Sapp v. County of Alameda et al

Case Number: 3:2003cv01066
Filed: March 11, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2006 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Judgment. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/11/2006. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2006)
August 29, 2006 100 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/29/06. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2006)
August 23, 2006 99 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 8/23/06. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sapp v. County of Alameda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?