United States of America v. Real Property at 6557 Ascot Drive, Oakland, Califo

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property at 6557 Ascot Drive, Oakland, California
Claimant: Niloufer Fontaine, Steven Fontaine, Huibert Johannes van Praag, Longmead Properties Limited, Hereford Humanitarian Business Trust and Howard Jachter
Case Number: 3:2002cv04948
Filed: October 7, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2009 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 276 Stipulation Third Amendment to Stipulated Occupancy. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/7/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
August 28, 2009 274 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 273 Stipulation to Amend Agreement. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 28, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 17, 2009 272 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Order Denying Motion For Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 17, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 14, 2009 271 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 262 Motion to Stay (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
July 2, 2009 265 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 264 Stipulation re: Revised Briefing Schedule and First Amendment to the May 8, 2009 Stipulated Occupancy Agreement. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/2/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
May 8, 2009 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 254 Stipulated Occupancy Agreement. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/8/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
April 20, 2009 252 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT AND FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/20/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
April 13, 2009 236 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/13/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
December 18, 2008 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING DATES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/18/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
November 5, 2008 224 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 220 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on November 5, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
October 7, 2008 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 205 Stipulation re One-Day Extension, Nunc Pro Tunc, for Filing the Motion of the United States for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/7/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property at 6557 Ascot Drive, Oakland, Califo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stephanie M. Hinds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property at 6557 Ascot Drive, Oakland, California
Represented By: Patricia Jean Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Niloufer Fontaine
Represented By: James McCarty Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Steven Fontaine
Represented By: James McCarty Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Huibert Johannes van Praag
Represented By: Nanci L. Clarence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Longmead Properties Limited
Represented By: Nanci L. Clarence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hereford Humanitarian Business Trust
Represented By: Paul G. Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Howard Jachter
Represented By: Edward L. Clabaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?