Chavarria v. Hamlet

Petitioner: Marcus Daniel Chavarria
Respondent: Jim Hamlet
Case Number: 3:2001cv02242
Filed: October 20, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
April 12, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The petition for writ of habeas corpus has been denied. Judgment is entered accordingly.(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
October 20, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTIONS. Granting 42 petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel Mr. Rosenbaum. Granting 47 , 59 petitioner's motion for extension of time to file his reply. Petitioner's reply shall be file no later than 11/18/09. Denying as moot 43 respondent's motion for extension of time to file an answer to the habeas petition, as respondent's answe was filed on 8/17/09. (cc: Neil J. Rosenbaum, Marcus D. Chavarria) (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavarria v. Hamlet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcus Daniel Chavarria
Represented By: Neil Jacob Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jim Hamlet
Represented By: Christopher William Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?