Overture Services, Inc. v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Overture Services Inc. alleged that defendant Google Inc. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 6,269,361 entitled \"System and method for influencing a position on a search result list generated by a computer network search engine.\"

Plaintiff: Overture Services, Inc.
Defendant: Google Inc.
Counter-claimant: Google Inc.
Counter-defendant: Overture Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2002cv01991
Filed: April 23, 2002
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2004 213 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 212 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice of All Claims. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 9, 2004. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2004)
August 9, 2004 212 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Stipulation And [Proposed] Order For Dismissal With Prejudice Of All Claims By And Against Google Inc.) by Overture Services, Inc.. (Mitchell, Sarah) (Filed on 8/9/2004)
August 2, 2004 211 Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of 204 Reply Re Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Re Prosecution of '361 Patent filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 204 ) (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 8/2/2004)
August 2, 2004 210 NOTICE by Google Inc. of Withdrawal of Request to File Documents Under Seal [Doc. No. 207] (Grewal, Ravind) (Filed on 8/2/2004)
July 30, 2004 Received Document (UNDER SEAL) Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of Reply by Google Inc. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 209 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 208 NOTICE by Google Inc. of Manual Filing (Grewal, Ravind) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 207 MOTION to Seal Document (Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of Google's Reply Re Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Re Prosecution of '361 Patent ); [Proposed] Order filed by Google Inc.. (Grewal, Ravind) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 206 Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of 204 Reply Re Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Re Prosecution of '361 Patent filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 204 ) (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 205 Declaration of Ravind S. Grewal in Support of 204 , 195 Reply Re Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Re Prosecution of '361 Patent filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 204 , 195 ) (Grewal, Ravind) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 204 Reply Memorandum re 195 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Re Prosecution of the '361 Patent filed by Google Inc.. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 23, 2004 203 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO COMPELSigned by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on July 23, 2004. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2004)
July 20, 2004 202 STIPULATION [Joint Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Re Briefing Schedule For Defendant And Counterclaimant Google Inc.'s Motion To Compel Production Of Documents And Testimony Re Prosecution Of The '361 Patent] by Overture Services, Inc.. (Byrnes, Andrew) (Filed on 7/20/2004)
July 15, 2004 Received Document (UNDER SEAL) Ex Parte Motion to File Documents Under Seal in Support of its Opposition by Overture Services, Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2004)
July 15, 2004 201 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Overture Services, Inc. [Ex Parte Motion to File Documents Under Seal in Support of its Opposition to Google Inc.'s [Corrected] Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony re: Prosecurtion of the '361 Patent] (Thayer, M.) (Filed on 7/15/2004)
July 15, 2004 200 Proposed Order [Granting Plaintiff Overture Services, Inc.'s Ex Parte Motion To File Documents Under Seal] by Overture Services, Inc.. (Thayer, M.) (Filed on 7/15/2004)
July 15, 2004 199 Proposed Order [Denying Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion To Compel [Corrected Motion] Production Of Documents And Testimony Re: Prosecution Of The '361 Patent] by Overture Services, Inc.. (Thayer, M.) (Filed on 7/15/2004)
July 15, 2004 198 DECLARATION of Michael P. Wickey [in Support of Plaintiff Overture Services, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony re Prosecution of the '361 Patent] filed by Overture Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K Part 1# 12 Exhibit K Part 2# 13 Exhibit K Part 3# 14 Exhibit K Part 4# 15 Exhibit K Part 5# 16 Exhibit K Part 6# 17 Exhibit K Part 7# 18 Exhibit K Part 8# 19 Exhibit L# 20 Exhibit M# 21 Exhibit N# 22 Exhibit O# 23 Exhibit P# 24 Exhibit Q# 25 Exhibit R# 26 Exhibit S# 27 Exhibit T# 28 Exhibit U# 29 Exhibit V)(Wickey, Michael) (Filed on 7/15/2004)
July 15, 2004 197 Memorandum in Opposition [Plaintiff Overture Services, Inc.'s Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion To Compel (Corrected Motion)] filed by Overture Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A (Non-Published Authority))(Thayer, M.) (Filed on 7/15/2004)
July 9, 2004 196 AMENDED [UNDER SEAL] Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of 195 filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 195 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2004)
July 9, 2004 195 MOTION to Compel Productions of Documents and Testimony RE: Prosecution of the '361 Patent; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof [AMENDED UNREDACTED VERSION] filed by Google Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2004)
July 9, 2004 194 AMENDED Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of 175 , [] Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Re: Prosecution of '361 Patent (Publicly Filed Amended Declaration w/o Exhibits ) filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 175 , []) (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 7/9/2004) Modified on 7/12/2004 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2004 193 Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of 175 Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Re Prosecution of the '361 Patent (Publicly Filed Version of Declaration - Without Exhibits) filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 175 ) (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 7/9/2004)
July 9, 2004 192 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte finding as moot 172 Motion to Seal Document, finding as moot 182 Motion to Seal Document, granting 189 Second Amended Request to Seal Documents (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2004)
