 Motion to file documents under seal. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 11, 2008 1469 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson denying 1464 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of the magistrate judge's September 10, 2008 order re: the deposition of Matthew Cate. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)
September 10, 2008 1462 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge John F. Moulds granting 1455 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel deposition testimony of Matthew Cate. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 9, 2008 1459 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER revising trial schedule in three-judge court proceedings. Signed by Judges Stephen Reinhardt, Lawrence K. Karlton, and Thelton E. Henderson on 09/09/08. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 8, 2008 1458 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge John F. Moulds granting in part and denying in part 1412 Plaintiffs' motion for order compelling deposition of certain legislative intervenors and 1414 Legislative Intervenors' motion for protective order. Depositions of Senator George Runner and Assemblyman Todd Spitzer shall be taken. Depositions of Senator David Codgill and Assemblyman Michael Villines shall not be taken. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 5, 2008 1451 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: space planning coordination agreement. Show Cause Response due by 09/26/08. Signed by Judges Lawrence K. Karlton, Thelton E. Henderson, Jeffrey S. White, and Claudia Wilken on 09/05/08. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
February 8, 2008 1089 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re further extension of time to file supplemental reply memorandum. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/08/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 4, 2008 1079 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: information technology coordination agreement. Show Cause Response due by 02/15/08. Signed by Judges Lawrence K. Karlton, Thelton E. Henderson, Jeffrey S. White, and Claudia Wilken on 02/04/08. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plata et al v. Schwarzenegger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marciano Plata
Represented By: Michael William Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Shaw
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Stoderd
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Long
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Rhoades
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Aviles
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Decasas
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Bautista
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Johns
Represented By: Steven Fama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah J. Sandoval
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Alan Smith
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Myelle
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Bornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dondi Van Horn
Represented By: Samuel F. Ernst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Genest
Represented By: Rochelle C. East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Represented By: Rochelle C. East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Tilton
Represented By: Rochelle C. East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chiang
Represented By: Paul Brian Mello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Gerald Frank Stanley
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Ralph Coleman
Represented By: Michael William Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Elwood Lui
Represented By: Peter Eliot Davids
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Peter Siggins
Represented By: Peter Eliot Davids
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: J. Clark Kelso
Represented By: James J. Brosnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Peter Davids
Represented By: Peter Eliot Davids
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: California Correctional Peace Officers Association
Represented By: Gregg McLean Adam, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: Theresa J. Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: County of Santa Barbara
Represented By: Theresa J. Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: County of San Mateo
Represented By: Theresa J. Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: County of Sonoma
Represented By: Anne L. Keck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Pat Hedges
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Jim Denney
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Rod Mitchell
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Larry Jones
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Jim Mele
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Margaret Mims
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Mike Kanalakis
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Richard Scholl
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Gary Philp
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Jeff Neves
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Mark Pazin
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Dean Wilson
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Steve Moore
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Martin Ryan
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: William Lutz
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Karen Staples
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Isabelle Voit
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Patricia Stewart
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: John Wardell
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Kim Barrett
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Lionel Chatman
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Jim Moffett
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Brian Richart
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Don Meyer
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Linda Penner
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Gail Neal
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Dave Singer
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Joel Neves
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Barney Melekian
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Jim Hudson
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Craig Steckler
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: George Galaza
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Union of American Physicians & Dentists
Represented By: Paul More
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Association of California State Supervisors
Represented By: Charles L. Post
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Californians United for a Responsible Budget
Represented By: Cassie M Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Anthony Adams
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Joel Anderson
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Tom Berryhill
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Sam Blakeslee
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Paul Cook,
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Chuck DeVore
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Michael D. Duvall
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Bill Emmerson
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Jean Fuller
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Ted Gaines
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Martin Garrick
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Shirley Horton
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Guy S. Houston
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Bob Huff
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Kevin Jeffries
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Rick Keene
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Doug La Malfa
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Bill Maze
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Roger Niello,
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Sharon Runner
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Jim Silva
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Cameron Smyth
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Todd Spitzer
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Audra Strickland
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Van Tran
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Michael N. Villines
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Mimi Walters
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: San Diego County Sheriff William B. Kolender
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Orange County Sheriff Coroner Michael S. Carona
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Placer County Sheriff Edward N. Bonner
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Butte County Sheriff- Coroner Perry L. Reniff
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Calaveras County Sheriff Dennis Downum
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Los Angeles County Sheriff Lee Baca
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Santa Clara County Sheriff Laurie Smith
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: San Benito County Sheriff Curtis Hill
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Stanislus County Sheriff Adam Christianson
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Mendocino County Sheriff Tom Allman
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Tehama County Sheriff Clay Parker
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Lassen County Sheriff Steve Warren
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Yolo County Sheriff Ed Prieto
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Santa Barbara County Sheriff Bill Brown
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Kern County Sheriff Donny Youngblood
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: San Mateo County Sheriff Greg Monks
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Yuba County Sheriff Steve Durfor
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Contra Costa County Sheriff Warren Rupf
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Shasta County Sheriff Tom Bosenko
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Stanislaus County Chief Probation Officer Jerry Powers
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Riverside County Sheriff Bob G. Doyle
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Ventura County Sheriff Bob Brooks
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Solano County Sheriff Gary R. Stanton
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: ROD PACHECO
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Bonnie M. Dumanis
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Tony Rackauckas
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Jan Scully
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Christie Stanley
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Michael Ramos
Represented By: William Charles Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Robert Kochly
Represented By: William Charles Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: David W. Paulson
Represented By: William Charles Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Gregg Cohen
Represented By: William Charles Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Todd Riebe
Represented By: William Charles Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Bradford Fenocchio
Represented By: William Charles Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: John R. Poyner
Represented By: William Charles Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Michael Ramsey
Represented By: William Charles Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Edward R. Jagels
Represented By: William Charles Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Samuel Aanestad
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Roy Ashburn
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: James F. Battin, Jr.
