Dukes et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Betty Dukes, Patricia Surgeson, Edith Arana, Karen Williamson, Deborah Gunter, Christine Kwapnoski, Cleo Page and M.J. Furman
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Miscellaneous: Diana Alexander-Jones
Case Number: 3:2001cv02252
Filed: June 8, 2001
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1173 Sua Sponte Judicial Referral for Purposes of Determining Relationship of Cases (re 5:19-CV-02525-LHK). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on August 20, 2010. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019) Modified on 8/20/2019 (kedS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1167 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying as moot 1161 Motion to Intervene. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1163 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MOTION TO INTERVENE by Judge Charles R. Breyer (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016).
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1151 ORDER TO PICK UP VOLUMINOUS EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 08/25/2015. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1134 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part: 1057 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 1060 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 1062 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 1072 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2015)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1129 ORDER re all pending administrative motions to seal. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 06/05/2015. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1074 ORDER re 1073 Notice of Withdrawal of Individual Counsel filed by Edith Arana, Christine Kwapnoski, Betty Dukes, Patricia Surgeson, Deborah Gunter. Attorney Peter Romer-Friedman terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/4/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1047 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF 1041 .(jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1038 ORDER granting 1037 STIPULATION MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE filed by Edith Arana, Christine Kwapnoski, Betty Dukes, Patricia Surgeson, Deborah Gunter (as modified). Dispositive Motions due by 4/3/2015. Responses due by 5/ 1/2015. Replies due by 5/15/2015. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Pretrial Order due by 8/21/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2015 02:30 PM before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 9/8/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer, Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/18/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF RE: PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/19/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 1018 Discovery Letter Brief.(jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1019 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF (Dkt. No. 1018). Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on July 21, 2014. (jsclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1012 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF: re 1006 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., 1004 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Edith Arana, Christine Kwapnoski, Betty Dukes, Patricia Surgeson, Deborah Gunter. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/17/2014. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 ORDER re Discovery Letter Brief 1004 by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. The parties shall file a joint letter brief outlining the issues and the parties meet and confer efforts in accordance with the Courts Standing Order by June 11, 2014. The Court will then conduct a telephonic discovery hearing on June 16, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1003 ORDER re 1002 Status Report filed by Edith Arana, Christine Kwapnoski, Betty Dukes, Patricia Surgeson, Deborah Gunter, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 1002 Status Report. Case Management Conference reset for 7/11/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Dispositive Motions due by 1/9/2015. Responses due by 2/6/2015. Replies due by 2/20/2015. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Pretrial Orde r due by 5/18/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 5/26/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Trial set for 6/1/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/5/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 997 ORDER granting 996 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs filed by Edith Arana, Christine Kwapnoski, Betty Dukes, Karen Williamson, M.J. Furman, Cleo Page, Patricia Surgeson, Deborah Gunter. Attorney Michael Victor Caesar terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/8/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 993 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/23/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 991 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying (891) Motion to Certify Class. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 989 ORDER granting 988 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Motion Hearing Scheduled for August 2, 2013 filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. The motion hearing schedule for 8/2/2013 is cancelled. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/29/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 978 ORDER Requiring Preparation for Hearing. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 06/28/2013. (crblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 944 ORDER granting 941 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 919 MOTION to Exclude to Declaration Dr. Richard M. Drogin. Reset Deadlines as to 919 MOTION to Exclude to Declaration Dr. Richard M. Drogin. Responses due by 6/19/2013. Replies due by 6/26/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/12/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 909 ORDER granting 902 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Hearing Date for Class Certification Motion filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.., Reset Hearing as too 891 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted) Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/25/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 883 ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF (Dkt. No. 882). Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on March 26, 2013. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 880 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF (Dkt. No. 879). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 878 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/19/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 875 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 867 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 872 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION RE: DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEFS (Dkt. No. 865) signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 863 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEFS (Dkt. Nos. 858 & 859) by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 851 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF (Dkt. No. 850). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/13/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 842 ORDER RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF (Dkt. No. 840). Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/22/2013. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 838 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 822 832 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 837 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF re 827 Letter filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on January 10, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 833 ORDER granting 826 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE CLASS MANAGEMENT AND CLASS CERTIFICATION. Motions for Class Certification due by 4/11/2013. Responses due by 5/31/2013. Replies due by 6/25/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/3/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 825 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE BY PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/13/2012. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 824 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 814 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 812 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 781 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 805 Supplemental Briefing ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/2/2012. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 801 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Advancement of Hearing Date for Wal-Mart's Motion to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint. 781 MOTION to Dismiss Hearing set for 6/8/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 04/18/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 788 ORDER re 786 STIPULATION Regarding Filing of Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Wal-Mart's Motion to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Reset Deadlines as to 781 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amen ded Complaint. Responses due by 3/30/2012. Replies due by 4/13/2012. Motion Hearing reset for 5/7/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/23/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 785 ORDER Granting Substitution of Attorney re 764 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Edith Arana, Christine Kwapnoski, Betty Dukes, Karen Williamson, Cleo Page, Patricia Surgeson, Deborah Gunter,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/17/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 780 ORDER re revised briefing schedule re 779 Stipulation, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Answer to 4th amended complaint due 01/13/2012.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/3/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 777 ORDER regarding page limits re 776 Stipulation filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/8/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 774 ORDER granting 772 Stipulation to Reschedule Hearing filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/15/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 769 ORDER re Filing of Fourth Amended Complaint re 766 Stipulation, filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/28/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 760 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part 740 Motion to Extend Tolling. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on July 1, 2011. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 732 ORDER. Due to the pending retirement of the undersigned, the clerk is directed to re-assign this case. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/28/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 723 STIPULATION AND ORDER to shorten time to consider joint motion to extend stay. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 09/17/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dukes et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Dukes
Represented By: Merit Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Surgeson
Represented By: Merit Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Arana
Represented By: Charles V. Firth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Williamson
Represented By: Charles V. Firth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Gunter
Represented By: Charles V. Firth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Kwapnoski
Represented By: Charles V. Firth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleo Page
Represented By: Charles V. Firth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.J. Furman
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy L. Abell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Diana Alexander-Jones
Represented By: Todd Michael Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?