July 9, 2004 191 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO COMPELSigned by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on July 9, 2004. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2004)
July 8, 2004 190 STIPULATION [Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Re Briefing Schedule for Defendant and Counterclaimant Google Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Re Prosecution of the '361 Patent] by Overture Services, Inc.. (Byrnes, Andrew) (Filed on 7/8/2004)
July 8, 2004 189 MOTION to Seal Document Second Amended Request to File Documents Under Seal; [Proposed] Order filed by Google Inc.. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 7/8/2004)
July 7, 2004 188 Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of 183 Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Re Prosecution of '361 Patent [Supplemental Declaration] filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 183 ) (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 7/7/2004)
July 7, 2004 187 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing reset to 8/10/2004 09:00 AM. (drk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2004)
July 6, 2004 186 Declaration of Ravind S. Grewal in Support of 183 Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Re Prosecution of '361 Patent filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 183 ) (Grewal, Ravind) (Filed on 7/6/2004)
July 6, 2004 185 NOTICE by Google Inc. of Manual Filing of [Amended Unredacted Version] of Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Re: Prosecution of the '361 Patent and the Amended Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support Thereof (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 7/6/2004)
July 6, 2004 184 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. of Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Production [Amended Unredacted Version] and Amended Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support Thereof (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 7/6/2004)
July 6, 2004 183 Amended MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Re: Prosecution of the '361 Patent; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof [Amended Redacted Version] filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2004 09:00 AM. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 7/6/2004)
July 6, 2004 182 Amended MOTION to Seal Document ; [Proposed] Order filed by Google Inc.. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 7/6/2004)
July 1, 2004 181 AmendedCertificate of Service by Google Inc.. Amendment to 180 Certificate of Service,. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 7/1/2004) Modified on 7/8/2004 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2004 180 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 175 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Re: Prosecution of the '361 Patent; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof [REDACTED VERSION], 176 Declaration in Support, 179 Exhibits,, (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 6/30/2004)
June 30, 2004 179 EXHIBITS re 176 Declaration of Ravind S. Grewal in Support of Motion to Compel Production and Testimony Re: Prosecution of '361 Patent filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1# 2 Exhibit A-3# 3 Exhibit A-4# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit E# 8 Exhibit F# 9 Exhibit G# 10 Exhibit H# 11 Exhibit I# 12 Exhibit J# 13 Exhibit K# 14 Exhibit L# 15 Exhibit M# 16 Exhibit N# 17 Exhibit O# 18 Exhibit P# 19 Exhibit Q)(Related document(s) 176 ) (Grewal, Ravind) (Filed on 6/30/2004)
June 29, 2004 Received Document: Declaration of Christine P. Sun "FILED UNDER SEAL" by Google Inc.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2004)
June 29, 2004 Received Document: Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony re: Prosecution of the '361 Patent "FILED UNDER SEAL" by Google Inc.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2004)
June 29, 2004 178 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. Motion to Compel Production (Unredacted Version) and Declaration of Christine P. Sun (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 6/29/2004)
June 29, 2004 177 Proposed Order re 175 Motion to Compel Production by Google Inc.. (Grewal, Ravind) (Filed on 6/29/2004)
June 29, 2004 176 Declaration of Ravind S. Grewal in Support of 175 Motion to Compel Production filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 175 ) (Grewal, Ravind) (Filed on 6/29/2004)
June 29, 2004 175 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Re: Prosecution of the '361 Patent; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof [REDACTED VERSION] filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2004 09:00 AM. (Keker, John) (Filed on 6/29/2004)
June 29, 2004 174 NOTICE by Google Inc. of Manual Filing (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 6/29/2004)
June 29, 2004 173 Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of 172 Request to File Documents Under Seal filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 172 ) (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 6/29/2004)
June 29, 2004 172 MOTION to Seal Document and [Proposed] Order filed by Google Inc.. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 6/29/2004)
May 18, 2004 171 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Plaintiff Overture Services, Inc.'s Response To Google Inc.'s Supplemental Claim Construction Brief filed by Overture Services, Inc., Andrew Byrnes. (Byrnes, Andrew) (Filed on 5/18/2004)
May 12, 2004 168 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Supplemental Claim Construction Brief (Redacted Version) filed by Google Inc.. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 5/12/2004)
May 11, 2004 170 Declaration of Ravind S. Grewal in Support of 169 "FILED UNDER SEAL" filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 169 ) (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2004)
May 11, 2004 169 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT "FILED UNDER SEAL" filed by Google Inc.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2004)
May 11, 2004 167 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 164 Stipulated Request for Leave to File Supplemental Claim Construction Brief and to Permit Sealing of Supplemental Claim Construction Brief and Declaration of Ravind S. Grewal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 11, 2004. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2004)
May 11, 2004 166 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 5/11/2004)
