Nissan Fire and Marine Insurance Company Ltd. et a v. Bax Global Inc

Case Number: 3:2002cv02516
Filed: May 23, 2002
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc. Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 49:81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2009 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 243 Stipulation FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/7/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
November 5, 2009 242 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 241 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 5, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
September 25, 2009 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 237 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 25, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
June 12, 2009 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 231 Stipulation to Set Further Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 12, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 222 Cross-Motions Regarding Damages and Attorney Fees (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
February 24, 2009 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 219 Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/24/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
January 13, 2009 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 215 MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/13/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nissan Fire and Marine Insurance Company Ltd. et a v. Bax Global Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?