Desert Outdoor Advertising Inc v. City of Oakland

Plaintiff: Desert Outdoor Advertising Inc
Defendant: City of Oakland
Case Number: 3:2003cv01078
Filed: April 7, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2009 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
February 21, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2009)
January 13, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIN TO SHORTEN TIME (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desert Outdoor Advertising Inc v. City of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desert Outdoor Advertising Inc
Represented By: James Shields Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oakland
Represented By: James F. Hodgkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?