May 11, 2004 165 Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of 164 Miscellaneous Administrative Request Re Filing of Supplemental Claim Construction Brief and to file Supplemental Claim Construction Brief and Decl. of Ravind S. Grewal in Support under seal; [Proposed Order] filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 164 ) (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 5/11/2004)
May 11, 2004 164 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Claim Construction Brief and to permit sealing of Supplemental Claim Construction Brief and Declaration of Ravind S. Grewal in Support of this Miscellaneous Administrative Request filed by Google Inc.. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 5/11/2004)
May 11, 2004 163 STIPULATION Re: Supplemental Claim Construction Briefing by Google Inc.. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 5/11/2004)
April 7, 2004 162 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/24/2004 before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter: Joan Columbini. (vlh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2004)
March 25, 2004 161 Minute Entry: Claims Construction Hearing held on 3/24/2004 before Judge Jeffrey S. White. The matter is submitted. (Court Reporter: Joan Columbini) (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/25/2004)
March 17, 2004 160 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 158 Request to Bring Equipment Into Courtroom. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 17, 2004. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2004)
March 16, 2004 159 Proposed Order re 158 [Plaintiff Overture Services, Inc.'s Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Bring Equipment into Courtroom the Day before Markman Hearing] by Overture Services, Inc.. (Byrnes, Andrew) (Filed on 3/16/2004)
March 16, 2004 158 NOTICE by Overture Services, Inc. [Plaintiff's Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Bring Equipment into Courtroom for Markman Hearing] (Byrnes, Andrew) (Filed on 3/16/2004)
March 10, 2004 157 Letter from counsel for Plaintiff dated 3/9/2004 re: tutorial exhibits. (vlh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2004)
March 10, 2004 156 Letter from counsel for Defendant dated 3/9/2004 re: tutorial exhibits. (vlh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2004)
March 9, 2004 155 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/9/2004 before Laporte (Date Filed: 3/9/2004) re 112 MOTION to Compel [Corrected Motion to Compel Production of Damages Documents; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Corrected Motion] filed by Overture Services, Inc.(Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.)(drk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/9/2004)
March 9, 2004 154 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part 109 112 Motion to Compel Production of Discovery Relating to Damages (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2004)
March 4, 2004 153 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 151 Miscellaneous Administrative Request re Equipment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 4, 2004. (jswlc2, ) (Filed on 3/4/2004)
March 4, 2004 152 Proposed Order [Re Plaintiff Overture Services, Inc.'s Miscellaneous Adminstrative Request to Bring Equipment into Courtroom for Markman Tutorial and Hearing] by Overture Services, Inc.. (Byrnes, Andrew) (Filed on 3/4/2004)
March 4, 2004 151 NOTICE by Overture Services, Inc. [Plaintiff Overture Services, Inc.'s Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Bring Equipment into Courtroom for Markman Tutorial and Hearing] (Byrnes, Andrew) (Filed on 3/4/2004)
March 4, 2004 150 CLERK'S NOTICE Requiring Counsel to Videotape Tutorial scheduled for 3-10-04 at 2:00 p.m. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2004)
March 2, 2004 149 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 148 Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Bring Equipment Into Courtroom. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 2, 2004. (jswlc2, ) (Filed on 3/2/2004)
March 1, 2004 148 Proposed Order and Misc. Admin. Request to Bring Equipment and Materials in Courtroom for Markman Hearing by Google Inc.. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 3/1/2004)
February 26, 2004 147 Memorandum in Opposition re 112 MOTION to Compel [Corrected Motion to Compel Production of Damages Documents; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Corrected Motion] [AMENDED] Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Google Inc.. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 2/26/2004)
February 25, 2004 144 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing reset to 09:30 AM of same day, 3/9/2004.(drk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2004)
February 24, 2004 146 Declaration of Mark Fuchs in Support of 112 "FILED UNDER SEAL" filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 112 ) (vlh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2004)
February 24, 2004 145 Declaration of Pietro Dova in Support of 112 "FILED UNDER SEAL" filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 112 ) (vlh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2004)
February 24, 2004 143 Reply to Opposition [Plaintiff Overture Services, Inc.'s Reply Memorandum In Support Of Its Motion To Compel Production Of Damages Documents] filed by Overture Services, Inc.. (Mitchell, Sarah) (Filed on 2/24/2004)
February 24, 2004 142 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part 130 Motion to File Documents Under Seal (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2004)
February 20, 2004 141 Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of 140 "FILED UNDER SEAL" filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 140 ) (vlh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2004)
February 20, 2004 140 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION Sur-Reply "FILED UNDER SEAL" filed by Google Inc.. (vlh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2004)
February 20, 2004 Received Document: Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of Claim Construction Sur-Reply by Google Inc.. (vlh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2004)
February 20, 2004 Received Document: Claim Construction Sur-Reply by Google Inc.. (vlh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2004)
February 20, 2004 139 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 136 MOTION to Seal Document from Claim Construction Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 20, 2004. (jswlc2, ) (Filed on 2/20/2004)
February 20, 2004 138 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. of Google Inc.'s Claim Construction Sur-Reply (Unredacted Version) and the Confidential Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of Google's Claim Construction Sur-Reply (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 2/20/2004)
