Gonzales v. Galaza

Case Number: 3:2002cv02279
Filed: May 10, 2002
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2010 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Benjamin Gonzales. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 30, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
March 5, 2009 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 142 MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF IN EXCESS OF 15 PAGES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/5/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
January 26, 2009 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 133 Motion for Extension of Time to File Traverse To Answer to First Amended Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/26/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
November 24, 2008 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 126 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/24/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Galaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?