North Pacifica LLC v. City of Pacifica et al

Case Number: 3:2001cv04823
Filed: December 7, 2001
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2008 656 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 655 Received Document filed by Pacifica Planning Commission, Pacifica City Council, City of Pacifica. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/30/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 29, 2008 654 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 649 Defendants' Application for Order Directing Refund of Deposit (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 12, 2008 652 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Briefing on 649 Defendant's Application for Order Directing Refund of Deposit. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/12/2008. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Pacifica LLC v. City of Pacifica et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?