February 20, 2004 137 NOTICE by Google Inc. of Manual Filing of Unredacted Version of Google Inc.'s Claim Construction Sur-Reply and the Confidential Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 2/20/2004)
February 20, 2004 136 MOTION to Seal Document (Claim Construction Sur-Reply and Confidential Declaration of Christine P. Sun); [Proposed] Order filed by Google Inc.. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 2/20/2004)
February 20, 2004 135 RESPONSE in Support of Google's Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Redacted Version) filed by Google Inc.. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 2/20/2004)
February 17, 2004 Received Document: Declaration of Pietro Dova in Support of Opposition "FILED UNDER SEAL" by Google Inc.. (vlh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2004)
February 17, 2004 Received Document: Declaration of Mark Fuchs in Support of Opposition "FILED UNDER SEAL" by Google Inc.. (vlh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2004)
February 17, 2004 Received Document: Memorandum in Opposition re 112 Motion to Compel Production of Damages Documents "FILED UNDER SEAL" by Google Inc.. (vlh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2004)
February 17, 2004 134 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. of Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Overture's Motion to Compel (Unredacted Version-Under Seal); Declaration of Mark Fuchs (Under Seal); and Declaration of Pietro Dova (Under Seal) (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 2/17/2004)
February 17, 2004 133 Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of 132 Google's Opposition to Overture's Motion to Compel Production of Damages Documents filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 132 ) (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 2/17/2004)
February 17, 2004 132 Memorandum in Opposition re 112 MOTION to Compel [Corrected Motion to Compel Production of Damages Documents; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Corrected Motion] [Redacted Version] filed by Google Inc.. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 2/17/2004)
February 17, 2004 131 NOTICE by Google Inc. of Manual Filing of Unredacted Version of Google Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Overture's Motion to Compel Production of Damages Documents and Supporting Declarations (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 2/17/2004)
February 17, 2004 130 MOTION to Seal Document Request to File Documents Under Seal; [Proposed] Order filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2004 09:00 AM. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 2/17/2004)
February 13, 2004 129 REPLY to Response to Motion [Overture Services Inc.'s Reply Claim Construction Brief] filed by Overture Services, Inc.. (Fram, Robert) (Filed on 2/13/2004)
February 13, 2004 128 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT [Amended Joint Claim Construction Statement] filed by Overture Services, Inc., Sarah Elizabeth Mitchell. (Mitchell, Sarah) (Filed on 2/13/2004)
February 9, 2004 127 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 119 Google's Miscellaneous Administrative Request Re: Overture's Revised Claim Constructions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 6, 2004. (jswlc2, ) (Filed on 2/9/2004)
February 4, 2004 126 Proposed Order [Re Google's Miscellaneous Administrative Request] by Overture Services, Inc.. (Mitchell, Sarah) (Filed on 2/4/2004)
February 4, 2004 125 RESPONSE to Google's Miscellaneous Request Re Overture's Revised Claim Constructions by Overture Services, Inc., Sarah Elizabeth Mitchell. (Mitchell, Sarah) (Filed on 2/4/2004)
February 3, 2004 124 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 118 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 3, 2004. (jswlc2, ) (Filed on 2/3/2004)
February 3, 2004 123 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 122 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 3, 2004. (jswlc2, ) (Filed on 2/3/2004)
February 2, 2004 122 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , individually filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2004 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kwun, Michael) (Filed on 2/2/2004)
January 30, 2004 Received Document: Responsive Claim Construction Brief "FILED UNDER SEAL" by Google Inc.. (vlh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2004)
January 30, 2004 Received Document re 120 : Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of Responsive Claim Construction Brief "FILED UNDER SEAL" by Google Inc.. (vlh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2004)
January 30, 2004 121 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 117 Notice (Other) Google's Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Unredacted Version) and Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of Google's Responsive Claim Coinstruction Brief (Unredacted Version) (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 1/30/2004)
January 30, 2004 120 Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of 119 Google's Miscellaneous Administrative Request Re: Overture's Revised Claim Constructions filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 119 ) (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 1/30/2004)
January 30, 2004 119 MOTION Google's Miscellaneous Administrative Request Re: Overture's Revised Claim Constructions and [Proposed] Order re 115 Claim Construction Statement filed by Google Inc.. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 1/30/2004)
January 30, 2004 118 MOTION for Leave to File Google's Request to File Documents Under Seal; [Proposed] Order filed by Google Inc.. (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 1/30/2004)
January 30, 2004 117 NOTICE by Google Inc. of Manual Filing of Unredacted Version of Its Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Declaration of Christine P. Sun (Sun, Christine) (Filed on 1/30/2004)
January 30, 2004 116 Declaration of Ravind S. Grewal in Support of 115 Google's Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25# 26 Exhibit 26# 27 Exhibit 27# 28 Exhibit 28# 29 Exhibit 29# 30 Exhibit 30)(Related document(s) 115 ) (Grewal, Ravind) (Filed on 1/30/2004)
January 30, 2004 115 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Google's Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Redacted Version) filed by Google Inc., Daralyn J. Durie. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 1/30/2004)
January 29, 2004 114 Proposed Order [Granting Plaintiff Overture Services, Inc.'s Corrected Motion to Compel Production of Damages Documents] by Overture Services, Inc.. (Byrnes, Andrew) (Filed on 1/29/2004)