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Dave Cox
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Bob Dutton
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Dennis Hollingsworth
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Abel Maldonado
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: George Runner
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Mark Wyland
Represented By: Steven Shea Kaufhold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: GREGORY TOTTEN
Represented By: William Charles Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Vern Pierson
Represented By: William Charles Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Clifford Newell
Represented By: William Charles Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Ronald L. Calhoun
Represented By: William Charles Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Donald Segerstrom
Represented By: William Charles Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Jim Copsey
Represented By: Ivy M. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Steve Lodge
Represented By: Ivy M. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Rich Word
Represented By: Ivy M. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Cary Sullivan
Represented By: Ivy M. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Mace McIntosh
Represented By: Ivy M. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Lisa Solomon
Represented By: Ivy M. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Michael Billdt
Represented By: Ivy M. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Richard Hawthorne
Represented By: Ivy M. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Adolpho Gonzales
Represented By: Ivy M. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Mark DeRosia
Represented By: Ivy M. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Roy Wasden
Represented By: Ivy M. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Jerry Dyer
Represented By: Ivy M. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Sonoma County District Attorney Stephan Passalacqua
Represented By: Anne L. Keck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Sonoma County Chief Probation Office Robert Ochs
Represented By: Anne L. Keck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Sonoma County Sheriff/Coroner William Cogbill
Represented By: Anne L. Keck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: San Mateo County Sheriff Greg Munks
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Bill Berryhill
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Connie Conway
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Danny Gilmore
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Curt Hagman
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Diane Harkey
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Steven Knight
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Dan Logue
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Jeff Miller
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Brian Nestande
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Jim Nielsen
Represented By: Chad Allen Stegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Gerald T. Shea
Represented By: William Charles Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: San Diego County Sheriff William B. Kolender
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Orange County Sheriff Coroner Michael S. Carona
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Placer County Sheriff Edward N. Bonner
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Butte County Sheriff- Coroner Perry L. Reniff
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Calaveras County Sheriff Dennis Downum
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Los Angeles County Sheriff Lee Baca
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Santa Clara County Sheriff Laurie Smith
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Stanislaus County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: San Benito County Sheriff Curtis Hill
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Stanislaus County Sheriff Adam Christianson
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Mendocino County Sheriff Tom Allman
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Tehama County Sheriff Clay Parker
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Lassen County Sheriff Steve Warren
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Yolo County Sheriff Ed Prieto
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Santa Barbara County Sheriff Bill Brown
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Kern County Sheriff Donny Youngblood
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: San Mateo County Sheriff Greg Munks
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Yuba County Sheriff Steve Durfor
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Contra Costa County Sheriff Warren Rupf
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Shasta County Sheriff Tom Bosenko
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Riverside County Sheriff Bob G. Doyle
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Ventura County Sheriff Bob Brooks
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Solano County Sheriff Gary R. Stanton
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: San Luis Obispo County Sheriff Pat Hedges
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Sutter County Sheriff Jim Denney
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Lake County Sheriff Rod Mitchell
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Glenn County Sheriff
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Tuolumne County Sheriff Jim Mele
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Fresno County Sheriff
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Monterey County Sheriff Mike Kanalakis
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Mono County Sheriff Richard Scholl
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Humboldt County Sheriff Gary Philp
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: El Dorado County Sheriff Jeff Neves
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Merced County Sheriff Mark Pazin
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Del Norte County Sheriff Dean Wilson
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: San Joaquin County Sheriff Steve Moore
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Amador County Sheriff Martin Ryan
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Inyo County Sheriff William Lutze
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Stanislaus County Chief Probation Officer Jerry Powers
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Ventura County Chief Probation Officer Karen Staples
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Solano County Chief Probation Officer Isabelle Voit
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Santa Barbara County Chief Probation Officer Patricia Stewart
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Butte County Chief Probation Officer John Wardell
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: San Luis Obispo County Chief Probation Officer Kim Barrett
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Contra Costa County Chief Probation Officer Lionel Chatman
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Inyo County Chief Probation Officer Jim Moffett
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Shasta County Chief Probation Officer Brian Richart
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Yolo County Chief Probation Officer Don Meyer
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Fresno County Chief Probation Officer Linda Penner
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Mariposa County Chief Probation Officer Gail Neal
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: City of Whittier Police Chief Dave Singer
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: City of Roseville Police Chief Joel Neves
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: City of Pasadena Police Chief Barney Melekian
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: City of Alhambra Police Chief Jim Hudson
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: City of Fremont Police Chief Craig Steckler
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: City of Grover Beach Police Chief Jim Copsey
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: City of Santa Clara Police Chief Steve Lodge
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: City of Vacaville Police Chief Rich Word
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: City of Woodland Police Chief Carey Sullivan
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: City of Sonora Police Chief Mace McIntosh
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: City of Paso Robles Police Chief Lisa Solomon
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: City of San Bernardino Police Chief Michael Billdt
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: City of Atwater Police Chief Richard Hawthorne
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: National City Police Chief Adolfo Gonzales
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: City of Delano Police Chief Mark DeRosia
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: City of Modesto Police Chief Roy Wasden
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: City of Fresno Police Chief Jerry Dyer
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: City of Delano Chief of Corrections George Galaza
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Glenn County Sheriff Larry Jones
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Fresno County Sheriff Margaret Mims
Represented By: Kimberly Hall Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Office of the Inspector General
Represented By: Tamara Michelle Colson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Matthew Cate
Represented By: Rochelle C. East
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Medical Development International
Represented By: Garrett E. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?