Rombeiro v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al

Plaintiff: Edumndo M. Rombeiro
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America, UnumProvident Corporation, Next Level Group Long Term Disability Plan, Next Level Communications, Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Colonial Life & Accident Insurance Company and Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2002cv04018
Filed: August 20, 2002
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2011 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for dismissal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
May 13, 2011 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with dismissal upon settlement. Within 90 days from the date hereof, that settlement has no in fact occurred, the foregoing order shall be vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011) Modified on 5/13/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2011 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
March 27, 2011 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES & EXPENSES AND NEXT LEVEL DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2011)
February 7, 2011 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
December 23, 2010 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: NEXT LEVEL DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; UNUM DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
November 18, 2010 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER request to extend briefing (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
August 19, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rombeiro v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edumndo M. Rombeiro
Represented By: Robert M. Churella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Anna M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnumProvident Corporation
Represented By: William Bernard Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Next Level Group Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: William Bernard Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Next Level Communications
Represented By: William Bernard Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Revere Life Insurance Company
Represented By: William Bernard Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: William Bernard Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: William Bernard Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?