January 29, 2004 113 Declaration in Support of 112 [Plaintiff Overture Services, Inc.'s Corrected Motion to Compel Production of Damages Documents] filed by Overture Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q# 18 Exhibit R# 19 Exhibit S# 20 Exhibit T# 21 Exhibit U# 22 Exhibit V# 23 Exhibit W)(Related document(s) 112 ) (Byrnes, Andrew) (Filed on 1/29/2004)
January 29, 2004 112 MOTION to Compel [Corrected Motion to Compel Production of Damages Documents; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Corrected Motion] filed by Overture Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2004 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Byrnes, Andrew) (Filed on 1/29/2004)
January 28, 2004 111 Proposed Order re 109 [Granting Plaintiff Overture Services, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Damages Documents] by Overture Services, Inc.. (Byrnes, Andrew) (Filed on 1/28/2004)
January 28, 2004 110 Declaration of Andrew C. Byrnes in Support of 109 [Plaintiff Overture Services, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Production of Damages Documents] filed by Overture Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit E# 4 Exhibit F# 5 Exhibit G# 6 Exhibit H# 7 Exhibit I# 8 Exhibit J# 9 Exhibit K# 10 Exhibit L# 11 Exhibit M# 12 Exhibit N# 13 Exhibit O# 14 Exhibit P# 15 Exhibit Q# 16 Exhibit R# 17 Exhibit C# 18 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 109 ) (Byrnes, Andrew) (Filed on 1/28/2004)
January 28, 2004 109 MOTION to Compel [Plaintiff Overture Services, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Production of Damages Documents; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion] filed by Overture Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2004 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1)(Byrnes, Andrew) (Filed on 1/28/2004)
January 8, 2004 108 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion to Compel Responses to Inerrogatory No. 10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2004)
January 6, 2004 107 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/6/2004 before Laporte (Date Filed: 1/6/2004). (Court Reporter James Yeomans.) (drk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/6/2004)
December 23, 2003 106 Reply Memorandum re 102 MOTION to Compel Google to Respond to Interrogatory No. 10 filed by Overture Services, Inc.. (McMahon, Charles) (Filed on 12/23/2003)
December 19, 2003 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Fram [Notice of Substitution of Counsel] (Fram, Robert) (Filed on 12/19/2003)
December 16, 2003 104 Memorandum in Opposition re 102 MOTION to Compel Google to Respond to Interrogatory No. 10 filed by Google Inc.. (Grewal, Ravind) (Filed on 12/16/2003)
December 10, 2003 103 Certificate of Interested Entities for Overture Services, Inc. (McMahon, Charles) (Filed on 12/10/2003)
December 2, 2003 102 MOTION to Compel Google to Respond to Interrogatory No. 10 filed by Overture Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2004 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Charles M. McMahon in Support of Overture's Motion to Compel# 2 Proposed Order)(McMahon, Charles) (Filed on 12/2/2003)
September 10, 2003 101 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER RE PRODUCTION OF EMAILSigned by Judge Laporte on September 10, 2003. (edllc1)
September 2, 2003 Set/Reset Hearings: Claims Construction Hearing set for 3/24/2004 02:00 PM. Tutorial set for 3/10/2004 2:00PM. (vlh, COURT STAFF)
September 2, 2003 100 DECLARATION in Support re 99 of Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Christine P. Sun) "FILED UNDER SEAL" filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 99 ) (vlh, COURT STAFF)
September 2, 2003 99 Brief -Google's Responsive Claim Construction Brief "FILED UNDER SEAL" filed by Google Inc.. (vlh, COURT STAFF)
September 2, 2003 98 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 95 PLAINTIFF'S MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST AND SETTING NEW DATES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 2, 2003. (jswlc2, )
September 2, 2003 97 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 92 REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 2, 2003. (jswlc2, )
August 25, 2003 96 Statement of Non-Opposition Re Overture's Miscellaneous Request filed by Google Inc.. (Kwun, Michael)
August 25, 2003 95 MOTION MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST FOR GUIDANCE REGARDING EXISTENCE OF LIMITATIONS ON THE LENGTH OF PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION filed by Overture Services, Inc.. (Fenwick, Anthony) filed by Overture Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fenwick, Anthony)
August 22, 2003 Received Document Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of Responsive Claim Construction Brief "FILED UNDER SEAL" by Google Inc.. (vlh, )
August 22, 2003 Received Document Responsive Claim Construction Brief "FILED UNDER SEAL" by Google Inc.. (vlh, )
August 22, 2003 94 CERTIFICATE/PROOF OF SERVICE by Google Inc. of GOOGLE's Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Sealed Version) and the Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of GOOGLE's Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Sealed) (Kwun, Michael)
August 22, 2003 93 NOTICE of Manual Filing of Unredacted Version of Its Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Declaration of Christine P. Sun by Google Inc.. (Kwun, Michael)
August 22, 2003 92 Proposed Order and Request to File Under Seal (Unredacted Markman Brief) by Google Inc.. (Kwun, Michael)
August 22, 2003 91 DECLARATION in Support re 90 (Kwun) Google's Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25# 26 Exhibit 26# 27 Exhibit 27# 28 Exhibit 28# 29 Exhibit 29)(Related document(s) 90 ) (Kwun, Michael)
August 22, 2003 90 Brief Responsive Claim Construction; tutorial date 10/15/03 at 2:00 pm; hearing date 10/22/03 at 2:00 pm filed by Google Inc.. (Durie, Daralyn) Modified on 8/22/2003 (dlp, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2003 89 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Laporte denying 70 Motion for Protective Order (drk, COURT STAFF)
August 19, 2003 88 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing re 70 , 71 held on 8/19/2003 before Laporte. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (drk, COURT STAFF)
August 15, 2003 87 DECLARATION in Support re 86 of Opposition (Christine P. Sun) "FILED UNDER SEAL" filed by Google Inc.. (Related document(s) 86 ) (vlh, )
August 15, 2003 86 Memorandum in Opposition re 70 to Motion For Protective Order "FILED UNDER SEAL" filed by Google Inc.. (vlh, )
August 15, 2003 85 Order granting defendant's request to file documents under seal. Signed by Judge Laporte on August 13, 2003. (edllc1, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2003 (edllc1, ).
