Securities And Exchange Commission v. Lapine
Plaintiff: Securities And Exchange Commission
Defendant: Jay Lapine
Case Number: 3:2001cv03650
Filed: February 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT JAY LAPINE. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 1, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER RE REQUEST TO ENLARGE TIME. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 5, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER RE REQUEST TO ENLARGE TIME. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 1, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CHANGE TIME by Judge Alsup granting 93 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 8, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 19, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 76 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER LIFTING STAY except that no interrogatories, requests for admission, and no deposition shall be required of defendant until after the ten third-party depositions are taken, which shall be completed by the end o f February 2009. Defendants shall answer the complaint by October 28, 2008, at noon. All parties shall make their Rule 26 initial disclosures by said date. Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2009 11:00 AM. Case management conference statement due 3/12/2009. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/20/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities And Exchange Commission v. Lapine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities And Exchange Commission
Represented By: Judith L. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Lapine
Represented By: William M. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?