Boston Telecommunications Group Inc. et al v. Wood et al

Case Number: 3:2002cv05971
Filed: December 31, 2002
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Referring Judge: Edward M. Chen
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2012 310 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING 309 Status Conference. Status Report due by 11/30/2012. Status Conference set for 12/7/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/4/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
June 8, 2012 308 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 307 STIPULATION To Vacate Jury Trial AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Joint Status Report due 8/31/2012 (Unless a Dismissal has been filed). Status Conference set for 9/7/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/8/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 5, 2012 306 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/5/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
May 21, 2012 299 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Objections to Exhibits. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 21, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
May 10, 2012 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL FOR EMERGENCY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO BE COMPLETED BY JUNE 15, 2012. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/10/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
February 3, 2012 286 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Pretrial Conference and Trial Dates. Jury Trial set for 6/18/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 5/29/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 02/03/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
January 30, 2012 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 262 Motion for Summary Judgment. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
October 31, 2011 282 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Pretrial Filing Deadlines, Pretrial Conference and Trial: Jury Trial set for 3/26/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/31/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
September 8, 2011 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/8/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
May 6, 2011 268 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 264 Stipulation to Continue Hearing and Modify Briefing Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 6, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
February 28, 2011 261 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/28/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
January 20, 2011 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 257 Stipulation SUPPLEMENTING THE FEBRUARY 9, 2004 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR TREATMENT OF CONFIDENTIAL AND/OR PROPRIETARY INFORMATION PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/20/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
March 19, 2010 249 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Referral. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 19, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 4, 2010 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 244 Administrative Request to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/4/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
January 13, 2010 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 238 Stipulation REGARDING CHANGE OF DATE FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/13/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boston Telecommunications Group Inc. et al v. Wood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?