August 14, 2003 84 Proposed Order Re: Request to File Documents Under Seal (Volume 2 of the Declaration of Christine P. Sun) by Google Inc.. (Sun, Christine)
August 11, 2003 Received Document Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of Opposition to Motion For Protective Order by Google Inc.. (vlh, )
August 11, 2003 Received Document Opposition to Motion For Protective Order "FILED UNDER SEAL" by Google Inc.. (vlh, )
August 11, 2003 Received Document Request to File Under Seal Opposition to Motion For Protective Order and Declaration of Christine P. Sun in Support of Opposition by Google Inc.. (vlh, )
August 11, 2003 83 CERTIFICATE/PROOF OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 70 Opposition to Overture's Motion for Protective Order (Sun, Christine)
August 11, 2003 82 DECLARATION in Support re 70 (Christine P. Sun) Opposition to Overture's Motion for Protective Order filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit I# 8 Exhibit J# 9 Exhibit K# 10 Exhibit L# 11 Exhibit M# 12 Exhibit N# 13 Exhibit O# 14 Exhibit P# 15 Exhibit Q# 16 Exhibit R)(Related document(s) 70 ) (Sun, Christine)
August 11, 2003 81 NOTICE re 80 Manual Filing of Unredacted Versions of Its Opposition to Overture's Motion for a Protective Order and Declaration of Christine P. Sun by Google Inc.. (Sun, Christine)
August 11, 2003 80 Memorandum in Opposition re 70 Overture's Motion for Protective Order (Redacted) filed by Google Inc.. (Sun, Christine)
August 11, 2003 79 STIPULATION -- Joint Motion for Entry of Supplemental Stipulated Protective Order re Email by Overture Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order -- Proposed Supplemental Stipulated Protective Order re Email)(McMahon, Charles)
August 8, 2003 78 CERTIFICATE/PROOF OF SERVICE by Overture Services, Inc. re 76 , 77 (vlh, )
August 8, 2003 77 EXHIBITS re 75 to Opening Claim Construction Brief (28) filed by Overture Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) 75 ) (vlh, )
August 8, 2003 76 EXHIBITS re 75 to Opening Claim Construction Brief (1 -27) filed by Overture Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) 75 ) (vlh, )
August 8, 2003 75 Brief -- Overture's Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Overture Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Charles M. McMahon in Support of Overture's Opening Claim Construction Brief# 2 Exhibit Notice of Exhibit Attachments)(McMahon, Charles)
August 7, 2003 74 Featured Case ORDER re 71 Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2003 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Laporte on 08/06/03. (drk, )
August 6, 2003 73 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laporte granting 71 Motion to Expedite (drk, )
August 6, 2003 72 RESPONSE to re 71 Google Technology Inc.'s Non-Opposition to Overture's Motion to Shorten the Briefing and Hearing Schedule Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-3 by Google Inc.. (Kwun, Michael)
August 4, 2003 71 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Overture's Motion for a Protective Order filed by Overture Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Affidavit of Charles M. McMahon in Support of Motion to Shorten Briefing and Hearing Schedule)(McMahon, Charles)
August 4, 2003 70 MOTION for Protective Order Preventing Excessive Third Party Discovery filed by Overture Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2003 09:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Charles M. McMahon in Support of Motion for Protective Order)(McMahon, Charles)
July 25, 2003 69 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/25/2003 before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz.) (jjo, )
July 18, 2003 68 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Overture Services, Inc.. (McMahon, Charles)
June 24, 2003 67 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -- Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement filed by Overture Services, Inc.. (McMahon, Charles) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2003 (vlh, ).
May 29, 2003 66 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST re 65 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 29, 2003. (jswlc2, )
May 29, 2003 65 STIPULATION REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO DEFER ADJUDICATION by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kwun, Michael)
May 19, 2003 64 Letter from Michael S. Kwun dated 5/16/2003 re: terms and phrases for construction. (vlh, )
May 2, 2003 63 Featured Case ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES -Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/2/03. (lmh, )
May 1, 2003 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge for Discovery Elizabeth D. Laporte. (wh, )
April 29, 2003 62 Featured Case ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 29, 2003. (jswlc2, )
April 28, 2003 61 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 60 and Demand for Jury Trial by Overture Services, Inc.. (McMahon, Charles)
April 14, 2003 60 Defendant Google Technology Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Overture Services, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM s and Demand for Jury against all plaintiffs by Google Inc.. (Kwun, Michael)
March 31, 2003 Set/Reset Hearings: Claims Construction Hearing set for 10/22/2003 02:00 PM. Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2003 at 01:30 PM. (vlh, )
March 31, 2003 59 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR AN ORDER CHANGING TIME re 58 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 31, 2003. (jswlc2, )
March 31, 2003 58 STIPULATION Stipulated Request for an Order Changing Time; Declarationof Michael S. Kwun in Support Thereof by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulaed Request for an Order Changing Time)(Kwun, Michael)
March 28, 2003 57 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google Inc.. Filed by Overture Services, Inc.. (McMahon, Charles)
March 28, 2003 56 STIPULATION re Overture's Amended Complaint by Overture Services, Inc.. (McMahon, Charles)
March 7, 2003 55 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION re 54 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 7, 2003. (jswlc2, )
March 7, 2003 54 Proposed Order Extending the Deadline for Mediation by Overture Services, Inc.. (McMahon, Charles)
February 18, 2003 53 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER . Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 18, 2003. (jswlc2, )
February 7, 2003 52 Featured Case SECOND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Claims Construction Hearing set for 8/7/2003 08:30 AM. Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2003 at 01:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 7, 2003. (jswlc2, )
February 6, 2003 51 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (FURTHER) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Case Management Order)(Kwun, Michael)
January 31, 2003 50 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER . Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 31, 2003. (jswlc2, )
January 24, 2003 49 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Case Management Order)(Kwun, Michael)
January 14, 2003 48 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by the Executive Committee. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 1/14/03. (mcl, )
January 9, 2003 47 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER . Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 01/09/03. (be, )
January 9, 2003 Claims Construction Hearing set for 7/9/2003 02:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 7/8/2003 02:30 PM. (be, )
January 9, 2003 46 Case Management Order . Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 01/07/03. (be, )
January 8, 2003 45 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Stipulated Supplemental Re Outside Counsel Only Source Code filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kwun, Michael)
January 7, 2003 44 NOTICE of Entry of Order Granting Google Inc.'s Motion Re Infringement Contentions And Invalidity Contentions by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Kwun, Michael)
January 6, 2003 43 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 25 defendant Google's Motion for Extension of Time to File Preliminary Invalidity Contentions ; Google's deadline due 2/14/03 (mcl, )
January 6, 2003 42 Featured Case NOTICE OF NEW STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/6/2003. (Attachments: # 1)(edllc2, )
January 3, 2003 41 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by Google Inc.. (Kwun, Michael)
December 18, 2002 40 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER . Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on December 16, 2002. (be, )
December 18, 2002 39 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing re 25 to compel supplementary preliminary infringement contentions held on 12/18/2002 before Magistrate Judge Laporte. Motion GRANTED. (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (sp, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/30/2002 (vlh, ).
December 13, 2002 38 STIPULATION Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order by Overture Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(McMahon, Charles)
December 12, 2002 37 DECLARATION in Support re 36 Reply Memorandum in Support of Google's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 36 ) (Kwun, Michael)
December 12, 2002 36 Reply Memorandum to Motion re 25 for an Extension of Time to Serve Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion for an Extension of Time to Serve Initial Invalidity Contentions)(Kwun, Michael)
December 12, 2002 35 Featured Case ORDER SETTING HEARING RE 25 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTARY PRELIMINARY INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS. Hearing on December 18, 2002 at 3:00 p.m.Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 12, 2002. (edllc1, )
December 9, 2002 34 Memorandum in Opposition re 25 Google's Motion for an Extension of Time to File Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by Overture Services, Inc.. (McMahon, Charles)
December 2, 2002 33 Featured Case ORDER setting briefing schedule for Defendant's Motion to Compel Supplementary Preliminary Infringement Contentions re 30 ; opposition due 12/9/02; reply due 12/12/02; if hearing necessary, it will be set 12/18/02 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laporte on December 2, 2002. (sp, )
October 21, 2002 32 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR AN ORDER CHANGING TIME. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on October 21, 2002. (be, )
October 18, 2002 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge for motion to compel supplemetary preliminary infrignement contentions to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (wh, )
October 18, 2002 31 STIPULATION REQUEST FOR AN ORDER CHANGING TIME by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Request for an Order Changing Time)(Kwun, Michael)
October 17, 2002 30 Featured Case ORDER vacating October 8, 2002 order granting motion for an extension of time and referring motion to a magistrate judge.Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on October 17, 2002. (crblc1)
October 10, 2002 29 NOTICE re 28 Declaration of Charles McMahon in Opposition to Motion to Extend Time by Overture Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(McMahon, Charles)
October 10, 2002 28 NOTICE re 25 Opposition to Motion to Extend Time by Overture Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McMahon, Charles)
October 8, 2002 27 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to File (be, )
October 7, 2002 26 DECLARATION in Support re 25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) 25 ) (Kwun, Michael)
October 7, 2002 25 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting)(Kwun, Michael)
August 30, 2002 Set/Reset Hearings:, Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines: Claims Construction Hearing set for 3/25/2003 02:30 AM. Tutorial set for 3/24/2003 02:30 PM. (be, )
August 30, 2002 24 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/30/2002 before Charles R. Breyer. () (be, )
August 19, 2002 23 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google Inc., Overture Services, Inc.. (McMahon, Charles)
August 8, 2002 22 Featured Case ORDER selecting ADR Process (Private ADR). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 08/06/02. (be, )
August 5, 2002 21 STIPULATION selecting Private ADR by Overture Services, Inc. (Berenzweig, Jack)
August 5, 2002 20 Stipulation selecting ADR Process(ADR L.R. 3-5b) (Berenzweig, Jack) Modified on 8/8/2002 (mcl, ). DUPLICATE ENTRY - see below #21
June 25, 2002 19 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM by Overture Services, Inc.. (Frankel, William)
June 7, 2002 18 ANSWER to Complaint AND, COUNTERCLAIM S against Overture Services, Inc. by Google Inc.. (Kwun, Michael)
May 16, 2002 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2002 at 08:30 AM. before Judge Charles R. Breyer (mf, )
May 7, 2002 16 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Judge Bernard Zimmerman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/7/02. (as, )
May 6, 2002 11 CERTIFICATE of Clerk Certificate of Service Notice of Impending Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (ls, )
May 6, 2002 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A UNITED STATES DISTRICT JUDGE. (ls, )
May 3, 2002 9 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Google Inc.. (Kwun, Michael)
May 2, 2002 15 Featured Case ORDER by Mag. Judge Bernard Zimmerman GRANTING plaintiff's application for Attorney Charles M. McMahon to appear Pro Hac Vice 5 . (tn)
May 2, 2002 14 Featured Case ORDER by Mag. Judge Bernard Zimmerman GRANTING plaintiff's application for Attorney William H. Frankel to Appear Pro Hac Vice 3 . (tn)
May 2, 2002 13 Featured Case ORDER by Mag. Judge Bernard Zimmerman GRANTING plaintiff's application for Attorney Jack C. Berenzweig to Appear Pro Hac Vice 6 . (tn)
May 2, 2002 12 Featured Case ORDER by Mag. Judge Bernard Zimmerman GRANTING plaintiff's application for attorney Jason C. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice 4 .(tn)
April 29, 2002 8 SERVICE OF SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Google Inc., personally served on 4/23/02. (tn)
April 26, 2002 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Overture Services, Inc. re 6 , 3 , 4 , 5 & [Proposed] Orders. (tn, )
April 26, 2002 Received Order re 6 : [Proposed] Order by Overture Services, Inc.. (tn, )
April 26, 2002 6 APPLICATION of Attorney Jack C. Berenzweig to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: paid, receipt #:3334424) filed by Plaintiff Overture Services, Inc.. (tn)
April 26, 2002 Received Order re 5 : [Proposed] Order by Overture Services, Inc.. (tn, )
April 26, 2002 5 APPLICATION for Attorney Charles M. McMahon to Appear Pro hac Vice, (Filing Fee: paid, receipt #:3334423) filed by Plaintiff Overture Services, Inc.. (tn)
April 26, 2002 Received Order re 4 : [Proposed] Order by Overture Services, Inc.. (tn, )
April 26, 2002 4 APPLICATION for Attorney Jason C. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: paid, receipt #:3334422) filed by Plaintiff Overture Services, Inc.. (tn)
April 26, 2002 Received Order re 3 : [Proposed] Order by Overture Services, Inc.. (tn, )
April 26, 2002 3 APPLICATION for Attorney William H. Frankel to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: paid, receipt #:3334425) filed by Plaintiff Overture Services, Inc.. (tn)
April 23, 2002 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2002. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4:00 p.m. on 8/26/2002. (tn)
April 23, 2002 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (tn, )
April 23, 2002 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn)
April 23, 2002 Summons Issued as to Google Inc. (tn, )
April 23, 2002 1 COMPLAINT (Summons Issued) against Google Inc. (Filing fee $150.00 receipt number 5505059). Filed by Overture Services, Inc.. (tn, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2002 (tn, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Overture Services, Inc. v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Overture Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Patrick Wickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Christine Patricia Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Google Inc.
Represented By: John Watkins Keker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Overture Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Patrick Wickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?